LMS Fowler "7F" Class 0-8-0
Class | LMS | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
7F | 9500 | 49500 | 26/03/1929 | 25D W |
Mirfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/06/1950 |
02/06/1950 |
7F | 9501 | 49501 | 30/03/1929 | 25B W |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/03/1950 |
25/03/1950 |
7F | 9502 | 49502 | 06/04/1929 | 24C 26B W |
Lostock Hall Agecroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1948 09/06/1951 |
09/06/1951 |
7F | 9503 | 49503 | 11/04/1929 | 24C 27B W |
Lostock Hall Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/08/1950 21/08/1954 |
21/08/1954 |
7F | 9504 | 49504 | 18/04/1929 | 25A 25D W |
Wakefield Mirfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/05/1948 04/1949 |
04/1949 |
7F | 9505 | 49505 | 24/04/1929 | 25A 23B 26E 26B W |
Wakefield Aintree Lees (Oldham) Agecroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/08/1949 31/12/1955 28/12/1957 29/10/1960 |
29/10/1960 |
7F | 9506 | 49506 | 26/04/1929 | 25A 23B W |
Wakefield Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/10/1949 01/11/1952 |
01/11/1952 |
7F | 9507 | 49507 | 26/04/1929 | 25E W |
Sowerby Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/1949 |
04/1949 |
7F | 9508 | 49508 | 29/04/1929 | 25E 26D 26A 26B W |
Sowerby Bridge Bury Newton Heath Agecroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/09/1950 21/03/1953 05/11/1960 20/01/1962 |
20/01/1962 |
7F | 9509 | 49509 | 02/05/1929 | 26F 26B W |
Lees (Oldham) Agecroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/12/1957 16/05/1959 |
16/05/1959 |
7F | 9510 | 49510 | 06/05/1929 | 26A 26B 26C 27B W |
Newton Heath Agecroft Bolton Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1949 04/06/1949 31/12/1950 08/09/1951 |
08/09/1951 |
7F | 9511 | 49511 | 10/05/1929 | 26A 25A 26B 27D 27D 27B 27D 25E 27B 26A W |
Newton Heath Wakefield Agecroft Wigan Central (L&Y) Wigan Central (L&Y) Aintree Wigan Central (L&Y) Sowerby Bridge Aintree Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/07/1948 15/10/1949 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 11/08/1951 22/03/1952 21/03/1953 14/08/1954 03/12/1955 16/05/1959 |
16/05/1959 |
7F | 9512 | 49512 | 11/05/1929 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 |
7F | 9513 | 49513 | 17/05/1929 | 25A W |
Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/10/1949 |
08/10/1949 |
7F | 9514 | 49514 | 17/05/1929 | 25A 26D W |
Wakefield Bury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/08/1948 04/08/1950 |
04/08/1950 |
7F | 9515 | 49515 | 22/05/1929 | 25A 23B 26A W |
Wakefield Aintree Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/07/1948 03/12/1955 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 |
7F | 9516 | 49516 | 23/05/1929 | 25A 26A W |
Wakefield Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/10/1949 28/07/1950 |
28/07/1950 |
7F | 9517 | 49517 | 24/05/1929 | 25A W |
Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 |
7F | 9518 | 49518 | 27/05/1929 | 25A W |
Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 |
7F | 9519 | 49519 | 01/06/1929 | 25A 26B 26B W |
Wakefield Agecroft Agecroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/06/1949 16/07/1949 23/03/1950 |
23/03/1950 |
7F | 9520 | 49520 | 05/06/1929 | 26A 26B W |
Newton Heath Agecroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1949 03/05/1950 |
03/05/1950 |
7F | 9521 | 49521 | 08/06/1929 | 23B W |
Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/1949 |
04/1949 |
7F | 9522 | 49522 | 14/06/1929 | 25D W |
Mirfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 |
7F | 9523 | 49523 | 17/06/1929 | 24C 25A 23B W |
Lostock Hall Wakefield Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/05/1949 04/06/1949 20/02/1951 |
20/02/1951 |
7F | 9524 | 49524 | 19/06/1929 | 24C 25A 23B W |
Lostock Hall Wakefield Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1948 08/10/1949 12/12/1953 |
12/12/1953 |
7F | 9525 | 49525 | 22/06/1929 | 25A W |
Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 |
7F | 9526 | 49526 | 28/06/1929 | 25A W |
Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/08/1949 |
13/08/1949 |
7F | 9527 | 49527 | 28/06/1929 | 25E W |
Sowerby Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 |
7F | 9528 | 49528 | 28/06/1929 | 25E W |
Sowerby Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/1949 |
08/1949 |
7F | 9529 | 49529 | 28/06/1929 | 25A 26A W |
Wakefield Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/07/1948 14/01/1950 |
14/01/1950 |
7F | 9530 | 49530 | 12/07/1929 | 25A 25G 25A W |
Wakefield Farnley Junction Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 11/12/1948 06/1949 |
06/1949 |
7F | 9531 | 49531 | 16/07/1929 | 25A 26A W |
Wakefield Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/09/1949 07/10/1950 |
07/10/1950 |
7F | 9532 | 49532 | 17/07/1929 | 25A 26B 26C 26C W |
Wakefield Agecroft Bolton Bolton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/08/1948 10/11/1951 01/12/1951 02/06/1956 |
02/06/1956 |
7F | 9533 | 49533 | 18/07/1929 | 26A 25A W |
Newton Heath Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/07/1948 16/07/1949 |
16/07/1949 |
7F | 9534 | 49534 | 18/07/1929 | 24C 25A 23B W |
Lostock Hall Wakefield Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/05/1949 04/06/1949 02/11/1950 |
02/11/1950 |
7F | 9535 | 49535 | 25/07/1929 | 23B W |
Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/11/1950 |
11/11/1950 |
7F | 9536 | 49536 | 25/07/1929 | 25B 25A 26A 26A 26F W |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Wakefield Newton Heath Newton Heath Lees (Oldham) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/10/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 16/06/1951 18/10/1957 |
18/10/1957 |
7F | 9537 | 49537 | 26/07/1929 | 25G W |
Farnley Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/05/1950 |
08/05/1950 |
7F | 9538 | 49538 | 27/07/1929 | 25G 26B 26C 26C W |
Farnley Junction Agecroft Bolton Bolton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/05/1950 10/11/1951 01/12/1951 16/08/1957 |
16/08/1957 |
7F | 9539 | 49539 | 30/07/1929 | 25C 23B W |
Goole Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/07/1949 15/10/1949 |
15/10/1949 |
7F | 9540 | 49540 | 02/08/1929 | 25G 25E W |
Farnley Junction Sowerby Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 19/05/1951 |
19/05/1951 |
7F | 9541 | 49541 | 03/08/1929 | 25A 23B 26A 23B W |
Wakefield Aintree Newton Heath Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/07/1948 17/09/1949 24/09/1949 17/07/1950 |
17/07/1950 |
7F | 9542 | 49542 | 09/08/1929 | 26C W |
Bolton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 |
7F | 9543 | 49543 | 14/08/1929 | 25A 23B W |
Wakefield Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/08/1948 08/08/1950 |
08/08/1950 |
7F | 9544 | 49544 | 13/08/1929 | 25B 26B 26C 26C 26A W |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Agecroft Bolton Bolton Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/07/1950 10/11/1951 01/12/1951 23/01/1960 13/02/1960 |
13/02/1960 |
7F | 9545 | 49545 | 14/08/1929 | 25A 26A 25D 27B 27B W |
Wakefield Newton Heath Mirfield Aintree Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/09/1949 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 06/07/1957 |
06/07/1957 |
7F | 9546 | 49546 | 17/08/1929 | 25A 26A W |
Wakefield Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/07/1948 10/1949 |
10/1949 |
7F | 9547 | 49547 | 20/08/1929 | 25G 27B W |
Farnley Junction Greenock Ladyburn Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/04/1950 04/05/1957 |
04/05/1957 |
7F | 9548 | 49548 | 23/08/1929 | 1A 26F W |
Willesden Lees (Oldham) Withdrawn |
11/04/1936 01/01/1948 16/01/1952 |
16/01/1952 |
7F | 9549 | 49549 | 24/08/1929 | 24B 23B W |
Rose Grove Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 04/1949 |
04/1949 |
7F | 9550 | 49550 | 03/09/1929 | 25A 23B W |
Wakefield Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/07/1948 08/1949 |
08/1949 |
7F | 9551 | 49551 | 03/09/1929 | 25G W |
Farnley Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/03/1949 |
26/03/1949 |
7F | 9552 | 49552 | 06/09/1929 | 25G 27B 25E 26A W |
Farnley Junction Greenock Ladyburn Sowerby Bridge Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/04/1950 23/04/1955 11/08/1956 01/09/1956 |
01/09/1956 |
7F | 9553 | 49553 | 07/09/1929 | 25G W |
Farnley Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/01/1950 |
08/01/1950 |
7F | 9554 | 49554 | 10/09/1929 | 26A 25D 27B 27B 27D 27B 25E W |
Newton Heath Mirfield Aintree Aintree Wigan Central (L&Y) Aintree Sowerby Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 03/10/1953 28/11/1953 27/03/1954 27/08/1955 |
27/08/1955 |
7F | 9555 | 49555 | 13/09/1929 | 19A 1A 25D 26B W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Willesden Mirfield Agecroft Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 11/04/1936 01/01/1948 01/04/1950 06/04/1957 |
06/04/1957 |
7F | 9556 | 49556 | 14/09/1929 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/03/1950 |
08/03/1950 |
7F | 9557 | 49557 | 19/09/1929 | 26D 26A W |
Bury Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1951 19/11/1955 |
19/11/1955 |
7F | 9558 | 49558 | 20/09/1929 | 25A 26A W |
Wakefield Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/10/1949 28/04/1951 |
28/04/1951 |
7F | 9559 | 49559 | 21/09/1929 | 25A 26A W |
Wakefield Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/07/1948 04/1949 |
04/1949 |
7F | 9560 | 49560 | 25/09/1929 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/12/1957 |
21/12/1957 |
7F | 9561 | 49561 | 28/09/1929 | 25A 23B W |
Wakefield Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/10/1949 15/06/1950 |
15/06/1950 |
7F | 9562 | 49562 | 28/09/1929 | 25A W |
Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/04/1949 |
23/04/1949 |
7F | 9563 | 49563 | 03/10/1929 | 25B 23B 26F W |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Aintree Lees (Oldham) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/10/1949 23/02/1952 06/1952 |
06/1952 |
7F | 9564 | 49564 | 05/10/1929 | 23B W |
Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/09/1949 |
24/09/1949 |
7F | 9565 | 49565 | 08/10/1929 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 |
7F | 9566 | 49566 | 09/10/1929 | 23B W |
Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/08/1957 |
15/08/1957 |
7F | 9567 | 49567 | 21/10/1929 | 23B W |
Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/01/1950 |
19/01/1950 |
7F | 9568 | 49568 | 16/10/1929 | 25E 27D W |
Sowerby Bridge Wigan Central (L&Y) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/09/1950 19/05/1951 |
19/05/1951 |
7F | 9569 | 49569 | 17/10/1929 | 25E W |
Sowerby Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1950 |
14/01/1950 |
7F | 9570 | 49570 | 19/10/1929 | 25A 26B 26B 26A W |
Wakefield Agecroft Agecroft Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/06/1949 16/07/1949 31/12/1950 20/08/1955 |
20/08/1955 |
7F | 9571 | 49571 | 23/10/1929 | 23B 25A 23B W |
Aintree Wakefield Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1948 15/10/1949 02/06/1951 |
02/06/1951 |
7F | 9572 | 49572 | 02/11/1929 | 25B W |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1949 |
09/1949 |
7F | 9573 | 49573 | 11/1929 | 26C W |
Bolton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/1949 |
12/1949 |
7F | 9574 | 49574 | 01/11/1929 | 25A 26A W |
Wakefield Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/09/1949 04/08/1950 |
04/08/1950 |
7F | 9575 | 49575 | 05/11/1929 | 25A 26B 26B W |
Wakefield Agecroft Agecroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/06/1949 16/07/1949 03/05/1950 |
03/05/1950 |
7F | 9576 | 49576 | 06/11/1929 | 25A 23B W |
Wakefield Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/06/1949 10/1949 |
10/1949 |
7F | 9577 | 49577 | 07/11/1929 | 25A W |
Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 |
7F | 9578 | 49578 | 08/11/1929 | 25A 26B 26F 26B W |
Wakefield Agecroft Lees (Oldham) Agecroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/10/1949 27/03/1954 28/12/1957 02/05/1959 |
02/05/1959 |
7F | 9579 | 49579 | 11/11/1929 | 25D W |
Mirfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/05/1950 |
08/05/1950 |
7F | 9580 | 49580 | 12/11/1929 | 25B 26A 26A 26A W |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Newton Heath Newton Heath Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 31/12/1950 24/03/1951 |
24/03/1951 |
7F | 9581 | 49581 | 15/11/1929 | 23B W |
Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/06/1949 |
11/06/1949 |
7F | 9582 | 49582 | 18/11/1929 | 25C 25E 27B W |
Goole Sowerby Bridge Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 12/08/1950 16/05/1959 |
16/05/1959 |
7F | 9583 | 49583 | 20/11/1929 | 25B 26A 26A W |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Newton Heath Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 23/08/1950 |
23/08/1950 |
7F | 9584 | 49584 | 22/11/1929 | 25A W |
Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/08/1949 |
13/08/1949 |
7F | 9585 | 49585 | 23/11/1929 | 24C 25A 23B 23D 23D W |
Lostock Hall Wakefield Aintree Wigan Central (L&Y) Wigan Central (L&Y) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/05/1949 30/07/1949 10/12/1949 24/12/1949 10/02/1951 |
10/02/1951 |
7F | 9586 | 49586 | 29/11/1929 | 23B 25G 27B W |
Aintree Farnley Junction Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1948 12/08/1950 01/08/1959 |
01/08/1959 |
7F | 9587 | 49587 | 11/1929 | 23B W |
Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/06/1951 |
16/06/1951 |
7F | 9588 | 49588 | 02/12/1929 | 25A 25G W |
Wakefield Farnley Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/10/1949 12/1949 |
12/1949 |
7F | 9589 | 49589 | 06/12/1929 | 19A 1A 25A 25D 26C 27B 27B W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Willesden Wakefield Mirfield Bolton Aintree Aintree Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 11/04/1936 01/01/1948 29/05/1948 31/12/1950 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 09/06/1951 |
09/06/1951 |
7F | 9590 | 49590 | 07/12/1929 | 26D 26F W |
Bury Lees (Oldham) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/01/1949 05/05/1951 |
05/05/1951 |
7F | 9591 | 49591 | 11/12/1929 | 26D 26A W |
Bury Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1951 06/12/1952 |
06/12/1952 |
7F | 9592 | 49592 | 12/12/1929 | 23B 27D 27D 27B 27D 27D 25E 26A W |
Aintree Wigan Central (L&Y) Wigan Central (L&Y) Aintree Wigan Central (L&Y) Wigan Central (L&Y) Sowerby Bridge Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 11/08/1951 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 10/09/1955 28/12/1957 16/05/1959 |
16/05/1959 |
7F | 9593 | 49593 | 12/12/1929 | 26F W |
Lees (Oldham) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/05/1951 |
26/05/1951 |
7F | 9594 | 49594 | 14/12/1929 | 26D W |
Bury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/09/1951 |
29/09/1951 |
7F | 9595 | 49595 | 17/12/1929 | 23B W |
Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/12/1951 |
08/12/1951 |
7F | 9596 | 49596 | 19/12/1929 | 25B W |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/03/1950 |
24/03/1950 |
7F | 9597 | 49597 | 20/12/1929 | 23B W |
Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 |
7F | 9598 | 49598 | 21/12/1929 | 25G 25D 25D 26F 26F 27D W |
Farnley Junction Mirfield Mirfield Lees (Oldham) Lees (Oldham) Wigan Central (L&Y) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 03/03/1951 24/03/1951 13/10/1951 17/01/1959 |
17/01/1959 |
7F | 9599 | 49599 | 21/12/1929 | 26B W |
Agecroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/1949 |
08/1949 |
7F | 9600 | 49600 | 17/12/1930 | 25C 25E 27B W |
Goole Sowerby Bridge Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 12/08/1950 15/08/1953 |
15/08/1953 |
7F | 9601 | 49601 | 18/12/1930 | 25D W |
Mirfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/1949 |
04/1949 |
7F | 9602 | 49602 | 21/12/1930 | 25D 25E 25E W |
Mirfield Sowerby Bridge Sowerby Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/04/1951 19/05/1951 27/02/1954 |
27/02/1954 |
7F | 9603 | 49603 | 06/01/1931 | 25A 27B 26B W |
Wakefield Aintree Agecroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/09/1950 23/02/1952 03/03/1956 |
03/03/1956 |
7F | 9604 | 49604 | 14/01/1931 | 25A W |
Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/1949 |
06/1949 |
7F | 9605 | 49605 | 20/01/1931 | 25A 23B W |
Wakefield Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/08/1948 13/02/1950 |
13/02/1950 |
7F | 9606 | 49606 | 23/01/1931 | 25E W |
Sowerby Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/1949 |
06/1949 |
7F | 9607 | 49607 | 30/01/1931 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1949 |
16/07/1949 |
7F | 9608 | 49608 | 05/02/1931 | 26A 26F 26F W |
Newton Heath Lees (Oldham) Lees (Oldham) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/05/1951 16/06/1951 04/07/1953 |
04/07/1953 |
7F | 9609 | 49609 | 07/02/1931 | 25A 23B W |
Wakefield Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/08/1948 12/10/1950 |
12/10/1950 |
7F | 9610 | 49610 | 17/02/1931 | 24B 23B 23D 23D W |
Rose Grove Aintree Wigan Central (L&Y) Wigan Central (L&Y) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 10/12/1949 24/12/1949 19/05/1951 |
19/05/1951 |
7F | 9611 | 49611 | 20/02/1931 | 24C 26A W |
Lostock Hall Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/05/1949 20/08/1949 |
20/08/1949 |
7F | 9612 | 49612 | 26/02/1931 | 24C 26A 27D 27D W |
Lostock Hall Newton Heath Wigan Central (L&Y) Wigan Central (L&Y) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/05/1949 14/10/1950 04/11/1950 05/09/1953 |
05/09/1953 |
7F | 9613 | 49613 | 06/03/1931 | 23B 25A W |
Aintree Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/07/1948 07/1949 |
07/1949 |
7F | 9614 | 49614 | 14/03/1931 | 24C W |
Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/1949 |
06/1949 |
7F | 9615 | 49615 | 23/03/1931 | 24C 25E W |
Lostock Hall Sowerby Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/05/1949 25/04/1950 |
25/04/1950 |
7F | 9616 | 49616 | 27/03/1931 | 24C W |
Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 |
7F | 9617 | 49617 | 07/04/1931 | 24C 25E 27B W |
Lostock Hall Sowerby Bridge Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/05/1949 09/09/1950 16/06/1951 |
16/06/1951 |
7F | 9618 | 49618 | 18/04/1931 | 25D 26F 26F 26C 26A 26B W |
Mirfield Lees (Oldham) Lees (Oldham) Bolton Newton Heath Agecroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/04/1951 19/05/1951 28/12/1957 23/01/1960 15/07/1961 07/10/1961 |
07/10/1961 |
7F | 9619 | 49619 | 18/04/1931 | 25D W |
Mirfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/08/1950 |
03/08/1950 |
7F | 9620 | 49620 | 30/10/1931 | 25D 25E 25E 27B W |
Mirfield Sowerby Bridge Sowerby Bridge Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/03/1951 19/05/1951 05/09/1953 28/01/1956 |
28/01/1956 |
7F | 9621 | 49621 | 02/11/1931 | 25A 26B 26B W |
Wakefield Agecroft Agecroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/06/1949 16/07/1949 25/01/1950 |
25/01/1950 |
7F | 9622 | 49622 | 09/11/1931 | 25A W |
Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1949 |
16/07/1949 |
7F | 9623 | 49623 | 18/11/1931 | 25A 23B W |
Wakefield Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/08/1948 13/01/1951 |
13/01/1951 |
7F | 9624 | 49624 | 24/11/1931 | 25G 25E 27B 25E 26A W |
Farnley Junction Sowerby Bridge Aintree Sowerby Bridge Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/01/1950 12/08/1950 31/10/1953 11/08/1956 27/02/1960 |
27/02/1960 |
7F | 9625 | 49625 | 20/11/1931 | 25A 26A 27D 27D W |
Wakefield Newton Heath Wigan Central (L&Y) Wigan Central (L&Y) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/09/1949 14/10/1950 04/11/1950 05/01/1951 |
05/01/1951 |
7F | 9626 | 49626 | 08/12/1931 | 25A W |
Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 |
7F | 9627 | 49627 | 08/12/1931 | 25A 25G 26B W |
Wakefield Farnley Junction Agecroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/10/1949 06/05/1950 14/10/1961 |
14/10/1961 |
7F | 9628 | 49628 | 11/12/1931 | 25E W |
Sowerby Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/06/1950 |
17/06/1950 |
7F | 9629 | 49629 | 15/12/1931 | 25A W |
Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 |
7F | 9630 | 49630 | 14/12/1931 | 25A W |
Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/03/1949 |
19/03/1949 |
7F | 9631 | 49631 | 17/12/1931 | 26B 25A 25G 25B 27B 27B W |
Agecroft Wakefield Farnley Junction Huddersfield Hillhouse Aintree Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/10/1948 22/10/1949 19/11/1949 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 28/04/1951 |
28/04/1951 |
7F | 9632 | 49632 | 17/12/1931 | 25A W |
Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 |
7F | 9633 | 49633 | 01/01/1932 | 25A W |
Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 |
7F | 9634 | 49634 | 12/1931 | 25A 25G 25B W |
Wakefield Farnley Junction Huddersfield Hillhouse Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/10/1949 19/11/1949 17/06/1950 |
17/06/1950 |
7F | 9635 | 49635 | 12/1931 | 25A 25G 25B 27B 27B W |
Wakefield Farnley Junction Huddersfield Hillhouse Aintree Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/10/1949 19/11/1949 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 27/10/1950 |
27/10/1950 |
7F | 9636 | 49636 | 01/01/1932 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/08/1950 |
16/08/1950 |
7F | 9637 | 49637 | 05/01/1932 | 26A 27D 27D 27B 27B 26B W |
Newton Heath Wigan Central (L&Y) Wigan Central (L&Y) Aintree Aintree Agecroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 28/11/1953 09/10/1954 06/02/1960 03/06/1961 |
03/06/1961 |
7F | 9638 | 49638 | 06/01/1932 | 25A 25G 25B 26B 27D 27D 27B 27B W |
Wakefield Farnley Junction Huddersfield Hillhouse Agecroft Wigan Central (L&Y) Wigan Central (L&Y) Aintree Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/10/1949 19/11/1949 01/07/1950 14/10/1950 04/11/1950 28/11/1953 09/10/1954 23/06/1956 |
23/06/1956 |
7F | 9639 | 49639 | 11/01/1932 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1949 |
09/1949 |
7F | 9640 | 49640 | 28/01/1932 | 24C 26C 27B W |
Lostock Hall Bolton Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/05/1949 31/12/1950 16/05/1959 |
16/05/1959 |
7F | 9641 | 49641 | 25/01/1932 | 26C 25A 23B 23B W |
Bolton Wakefield Aintree Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/10/1948 17/12/1949 24/12/1949 18/11/1950 |
18/11/1950 |
7F | 9642 | 49642 | 01/02/1932 | 26A 25A W |
Newton Heath Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/07/1948 16/07/1949 |
16/07/1949 |
7F | 9643 | 49643 | 02/02/1932 | 25A 23B 23B W |
Wakefield Aintree Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/12/1949 24/12/1949 31/12/1949 |
31/12/1949 |
7F | 9644 | 49644 | 04/02/1932 | 25A W |
Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 |
7F | 9645 | 49645 | 10/02/1932 | 25A W 23B |
Wakefield Withdrawn Aintree |
01/01/1948 12/1949 17/12/1949 |
12/1949 |
7F | 9646 | 49646 | 10/02/1932 | 25A 25G 25A W |
Wakefield Farnley Junction Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/08/1948 11/12/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 |
7F | 9647 | 49647 | 17/02/1932 | 25A W |
Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1949 |
16/07/1949 |
7F | 9648 | 49648 | 19/02/1932 | 25A 25E 26B W |
Wakefield Sowerby Bridge Agecroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/11/1949 24/03/1956 21/09/1957 |
21/09/1957 |
7F | 9649 | 49649 | 23/02/1932 | 24C 23B W |
Lostock Hall Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/05/1949 29/11/1950 |
29/11/1950 |
7F | 9650 | 49650 | 02/03/1932 | 26A 25E 25E W 27B |
Newton Heath Sowerby Bridge Sowerby Bridge Withdrawn Aintree |
01/01/1948 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 26/05/1951 05/09/1953 |
26/05/1951 |
7F | 9651 | 49651 | 02/03/1932 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1950 |
29/12/1950 |
7F | 9652 | 49652 | 10/03/1932 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1949 |
09/1949 |
7F | 9653 | 49653 | 17/03/1932 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/08/1950 |
04/08/1950 |
7F | 9654 | 49654 | 21/03/1932 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/1949 |
12/1949 |
7F | 9655 | 49655 | 30/03/1932 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/03/1950 |
14/03/1950 |
7F | 9656 | 49656 | 23/03/1932 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/1949 |
09/1949 |
7F | 9657 | 49657 | 05/04/1932 | 26A 25E 25E W |
Newton Heath Sowerby Bridge Sowerby Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 16/02/1957 |
16/02/1957 |
7F | 9658 | 49658 | 08/04/1932 | 25D W |
Mirfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/1949 |
08/1949 |
7F | 9659 | 49659 | 12/04/1932 | 25D 27D 27D 27B W |
Mirfield Wigan Central (L&Y) Wigan Central (L&Y) Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 11/08/1951 02/03/1957 |
02/03/1957 |
7F | 9660 | 49660 | 22/04/1932 | 25D 26A 26A 25E 25E 25D 25E 25E W |
Mirfield Newton Heath Newton Heath Sowerby Bridge Sowerby Bridge Mirfield Sowerby Bridge Sowerby Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/10/1950 04/11/1950 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 31/03/1951 |
31/03/1951 |
7F | 9661 | 49661 | 26/04/1932 | 25D 26A 26A 25E 25E W |
Mirfield Newton Heath Newton Heath Sowerby Bridge Sowerby Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/10/1950 04/11/1950 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 19/01/1952 |
19/01/1952 |
7F | 9662 | 49662 | 05/05/1932 | 25D 25E 25E 26F 26C W |
Mirfield Sowerby Bridge Sowerby Bridge Lees (Oldham) Bolton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 14/06/1952 28/12/1957 16/05/1959 |
16/05/1959 |
7F | 9663 | 49663 | 26/05/1932 | 25D 25E 25E W |
Mirfield Sowerby Bridge Sowerby Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 28/04/1951 |
28/04/1951 |
7F | 9664 | 49664 | 26/05/1932 | 26C 27D 27D 27B W |
Bolton Wigan Central (L&Y) Wigan Central (L&Y) Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 11/08/1951 16/02/1957 |
16/02/1957 |
7F | 9665 | 49665 | 06/1932 | 26D 23B 23B W |
Bury Aintree Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/01/1950 14/01/1950 14/08/1950 |
14/08/1950 |
7F | 9666 | 49666 | 06/1932 | 25A 26D 26A W |
Wakefield Bury Newton Heath Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 01/01/1948 28/11/1953 28/04/1956 |
28/04/1956 |
7F | 9667 | 49667 | 06/1932 | 26D 26A W |
Bury Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/11/1953 16/05/1959 |
16/05/1959 |
7F | 9668 | 49668 | 06/06/1932 | 26F 27B 26B W |
Lees (Oldham) Aintree Agecroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/12/1957 20/02/1960 11/11/1961 |
11/11/1961 |
7F | 9669 | 49669 | 03/06/1932 | 25A W |
Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/1949 |
04/1949 |
7F | 9670 | 49670 | 15/06/1932 | 25A W |
Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/1949 |
07/1949 |
7F | 9671 | 49671 | 20/06/1932 | 25A 23B W |
Wakefield Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/07/1948 08/03/1952 |
08/03/1952 |
7F | 9672 | 49672 | 20/06/1932 | 25G 26C 27B W |
Farnley Junction Bolton Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/04/1950 31/12/1950 09/03/1957 |
09/03/1957 |
7F | 9673 | 49673 | 28/06/1932 | 25G 25B 26A 25E 25E W |
Farnley Junction Huddersfield Hillhouse Newton Heath Sowerby Bridge Sowerby Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/05/1950 01/07/1950 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 24/02/1951 |
24/02/1951 |
7F | 9674 | 49674 | 26/07/1932 | 23A 25G 25B 26A 25E 25E 26C W 26B |
Bank Hall Farnley Junction Huddersfield Hillhouse Newton Heath Sowerby Bridge Sowerby Bridge Bolton Withdrawn Agecroft |
01/01/1948 25/12/1948 15/04/1950 01/07/1950 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 16/06/1956 13/02/1959 02/05/1959 |
13/02/1959 |