Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 1005 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 5497 Week
» 30331 Month
» 64663 Year
» 1730039 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LYR/LMS Aspinall "1008" Class 2-4-2T


Class LYR WR LMS (1923) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
1008 1008   10621 50621 02/1889 20D
20E
W
Normanton
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/05/1948
18/09/1954
18/09/1954
1008 1009   10622 50622 03/1889 20A
20E
W
Holbeck (MR)
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
23/08/1952
23/08/1952
1008 1010   10623 50623 03/1889 20F
20E
20E
W
Skipton
Manningham
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/11/1949
24/12/1949
21/06/1952
21/06/1952
1008 1011   10624   04/1889 01/1944
1008 1012   10625 50625 05/1889 20G
W
Hellifield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/08/1952
09/08/1952
1008 1013   10626   05/1889 12/1937
1008 1014   10627   06/1889 11/1935
1008 1015   10628   06/1889 08/1930
1008 1016   10629   07/1889 08/1938
1008 1017   10630 50630 07/1889 20E
W
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/10/1950
14/10/1950
1008 1033   10631 50631 04/1890 20E
W
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
20/11/1948
20/11/1948
1008 1034   10632   04/1890 01/1939
1008 1035   10932   05/1890 08/1930
1008 1036   10633 50633 05/1890 20E
W
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/06/1952
21/06/1952
1008 1037   10634 50634 06/1890 20E
W
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
18/10/1952
18/10/1952
1008 1038   10635   06/1890 03/1930
1008 1039   10636 50636 06/1890 20E
W
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
19/07/1957
19/07/1957
1008 1040   10637   06/1890 02/1934
1008 1041 6 6762 46762 07/1890 10B Preston 01/01/1948 16/02/1952
1008 1042   10639 50639 07/1890 10B
W
Preston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/05/1952
17/05/1952
1008 1043   10640 50640 07/1890 24F
27C
27C
W
Fleetwood
Southport
Southport
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/06/1951
17/07/1951
19/04/1952
19/04/1952
1008 1044   10641   07/1890 06/1939
1008 1045   10642 50642 08/1890 26C
24F
W
Bolton
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/09/1949
24/03/1951
24/03/1951
1008 1046   10643 50643 08/1890 11B
10D
10B
8B
W
Barrow in Furness
Plodder Lane
Preston
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
14/06/1952
28/11/1953
10/1958
10/1958
1008 1047   10644 50644 08/1890 11B
10D
10B
10B
8B
W
Barrow in Furness
Plodder Lane
Preston
Preston
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/06/1950
12/07/1952
09/08/1952
21/03/1953
25/10/1958
25/10/1958
1008 1048   10645   08/1890 11/1930
1008 1049   10646 50646 08/1890 26C
24F
27B
27B
26C
26C
20C
15D
W
Bolton
Fleetwood
Aintree
Aintree
Bolton
Bolton
Royston
Bedford
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/11/1949
27/01/1951
31/01/1951
10/03/1951
24/03/1951
09/10/1954
25/02/1956
08/11/1958
08/11/1958
1008 1050   10930   09/1890 11/1929
1008 1051   10936   09/1890 03/1929
1008 1052   10647 50647 09/1890 25A
24F
26C
26D
24B
26D
26D
26C
26E
26D
26C
W
Wakefield
Fleetwood
Bolton
Bury
Rose Grove
Bury
Bury
Bolton
Bacup
Bury
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/12/1949
22/04/1950
24/03/1951
19/05/1951
26/05/1951
16/06/1951
22/03/1952
04/10/1952
06/11/1954
26/02/1955
21/02/1959
21/02/1959
1008 1157   10648 50648 04/1892 23B
26C
26C
26E
26C
24B
27B
24B
W
Aintree
Bolton
Bolton
Bacup
Bolton
Rose Grove
Aintree
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/09/1951
06/10/1951
14/06/1952
12/07/1952
08/08/1953
30/01/1954
27/03/1954
19/11/1955
19/11/1955
1008 1158   10649   05/1892 11/1938
1008 1159   10650 50650 05/1892 25A
26E
26E
26D
26C
26C
26C
20C
15A
W
Wakefield
Bacup
Bacup
Bury
Bolton
Bolton
Bolton
Royston
Wellingborough
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/11/1950
02/12/1950
01/12/1951
17/05/1952
14/06/1952
03/10/1953
06/11/1954
25/02/1956
06/10/1956
06/10/1956
1008 1160   10651 50651 05/1892 26E
26D
27B
26D
24B
24B
W
Bacup
Bury
Aintree
Bury
Rose Grove
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/03/1951
16/06/1951
11/08/1951
17/05/1952
14/06/1952
17/12/1955
17/12/1955
1008 1161   10652 50652 05/1892 26E
27B
26E
27B
24B
24B
W
Bacup
Aintree
Bacup
Aintree
Rose Grove
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/02/1951
24/03/1951
19/05/1951
09/06/1951
16/06/1951
13/10/1956
13/10/1956
1008 1162   10653 50653 05/1892 24B
W
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/02/1956
04/02/1956
1008 1163   10654 50654 06/1892 24B
W
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/04/1951
28/04/1951
1008 1164   10655 50655 06/1892 23B
26D
26D
24B
24B
26C
24B
W
Aintree
Bury
Bury
Rose Grove
Rose Grove
Bolton
Rose Grove
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/06/1951
16/06/1951
17/05/1952
14/06/1952
05/11/1955
25/02/1956
11/08/1956
11/08/1956
1008 1065   10656 50656 06/1892 25A
26E
26D
26E
24B
26C
W
Wakefield
Bacup
Bury
Bacup
Rose Grove
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
31/12/1950
24/03/1951
01/12/1951
21/03/1953
11/09/1954
12/03/1955
12/03/1955
1008 1066   10657   06/1892 08/1940
1008 10   10658   06/1892 03/1930
1008 1167   10659   06/1892 11/1938
1008 1168   10660 50660 07/1892 23B
26E
26C
W
Aintree
Bacup
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/11/1950
30/11/1950
29/03/1958
29/03/1958
1008 1169   10661   07/1892 03/1946
1008 287   10662   07/1892 12/1930
1008 289   10663   07/1892 02/1937
1008 321   10664   07/1892 02/1947
1008 323   10665 50665 07/1892 25F
7D
W
Low Moor
Rhyl
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/02/1948
08/1949
08/1949
1008 334   10666   07/1892 01/1944
1008 337   10667   07/1892 7D Rhyl 28/02/1948 20/03/1948
1008 1170   10668   08/1892 12/1937
1008 1171   10669   08/1892 01/1947
1008 1172   10670 50670 08/1892 25D
7D
W
Mirfield
Rhyl
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/02/1948
04/1949
04/1949
1008 1173   10671 50671 08/1892 20F
20E
20E
W
Skipton
Manningham
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/11/1949
24/12/1949
15/03/1952
15/03/1952
1008 1174   10672   09/1892 12/1930
1008 1175   10673   09/1892 11/1934
1008 1176   10674   09/1892 05/1947
1008 1177   10675 50675 09/1892 24D
24F
7D
W
Lower Darwen
Fleetwood
Rhyl
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
28/02/1948
31/12/1949
31/12/1949
1008 1178   10676 50676 09/1892 10B
W
Preston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
03/1950
03/1950
1008 1179   10677   09/1892 04/1945
1008 16   10678 50678 09/1892 23C
7D
10B
10B
W
Southport
Rhyl
Preston
Preston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/02/1948
21/10/1950
04/11/1950
26/12/1953
26/12/1953
1008 26   10928   09/1892 10/1928
1008 37   10679   10/1892 12/1930
1008 301   10680   10/1892 04/1934
1008 340   10681 50681 10/1892 20E
W
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/07/1952
05/07/1952
1008 345   10682   10/1892 10/1939
1008 349   10683   10/1892 06/1939
1008 638   10684   10/1892 09/1930
1008 651   10685   11/1892 11/1934
1008 680   10686 50686 11/1892 20G
20E
W
Hellifield
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1952
20/08/1955
20/08/1955
1008 45   10929   08/1893 05/1928
1008 46   10687 50687 09/1893 24D
23C
7D
8A
7D
8B
7D
8B
8B
W
Lower Darwen
Southport
Rhyl
Edge Hill
Rhyl
Warrington Dallam
Rhyl
Warrington Dallam
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
28/02/1948
03/09/1949
11/02/1950
21/10/1950
04/11/1950
02/12/1950
31/12/1950
05/1953
05/1953
1008 54   10658   10/1893 01/1940
1008 58   10933   10/1893 09/1927
1008 119   10689 50689 10/1893 20A
20E
20A
20A
W
Holbeck (MR)
Manningham
Holbeck (MR)
Holbeck (MR)
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
29/10/1949
26/11/1949
24/12/1949
09/08/1952
09/08/1952
1008 147   10690   10/1893 12/1930
1008 189   10691   10/1893 12/1937
1008 206   10692 50692 11/1893 23D
8A
W
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Edge Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/02/1948
10/1949
10/1949
1008 208   10693   11/1893 03/1946
1008 299   10694   11/1893 04/1938
1008 1210   10695 50695 11/1893 25A
8A
7D
8A
10B
W
Wakefield
Edge Hill
Rhyl
Edge Hill
Preston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/02/1948
06/11/1948
03/09/1949
18/03/1950
19/07/1952
19/07/1952
1008 1211   10696 50696 11/1893 23C
8A
7D
W
Southport
Edge Hill
Rhyl
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/02/1948
27/03/1948
02/1949
02/1949
1008 1212   10697 50697 11/1893 26C
8B
W
Bolton
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/02/1948
17/05/1952
17/05/1952
1008 1213   10698   12/1893 12/1930
1008 1214   10699   12/1893 11/1935
1008 1215   10700   12/1893 11/1936
1008 1216   10701   12/1893 11/1938
1008 1217   10702   12/1893 08/1930
1008 1218   10703 50703 12/1893 24F
8B
W
Fleetwood
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/02/1948
21/03/1953
21/03/1953
1008 1219   10704   12/1893 02/1946
1008 36   10705 50705 02/1895 24F
8B
W
Fleetwood
Warrington Dallam
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/02/1948
25/10/1958
25/10/1958
1008 39   10706   02/1895 08/1930
1008 1258   10707   02/1895 09/1946
1008 1259   10708   02/1895 08/1930
1008 1260   10709   02/1895 04/1938
1008 1261   10710   03/1895 12/1930
1008 1262   10711 50711 03/1895 25E
23C
W
Sowerby Bridge
Southport
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/01/1948
06/1949
06/1949
1008 1263   10712 50712 03/1895 25D
25B
25E
25A
28A
28A
24C
27C
27A
W
Mirfield
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Sowerby Bridge
Wakefield
Blackpool Central
Blackpool Central
Lostock Hall
Southport
Bank Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/10/1949
04/11/1950
14/04/1951
28/04/1951
19/05/1951
11/07/1953
09/10/1954
10/08/1957
03/1959
03/1959
1008 1264   10713   03/1895 03/1938
1008 1265   10714 50714 03/1895 20E
W
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
08/1953
08/1953
1008 1266   10715 50715 03/1895 25F
25A
25F
25A
25E
25E
25A
25A
25E
25E
25A
25E
W
Low Moor
Wakefield
Low Moor
Wakefield
Sowerby Bridge
Sowerby Bridge
Wakefield
Wakefield
Sowerby Bridge
Sowerby Bridge
Wakefield
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/01/1948
21/02/1948
09/04/1949
24/02/1951
28/02/1951
09/06/1951
16/06/1951
25/08/1951
08/09/1951
13/10/1951
22/03/1952
05/02/1955
05/02/1955
1008 1267   10716   04/1895 04/1934
1008 1268   10717   04/1895 10/1947
1008 1269   10718   04/1895 03/1939
1008 1270   10719   05/1895 01/1947
1008 1271   10720 50720 05/1895 24F
24C
24C
W
Fleetwood
Lostock Hall
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/08/1951
01/12/1951
29/12/1951
29/12/1951
1008 1272   10721 50721 05/1895 24E
27D
27C
27C
27A
W
Blackpool Central
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Southport
Southport
Bank Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/12/1951
01/11/1952
29/11/1952
10/08/1957
14/01/1961
14/01/1961
1008 1273   10722   05/1895 12/1946
1008 1274   10723   05/1895 05/1934
1008 1275   10724   05/1895 05/1945
1008 24   10725 50725 03/1896 24E
24C
25B
W
Blackpool Central
Lostock Hall
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/07/1953
19/06/1954
02/10/1958
02/10/1958
1008 31   10726   03/1896 06/1934
1008 38   10922   03/1896 01/1929
1008 63   10727   03/1896 11/1934
1008 76   10728 50728 03/1896 23C
W
Southport
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/08/1948
07/08/1948
1008 84   10729   03/1896 10/1945
1008 88   10730   03/1896 06/1937
1008 97   10731 50731 04/1896 25D
25B
26C
26C
26D
26C
W
Mirfield
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Bolton
Bolton
Bury
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
30/07/1949
25/08/1951
08/09/1951
03/11/1951
23/02/1952
05/11/1955
05/11/1955
1008 104   10732 50732 04/1896 24F
W
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/1949
06/1949
1008 107   10733   04/1896 08/1937
1008 110   10734   04/1896 03/1934
1008 129   10735 50735 04/1896 24D
25A
25D
25B
W
Lower Darwen
Wakefield
Mirfield
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/11/1948
18/03/1950
15/04/1950
06/1952
06/1952
1008 156   10736 50736 04/1896 26A
25B
25F
25F
W
Newton Heath
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Low Moor
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
28/01/1950
30/06/1951
17/07/1951
12/1951
12/1951
1008 185   10737   04/1896 06/12/1947
1008 296   10738 50738 05/1896 26A
26C
W
Newton Heath
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/06/1949
16/07/1949
16/07/1949
1008 319   10739   05/1896 11/1939
1008 329   10740   05/1896 04/1934
1008 362   10741   05/1896 04/1937
1008 369   10742   05/1896 04/1945
1008 415   10743 50743 06/1896 23C
24F
W
Southport
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/06/1949
06/1950
06/1950
1008 1311   10744   06/1896 12/1930
1008 1312   10745   06/1896 12/1930
1008 1313   10746 50746 06/1896 23C
28A
24D
24D
27C
W
Southport
Blackpool Central
Lower Darwen
Lower Darwen
Southport
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/07/1950
25/08/1951
08/09/1951
04/12/1954
18/02/1961
18/02/1961
1008 1314   10747   06/1896 11/1936
1008 1315   10748 50748 06/1896 25A
28B
28B
28A
W
Wakefield
Fleetwood
Fleetwood
Blackpool Central
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/02/1950
11/03/1950
22/07/1950
09/1950
09/1950
1008 1316   10749 50749 06/1896 24E
24F
28A
W
Blackpool Central
Fleetwood
Blackpool Central
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/08/1949
22/07/1950
26/01/1952
26/01/1952
1008 1317   10750 50750 06/1896 24E
25D
W
Blackpool Central
Mirfield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/11/1948
12/1949
10/12/1949
1008 1318   10751   07/1896 01/1937
1008 1319   10752 50752 07/1896 23C
24E
24F
24F
28A
28A
28B
25E
W
Southport
Blackpool Central
Fleetwood
Fleetwood
Blackpool Central
Blackpool Central
Fleetwood
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/08/1948
31/12/1949
14/01/1950
19/08/1950
09/09/1950
03/11/1951
06/09/1952
12/08/1957
12/08/1957
1008 1320   10753   07/1896 05/1930
1008 1321   10754   07/1896 03/1938
1008 1322   10755 50755 08/1896 25A
24C
28A
W
Wakefield
Lostock Hall
Motherwell
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/04/1950
20/05/1950
07/1950
07/1950
1008 1323   10756   08/1896 11/1934
1008 1324   10757 50757 08/1896 23D
24E
24E
26A
26A
25E
25F
25E
25F
W
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Blackpool Central
Blackpool Central
Newton Heath
Newton Heath
Sowerby Bridge
Low Moor
Sowerby Bridge
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
25/06/1949
16/07/1949
02/06/1951
16/06/1951
21/03/1953
24/04/1954
09/10/1954
21/05/1955
11/1958
11/1958
1008 1325   10758   08/1896 10/1928
1008 1326   10759   08/1896 03/01/1948
1008 1327   10760   08/1896 04/1934
1008 1328   10761   09/1896 08/1938
1008 1329   10762 50762 09/1896 25F
25D
25B
25A
25F
25D
25F
W
Low Moor
Mirfield
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Wakefield
Low Moor
Mirfield
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/01/1948
11/09/1948
27/08/1949
30/06/1951
06/10/1951
12/07/1952
19/12/1953
19/12/1953
1008 1330   10763   09/1896 07/1938
1008 1331   10764 50764 01/1897 25A
24C
24B
24B
24C
25F
W
Wakefield
Lostock Hall
Rose Grove
Rose Grove
Lostock Hall
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
07/07/1951
17/07/1951
19/04/1952
21/03/1953
07/07/1956
07/07/1956
1008 1332   10765 50765 01/1897 24F
23C
26A
24D
25E
26C
26C
25B
W
Fleetwood
Southport
Newton Heath
Lower Darwen
Sowerby Bridge
Bolton
Bolton
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
13/11/1948
04/02/1950
15/04/1950
06/05/1950
28/07/1951
11/08/1951
02/01/1954
12/06/1954
12/06/1954
1008 1333   10766 50766 01/1897 24E
24F
W
Blackpool Central
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/08/1949
25/08/1951
25/08/1951
1008 1334   10767   02/1897 12/1936
1008 1335   10768   02/1897 05/1934
1008 1336   10769   02/1897 12/1930
1008 1337   10770   02/1897 12/1930
1008 1338   10771   02/1897 04/1938
1008 1339   10772   02/1897 07/1936
1008 1340   10773   03/1897 09/1930
1008 1341   10774   03/1897 06/1930
1008 1342   10775   03/1897 05/1934
1008 1343   10776   03/1897 20/12/1947
1008 1344   10777 50777 03/1897 25A
24C
28B
28B
28A
27C
27C
24C
25E
W
Wakefield
Lostock Hall
Fleetwood
Fleetwood
Blackpool Central
Southport
Southport
Lostock Hall
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/04/1950
17/03/1951
24/03/1951
06/10/1951
17/05/1952
14/06/1952
24/04/1954
19/06/1954
03/10/1958
03/10/1958
1008 1345   10778 50778 03/1897 23C
24E
25E
W
Southport
Blackpool Central
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/02/1949
27/10/1951
07/03/1953
07/03/1953
1008 1346   10779   04/1897 07/1937
1008 1347   10780   04/1897 06/1945
1008 1348   10781 50781 04/1897 24D
24C
24F
24C
27D
27C
27E
W
Lower Darwen
Lostock Hall
Fleetwood
Lostock Hall
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Southport
Walton on the Hill
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/03/1949
28/01/1950
07/10/1950
01/12/1951
31/10/1953
30/11/1957
06/02/1960
06/02/1960
1008 1349   10782   04/1897 01/1940
1008 1350   10783   04/1897 10/1939
1008 1361   10784   03/1898 07/1930
1008 1362   10785   03/1898 11/1938
1008 1367   10786   03/1898 09/1940
1008 1370   10787   04/1898 06/1946
1008 1371   10788 50788 04/1898 25F
25A
25F
25A
26C
26C
26B
24F
W
Low Moor
Wakefield
Low Moor
Wakefield
Bolton
Bolton
Agecroft
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/01/1948
21/02/1948
08/05/1948
28/10/1950
04/11/1950
11/08/1951
12/07/1952
11/08/1956
11/08/1956
1008 1372   10789   04/1898 02/1936
1008 1373   10790   04/1898 12/1933
1008 1374   10791   04/1898 01/1934
1008 1375   10792   04/1898 12/1933
1008 1376   10793 50793 05/1898 10B
W
Preston
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
02/1950
02/1950
1008 1377   10794   05/1898 09/1928
1008 1378   10795 50795 05/1898 20F
20E
W
Skipton
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
14/08/1948
16/11/1959
16/11/1959
1008 1379   10796   05/1895 20/12/1947
1008 1380   10931   05/1895 11/1930
1008 1381   10797   05/1898 06/1937
1008 1382   10798 50798 05/1898 25D

28B
28B
W
Mirfield

Fleetwood
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
15/04/1950
20/05/1950
17/06/1950
07/1950
07/1950
1008 1383   10799 50799 06/1898 24D
24E
25D
25B
24D
25A
26C
26C
25B
W
Lower Darwen
Blackpool Central
Mirfield
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Lower Darwen
Wakefield
Bolton
Bolton
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Withdrawn
22/06/1946
01/01/1948
13/11/1948
18/02/1950
15/04/1950
20/05/1950
17/03/1951
24/03/1951
26/01/1952
16/08/1952
16/08/1952
1008 1384   10800 50800 06/1898 25A
W
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/08/1948
07/08/1948
1008 1385   10801 50801 06/1898 25A
W
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/12/1948
04/12/1948
1008 1386   10802 50802 06/1898 24F
W
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
05/07/1952
05/07/1952
1008 1387   10803   06/1898 10/1946
1008 1388   10804 50804 07/1898 25A
25D
25A
25B
25B
W
Wakefield
Mirfield
Wakefield
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/02/1948
04/06/1949
17/12/1949
24/12/1949
02/1950
02/1950
1008 1389   10805   07/1898 04/1940
1008 1390   10806 50806 07/1898 25A
25D
24F
24F
28A
27C
27C
W
Wakefield
Mirfield
Fleetwood
Fleetwood
Blackpool Central
Southport
Southport
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/02/1948
17/12/1949
24/12/1949
07/10/1950
29/09/1951
06/10/1951
23/02/1952
23/02/1952
1008 1391   10807 50807 07/1898 26C
25F
W
Bolton
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
12/07/1952
05/1955
05/1955
1008 686   10808   07/1898 12/1933
1008 693   10927   07/1898 11/1929
1008 696   10809   07/1898 06/1946
1008 699   10810   08/1898 02/1947
1008 701   10811   08/1898 10/1939
1008 703   10812 50812 08/1898 24F
W
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/05/1952
10/05/1952
1008 721   10813 50813 08/1898 25A
25F
25A
W
Wakefield
Low Moor
Wakefield
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
21/02/1948
08/05/1948
05/1949
05/1949
1008 723   10814   08/1898 12/1934
1008 724   10815 50815 08/1898 26C
26C
W
Bolton
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
02/1951
02/1951
1008 725   10816   09/1898 02/1934
1008 728   10817   09/1898 08/1935
1008 730   10818 50818 09/1898 26A
26C
26A
26A
25F
25E
W
Newton Heath
Bolton
Newton Heath
Newton Heath
Low Moor
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
28/04/1951
19/05/1951
14/06/1952
24/04/1954
03/10/1958
03/10/1958
1008 732   10819   09/1898 20/12/1947
1008 733   10820   09/1898 06/1934
1008 734   10821   09/1898 08/1944
1008 5   10822   10/1898 11/1945
1008 34   10823 50823 10/1898 26D
24F
W
Bury
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/01/1948
04/12/1948
04/12/1948
1008 48   10935   10/1898 07/1946
1008 90   10824   10/1898 10/1938
1008 98   10825   10/1898 01/1947
1008 120   10953 50953 10/1898 08/04/1950
1008 183   10827   10/1898 01/1944
1008 191   10828   11/1898 02/1939
1008 192   10829 50829 11/1898 25D
26C
26C
26E
26C
26D
27B
27B
26E
26E
26D
26C
W
Mirfield
Bolton
Bolton
Bacup
Bolton
Bury
Aintree
Aintree
Bacup
Bacup
Bury
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/04/1948
10/06/1950
02/12/1950
31/12/1950
19/05/1951
09/06/1951
16/06/1951
25/08/1951
08/09/1951
06/11/1954
06/10/1956
12/04/1958
12/04/1958
1008 267   10923   11/1898 08/11/1947
1008 297   10830   11/1898 01/1937
1008 316   10831 50831 11/1898 26C
24D
24D
24C
25F
25B
25F
W
Bolton
Lower Darwen
Lower Darwen
Lostock Hall
Low Moor
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
07/07/1951
17/07/1951
22/03/1952
12/07/1952
09/10/1954
03/12/1955
11/1958
11/1958
1008 332   10952 50952 11/1898 19/06/1948
1008 346   10833   12/1898 06/1939
1008 351   10948   12/1898 02/1929
1008 353   10834   12/1898 08/1936
1008 356   10950 50950 12/1898 21/08/1948
1008 371   10835 50835 12/1898 07/08/1948
1008 379   10954   12/1898 08/1940
1008 380   10942   12/1898 12/1945
1008 627   10926   04/1899 10/1928
1008 629   10827   04/1899 02/1937
1008 630   10937   05/1899 06/1931
1008 643   10838   05/1899 03/1939
1008 644   10947   05/1899 06/1940
1008 645   10839   06/1899 12/1939
1008 646   10840 50840 06/1899 25F
23C
24F
26C
26C
26B
W
Low Moor
Southport
Fleetwood
Bolton
Bolton
Agecroft
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/01/1948
02/04/1949
24/02/1951
28/02/1951
11/08/1951
23/02/1952
23/02/1952
1008 649   10949   06/1899 11/1939
1008 653   10841   06/1899 11/1946
1008 658   10842 50842 07/1899 20G
20E
W
Hellifield
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/09/1948
25/08/1951
25/08/1951
1008 661   10946   07/1899 01/1944
1008 664   10843   07/1899 11/1945
1008 667   10844 50844 08/1899 23D
24C
26C

28B
28A
W
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Lostock Hall
Bolton

Fleetwood
Blackpool Central
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/02/1949
28/01/1950
15/04/1950
20/05/1950
12/08/1950
09/1950
09/1950
1008 668   10845   08/1899 07/1936
1008 670   10846 50951 08/1899 01/1950
1008 671   10847   09/1899 06/12/1947
1008 672   10848   09/1899 04/1930
1008 674   10849 50849 09/1899 23C
24E
W
Southport
Blackpool Central
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/02/1949
02/1950
02/1950
1008 675   10850 50850 09/1899 25D
24F
24F
26C
27C
W
Mirfield
Fleetwood
Fleetwood
Bolton
Southport
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/12/1949
24/12/1949
11/08/1951
13/06/1960
11/1961
11/1961
1008 678   10851   10/1899 10/1938
1008 514   10852 50852 10/1900 25A
24C
W
Wakefield
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
09/09/1950
17/01/1953
17/01/1953
1008 515   10853   11/1900 12/1936
1008 516   10854   11/1900 11/1939
1008 525   10855 50855 11/1900 25F
23C
26A
26C
26C
25F
W
Low Moor
Southport
Newton Heath
Bolton
Bolton
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/01/1948
01/04/1950
24/02/1951
28/02/1951
08/09/1956
09/1958
09/1958
1008 632   10944   11/1900 08/1947
1008 641   10856   11/1900 10/1944
1008 669   10857   12/1900 20/12/1947
1008 689   10858   12/1900 04/1940
1008 705   10859 50859 12/1900 26C
26A
25B
W
Bolton
Newton Heath
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
22/07/1950
14/06/1952
28/11/1953
28/11/1953
1008 707   10860   12/1900 08/1938
1008 714   10861   12/1900 10/1946
1008 716   10862   12/1900 09/1938
1008 719   10943 50943 12/1900 18/12/1948
1008 722   10863   01/1901 11/1938
1008 740   10864   01/1901 04/1944
1008 741   10865 50865 01/1901 23C
26C
25F
25B
W
Southport
Bolton
Low Moor
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
01/04/1950
12/07/1952
06/09/1952
03/10/1958
03/10/1958
1008 742   10866   01/1901 07/1936
1008 743   10867   02/1901 12/1938
1008 746   10868   02/1901 09/1938
1008 790   10869 50869 02/1901 25A
25D
25F
W
Wakefield
Mirfield
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
06/10/1951
31/10/1953
05/11/1955
05/11/1955
1008 816   10870   04/1905 05/1943
1008 817   10871   04/1905 06/1946
1008 819   10872 50872 04/1905 26D
24F
26C
W
Bury
Fleetwood
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/01/1948
12/02/1949
22/03/1952
22/03/1952
1008 833   10873 50873 05/1905 25D
25A
24C
24C
W
Mirfield
Wakefield
Lostock Hall
Lostock Hall
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
27/08/1949
17/03/1951
24/03/1951
01/03/1952
01/03/1952
1008 839   10874   05/1905 08/1946
1008 842   10875 50875 05/1905 26D
24F
W
Bury
Fleetwood
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/01/1948
22/05/1948
22/05/1948
1008 867   10876   05/1905 03/1946
1008 868   10877   06/1905 05/1931
1008 869   10939   06/1905 03/1945
1008 878   10878   06/1905 05/1946
1008 1461   10879   06/1905 01/1946
1008 1462   10880 50880 06/1905 20A
20E
W
Holbeck (MR)
Manningham
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/12/1948
10/1949
10/1949
1008 1463   10881   07/1905 06/1946
1008 1464   10882   07/1905 08/1944
1008 1465   10883   07/1905 10/1944
1008 1466   10884   07/1905 11/1944
1008 1467   10885   08/1905 10/1947
1008 1468   10886 50886 09/1905 25F
23D
25A
25F
25F
W
Low Moor
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Wakefield
Low Moor
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/01/1948
12/02/1949
30/06/1951
17/07/1951
29/12/1951
29/12/1951
1008 1469   10938   09/1905 19/10/1946
1008 1470   10887 50887 10/1905 23D
25B
25E
25E
26C
26C
26C
26D
26C
W
Wigan Central (L&Y)
Huddersfield Hillhouse
Sowerby Bridge
Sowerby Bridge
Bolton
Bolton
Bolton
Bury
Bolton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
26/02/1949
17/03/1951
24/03/1951
29/09/1951
06/10/1951
22/03/1952
06/11/1954
06/10/1956
14/12/1957
14/12/1957
1008 1526   10888   01/1910 03/1946
1008 1527   10889 50889 01/1910 24E
W
Blackpool Central
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
10/1949
10/1949
1008 1528   10921   01/1910 03/1947
1008 1529   10920   02/1910 10/1929
1008 1530   10890   02/1910 03/1945
1008 1531   10891 50891 02/1910 04/03/1950
1008 1532   10940   02/1910 05/1942
1008 1533   10934 50934 02/1910 14/08/1948
1008 1534   10941   02/1910 07/1946
1008 1535   10892 50892 03/1910 26D
26C
25A
25E
25A
25A
25E
25E
25A
25A
25D
25F
W
Bury
Bolton
Wakefield
Sowerby Bridge
Wakefield
Wakefield
Sowerby Bridge
Sowerby Bridge
Wakefield
Wakefield
Mirfield
Low Moor
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
17/01/1948
12/11/1949
04/11/1950
24/02/1951
28/02/1951
09/06/1951
16/06/1951
25/08/1951
08/09/1951
06/10/1951
26/01/1952
05/1952
05/1952
1008 1536   10925 50925 03/1910 09/08/1952
1008 1537   10893 50893 03/1910 29/04/1950
1008 1538   10894   03/1910 08/1931
1008 1539   10926   03/1910 03/1928
1008 1540   10895   03/1910 04/1932
1008 1541   10896 50896 03/1910 20G
26E
W
Hellifield
Bacup
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
24/07/1948
04/12/1948
04/12/1948
1008 1542   10897   04/1910 11/1945
1008 1543   10945 50945 04/1910 01/1949
1008 1544   10898 50898 04/1910 25D
25A
25E
W
Mirfield
Wakefield
Sowerby Bridge
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
04/06/1949
07/10/1950
23/02/1952
23/02/1952
1008 1545   10899 50899 04/1910 20G
20F
W
Hellifield
Skipton
Withdrawn
01/01/1948
11/09/1948
23/10/1948
23/10/1948