LNWR/LMS Webb "1P" Class 2-4-2T
Class | LNWR | LNWR (Renum) | LMS | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1P | 910 | 6601 | 46601 | 09/1890 | 4A 4B 2B 2A 1E 2A W |
Shrewsbury Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Bletchley Rugby Bletchley Rugby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 23/10/1948 16/05/1953 11/07/1953 31/10/1953 05/12/1953 |
05/12/1953 | |
1P | 214 | 6602 | 02/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1936 | 03/1936 | ||
1P | 459 | 6603 | 46603 | 02/1891 | 8B W |
Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/07/1951 |
21/07/1951 | |
1P | 465 | 6604 | 46604 | 01/1891 | 2B 7B 7A 6H 2A 5A 2C W |
Bletchley Bangor Llandudno Junction Bangor Rugby Crewe North Warwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/07/1948 23/10/1948 11/07/1953 02/01/1954 24/04/1954 11/09/1954 20/08/1955 |
20/08/1955 | |
1P | 466 | 6605 | 46605 | 01/1891 | 5A W |
Crewe North Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/05/1948 |
22/05/1948 | |
1P | 655 | 6606 | 01/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1931 | 07/1931 | ||
1P | 133 | 6607 | 04/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1946 | 06/1946 | ||
1P | 199 | 6608 | 04/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1928 | 03/1928 | ||
1P | 546 | 6609 | 01/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1930 | 06/1930 | ||
1P | 608 | 6610 | 03/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1931 | 07/1931 | ||
1P | 613 | 6611 | 03/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1936 | 04/1936 | ||
1P | 657 | 6612 | 01/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1924 | 09/1924 | ||
1P | 658 | 6613 | 01/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1930 | 08/1930 | ||
1P | 660 | 6614 | 02/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1927 | 08/1927 | ||
1P | 661 | 6615 | 02/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1924 | 05/1924 | ||
1P | 662 | 6616 | 46616 | 03/1891 | 2C 9D 87K W |
Northampton Buxton (LNWR) Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 21/02/1953 30/09/1955 |
30/09/1955 | |
1P | 897 | 6617 | 03/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1932 | 09/1932 | ||
1P | 900 | 6618 | 03/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1928 | 09/1928 | ||
1P | 921 | 6619 | 04/1891 | 4B W |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Withdrawn |
11/04/1936 05/1947 |
05/1947 | ||
1P | 922 | 6620 | 46620 | 04/1891 | 4B W |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/1953 |
02/1953 | |
1P | 2536 | 1769 | 6621 | 11/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 1932 | 1932 | |
1P | 1750 | 6622 | 12/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 1932 | 1932 | ||
1P | 1751 | 6623 | 12/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1930 | 03/1930 | ||
1P | 1752 | 6624 | 12/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 1932 | 1932 | ||
1P | 1753 | 6625 | 12/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1937 | 03/1937 | ||
1P | 1754 | 6626 | 12/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 1932 | 1932 | ||
1P | 1755 | 6627 | 12/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1947 | 09/1947 | ||
1P | 1756 | 6628 | 46628 | 12/1891 | 7A 10E W |
Llandudno Junction Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
11/04/1936 01/01/1948 07/1951 |
07/1951 | |
1P | 1757 | 6629 | 12/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1932 | 05/1932 | ||
1P | 1758 | 6630 | 12/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1925 | 08/1925 | ||
1P | 1759 | 6631 | 12/1891 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1932 | 11/1932 | ||
1P | 1760 | 6632 | 46632 | 01/1892 | 7D 10E W |
Rhyl Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 06/1950 |
06/1950 | |
1P | 1761 | 6633 | 01/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1934 | 05/1934 | ||
1P | 1762 | 6634 | 01/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1925 | 05/1925 | ||
1P | 1763 | 6635 | 46635 | 01/1892 | 12G W |
Dumfries Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1950 |
01/04/1950 | |
1P | 1764 | 01/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1907 | 01/1907 | |||
1P | 1765 | 6636 | 01/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1947 | 12/1947 | ||
1P | 1766 | 6637 | 46637 | 01/1892 | 10E W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/09/1949 |
17/09/1949 | |
1P | 1767 | 6638 | 01/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1930 | 12/1930 | ||
1P | 1768 | 6639 | 46639 | 01/1892 | 12G 68D W |
Dumfries Beattock Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/01/1949 06/1949 |
06/1949 | |
1P | 338 | 6640 | 12/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 1931 | 1931 | ||
1P | 408 | 6641 | 04/1894 | 7A W |
Llandudno Junction Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 10/1946 |
10/1946 | ||
1P | 409 | 6642 | 12/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1932 | 09/1932 | ||
1P | 1154 | 12/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 1921 | 1921 | |||
1P | 431 | 6643 | 46643 | 12/1892 | 3C 7B 5A 7B 10E 6D 10E 8B 6K W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Bangor Crewe North Bangor Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Chester Northgate Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Warrington Dallam Rhyl Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 03/07/1948 07/08/1948 30/10/1948 27/01/1951 19/05/1951 11/08/1951 12/07/1952 01/1953 |
01/1953 | |
1P | 481 | 6644 | 12/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1928 | 07/1928 | ||
1P | 1144 | 6645 | 12/1892 | 6C W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 10/1946 |
10/1946 | ||
1P | 1152 | 6646 | 12/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1947 | 05/1947 | ||
1P | 1165 | 6647 | 12/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1932 | 11/1932 | ||
1P | 1169 | 6648 | 12/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 1931 | 1931 | ||
1P | 2125 | 6649 | 05/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 1932 | 1932 | ||
1P | 2126 | 6650 | 05/1893 | 6C W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Withdrawn |
11/04/1936 07/1947 |
02/08/1947 | ||
1P | 2127 | 6651 | 05/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 1931 | 1931 | ||
1P | 2128 | 6652 | 05/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1946 | 08/1946 | ||
1P | 2129 | 6653 | 09/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1947 | 06/1947 | ||
1P | 2130 | 6654 | 46654 | 09/1893 | 3B 8B 2C W |
Bushbury Warrington Dallam Warwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/09/1949 22/03/1952 12/09/1953 |
12/09/1953 | |
1P | 2131 | 6655 | 09/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1935 | 01/1935 | ||
1P | 2132 | 6656 | 46656 | 09/1893 | 27C 27A 12G 12G 68D 68D W |
Hamilton (West) Polmadie Dumfries Dumfries Beattock Beattock Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 27/11/1948 11/12/1948 09/07/1949 16/07/1949 02/1952 |
02/1952 | |
1P | 2133 | 6657 | 09/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1946 | 02/1946 | ||
1P | 2134 | 6658 | 46658 | 09/1893 | 7D 7A 10E W |
Rhyl Llandudno Junction Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 10/12/1949 09/12/1950 |
09/12/1950 | |
1P | 406 | 6659 | 12/1892 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1945 | 09/1945 | ||
1P | 413 | 6660 | 06/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1947 | 20/09/1947 | ||
1P | 425 | 6661 | 46661 | 06/1893 | 3C W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/1948 |
06/1948 | |
1P | 718 | 6662 | 06/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1935 | 07/1935 | ||
1P | 779 | 6663 | 46663 | 06/1893 | 8B W |
Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1949 |
16/07/1949 | |
1P | 1150 | 6664 | 06/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1936 | 02/1936 | ||
1P | 1174 | 6665 | 06/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1936 | 04/1936 | ||
1P | 2146 | 6666 | 46666 | 06/1893 | 2C W |
Northampton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1954 |
19/06/1954 | |
1P | 2148 | 6667 | 06/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1946 | 03/1946 | ||
1P | 2149 | 6668 | 06/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1936 | 03/1936 | ||
1P | 202 | 6669 | 46669 | 02/1894 | 2E 8B W |
Warwick Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1948 09/1949 |
09/1949 | |
1P | 204 | 6670 | 02/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1930 | 05/1930 | ||
1P | 886 | 6671 | 01/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1936 | 03/1936 | ||
1P | 1157 | 6672 | 08/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 11/1934 | ||
1P | 1197 | 6673 | 46673 | 08/1893 | 2E W |
Warwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1948 |
24/04/1948 | |
1P | 2135 | 6674 | 07/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1947 | 12/1947 | ||
1P | 2136 | 6675 | 07/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1930 | 07/1930 | ||
1P | 2137 | 6676 | 46676 | 07/1893 | 10E W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/1949 |
12/1949 | |
1P | 2138 | 6677 | 07/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 1931 | 1931 | ||
1P | 2139 | 6678 | 07/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1927 | 10/1927 | ||
1P | 2140 | 6679 | 46679 | 07/1893 | 3C W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/1948 |
02/1948 | |
1P | 2141 | 6680 | 46680 | 07/1893 | 5A 5A W |
Crewe North Crewe North Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/01/1948 01/1953 |
01/1953 | |
1P | 2142 | 6681 | 46681 | 07/1893 | 7A 5A W |
Llandudno Junction Crewe North Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 12/06/1948 |
12/06/1948 | |
1P | 2143 | 6682 | 46682 | 07/1893 | W 10E |
Withdrawn Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) |
12/1947 01/01/1948 |
12/1947 | |
1P | 2144 | 6683 | 46683 | 07/1893 | 2E 4A 2C 2C W |
Warwick Bletchley Warwick Warwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/05/1951 14/07/1951 17/07/1951 28/02/1953 |
28/02/1953 | |
1P | 2215 | 6684 | 09/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1927 | 10/1927 | ||
1P | 2216 | 6685 | 09/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1947 | 16/08/1947 | ||
1P | 2217 | 6686 | 46686 | 09/1893 | 1C W |
Watford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/05/1948 |
22/05/1948 | |
1P | 2218 | 6687 | 46687 | 09/1893 | 7D 7B 7A W |
Rhyl Bangor Llandudno Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 30/10/1948 24/12/1949 |
24/12/1949 | |
1P | 2219 | 6688 | 46688 | 09/1893 | 8B W |
Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/1951 |
04/1951 | |
1P | 427 | 6689 | 04/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1947 | 08/11/1947 | ||
1P | 697 | 6690 | 04/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1947 | 04/1947 | ||
1P | 1143 | 6691 | 46691 | 04/1894 | 7D 7B W |
Rhyl Bangor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 27/03/1948 |
27/03/1948 | |
1P | 1145 | 6692 | 46692 | 04/1894 | 10E W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/03/1948 |
20/03/1948 | |
1P | 1147 | 6693 | 04/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1934 | 02/1934 | ||
1P | 1148 | 6694 | 04/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1936 | 04/1936 | ||
1P | 1149 | 6695 | 04/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1936 | 10/1936 | ||
1P | 1155 | 6696 | 04/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1925 | 10/1925 | ||
1P | 2145 | 6697 | 04/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1935 | 08/1935 | ||
1P | 31 | 6698 | 06/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1928 | 09/1928 | ||
1P | 50 | 6699 | 06/1894 | 2B W |
Bletchley Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 11/1945 |
11/1945 | ||
1P | 290 | 6700 | 06/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1946 | 10/1946 | ||
1P | 342 | 6701 | 46701 | 06/1894 | 7A 7D 8B 6H 6H W |
Llandudno Junction Rhyl Warrington Dallam Bangor Bangor Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 01/01/1948 17/01/1948 12/07/1952 09/08/1952 28/02/1953 |
28/02/1953 | |
1P | 620 | 6702 | 06/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1931 | 07/1931 | ||
1P | 649 | 6703 | 06/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1947 | 08/1947 | ||
1P | 923 | 6704 | 06/1894 | 3B W |
Bushbury Withdrawn |
21/06/1947 09/1947 |
20/09/1947 | ||
1P | 960 | 6705 | 06/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1937 | 03/1937 | ||
1P | 1018 | 6706 | 06/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1930 | 09/1930 | ||
1P | 2232 | 6707 | 06/1894 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1936 | 01/1936 | ||
1P | 255 | 6708 | 02/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1937 | 02/1937 | ||
1P | 426 | 6709 | 02/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 1935 | 1935 | ||
1P | 626 | 6710 | 46710 | 02/1895 | 8B 8B 5A 5A W |
Warrington Dallam Warrington Dallam Crewe North Crewe North Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/01/1948 05/06/1948 11/12/1948 09/1949 |
09/1949 | |
1P | 680 | 6711 | 46711 | 02/1895 | 5A 1C 2C 2E W |
Crewe North Watford Northampton Warwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/05/1948 28/08/1948 06/11/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 | |
1P | 847 | 6712 | 46712 | 02/1895 | 7D 3C 2A 3C 2C W |
Rhyl Ryecroft (Walsall) Rugby Ryecroft (Walsall) Warwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 29/12/1951 23/02/1952 19/06/1954 14/08/1954 |
14/08/1954 | |
1P | 1180 | 6713 | 02/1895 | 3C W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
11/04/1936 09/1946 |
09/1946 | ||
1P | 70 | 6714 | 04/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1932 | 10/1932 | ||
1P | 144 | 6715 | 03/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 1928 | 1928 | ||
1P | 151 | 6716 | 03/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1928 | 07/1928 | ||
1P | 187 | 6717 | 03/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1928 | 07/1928 | ||
1P | 340 | 6718 | 46718 | 03/1895 | 8B W |
Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1948 |
24/01/1948 | |
1P | 341 | 6719 | 03/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 1932 | 1932 | ||
1P | 344 | 04/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1922 | 05/1922 | |||
1P | 371 | 6720 | 04/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 1935 | 1935 | ||
1P | 402 | 6721 | 06/1893 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1935 | 10/1935 | ||
1P | 853 | 6722 | 03/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1946 | 12/1946 | ||
1P | 1156 | 6723 | 04/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1947 | 05/1947 | ||
1P | 516 | 6724 | 05/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1930 | 03/1930 | ||
1P | 1151 | 6725 | 05/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1947 | 12/1947 | ||
1P | 2259 | 6726 | 04/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1934 | 01/1934 | ||
1P | 2260 | 6727 | 46727 | 04/1895 | 6C 7D 10E 4A 10E 8B 11B 11B W |
Birkenhead Mollington Street Rhyl Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Shrewsbury Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Warrington Dallam Barrow in Furness Barrow in Furness Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 01/01/1948 17/01/1948 06/08/1949 26/11/1949 31/12/1950 22/03/1952 19/04/1952 12/1952 |
12/1952 | |
1P | 2261 | 6728 | 04/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1947 | 06/1947 | ||
1P | 2262 | 6729 | 05/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1947 | 08/11/1947 | ||
1P | 2263 | 6730 | 05/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1928 | 07/1928 | ||
1P | 2264 | 6731 | 05/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1928 | 07/1928 | ||
1P | 2265 | 6732 | 05/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1928 | 07/1928 | ||
1P | 2266 | 6733 | 05/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1928 | 07/1928 | ||
1P | 2267 | 6734 | 05/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1946 | 03/1946 | ||
1P | 1153 | 6735 | 08/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1932 | 07/1932 | ||
1P | 838 | 6736 | 08/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 1931 | 1931 | ||
1P | 2147 | 6737 | 11/1895 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1935 | 09/1935 | ||
1P | 1367 | 6738 | 46738 | 05/1897 | 9D W |
Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/05/1948 |
08/05/1948 | |
1P | 1374 | 6739 | 04/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1947 | 05/1947 | ||
1P | 1383 | 6740 | 46740 | 04/1897 | 4B W |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/05/1948 |
08/05/1948 | |
1P | 1386 | 6741 | 04/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1946 | 05/1946 | ||
1P | 1398 | 6742 | 46742 | 04/1897 | 2C 2C 10E W |
Northampton Northampton Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/01/1948 06/11/1948 12/1949 |
12/1949 | |
1P | 1402 | 6743 | 04/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 1944 | 1944 | ||
1P | 1409 | 6744 | 04/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1930 | 09/1930 | ||
1P | 1410 | 6745 | 05/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1930 | 05/1930 | ||
1P | 1423 | 6746 | 05/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1946 | 10/1946 | ||
1P | 1425 | 6747 | 46747 | 05/1897 | 7A W |
Llandudno Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1948 |
07/02/1948 | |
1P | 1378 | 6748 | 05/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1947 | 16/08/1947 | ||
1P | 1381 | 6749 | 46749 | 05/1897 | 2E W |
Warwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1952 |
23/02/1952 | |
1P | 1389 | 6750 | 05/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 11/1934 | ||
1P | 1391 | 6751 | 05/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1928 | 04/1928 | ||
1P | 1392 | 6752 | 06/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1930 | 03/1930 | ||
1P | 1393 | 6753 | 05/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1936 | 02/1936 | ||
1P | 1451 | 6754 | 05/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1947 | 12/1947 | ||
1P | 1458 | 6755 | 05/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1946 | 06/1946 | ||
1P | 1463 | 6756 | 06/1897 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1936 | 03/1936 | ||
1P | 1468 | 6757 | 46757 | 07/1897 | 3C 10E 10E 2A W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Rugby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 23/02/1952 02/1953 |
02/1953 |