Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 1051 Today
» 1138 Yesterday
» 4754 Week
» 3492 Month
» 417813 Year
» 1639378 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNWR/LMS Cooke "6F" Class 0-8-2T


Class LNWR LNWR (Prelim) LMS BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
1185 1185   7870   12/1911 W Withdrawn 12/1945 12/1945
1185 1665   7872   12/1911 W Withdrawn 10/1936 10/1936
1185 1548 1790 7871   12/1911 W Withdrawn 05/1935 05/1935
1185 289   7873   01/1912 W Withdrawn 01/1935 01/1935
1185 1163   7874   01/1912 W Withdrawn 06/1935 06/1935
1185     7875 47875 01/1912 8C
W
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/08/1948
28/08/1948
1185 1592   7876   01/1912 W Withdrawn 07/1947 07/1947
1185     7877 47877 01/1912 8C
W
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/02/1953
21/02/1953
1185 1663   7878   01/1912 W Withdrawn 06/1947 06/1947
1185 2013   7879   02/1912 W Withdrawn 12/1936 12/1936
1185 58   7882   08/1915 W Withdrawn 10/1934 10/1934
1185 482   7880   08/1915 W Withdrawn 03/1937 03/1937
1185     7881 47881 08/1915 8C
W
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/07/1951
21/07/1951
1185 736   7883   08/1915 W Withdrawn 03/1935 03/1935
1185     7884 47884 09/1915 8C
W
Speke Junction
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/06/1951
09/06/1951
1185     7885 47885 09/1915 10A
W
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1950
03/1950
1185 1414   7886 47886 09/1915 W Withdrawn 09/1948 09/1948
1185     7887 47887 09/1915 10C
W
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/08/1948
28/08/1948
1185     7888 47888 09/1915 10A
W
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1948
04/12/1948
1185 2277   7889   09/1915 W Withdrawn 10/1934 10/1934
1185 24   7890   12/1916 W Withdrawn 06/1939 06/1939
1185 92   7891   12/1916 W Withdrawn 06/1946 06/1946
1185     7892 47892 01/1917 10C
W
Patricroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/02/1948
14/02/1948
1185 1291   7893   01/1917 W Withdrawn 10/1934 10/1934
1185 1331   7894   01/1917 W Withdrawn 09/1939 09/1939
1185 2105   7895   01/1917 W Withdrawn 10/1934 10/1934
1185     7896 47896 01/1917 10A
W
Springs Branch (Wigan)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
04/11/1950
1185 2341   7897   02/1917 W Withdrawn 06/1946 06/1946
1185 2348   7898   02/1917 W Withdrawn 01/1946 01/1946
1185 2391   7899   02/1917 W Withdrawn 08/1935 08/1935