LYR/LMS Hughes "1546" Class 0-8-0
Company | Old Number | Company | New Number | Subtype | Date | Information | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
LYR | 117 | renumbered to | LMS | 12900 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 134 | renumbered to | LMS | 12882 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1365 | renumbered to | LMS | 12987 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 141 | renumbered to | LMS | 12883 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 142 | renumbered to | LMS | 12884 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1427 | renumbered to | LMS | 12990 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1431 | renumbered to | LMS | 12922 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1440 | renumbered to | LMS | 12981 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1453 | renumbered to | LMS | 12994 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1456 | renumbered to | LMS | 12896 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1491 | renumbered to | LMS | 12979 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 150 | renumbered to | LMS | 12885 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1500 | renumbered to | LMS | 12975 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1546 | renumbered to | LMS | 12840 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1547 | renumbered to | LMS | 12841 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1548 | renumbered to | LMS | 12842 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1549 | renumbered to | LMS | 12843 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1550 | renumbered to | LMS | 12844 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1551 | renumbered to | LMS | 12845 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1552 | renumbered to | LMS | 12846 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1553 | renumbered to | LMS | 12847 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1554 | renumbered to | LMS | 12848 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1555 | renumbered to | LMS | 12849 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1556 | renumbered to | LMS | 12850 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1557 | renumbered to | LMS | 12851 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1558 | renumbered to | LMS | 12852 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1559 | renumbered to | LMS | 12853 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1560 | renumbered to | LMS | 12854 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1561 | renumbered to | LMS | 12855 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1562 | renumbered to | LMS | 12856 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1563 | renumbered to | LMS | 12857 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1564 | renumbered to | LMS | 12858 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1566 | renumbered to | LMS | 12860 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1567 | renumbered to | LMS | 12861 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1568 | renumbered to | LMS | 12862 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1569 | renumbered to | LMS | 12863 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1570 | renumbered to | LMS | 12864 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1571 | renumbered to | LMS | 12865 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1572 | renumbered to | LMS | 12866 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1573 | renumbered to | LMS | 12867 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1574 | renumbered to | LMS | 12868 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1575 | renumbered to | LMS | 12869 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1576 | renumbered to | LMS | 12870 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1577 | renumbered to | LMS | 12871 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1578 | renumbered to | LMS | 12872 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1579 | renumbered to | LMS | 12873 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1580 | renumbered to | LMS | 12874 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1581 | renumbered to | LMS | 12875 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1582 | renumbered to | LMS | 12876 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1583 | renumbered to | LMS | 12877 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1584 | renumbered to | LMS | 12878 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1585 | renumbered to | LMS | 12879 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1604 | renumbered to | LMS | 12924 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1605 | renumbered to | LMS | 12925 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1606 | renumbered to | LMS | 12926 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1607 | renumbered to | LMS | 12927 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1608 | renumbered to | LMS | 12928 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1609 | renumbered to | LMS | 12929 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1610 | renumbered to | LMS | 12930 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1611 | renumbered to | LMS | 12931 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1612 | renumbered to | LMS | 12932 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1613 | renumbered to | LMS | 12933 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1614 | renumbered to | LMS | 12934 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1615 | renumbered to | LMS | 12935 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1616 | renumbered to | LMS | 12936 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1617 | renumbered to | LMS | 12937 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1618 | renumbered to | LMS | 12938 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1619 | renumbered to | LMS | 12939 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1620 | renumbered to | LMS | 12940 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1621 | renumbered to | LMS | 12941 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1622 | renumbered to | LMS | 12942 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1623 | renumbered to | LMS | 12943 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1624 | renumbered to | LMS | 12944 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1625 | renumbered to | LMS | 12945 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1626 | renumbered to | LMS | 12946 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1627 | renumbered to | LMS | 12947 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1628 | renumbered to | LMS | 12948 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1629 | renumbered to | LMS | 12949 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1630 | renumbered to | LMS | 12950 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1631 | renumbered to | LMS | 12951 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1632 | renumbered to | LMS | 12952 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1633 | renumbered to | LMS | 12953 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1634 | renumbered to | LMS | 12954 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1635 | renumbered to | LMS | 12955 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1636 | renumbered to | LMS | 12956 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1637 | renumbered to | LMS | 12957 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1638 | renumbered to | LMS | 12958 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1639 | renumbered to | LMS | 12959 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1640 | renumbered to | LMS | 12960 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1641 | renumbered to | LMS | 12961 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1642 | renumbered to | LMS | 12962 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1643 | renumbered to | LMS | 12963 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1644 | renumbered to | LMS | 12964 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1645 | renumbered to | LMS | 12965 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1646 | renumbered to | LMS | 12966 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1647 | renumbered to | LMS | 12967 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1648 | renumbered to | LMS | 12968 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 1656 | renumbered to | LMS | 12859 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 201 | renumbered to | LMS | 12986 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 216 | renumbered to | LMS | 12902 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 229 | renumbered to | LMS | 12886 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 235 | renumbered to | LMS | 12903 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 241 | renumbered to | LMS | 12904 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 259 | renumbered to | LMS | 12887 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 265 | renumbered to | LMS | 12905 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 281 | renumbered to | LMS | 12888 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 312 | renumbered to | LMS | 12906 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 373 | renumbered to | LMS | 12980 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 381 | renumbered to | LMS | 12972 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 384 | renumbered to | LMS | 12988 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 395 | renumbered to | LMS | 12899 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 408 | renumbered to | LMS | 12969 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 413 | renumbered to | LMS | 12985 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 460 | renumbered to | LMS | 12889 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 493 | renumbered to | LMS | 12907 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 503 | renumbered to | LMS | 12908 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 507 | renumbered to | LMS | 12911 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 6 | renumbered to | LMS | 12880 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 601 | renumbered to | LMS | 12909 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 603 | renumbered to | LMS | 12910 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 611 | renumbered to | LMS | 12973 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 626 | renumbered to | LMS | 12912 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 631 | renumbered to | LMS | 12913 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 640 | renumbered to | LMS | 12915 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 65 | renumbered to | LMS | 12901 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 660 | renumbered to | LMS | 12914 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 673 | renumbered to | LMS | 12916 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 694 | renumbered to | LMS | 12917 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 697 | renumbered to | LMS | 12918 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 698 | renumbered to | LMS | 12919 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 7 | renumbered to | LMS | 12881 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 706 | renumbered to | LMS | 12970 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 709 | renumbered to | LMS | 12984 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 738 | renumbered to | LMS | 12971 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 789 | renumbered to | LMS | 12920 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 827 | renumbered to | LMS | 12992 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 831 | renumbered to | LMS | 12977 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 86 | renumbered to | LMS | 12983 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 91 | renumbered to | LMS | 12978 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LYR | 915 | renumbered to | LMS | 12921 | y/e | 1924 | ||
LMS | 12870 | renumbered to | BR | 52870 | w/e | 01/05/1948 | ||
LMS | 12962 | renumbered to | BR | 52962 | w/e | 07/08/1948 | ||
LMS | 12856 | renumbered to | BR | 52856 | w/e | 23/10/1948 | ||
LMS | 12886 | renumbered to | BR | 52886 | w/e | 27/11/1948 | ||
LMS | 12857 | renumbered to | BR | 52857 | w/e | 18/12/1948 | ||
LMS | 12910 | renumbered to | BR | 52910 | w/e | 22/01/1949 | ||
LMS | 12906 | renumbered to | BR | 52906 | w/e | 26/03/1949 | ||
LMS | 12916 | renumbered to | BR | 52916 | w/e | 02/04/1949 | ||
LMS | 12945 | renumbered to | BR | 52945 | w/e | 02/04/1949 |