LNWR/LMS Webb "A" Class 0-8-0
LNWR | LNWR (ORIG) | LMS | LMS (Dup.) | LMS (Correct) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2525 | 50 | 9008 | 49008 | 09/1893 | 08/12/1962 | 07/1906 to D |
69.25 | ||||||||
2526 | 9043 | 49043 | 11/1894 | 09/1949 | 03/1908 to D |
54.83 | |||||||||
2527 | 9051 | 49051 | 11/1894 | 15/02/1957 | 07/1908 to D |
62.25 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 08/03/1957 | 62.35 | |||||
2528 | 9027 | 49027 | 11/1894 | 21/11/1959 | 07/1907 to D |
65 | |||||||||
2529 | 8954 | 48954 | 11/1894 | 16/07/1949 | 03/1905 to C |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) | 54.67 | ||||||||
2530 | 9049 | 49049 | 02/1895 | 01/12/1962 | 05/1908 to D |
67.83 | |||||||||
2531 | 8978 | 02/1895 | 11/1932 | 12/1909 to C1 |
37.75 | ||||||||||
2532 | 9029 | 49029 | 02/1895 | 13/05/1950 | 08/1907 to D |
55.25 | |||||||||
2533 | 8979 | 02/1895 | 10/1929 | 01/1910 to C1 |
34.67 | ||||||||||
2534 | 9000 | 02/1895 | 11/1927 | 08/1912 to C1 |
32.75 | ||||||||||
2535 | 8986 | 02/1895 | 12/1930 | 05/1910 to C1 |
35.83 | ||||||||||
2536 | 9033 | 49033 | 08/1896 | 10/12/1957 | 10/1907 to D |
61.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 03/01/1958 | 61.42 | |||||
2537 | 9019 | 49019 | 08/1896 | 06/1949 | 04/1907 to D |
52.83 | |||||||||
2538 | 8962 | 48962 | 08/1896 | 12/1948 | 09/1905 to C |
52.33 | |||||||||
2539 | 9031 | 49031 | 08/1896 | 05/1951 | 09/1907 to D |
54.75 | |||||||||
2540 | 9020 | 49020 | 08/1896 | 07/10/1961 | 04/1907 to D |
65.17 | |||||||||
2541 | 8953 | 48953 | 08/1896 | 07/10/1961 | 11/1904 to C |
65.17 | |||||||||
2542 | 8990 | 08/1896 | 12/1930 | 08/1910 to C1 |
34.33 | ||||||||||
2543 | 8981 | 08/1896 | 06/1930 | 02/1910 to C1 |
33.83 | ||||||||||
2544 | 9040 | 49040 | 08/1896 | 04/1949 | 02/1908 to D |
Ryecroft (Walsall) | 52.67 | ||||||||
2545 | 8980 | 08/1896 | 03/1930 | 01/1910 to C1 |
33.58 | ||||||||||
2546 | 8969 | 09/1896 | 12/1932 | 04/1909 to C1 |
36.25 | ||||||||||
2547 | 9012 | 49012 | 09/1896 | 11/12/1948 | 12/1906 to D |
52.25 | |||||||||
2548 | 9004 | 49004 | 09/1896 | 06/1949 | 05/1906 to D |
52.75 | |||||||||
2549 | 8963 | 12/1896 | 12/1930 | 09/1905 to C |
34 | ||||||||||
2550 | 8976 | 12/1896 | 12/1932 | 11/1909 to C1 |
36 | ||||||||||
2551 | 9034 | 49034 | 12/1896 | 22/09/1962 | 10/1907 to D |
65.75 | |||||||||
2552 | 9052 | 49052 | 12/1896 | 04/1949 | 07/1908 to D |
52.33 | |||||||||
2553 | 8958 | 12/1896 | 12/1930 | 07/1905 to C |
34 | ||||||||||
2554 | 8997 | 12/1896 | 12/1930 | 06/1911 to C1 |
34 | ||||||||||
2555 | 8998 | 12/1896 | 05/1932 | 07/1911 to C1 |
35.42 | ||||||||||
1801 | 8977 | 10/1897 | 12/1930 | 12/1909 to C1 |
33.17 | ||||||||||
1802 | 9016 | 49016 | 10/1897 | 03/1949 | 03/1907 to D |
51.42 | |||||||||
1803 | 8967 | 10/1897 | 10/1927 | 03/1906 to C |
30 | ||||||||||
1804 | 9017 | 49017 | 10/1897 | 06/1952 | 03/1907 to D |
54.67 | |||||||||
1805 | 8959 | 10/1897 | 12/1930 | 08/1905 to C |
33.17 | ||||||||||
1806 | 8984 | 10/1897 | 03/1928 | 05/1910 to C1 |
30.42 | ||||||||||
1807 | 8961 | 10/1897 | 04/1932 | 09/1905 to C |
34.5 | ||||||||||
1808 | 9047 | 49047 | 10/1897 | 04/01/1958 | 05/1908 to D |
60.25 | |||||||||
1809 | 8971 | 10/1897 | 10/1927 | 07/1909 to C1 |
30 | ||||||||||
1810 | 8955 | 10/1897 | 10/1927 | 04/1905 to C |
30 | ||||||||||
1811 | 8991 | 10/1897 | 12/1932 | 01/1911 to C1 |
35.17 | ||||||||||
1812 | 9014 | 29014 | 9014 | 49014 | 10/1897 | 05/1951 | 02/1907 to D |
53.58 | |||||||
1813 | 9060 | 49060 | 11/1897 | 05/1949 | 11/1908 to D |
51.5 | |||||||||
1814 | 8960 | 11/1897 | 12/1930 | 08/1905 to C |
33.08 | ||||||||||
1815 | 9044 | 49044 | 11/1897 | 24/10/1959 | 04/1908 to D |
61.92 | |||||||||
1816 | 9045 | 49045 | 11/1897 | 22/12/1962 | 04/1908 to D |
65.08 | |||||||||
1817 | 8999 | 12/1897 | 12/1930 | 07/1912 to C1 |
33 | ||||||||||
1818 | 9013 | 49013 | 12/1897 | 04/1948 | 01/1907 to D |
50.33 | |||||||||
1819 | 9058 | 49058 | 12/1897 | 03/1950 | 10/1908 to D |
52.25 | |||||||||
1820 | 9050 | 49050 | 01/1898 | 10/1950 | 07/1908 to D |
52.75 | |||||||||
1821 | 9064 | 49064 | 04/1898 | 04/06/1960 | 03/1909 to D |
62.17 | |||||||||
1822 | 9005 | 49005 | 04/1898 | 10/08/1957 | 06/1906 to D |
59.33 | |||||||||
1823 | 8965 | 04/1898 | 11/1927 | 12/1905 to C |
29.58 | ||||||||||
1824 | 9035 | 49035 | 04/1898 | 24/01/1957 | 11/1907 to D |
58.75 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 08/02/1957 | 58.86 | |||||
1825 | 9053 | 49053 | 04/1898 | 05/1950 | 08/1908 to D |
52.08 | |||||||||
1826 | 8995 | 04/1898 | 11/1930 | 04/1911 to C1 |
32.58 | ||||||||||
1827 | 9018 | 49018 | 05/1898 | 05/09/1959 | 03/1907 to D |
61.33 | |||||||||
1828 | 8957 | 05/1898 | 12/1930 | 07/1905 to C |
32.58 | ||||||||||
1829 | 8988 | 05/1898 | 10/1930 | 08/1910 to C1 |
32.42 | ||||||||||
1830 | 9041 | 49041 | 05/1898 | 08/1950 | 03/1908 to D |
52.25 | |||||||||
1831 | 9039 | 49039 | 07/1898 | 14/01/1950 | 02/1908 to D |
Bescot | 51.5 | ||||||||
1832 | 9038 | 49038 | 07/1898 | 04/1948 | 01/1908 to D |
49.75 | |||||||||
1833 | 9009 | 49009 | 07/1898 | 28/11/1959 | 10/1906 to D |
61.33 | |||||||||
1834 | 9028 | 49028 | 07/1898 | 03/03/1956 | 08/1907 to D |
57.67 | |||||||||
1835 | 9001 | 07/1898 | 07/1928 | 08/1912 to C1 |
30 | ||||||||||
1836 | 9061 | 49061 | 07/1898 | 07/10/1961 | 02/1909 to D |
63.25 | |||||||||
1837 | 9055 | 49055 | 07/1898 | 03/1949 | 09/1908 to D |
50.67 | |||||||||
1838 | 9032 | 49032 | 08/1898 | 03/06/1950 | 10/1907 to D |
51.83 | |||||||||
1839 | 9010 | 49010 | 08/1898 | 06/06/1959 | 10/1906 to D |
60.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | |||||||
1840 | 8975 | 08/1898 | 12/1930 | 11/1909 to C1 |
32.33 | ||||||||||
1841 | 8983 | 10/1898 | 12/1930 | 04/1910 to C1 |
32.17 | ||||||||||
1842 | 8966 | 48966 | 10/1898 | 18/02/1950 | 01/1906 to C |
51.33 | |||||||||
1843 | 9048 | 49048 | 10/1898 | 14/11/1959 | 05/1908 to D |
61.08 | |||||||||
1844 | 8985 | 10/1898 | 11/1930 | 05/1910 to C1 |
32.08 | ||||||||||
1845 | 9003 | 49003 | 10/1898 | 03/1949 | 04/1906 to D |
50.42 | |||||||||
1846 | 9059 | 49059 | 10/1898 | 11/02/1950 | 10/1908 to D |
51.33 | |||||||||
1847 | 8982 | 10/1898 | 03/1930 | 03/1910 to C1 |
31.42 | ||||||||||
1848 | 9022 | 49022 | 10/1898 | 05/1951 | 06/1907 to D |
52.58 | |||||||||
1849 | 8987 | 10/1898 | 02/1928 | 06/1910 to C1 |
29.33 | ||||||||||
1850 | 8970 | 11/1898 | 11/1927 | 06/1909 to C1 |
29 | ||||||||||
1851 | 8992 | 02/1899 | 11/1932 | 01/1911 to C1 |
33.75 | ||||||||||
1852 | 8993 | 02/1899 | 11/1932 | 02/1911 to C1 |
33.75 | ||||||||||
1853 | 9036 | 49036 | 02/1899 | 12/1949 | 11/1907 to D |
50.83 | |||||||||
1854 | 9023 | 49023 | 02/1899 | 07/10/1961 | 06/1907 to D |
62.67 | |||||||||
1855 | 8964 | 48964 | 02/1899 | 21/04/1962 | 10/1905 to C |
63.17 | |||||||||
1856 | 9026 | 49026 | 02/1899 | 09/1949 | 07/1907 to D |
50.58 | |||||||||
1857 | 9042 | 49042 | 02/1899 | 04/1949 | 03/1908 to D |
50.17 | |||||||||
1858 | 8996 | 02/1899 | 11/1927 | 05/1911 to C1 |
28.75 | ||||||||||
1859 | 8994 | 02/1899 | 08/1930 | 03/1911 to C1 |
31.5 | ||||||||||
1860 | 8956 | 02/1899 | 11/1927 | 06/1905 to C |
28.75 | ||||||||||
1861 | 8972 | 05/1899 | 02/1930 | 08/1909 to C1 |
30.75 | ||||||||||
1862 | 8968 | 05/1899 | 11/1927 | 03/1909 to C1 |
28.5 | ||||||||||
1863 | 9006 | 49006 | 05/1899 | 26/05/1951 | 07/1906 to D |
52 | |||||||||
1864 | 9063 | 49063 | 05/1899 | 29/08/1959 | 06/1909 to D |
60.25 | |||||||||
1865 | 9062 | 49062 | 05/1899 | 26/05/1951 | 02/1909 to D |
52 | |||||||||
1866 | 9002 | 49002 | 05/1899 | 15/09/1962 | 03/1906 to D |
63.33 | |||||||||
1867 | 8973 | 05/1899 | 05/1933 | 08/1909 to C1 |
34 | ||||||||||
1868 | 9056 | 49056 | 05/1899 | 08/1948 | 09/1908 to D |
49.25 | |||||||||
1869 | 8989 | 05/1899 | 11/1928 | 08/1910 to C1 |
29.5 | ||||||||||
1870 | 9057 | 49057 | 05/1899 | 18/05/1957 | 09/1908 to D |
58 | |||||||||
1871 | 9030 | 49030 | 04/1900 | 23/06/1951 | 09/1907 to D |
51.17 | |||||||||
1872 | 9015 | 49015 | 05/1900 | 05/1949 | 02/1907 to D |
49 | |||||||||
1873 | 9007 | 49007 | 05/1900 | 07/10/1961 | 07/1906 to D |
61.42 | |||||||||
1874 | 9054 | 49054 | 05/1900 | 04/1949 | 08/1908 to D |
48.92 | |||||||||
1875 | 8974 | 05/1900 | 01/1930 | 09/1909 to C1 |
29.67 | ||||||||||
1876 | 9021 | 49021 | 05/1900 | 07/10/1961 | 05/1907 to D |
61.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | |||||||
1877 | 9046 | 49046 | 05/1900 | 08/03/1957 | 04/1908 to D |
56.83 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 22/03/1957 | 56.89 | |||||
1878 | 9024 | 49024 | 05/1900 | 23/02/1957 | 06/1907 to D |
56.75 | |||||||||
1879 | 9025 | 49025 | 05/1900 | 15/09/1962 | 06/1907 to D |
62.33 | |||||||||
1880 | 9037 | 49037 | 05/1900 | 29/12/1962 | 12/1907 to D |
62.58 |