Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 110 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4602 Week
» 29436 Month
» 63768 Year
» 1729144 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LYR/LMS Hughes "6" Class 2-4-2T


Class LYR LMS BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
6 371 10835 50835 12/1898 25E
W
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/08/1948
07/08/1948
6 1531 10891 50891 02/1910 24C
25E
W
Lostock Hall
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
04/03/1950
04/03/1950
6 1537 10893 50893 03/1910 23C
24D
25E
W
Southport
Lower Darwen
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
11/03/1950
29/04/1950
29/04/1950
6 70 10901 50901 03/1911 20D
W
Normanton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/03/1948
20/03/1948
6 112 10903 50903 03/1911 20A
20E
W
Holbeck (MR)
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/01/1948
14/02/1948
14/02/1948
6 224 10909 50909 05/1911 25F
25E
W
Low Moor
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/06/1949
17/03/1951
17/03/1951
6 1536 10925 50925 03/1910 25E
W
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/08/1952
09/08/1952
6 1533 10934 50934 02/1910 25E
W
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/08/1948
14/08/1948
6 719 10943 50943 12/1910 25E
W
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/12/1948
18/12/1948
6 1543 10945 50945 04/1910 23D
24D
24C
W
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Lower Darwen
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
18/09/1948
01/1949
01/1949
6 356 10950 50950 12/1898 23C
24D
W
Southport
Lower Darwen
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
21/08/1948
21/08/1948
6 670 10951 50951 08/1899 24D
W
Lower Darwen
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/1950
01/1950
6 332 10952 50952 11/1898 25F
W
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/06/1948
19/06/1948
6 120 10953 50953 10/1898 24D
24C
24D
25E
W
Lower Darwen
Lostock Hall
Lower Darwen
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/09/1948
04/06/1949
11/03/1950
08/04/1950
08/04/1950