LNWR/LMS Webb "2F" Class 0-6-2T
LNWR | LNWR (Duplicate) | LMS | LMS (Duplicate) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
602 | 7568 | 09/1881 | 1932 | 50.25 | |||||||||
627 | 7570 | 09/1881 | 06/1927 | 45.75 | |||||||||
971 | 7574 | 09/1881 | 01/1929 | 47.33 | |||||||||
703 | 7571 | 27571 | 09/1881 | 08/1946 | 64.92 | ||||||||
957 | 7573 | 09/1881 | 1932 | 50.25 | |||||||||
766 | 7572 | 27572 | 09/1881 | 11/1946 | 65.17 | ||||||||
1060 | 7575 | 27575 | 09/1881 | 12/1938 | 57.25 | ||||||||
102 | 7576 | 09/1881 | 09/1934 | 53 | |||||||||
119 | 3710 | 7577 | 27577 | 09/1881 | 02/1946 | 64.42 | |||||||
141 | 7578 | 09/1881 | 08/1928 | 46.92 | |||||||||
313 | 3119 | 7579 | 10/1881 | 08/1928 | 46.83 | ||||||||
205 | 3154 | 7580 | 27580 | 58883 | 10/1881 | 31/12/1949 | Edge Hill | 68.17 | 68.21 | ||||
207 | 3206 | 7581 | 10/1881 | 02/1929 | 47.33 | ||||||||
208 | 3292 | 7582 | 10/1881 | 1931 | 49.17 | ||||||||
227 | 3737 | 7551 | 27551 | 10/1881 | 11/1938 | 57.08 | |||||||
68 | 3707 | 7584 | 10/1881 | 08/1932 | 50.83 | ||||||||
850 | 7583 | 27583 | 10/1881 | 01/1937 | 55.25 | ||||||||
232 | 3738 | 7585 | 27585 | 58884 | 10/1881 | 13/11/1948 | 67.08 | 67.21 | |||||
239 | 3740 | 7586 | 27586 | 58885 | 11/1881 | 18/09/1948 | 66.83 | ||||||
241 | 3742 | 7587 | 11/1881 | 09/1932 | 50.83 | ||||||||
242 | 3743 | 7588 | 11/1881 | 11/1932 | 51 | ||||||||
243 | 3744 | 7589 | 11/1881 | 09/1925 | 43.83 | ||||||||
244 | 3745 | 7590 | 27590 | 11/1881 | 11/1947 | 66 | |||||||
246 | 3746 | 7591 | 27591 | 58886 | 12/1881 | 01/1949 | 67.08 | ||||||
247 | 3747 | 7592 | 27592 | 12/1881 | 01/1936 | 54.08 | |||||||
248 | 3748 | 7593 | 27593 | 12/1881 | 04/1938 | 56.33 | |||||||
249 | 3749 | 7594 | 27594 | 12/1881 | 08/1938 | 56.67 | |||||||
251 | 3750 | 7595 | 12/1881 | 06/1930 | 48.5 | ||||||||
252 | 3751 | 7596 | 27596 | 58887 | 12/1881 | 09/04/1955 | 73.33 | ||||||
142 | 3718 | 12/1881 | 07/1922 | 40.58 | |||||||||
2458 | 7597 | 27597 | 08/1882 | 11/1947 | 65.25 | ||||||||
2459 | 7598 | 08/1882 | 06/1927 | 44.83 | |||||||||
2460 | 7599 | 08/1882 | 12/1930 | 48.33 | |||||||||
2461 | 7600 | 27600 | 08/1882 | 07/1937 | 54.92 | ||||||||
2462 | 7601 | 08/1882 | 1931 | 48.33 | |||||||||
2463 | 7602 | 27602 | 58888 | 08/1882 | 30/09/1954 | 72.08 | 72.30 | ||||||
996 | 7607 | 08/1882 | 11/1930 | 48.25 | |||||||||
991 | 7554 | 08/1882 | 11/1928 | 46.25 | |||||||||
701 | 7605 | 27605 | 08/1882 | 04/1946 | 63.67 | ||||||||
770 | 7553 | 27553 | 58880 | 08/1882 | 30/04/1954 | 71.67 | |||||||
605 | 7569 | 08/1882 | 11/1928 | 46.25 | |||||||||
611 | 7552 | 27552 | 09/1882 | 08/1947 | 64.92 | ||||||||
682 | 7604 | 27604 | 09/1882 | 03/1946 | 63.5 | ||||||||
292 | 3053 | 7609 | 27609 | 09/1882 | 04/1946 | 63.58 | |||||||
679 | 7603 | 27603 | 58889 | 09/1882 | 31/08/1953 | 70.92 | |||||||
717 | 7606 | 27606 | 09/1882 | 11/1946 | 64.17 | ||||||||
140 | 3716 | 7610 | 09/1882 | 1932 | 49.25 | ||||||||
157 | 3725 | 7611 | 09/1882 | 1931 | 48.25 | ||||||||
158 | 3726 | 7612 | 09/1882 | 04/1927 | 44.58 | ||||||||
267 | 3756 | 7613 | 09/1882 | 1932 | 49.25 | ||||||||
693 | 7614 | 09/1882 | 11/1930 | 48.17 | |||||||||
997 | 7608 | 27608 | 09/1882 | 10/1934 | 52.08 | ||||||||
268 | 3757 | 7615 | 27615 | 09/1882 | 03/1936 | 53.5 | |||||||
269 | 3758 | 7616 | 27616 | 09/1882 | 12/1945 | 63.25 | |||||||
270 | 3759 | 7617 | 09/1882 | 10/1928 | 46.08 | ||||||||
272 | 3760 | 7618 | 27618 | 01/1883 | 10/1947 | 64.75 | |||||||
273 | 3761 | 7619 | 27619 | 58890 | 01/1883 | 11/1949 | 66.83 | 66.96 | |||||
274 | 3762 | 7620 | 01/1883 | 04/1928 | 45.25 | ||||||||
277 | 3763 | 7621 | 27621 | 58891 | 01/1883 | 08/1955 | 72.58 | 73.72 | |||||
281 | 3764 | 7622 | 01/1883 | 04/1927 | 44.25 | ||||||||
673 | 7624 | 27624 | 01/1883 | 06/1946 | 63.42 | ||||||||
797 | 7626 | 27626 | 01/1883 | 11/1944 | 61.83 | ||||||||
1009 | 7627 | 27627 | 58893 | 01/1883 | 16/10/1948 | 65.75 | 65.88 | ||||||
629 | 7623 | 27623 | 02/1883 | 11/1944 | 61.75 | ||||||||
747 | 7625 | 27625 | 58892 | 02/1883 | 24/05/1952 | 69.25 | |||||||
1015 | 7556 | 02/1883 | 09/1924 | 41.58 | |||||||||
671 | 7649 | 02/1883 | 1933 | 49.83 | |||||||||
607 | 7647 | 02/1883 | 02/1928 | 45 | |||||||||
690 | 7650 | 27650 | 02/1883 | 03/1946 | 63.08 | ||||||||
615 | 7648 | 27648 | 02/1883 | 01/1948 | 64.92 | ||||||||
2473 | 7628 | 02/1883 | 04/1927 | 44.17 | |||||||||
2474 | 7629 | 02/1883 | 05/1928 | 45.25 | |||||||||
2475 | 7630 | 02/1883 | 12/1934 | 51.83 | |||||||||
2476 | 7631 | 02/1883 | 09/1944 | 61.58 | |||||||||
2477 | 7632 | 02/1883 | 07/1933 | 50.42 | |||||||||
2478 | 7633 | 02/1883 | 06/1926 | 43.33 | |||||||||
2479 | 7634 | 03/1883 | 05/1929 | 46.17 | |||||||||
2480 | 7635 | 27635 | 58894 | 03/1883 | 03/1949 | 66 | |||||||
2481 | 7636 | 27636 | 03/1883 | 12/1947 | 64.75 | ||||||||
2482 | 7637 | 03/1883 | 03/1926 | 43 | |||||||||
2483 | 7638 | 27638 | 03/1883 | 07/1934 | 51.33 | ||||||||
2484 | 7639 | 27639 | 03/1883 | 11/1936 | 53.67 | ||||||||
2485 | 7640 | 27640 | 03/1883 | 10/1947 | 64.58 | ||||||||
2486 | 7641 | 03/1883 | 11/1932 | 49.67 | |||||||||
2487 | 7642 | 03/1883 | 09/1932 | 49.5 | |||||||||
2488 | 7643 | 04/1883 | 07/1934 | 51.25 | |||||||||
2489 | 7644 | 04/1883 | 04/1926 | 43 | |||||||||
2490 | 7555 | 27555 | 04/1883 | 01/1947 | 63.75 | ||||||||
2491 | 7645 | 27645 | 04/1883 | 12/1945 | 62.67 | ||||||||
2492 | 7646 | 04/1883 | 09/1926 | 43.42 | |||||||||
952 | 7651 | 27651 | 07/1883 | 10/1938 | 55.25 | ||||||||
953 | 7657 | 27657 | 07/1883 | 11/1936 | 53.33 | ||||||||
617 | 7652 | 07/1883 | 11/1934 | 51.33 | |||||||||
678 | 7653 | 07/1883 | 06/1927 | 43.92 | |||||||||
518 | 3285 | 7566 | 07/1883 | 03/1928 | 44.67 | ||||||||
694 | 7655 | 27655 | 07/1883 | 04/1937 | 53.75 | ||||||||
692 | 7654 | 27654 | 58895 | 07/1883 | 10/1951 | 68.25 | |||||||
698 | 7656 | 07/1883 | 1932 | 48.42 | |||||||||
780 | 7658 | 07/1883 | 04/1927 | 43.75 | |||||||||
959 | 7659 | 27659 | 07/1883 | 11/1935 | 52.33 | ||||||||
1004 | 7660 | 27660 | 07/1883 | 09/1938 | 55.17 | ||||||||
42 | 3705 | 7662 | 27662 | 07/1883 | 07/1946 | 63 | |||||||
110 | 3709 | 7663 | 27663 | 07/1883 | 12/1947 | 64.42 | |||||||
148 | 3720 | 7664 | 27664 | 07/1883 | 12/1947 | 64.42 | |||||||
150 | 3722 | 7665 | 08/1883 | 03/1928 | 44.58 | ||||||||
169 | 3728 | 7666 | 27666 | 08/1883 | 01/1947 | 63.42 | |||||||
178 | 08/1883 | 01/1920 | 36.42 | ||||||||||
179 | 3729 | 7667 | 08/1883 | 1931 | 47.33 | ||||||||
223 | 3735 | 7668 | 27684 | 08/1883 | 1931 | 47.33 | |||||||
259 | 3753 | 7669 | 27669 | 58896 | 08/1883 | 01/1949 | 65.42 | ||||||
1106 | 7672 | 27672 | 10/1883 | 10/1947 | 64 | ||||||||
1109 | 7673 | 10/1883 | 07/1928 | 44.75 | |||||||||
324 | 3151 | 7675 | 11/1883 | 06/1927 | 43.58 | ||||||||
848 | 7670 | 11/1883 | 05/1927 | 43.5 | |||||||||
1101 | 7671 | 11/1883 | 07/1931 | 47.67 | |||||||||
1112 | 7674 | 27674 | 58897 | 11/1883 | 10/1950 | 66.92 | 67.04 | ||||||
373 | 3339 | 7684 | 11/1883 | 11/1935 | 52 | ||||||||
1118 | 7682 | 11/1883 | 06/1947 | 63.58 | |||||||||
981 | 7680 | 27680 | 11/1883 | 01/1937 | 53.17 | ||||||||
491 | 3005 | 7567 | 11/1883 | 03/1928 | 44.33 | ||||||||
149 | 3721 | 7687 | 12/1883 | 1932 | 48 | ||||||||
1013 | 7681 | 27681 | 58898 | 12/1883 | 02/10/1948 | 64.83 | 64.88 | ||||||
367 | 3029 | 7683 | 12/1883 | 04/1927 | 43.33 | ||||||||
489 | 3448 | 7685 | 12/1883 | 10/1927 | 43.83 | ||||||||
490 | 3457 | 7686 | 27686 | 12/1883 | 11/1935 | 51.92 | |||||||
492 | 3055 | 7557 | 12/1883 | 12/1930 | 47 | ||||||||
925 | 7676 | 01/1884 | 10/1928 | 44.75 | |||||||||
926 | 7677 | 01/1884 | 1932 | 47.92 | |||||||||
927 | 7678 | 27678 | 01/1884 | 12/1945 | 61.92 | ||||||||
928 | 7679 | 01/1884 | 1932 | 47.92 | |||||||||
6 | 3336 | 7692 | 58899 | 04/1884 | 08/1954 | 70.33 | |||||||
8 | 3475 | 7693 | 04/1884 | 03/1928 | 43.92 | ||||||||
23 | 3702 | 7694 | 04/1884 | 10/1927 | 43.5 | ||||||||
30 | 3703 | 7695 | 04/1884 | 11/1928 | 44.58 | ||||||||
32 | 3704 | 7696 | 04/1884 | 05/1932 | 48.08 | ||||||||
1057 | 7690 | 07/1884 | 07/1947 | 63 | |||||||||
948 | 7689 | 07/1884 | 07/1927 | 43 | |||||||||
152 | 3723 | 7691 | 27691 | 09/1884 | 1935 | 50.25 | |||||||
751 | 7688 | 08/1884 | 04/1938 | 53.67 | |||||||||
994 | 09/1884 | 07/1922 | 37.83 | ||||||||||
63 | 3706 | 7697 | 09/1884 | 04/1924 | 39.58 | ||||||||
145 | 3719 | 7698 | 09/1884 | 08/1928 | 43.92 | ||||||||
186 | 3724 | 7699 | 58900 | 09/1884 | 10/1954 | 70.08 | |||||||
161 | 3727 | 7700 | 09/1884 | 03/1948 | 63.5 | ||||||||
258 | 3752 | 7701 | 09/1884 | 07/1927 | 42.83 | ||||||||
1005 | 7705 | 10/1884 | 11/1946 | 62.08 | |||||||||
947 | 7702 | 10/1884 | 07/1928 | 43.75 | |||||||||
949 | 7703 | 58901 | 10/1884 | 07/1948 | 63.75 | 64.04 | |||||||
950 | 7704 | 10/1884 | 12/1930 | 46.17 | |||||||||
483 | 3423 | 7706 | 10/1884 | 06/1928 | 43.67 | ||||||||
484 | 12/1884 | 02/1920 | 35.17 | ||||||||||
652 | 7707 | 12/1884 | 12/1930 | 46 | |||||||||
699 | 7708 | 12/1884 | 03/1928 | 43.25 | |||||||||
771 | 7709 | 12/1884 | 06/1947 | 62.5 | |||||||||
782 | 12/1884 | 11/1922 | 37.92 | ||||||||||
796 | 7710 | 58902 | 12/1884 | 31/12/1954 | 70 | ||||||||
958 | 7558 | 27558 | 12/1884 | 01/1947 | 62.08 | ||||||||
966 | 7711 | 58903 | 01/1885 | 19/06/1954 | 69.42 | ||||||||
970 | 7712 | 01/1885 | 07/1938 | 53.5 | |||||||||
1012 | 01/1885 | 07/1922 | 37.5 | ||||||||||
1016 | 7713 | 01/1885 | 11/1932 | 47.83 | |||||||||
1075 | 7714 | 01/1885 | 06/1928 | 43.42 | |||||||||
1201 | 7715 | 01/1885 | 01/1948 | 63 | |||||||||
1202 | 7716 | 01/1885 | 09/1928 | 43.67 | |||||||||
1203 | 7717 | 01/1885 | 11/1947 | 62.83 | |||||||||
1204 | 7718 | 01/1885 | 1932 | 46.92 | |||||||||
1206 | 7719 | 01/1885 | 1932 | 46.92 | |||||||||
1207 | 7720 | 58904 | 01/1885 | 30/09/1955 | 70.67 | 70.71 | |||||||
1208 | 7721 | 58905 | 01/1885 | 28/08/1948 | 63.58 | 63.79 | |||||||
1209 | 7722 | 01/1885 | 01/1947 | 62 | |||||||||
1210 | 7723 | 04/1886 | 04/1927 | 41 | |||||||||
2360 | 7724 | 04/1886 | 08/1938 | 52.33 | |||||||||
2361 | 7725 | 04/1886 | 11/1930 | 44.58 | |||||||||
2362 | 7726 | 04/1885 | 09/1927 | 42.42 | |||||||||
2363 | 7727 | 27727 | 04/1886 | 03/1936 | 49.92 | ||||||||
2364 | 7728 | 04/1886 | 12/1938 | 52.67 | |||||||||
2453 | 7729 | 04/1886 | 01/1944 | 57.75 | |||||||||
2454 | 7730 | 58906 | 04/1886 | 13/11/1948 | 62.58 | ||||||||
2455 | 7731 | 04/1886 | 06/1928 | 42.17 | |||||||||
2456 | 7732 | 04/1886 | 05/1928 | 42.08 | |||||||||
2457 | 7733 | 58907 | 04/1886 | 02/10/1948 | 62.5 | 62.54 | |||||||
355 | 3271 | 7735 | 07/1886 | 11/1928 | 42.33 | ||||||||
357 | 3320 | 7736 | 27736 | 07/1886 | 05/1936 | 49.83 | |||||||
359 | 3325 | 7737 | 58908 | 07/1886 | 10/11/1951 | 65.33 | |||||||
240 | 3741 | 7741 | 58910 | 07/1886 | 05/07/1952 | 66 | |||||||
210 | 3453 | 7740 | 58909 | 07/1886 | 12/06/1948 | 61.92 | 62.04 | ||||||
369 | 3058 | 7734 | 27734 | 07/1886 | 09/1936 | 50.17 | |||||||
436 | 3415 | 7559 | 07/1886 | 1931 | 44.42 | ||||||||
452 | 3422 | 7739 | 07/1886 | 1931 | 44.42 | ||||||||
438 | 3418 | 7738 | 07/1886 | 12/1930 | 44.42 | ||||||||
120 | 3711 | 7749 | 08/1886 | 01/1928 | 41.42 | ||||||||
261 | 3754 | 7756 | 58914 | 08/1886 | 28/08/1948 | 62 | 62.13 | ||||||
266 | 3755 | 7757 | 58915 | 08/1886 | 30/09/1954 | 68.08 | 68.30 | ||||||
215 | 3731 | 7751 | 58912 | 08/1886 | 16/12/1950 | 64.33 | 64.46 | ||||||
293 | 3105 | 7744 | 08/1886 | 1931 | 44.33 | ||||||||
296 | 3109 | 7745 | 08/1886 | 04/1927 | 40.67 | ||||||||
192 | 3068 | 7743 | 08/1886 | 12/1930 | 44.33 | ||||||||
211 | 3509 | 7748 | 08/1886 | 07/1931 | 44.92 | ||||||||
220 | 3733 | 7753 | 08/1886 | 10/1927 | 41.17 | ||||||||
440 | 3419 | 7747 | 08/1886 | 09/1947 | 61.08 | ||||||||
221 | 3734 | 7754 | 08/1886 | 04/1927 | 40.67 | ||||||||
237 | 3739 | 7755 | 08/1886 | 09/1947 | 61.08 | ||||||||
123 | 3712 | 7750 | 27750 | 08/1886 | 03/1936 | 49.58 | |||||||
183 | 3044 | 7742 | 08/1886 | 10/1947 | 61.17 | ||||||||
216 | 3732 | 7752 | 58913 | 08/1885 | 06/1952 | 66.83 | |||||||
407 | 3353 | 7746 | 58911 | 08/1886 | 31/03/1954 | 67.58 | |||||||
1338 | 7762 | 12/1886 | 01/1935 | 48.08 | |||||||||
2010 | 7763 | 12/1886 | 04/1946 | 59.33 | |||||||||
442 | 3420 | 7560 | 12/1886 | 05/1928 | 41.42 | ||||||||
429 | 3414 | 7764 | 12/1886 | 02/1939 | 52.17 | ||||||||
411 | 3356 | 7758 | 12/1886 | 1932 | 45 | ||||||||
417 | 3387 | 7759 | 58916 | 12/1886 | 07/10/1950 | 63.83 | |||||||
224 | 3736 | 7761 | 12/1886 | 03/1946 | 59.25 | ||||||||
549 | 3287 | 7550 | 12/1886 | 07/1931 | 44.58 | ||||||||
551 | 3428 | 7760 | 12/1886 | 12/1930 | 44 | ||||||||
554 | 3447 | 7767 | 02/1887 | 06/1927 | 40.33 | ||||||||
557 | 3765 | 7768 | 02/1887 | 12/1944 | 57.83 | ||||||||
558 | 3766 | 7769 | 58918 | 02/1887 | 24/04/1948 | 61.17 | |||||||
579 | 7766 | 02/1887 | 06/1927 | 40.33 | |||||||||
567 | 3767 | 7770 | 02/1887 | 02/1936 | 49 | ||||||||
568 | 3768 | 7771 | 02/1887 | 1928 | 40.83 | ||||||||
569 | 3769 | 7772 | 02/1887 | 04/1947 | 60.17 | ||||||||
570 | 3770 | 7773 | 58919 | 02/1887 | 20/12/1952 | 65.83 | 66.29 | ||||||
571 | 3771 | 7774 | 02/1887 | 03/1936 | 49.08 | ||||||||
572 | 3772 | 7775 | 02/1887 | 11/1930 | 43.75 | ||||||||
573 | 3773 | 7776 | 02/1887 | 12/1924 | 37.83 | ||||||||
974 | 3774 | 7777 | 02/1887 | 09/1930 | 43.58 | ||||||||
575 | 3775 | 7778 | 02/1887 | 09/1946 | 59.58 | ||||||||
576 | 3776 | 7561 | 27561 | 58881 | 02/1887 | 09/1950 | 63.58 | 63.62 | |||||
578 | 7765 | 58917 | 02/1887 | 02/1950 | 63 | ||||||||
129 | 3714 | 7787 | 58922 | 05/1887 | 07/1948 | 61.17 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 04/09/1948 | 61.35 | |||
443 | 3421 | 7785 | 05/1887 | 1932 | 44.58 | ||||||||
135 | 3715 | 7788 | 05/1887 | 1931 | 43.58 | ||||||||
580 | 7779 | 05/1887 | 04/1932 | 44.92 | |||||||||
582 | 7780 | 58920 | 05/1887 | 14/08/1948 | 61.25 | ||||||||
584 | 7781 | 05/1887 | 1934 | 46.58 | |||||||||
585 | 7782 | 58921 | 05/1887 | 21/08/1954 | 67.25 | ||||||||
435 | 3155 | 7562 | 27562 | 58882 | 05/1887 | 10/1949 | 62.42 | ||||||
125 | 3713 | 7786 | 05/1887 | 04/1927 | 39.92 | ||||||||
588 | 7783 | 05/1887 | 1932 | 44.58 | |||||||||
589 | 7784 | 05/1887 | 01/1936 | 48.67 | |||||||||
590 | 7789 | 58923 | 06/1887 | 01/1950 | 62.58 | ||||||||
591 | 7790 | 06/1887 | 12/1930 | 43.5 | |||||||||
592 | 7791 | 58924 | 06/1887 | 30/09/1954 | 67.25 | 67.38 | |||||||
594 | 7792 | 06/1887 | 11/1937 | 50.42 | |||||||||
595 | 7793 | 06/1887 | 1932 | 44.5 | |||||||||
596 | 7794 | 58925 | 06/1887 | 30/09/1955 | 68.25 | 68.30 | |||||||
597 | 7563 | 27563 | 06/1887 | 10/1934 | 47.33 | ||||||||
493 | 3062 | 27795 | 06/1887 | 01/1947 | 59.58 | ||||||||
325 | 3209 | 7796 | 07/1887 | 02/1948 | 60.58 | ||||||||
706 | 7797 | 06/1888 | 12/1945 | 57.5 | |||||||||
753 | 7798 | 07/1888 | 05/1927 | 38.83 | |||||||||
1053 | 7661 | 09/1888 | 09/1928 | 40 | |||||||||
1054 | 7799 | 58926 | 09/1888 | 31/10/1958 | 70.08 | Prs | Preserved | ||||||
1062 | 7800 | 09/1888 | 10/1927 | 39.08 | |||||||||
1063 | 7801 | 09/1888 | 1932 | 43.25 | |||||||||
1067 | 7802 | 58927 | 09/1888 | 10/1949 | 61.08 | ||||||||
1068 | 7803 | 58928 | 09/1888 | 27/01/1951 | 62.33 | 62.37 | |||||||
1069 | 7804 | 09/1888 | 10/1934 | 46.08 | |||||||||
1076 | 7805 | 09/1888 | 1931 | 42.25 | |||||||||
1031 | 7806 | 09/1888 | 03/1936 | 47.5 | |||||||||
1046 | 7807 | 12/1888 | 01/1946 | 57.08 | |||||||||
1048 | 7808 | 58929 | 12/1888 | 03/1950 | 61.25 | ||||||||
1049 | 7809 | 12/1888 | 08/1928 | 39.67 | |||||||||
1050 | 7810 | 12/1888 | 04/1927 | 38.33 | |||||||||
1052 | 7811 | 12/1888 | 1934 | 45 | |||||||||
1077 | 7812 | 12/1888 | 01/1946 | 57.08 | |||||||||
1078 | 7813 | 12/1888 | 08/1932 | 43.67 | |||||||||
1079 | 7814 | 12/1888 | 12/1934 | 46 | |||||||||
1080 | 7815 | 12/1888 | 11/1928 | 39.92 | |||||||||
1250 | 7816 | 58930 | 07/1892 | 18/09/1948 | 56.17 | 56.21 | |||||||
1251 | 7817 | 07/1892 | 11/1926 | 34.33 | |||||||||
1252 | 7818 | 07/1892 | 10/1934 | 42.25 | |||||||||
1253 | 7819 | 07/1892 | 04/1927 | 34.75 | |||||||||
1254 | 7820 | 07/1892 | 10/1934 | 42.25 | |||||||||
1255 | 7821 | 58931 | 07/1892 | 27/03/1948 | 55.67 | 55.87 | |||||||
1256 | 7822 | 58932 | 07/1892 | 06/1952 | 59.92 | ||||||||
1257 | 07/1892 | 01/1920 | 27.5 | ||||||||||
1258 | 7823 | 07/1892 | 06/1947 | 54.92 | |||||||||
1259 | 7824 | 07/1892 | 05/1945 | 52.83 | |||||||||
331 | 3231 | 7828 | 10/1896 | 10/1928 | 32 | ||||||||
1198 | 7826 | 10/1896 | 1932 | 35.17 | |||||||||
1199 | 7564 | 10/1896 | 1931 | 34.17 | |||||||||
1200 | 7827 | 10/1896 | 04/1946 | 49.5 | |||||||||
10 | 3498 | 7829 | 58933 | 10/1896 | 15/12/1951 | 55.17 | |||||||
11 | 3669 | 7830 | 27830 | 58934 | 10/1896 | 10/1949 | 53 | 53.12 | |||||
709 | 7825 | 10/1896 | 12/1927 | 31.17 | |||||||||
13 | 3670 | 7831 | 10/1896 | 07/1935 | 38.75 | ||||||||
15 | 3701 | 7832 | 11/1896 | 10/1927 | 30.92 | ||||||||
69 | 11/1896 | 01/1920 | 23.17 | ||||||||||
2350 | 7833 | 58935 | 02/1897 | 10/1951 | 54.67 | ||||||||
2351 | 7834 | 02/1897 | 10/1947 | 50.67 | |||||||||
2352 | 7835 | 02/1897 | 03/1936 | 39.08 | |||||||||
2353 | 7836 | 58936 | 02/1897 | 22/05/1948 | 51.25 | ||||||||
2354 | 7837 | 02/1897 | 05/1927 | 30.25 | |||||||||
2355 | 7838 | 02/1897 | 11/1938 | 41.75 | |||||||||
2356 | 7565 | 02/1897 | 12/1930 | 33.83 | |||||||||
2357 | 7839 | 02/1897 | 02/1928 | 31 | |||||||||
2358 | 7840 | 58937 | 02/1897 | 24/04/1948 | 51.17 | 51.61 | |||||||
180 | 7841 | 02/1897 | 02/1948 | 51 |