Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 823 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6750 Week
» 5488 Month
» 419809 Year
» 1641374 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LNWR/LMS Cooke "6F" Class 0-8-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
10/1934 Condemned 7882       COND  
10/1934 Condemned 7889       COND  
10/1934 Condemned 7893       COND  
10/1934 Condemned 7895       COND  
01/1935 Condemned 7873       COND  
03/1935 Condemned 7883       COND  
05/1935 Condemned 7871       COND  
06/1935 Condemned 7874       COND  
08/1935 Condemned 7899       COND  
10/1936 Condemned 7872       COND  
12/1936 Condemned 7879       COND  
03/1937 Condemned 7880       COND  
06/1939 Condemned 7890       COND  
09/1939 Condemned 7894       COND  
12/1945 Condemned 7870       COND  
01/1946 Condemned 7898       COND  
06/1946 Condemned 7891       COND  
06/1946 Condemned 7897       COND  
06/1947 Condemned 7878       COND  
07/1947 Condemned 7876       COND  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7875     8C Speke Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7877     8C Speke Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7881     8C Speke Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7884     8C Speke Junction  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7885     10A Springs Branch (Wigan)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7887     10C Patricroft  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7888     10A Springs Branch (Wigan)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7892     10C Patricroft  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 7896     10A Springs Branch (Wigan)  
14/02/1948 Condemned 7892 10C Patricroft   COND  
28/08/1948 Condemned 7875 8C Speke Junction   COND  
28/08/1948 Condemned 7887 10C Patricroft   COND  
09/1948 Condemned 7886       COND  
04/12/1948 Condemned 7888 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)   COND  
03/1950 Condemned 47885 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)   COND  
04/11/1950 Condemned 47896 10A Springs Branch (Wigan)   COND  
09/06/1951 Condemned 47884 8C Speke Junction   COND  
21/07/1951 Condemned 47881 8C Speke Junction   COND  
21/02/1953 Condemned 47877 8C Speke Junction   COND