Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 146 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1215 Week
» 1215 Month
» 68077 Year
» 1733453 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LYR/LMS Hughes "6" Class 2-4-2T


LYR LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
371 10835 50835 12/1898 07/08/1948 49.67
1531 10891 50891 02/1910 04/03/1950 40.08
1537 10893 50893 03/1910 29/04/1950 40.08
70 10901 50901 03/1911 20/03/1948 37
112 10903 50903 03/1911 14/02/1948 36.92
224 10909 50909 05/1911 17/03/1951 39.83
1536 10925 50925 03/1910 09/08/1952 42.42
1533 10934 50934 02/1910 14/08/1948 38.5
719 10943 50943 12/1910 18/12/1948 38
1543 10945 50945 04/1910 01/1949 38.75
356 10950 50950 12/1898 21/08/1948 49.67
670 10951 50951 08/1899 01/1950 50.42
332 10952 50952 11/1898 19/06/1948 49.58
120 10953 50953 10/1898 08/04/1950 51.5