Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 391 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4883 Week
» 29717 Month
» 64049 Year
» 1729425 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LYR/LMS Hughes "6" Class 2-4-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
22/06/1946 Reallocation 10891     24C Lostock Hall  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 10893     23C Southport  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 10945     23D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 10950     23C Southport  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50835     25E Sowerby Bridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10891 24C Lostock Hall 25E Sowerby Bridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10893 23C Southport 24D Lower Darwen  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50901     20D Normanton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50903     20A Holbeck (MR)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10909     25F Low Moor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10925     25E Sowerby Bridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50934     25E Sowerby Bridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50943     25E Sowerby Bridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50945 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 24D Lower Darwen  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50950 23C Southport 24D Lower Darwen  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50951     24D Lower Darwen  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50952     25F Low Moor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10953     24D Lower Darwen  
10/01/1948 Reallocation 50903 20A Holbeck (MR) 20E Manningham  
14/02/1948 Condemned 50903 20E Manningham   COND  
20/03/1948 Condemned 50901 20D Normanton   COND  
19/06/1948 Condemned 50952 25F Low Moor   COND  
07/08/1948 Condemned 50835 25E Sowerby Bridge   COND  
14/08/1948 Condemned 50934 25E Sowerby Bridge   COND  
21/08/1948 Condemned 50950 24D Lower Darwen   COND  
18/09/1948 Reallocation 50945 24D Lower Darwen 24C Lostock Hall  
18/09/1948 Reallocation 50953 24D Lower Darwen 24C Lostock Hall  
18/12/1948 Condemned 50943 25E Sowerby Bridge   COND  
01/1949 Condemned 50945 24C Lostock Hall   COND  
04/06/1949 Reallocation 10909 25F Low Moor 25E Sowerby Bridge  
04/06/1949 Reallocation 50953 24C Lostock Hall 24D Lower Darwen  
01/1950 Condemned 50951 24D Lower Darwen   COND  
04/03/1950 Condemned 50891 25E Sowerby Bridge   COND  
11/03/1950 Reallocation 50893 24D Lower Darwen 25E Sowerby Bridge  
11/03/1950 Reallocation 50953 24D Lower Darwen 25E Sowerby Bridge  
08/04/1950 Condemned 50953 25E Sowerby Bridge   COND  
29/04/1950 Condemned 50893 25E Sowerby Bridge   COND  
17/03/1951 Condemned 50909 25E Sowerby Bridge   COND  
09/08/1952 Condemned 50925 25E Sowerby Bridge   COND