Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 164 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2329 Week
» 2329 Month
» 69191 Year
» 1734567 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LYR/LMS Aspinall "1008" Class 2-4-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
09/1928 Condemned 10794       COND  
10/1928 Condemned 10758       COND  
03/1930 Condemned 10635       COND  
03/1930 Condemned 10658       COND  
04/1930 Condemned 10848       COND  
05/1930 Condemned 10753       COND  
06/1930 Condemned 10774       COND  
07/1930 Condemned 10784       COND  
08/1930 Condemned 10628       COND  
08/1930 Condemned 10702       COND  
08/1930 Condemned 10706       COND  
08/1930 Condemned 10708       COND  
09/1930 Condemned 10684       COND  
09/1930 Condemned 10773       COND  
11/1930 Condemned 10645       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 10662       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 10672       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 10679       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 10690       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 10698       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 10710       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 10744       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 10745       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 10769       COND  
12/1930 Condemned 10770       COND  
12/1933 Condemned 10790       COND  
12/1933 Condemned 10792       COND  
12/1933 Condemned 10808       COND  
01/1934 Condemned 10791       COND  
02/1934 Condemned 10637       COND  
02/1934 Condemned 10816       COND  
03/1934 Condemned 10734       COND  
04/1934 Condemned 10680       COND  
04/1934 Condemned 10716       COND  
04/1934 Condemned 10740       COND  
04/1934 Condemned 10760       COND  
05/1934 Condemned 10723       COND  
05/1934 Condemned 10768       COND  
05/1934 Condemned 10775       COND  
06/1934 Condemned 10726       COND  
06/1934 Condemned 10820       COND  
11/1934 Condemned 10673       COND  
11/1934 Condemned 10685       COND  
11/1934 Condemned 10727       COND  
11/1934 Condemned 10756       COND  
12/1934 Condemned 10814       COND  
08/1935 Condemned 10817       COND  
11/1935 Condemned 10627       COND  
11/1935 Condemned 10699       COND  
02/1936 Condemned 10789       COND  
07/1936 Condemned 10772       COND  
07/1936 Condemned 10845       COND  
07/1936 Condemned 10866       COND  
08/1936 Condemned 10834       COND  
11/1936 Condemned 10700       COND  
11/1936 Condemned 10747       COND  
12/1936 Condemned 10767       COND  
12/1936 Condemned 10853       COND  
01/1937 Condemned 10751       COND  
01/1937 Condemned 10830       COND  
02/1937 Condemned 10663       COND  
02/1937 Condemned 10827       COND  
04/1937 Condemned 10741       COND  
06/1937 Condemned 10730       COND  
06/1937 Condemned 10797       COND  
07/1937 Condemned 10779       COND  
08/1937 Condemned 10733       COND  
12/1937 Condemned 10626       COND  
12/1937 Condemned 10668       COND  
12/1937 Condemned 10691       COND  
03/1938 Condemned 10713       COND  
03/1938 Condemned 10754       COND  
04/1938 Condemned 10694       COND  
04/1938 Condemned 10709       COND  
04/1938 Condemned 10771       COND  
07/1938 Condemned 10763       COND  
08/1938 Condemned 10629       COND  
08/1938 Condemned 10761       COND  
08/1938 Condemned 10860       COND  
09/1938 Condemned 10862       COND  
09/1938 Condemned 10868       COND  
10/1938 Condemned 10824       COND  
10/1938 Condemned 10851       COND  
11/1938 Condemned 10649       COND  
11/1938 Condemned 10659       COND  
11/1938 Condemned 10701       COND  
11/1938 Condemned 10785       COND  
11/1938 Condemned 10863       COND  
12/1938 Condemned 10867       COND  
01/1939 Condemned 10632       COND  
02/1939 Condemned 10828       COND  
03/1939 Condemned 10718       COND  
03/1939 Condemned 10838       COND  
06/1939 Condemned 10641       COND  
06/1939 Condemned 10683       COND  
06/1939 Condemned 10833       COND  
10/1939 Condemned 10682       COND  
10/1939 Condemned 10783       COND  
10/1939 Condemned 10811       COND  
11/1939 Condemned 10739       COND  
11/1939 Condemned 10854       COND  
12/1939 Condemned 10839       COND  
01/1940 Condemned 10658       COND  
01/1940 Condemned 10782       COND  
04/1940 Condemned 10805       COND  
04/1940 Condemned 10858       COND  
08/1940 Condemned 10657       COND  
09/1940 Condemned 10786       COND  
05/1943 Condemned 10870       COND  
01/1944 Condemned 10624       COND  
01/1944 Condemned 10666       COND  
01/1944 Condemned 10827       COND  
04/1944 Condemned 10864       COND  
08/1944 Condemned 10821       COND  
10/1944 Condemned 10856       COND  
10/1944 Condemned 10883       COND  
11/1944 Condemned 10884       COND  
04/1945 Condemned 10677       COND  
04/1945 Condemned 10742       COND  
05/1945 Condemned 10724       COND  
06/1945 Condemned 10780       COND  
10/1945 Condemned 10729       COND  
11/1945 Condemned 10822       COND  
11/1945 Condemned 10843       COND  
11/1945 Condemned 10897       COND  
01/1946 Condemned 10879       COND  
02/1946 Condemned 10704       COND  
03/1946 Condemned 10661       COND  
03/1946 Condemned 10693       COND  
03/1946 Condemned 10876       COND  
03/1946 Condemned 10888       COND  
05/1946 Condemned 10878       COND  
06/1946 Condemned 10787       COND  
06/1946 Condemned 10809       COND  
06/1946 Condemned 10871       COND  
06/1946 Condemned 10881       COND  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 10675     24D Lower Darwen  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 10687     24D Lower Darwen  
22/06/1946 Reallocation 10799     24D Lower Darwen  
08/1946 Condemned 10874       COND  
09/1946 Condemned 10707       COND  
10/1946 Condemned 10803       COND  
10/1946 Condemned 10861       COND  
11/1946 Condemned 10841       COND  
12/1946 Condemned 10722       COND  
01/1947 Condemned 10669       COND  
01/1947 Condemned 10719       COND  
01/1947 Condemned 10825       COND  
02/1947 Condemned 10664       COND  
02/1947 Condemned 10810       COND  
05/1947 Condemned 10674       COND  
10/1947 Condemned 10717       COND  
06/12/1947 Condemned 10737       COND  
06/12/1947 Condemned 10847       COND  
20/12/1947 Condemned 10776       COND  
20/12/1947 Condemned 10796       COND  
20/12/1947 Condemned 10819       COND  
20/12/1947 Condemned 10857       COND  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10621     20D Normanton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10622     20A Holbeck (MR)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10623     20F Skipton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10625     20G Hellifield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10630     20E Manningham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50631     20E Manningham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10633     20E Manningham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10634     20E Manningham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10636     20E Manningham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 6762     10B Preston  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10639     10B Preston  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10640     24F Fleetwood  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10642     26C Bolton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10643     11B Barrow in Furness  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10644     11B Barrow in Furness  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10646     26C Bolton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10647     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10648     23B Aintree  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10650     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10651     26E Bacup  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10652     26E Bacup  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10653     24B Rose Grove  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10654     24B Rose Grove  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10655     23B Aintree  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10656     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10660     23B Aintree  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50665     25F Low Moor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50670     25D Mirfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10671     20F Skipton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10675 24D Lower Darwen 24F Fleetwood  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50676     10B Preston  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10678     23C Southport  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10681     20E Manningham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10686     20G Hellifield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10687 24D Lower Darwen 23C Southport  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10689     20A Holbeck (MR)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50692     23D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10695     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50696     23C Southport  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10697     26C Bolton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10703     24F Fleetwood  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10705     24F Fleetwood  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50711     25E Sowerby Bridge  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10712     25D Mirfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10714     20E Manningham  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10715     25F Low Moor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10720     24F Fleetwood  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10721     24E Blackpool Central  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50725     24E Blackpool Central  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50728     23C Southport  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10731     25D Mirfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50732     24F Fleetwood  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50735     24D Lower Darwen  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50736     26A Newton Heath  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50738     26A Newton Heath  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50743     23C Southport  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10746     23C Southport  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50748     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10749     24E Blackpool Central  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50750     24E Blackpool Central  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10752     23C Southport  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50755     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10757     23D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10762     25F Low Moor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10764     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10765     24F Fleetwood  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10766     24E Blackpool Central  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10777     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10778     23C Southport  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10781     24D Lower Darwen  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10788     25F Low Moor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50793     10B Preston  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10795     20F Skipton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50798     25D Mirfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10799 24D Lower Darwen 24E Blackpool Central  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50800     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50801     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10802     24F Fleetwood  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50804     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10806     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10807     26C Bolton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10812     24F Fleetwood  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50813     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50815     26C Bolton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10818     26A Newton Heath  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50823     26D Bury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10829     25D Mirfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10831     26C Bolton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10840     25F Low Moor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10842     20G Hellifield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50844     23D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50849     23C Southport  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10850     25D Mirfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10852     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10855     25F Low Moor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10859     26C Bolton  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10865     23C Southport  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10869     25A Wakefield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10872     26D Bury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10873     25D Mirfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50875     26D Bury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50880     20A Holbeck (MR)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10886     25F Low Moor  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10887     23D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50889     24E Blackpool Central  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50892     26D Bury  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50896     20G Hellifield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 10898     25D Mirfield  
01/01/1948 Reallocation 50899     20G Hellifield  
03/01/1948 Condemned 10759       COND  
17/01/1948 Reallocation 50711 25E Sowerby Bridge 23C Southport  
17/01/1948 Reallocation 10715 25F Low Moor 25A Wakefield  
17/01/1948 Reallocation 10762 25F Low Moor 25D Mirfield  
17/01/1948 Reallocation 10788 25F Low Moor 25A Wakefield  
17/01/1948 Reallocation 50823 26D Bury 24F Fleetwood  
17/01/1948 Reallocation 10840 25F Low Moor 23C Southport  
17/01/1948 Reallocation 10855 25F Low Moor 23C Southport  
17/01/1948 Reallocation 10872 26D Bury 24F Fleetwood  
17/01/1948 Reallocation 50875 26D Bury 24F Fleetwood  
17/01/1948 Reallocation 10886 25F Low Moor 23D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
17/01/1948 Reallocation 50892 26D Bury 26C Bolton  
21/02/1948 Reallocation 10715 25A Wakefield 25F Low Moor  
21/02/1948 Reallocation 10788 25A Wakefield 25F Low Moor  
21/02/1948 Reallocation 50804 25A Wakefield 25D Mirfield  
21/02/1948 Reallocation 10806 25A Wakefield 25D Mirfield  
21/02/1948 Reallocation 50813 25A Wakefield 25F Low Moor  
28/02/1948 Reallocation 50665 25F Low Moor 7D Rhyl  
28/02/1948 Reallocation 10667     7D Rhyl  
28/02/1948 Reallocation 50670 25D Mirfield 7D Rhyl  
28/02/1948 Reallocation 10675 24F Fleetwood 7D Rhyl  
28/02/1948 Reallocation 10678 23C Southport 7D Rhyl  
28/02/1948 Reallocation 10687 23C Southport 7D Rhyl  
28/02/1948 Reallocation 50692 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 8A Edge Hill  
28/02/1948 Reallocation 10695 25A Wakefield 8A Edge Hill  
28/02/1948 Reallocation 50696 23C Southport 8A Edge Hill  
28/02/1948 Reallocation 10697 26C Bolton 8B Warrington Dallam  
28/02/1948 Reallocation 10703 24F Fleetwood 8B Warrington Dallam  
28/02/1948 Reallocation 10705 24F Fleetwood 8B Warrington Dallam  
20/03/1948 Condemned 10667 7D Rhyl   COND  
27/03/1948 Reallocation 50696 8A Edge Hill 7D Rhyl  
24/04/1948 Reallocation 10829 25D Mirfield 26C Bolton  
08/05/1948 Reallocation 10621 20D Normanton 20E Manningham  
08/05/1948 Reallocation 10788 25F Low Moor 25A Wakefield  
08/05/1948 Reallocation 50813 25F Low Moor 25A Wakefield  
22/05/1948 Condemned 50875 24F Fleetwood   COND  
24/07/1948 Reallocation 50896 20G Hellifield 26E Bacup  
07/08/1948 Condemned 50728 23C Southport   COND  
07/08/1948 Condemned 50800 25A Wakefield   COND  
14/08/1948 Reallocation 10795 20F Skipton 20E Manningham  
21/08/1948 Reallocation 10752 23C Southport 24E Blackpool Central  
11/09/1948 Reallocation 10762 25D Mirfield 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
11/09/1948 Reallocation 10842 20G Hellifield 20E Manningham  
11/09/1948 Reallocation 50899 20G Hellifield 20F Skipton  
23/10/1948 Condemned 50899 20F Skipton   COND  
06/11/1948 Reallocation 50695 8A Edge Hill 7D Rhyl  
13/11/1948 Reallocation 50735 24D Lower Darwen 25A Wakefield  
13/11/1948 Reallocation 50750 24E Blackpool Central 25D Mirfield  
13/11/1948 Reallocation 10765 24F Fleetwood 23C Southport  
13/11/1948 Reallocation 10799 24E Blackpool Central 25D Mirfield  
20/11/1948 Condemned 50631 20E Manningham   COND  
04/12/1948 Condemned 50801 25A Wakefield   COND  
04/12/1948 Condemned 50823 24F Fleetwood   COND  
04/12/1948 Condemned 50896 26E Bacup   COND  
11/12/1948 Reallocation 50880 20A Holbeck (MR) 20E Manningham  
02/1949 Condemned 50696 7D Rhyl   COND  
12/02/1949 Reallocation 50872 24F Fleetwood 26C Bolton  
12/02/1949 Reallocation 50886 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 25A Wakefield  
26/02/1949 Reallocation 10778 23C Southport 24E Blackpool Central  
26/02/1949 Reallocation 50844 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 24C Lostock Hall  
26/02/1949 Reallocation 50849 23C Southport 24E Blackpool Central  
26/02/1949 Reallocation 10887 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
12/03/1949 Reallocation 10781 24D Lower Darwen 24C Lostock Hall  
04/1949 Condemned 50670 7D Rhyl   COND  
02/04/1949 Reallocation 10840 23C Southport 24F Fleetwood  
09/04/1949 Reallocation 10715 25F Low Moor 25A Wakefield  
05/1949 Condemned 50813 25A Wakefield   COND  
06/1949 Condemned 50711 23C Southport   COND  
06/1949 Condemned 50732 24F Fleetwood   COND  
04/06/1949 Reallocation 50738 26A Newton Heath 26C Bolton  
04/06/1949 Reallocation 50743 23C Southport 24F Fleetwood  
04/06/1949 Reallocation 50804 25D Mirfield 25A Wakefield  
04/06/1949 Reallocation 50898 25D Mirfield 25A Wakefield  
25/06/1949 Reallocation 10757 23D Wigan Central (L&Y) 24E Blackpool Central  
16/07/1949 Condemned 50738 26C Bolton   COND  
16/07/1949 Reallocation 10757 24E Blackpool Central 24E Blackpool Central  
30/07/1949 Reallocation 10731 25D Mirfield 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
08/1949 Condemned 50665 7D Rhyl   COND  
27/08/1949 Reallocation 50749 24E Blackpool Central 24F Fleetwood  
27/08/1949 Reallocation 50762 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 25A Wakefield  
27/08/1949 Reallocation 50766 24E Blackpool Central 24F Fleetwood  
27/08/1949 Reallocation 50873 25D Mirfield 25A Wakefield  
03/09/1949 Reallocation 50642 26C Bolton 24F Fleetwood  
03/09/1949 Reallocation 50687 7D Rhyl 8A Edge Hill  
03/09/1949 Reallocation 50695 7D Rhyl 8A Edge Hill  
10/1949 Condemned 50692 8A Edge Hill   COND  
10/1949 Condemned 50880 20E Manningham   COND  
10/1949 Condemned 50889 24E Blackpool Central   COND  
15/10/1949 Reallocation 50712 25D Mirfield 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
29/10/1949 Reallocation 10689 20A Holbeck (MR) 20E Manningham  
12/11/1949 Reallocation 50646 26C Bolton 24F Fleetwood  
12/11/1949 Reallocation 50892 26C Bolton 25A Wakefield  
26/11/1949 Reallocation 50623 20F Skipton 20E Manningham  
26/11/1949 Reallocation 50671 20F Skipton 20E Manningham  
26/11/1949 Reallocation 10689 20E Manningham 20A Holbeck (MR)  
10/12/1949 Condemned 50750 98W     COND  
17/12/1949 Reallocation 50804 25A Wakefield 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
17/12/1949 Reallocation 50806 25D Mirfield 24F Fleetwood  
17/12/1949 Reallocation 10850 25D Mirfield 24F Fleetwood  
24/12/1949 Reallocation 50623 20E Manningham 20E Manningham  
24/12/1949 Reallocation 50647 25A Wakefield 24F Fleetwood  
24/12/1949 Reallocation 50671 20E Manningham 20E Manningham  
24/12/1949 Reallocation 10689 20A Holbeck (MR) 20A Holbeck (MR)  
24/12/1949 Reallocation 50804 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
24/12/1949 Reallocation 50806 24F Fleetwood 24F Fleetwood  
24/12/1949 Reallocation 10850 24F Fleetwood 24F Fleetwood  
31/12/1949 Condemned 50675 7D Rhyl   COND  
31/12/1949 Reallocation 50752 24E Blackpool Central 24F Fleetwood  
14/01/1950 Reallocation 50752 24F Fleetwood 24F Fleetwood  
28/01/1950 Reallocation 50736 26A Newton Heath 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
28/01/1950 Reallocation 50781 24C Lostock Hall 24F Fleetwood  
28/01/1950 Reallocation 50844 24C Lostock Hall 26C Bolton  
02/1950 Condemned 50793 10B Preston   COND  
02/1950 Condemned 50804 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse   COND  
02/1950 Condemned 50849 24E Blackpool Central   COND  
04/02/1950 Reallocation 10765 23C Southport 26A Newton Heath  
11/02/1950 Reallocation 50687 8A Edge Hill 7D Rhyl  
18/02/1950 Reallocation 10799 25D Mirfield 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
25/02/1950 Reallocation 50748 25A Wakefield 28B Fleetwood  
03/1950 Condemned 50676 10B Preston   COND  
11/03/1950 Reallocation 50748 28B Fleetwood 28B Fleetwood  
18/03/1950 Reallocation 50695 8A Edge Hill 10B Preston  
18/03/1950 Reallocation 50735 25A Wakefield 25D Mirfield  
01/04/1950 Reallocation 10855 23C Southport 26A Newton Heath  
01/04/1950 Reallocation 10865 23C Southport 26C Bolton  
15/04/1950 Reallocation 50735 25D Mirfield 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
15/04/1950 Reallocation 50755 25A Wakefield 24C Lostock Hall  
15/04/1950 Reallocation 10765 26A Newton Heath 24D Lower Darwen  
15/04/1950 Reallocation 10777 25A Wakefield 24C Lostock Hall  
15/04/1950 Reallocation 10799 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 24D Lower Darwen  
22/04/1950 Reallocation 50647 24F Fleetwood 26C Bolton  
06/05/1950 Reallocation 10765 24D Lower Darwen 25E Sowerby Bridge  
20/05/1950 Reallocation 50755 24C Lostock Hall 28A Motherwell  
20/05/1950 Reallocation 50798 27D   28B Fleetwood  
20/05/1950 Reallocation 10799 24D Lower Darwen 25A Wakefield  
20/05/1950 Reallocation 50844 27D   28B Fleetwood  
06/1950 Condemned 50743 24F Fleetwood   COND  
03/06/1950 Reallocation 50644 11B Barrow in Furness 10D Plodder Lane  
10/06/1950 Reallocation 50829 26C Bolton 26C Bolton  
17/06/1950 Reallocation 50798 28B Fleetwood 28B Fleetwood  
07/1950 Condemned 50755 28A Motherwell   COND  
07/1950 Condemned 50798 28B Fleetwood   COND  
01/07/1950 Reallocation 50746 23C Southport 28A Blackpool Central  
22/07/1950 Reallocation 50748 28B Fleetwood 28A Blackpool Central  
22/07/1950 Reallocation 50749 24F Fleetwood 28A Blackpool Central  
22/07/1950 Reallocation 50859 26C Bolton 26A Newton Heath  
12/08/1950 Reallocation 50844 28B Fleetwood 28A Blackpool Central  
19/08/1950 Reallocation 50752 24F Fleetwood 28A Blackpool Central  
09/1950 Condemned 50748 28A Blackpool Central   COND  
09/1950 Condemned 50844 28A Blackpool Central   COND  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 50752 28A Blackpool Central 28A Blackpool Central  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 50764 25A Wakefield 24C Lostock Hall  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 50815 26C Bolton 26C Bolton  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 50818 26A Newton Heath 26C Bolton  
09/09/1950 Reallocation 50852 25A Wakefield 24C Lostock Hall  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 50781 24F Fleetwood 24C Lostock Hall  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 50806 24F Fleetwood 28A Blackpool Central  
07/10/1950 Reallocation 50898 25A Wakefield 25E Sowerby Bridge  
14/10/1950 Condemned 50630 20E Manningham   COND  
21/10/1950 Reallocation 50678 7D Rhyl 10B Preston  
21/10/1950 Reallocation 50687 7D Rhyl 8B Warrington Dallam  
28/10/1950 Reallocation 50788 25A Wakefield 26C Bolton  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 50660 23B Aintree 26E Bacup  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 50678 10B Preston 10B Preston  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 50687 8B Warrington Dallam 7D Rhyl  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 50712 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 25E Sowerby Bridge  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 50788 26C Bolton 26C Bolton  
04/11/1950 Reallocation 50892 25A Wakefield 25E Sowerby Bridge  
30/11/1950 Reallocation 50650 25A Wakefield 26E Bacup  
30/11/1950 Reallocation 50660 26E Bacup 26C Bolton  
02/12/1950 Reallocation 50650 26E Bacup 26E Bacup  
02/12/1950 Reallocation 50687 7D Rhyl 8B Warrington Dallam  
02/12/1950 Reallocation 50829 26C Bolton 26E Bacup  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 50622 20A Holbeck (MR) 20E Manningham  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 50656 25A Wakefield 26E Bacup  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 50687 8B Warrington Dallam 8B Warrington Dallam  
31/12/1950 Reallocation 50829 26E Bacup 26C Bolton  
27/01/1951 Reallocation 50646 24F Fleetwood 27B Aintree  
31/01/1951 Reallocation 50646 27B Aintree 27B Aintree  
02/1951 Condemned 50815 26C Bolton   COND  
24/02/1951 Reallocation 50652 26E Bacup 27B Aintree  
24/02/1951 Reallocation 50715 25A Wakefield 25E Sowerby Bridge  
24/02/1951 Reallocation 50840 24F Fleetwood 26C Bolton  
24/02/1951 Reallocation 50855 26A Newton Heath 26C Bolton  
24/02/1951 Reallocation 50892 25E Sowerby Bridge 25A Wakefield  
28/02/1951 Reallocation 50715 25E Sowerby Bridge 25E Sowerby Bridge  
28/02/1951 Reallocation 50840 26C Bolton 26C Bolton  
28/02/1951 Reallocation 50855 26C Bolton 26C Bolton  
28/02/1951 Reallocation 50892 25A Wakefield 25A Wakefield  
10/03/1951 Reallocation 50646 27B Aintree 26C Bolton  
17/03/1951 Reallocation 50777 24C Lostock Hall 28B Fleetwood  
17/03/1951 Reallocation 10799 25A Wakefield 26C Bolton  
17/03/1951 Reallocation 50873 25A Wakefield 24C Lostock Hall  
17/03/1951 Reallocation 10887 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 25E Sowerby Bridge  
24/03/1951 Condemned 50642 24F Fleetwood   COND  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 50646 26C Bolton 26C Bolton  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 50647 26C Bolton 26D Bury  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 50651 26E Bacup 26D Bury  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 50652 27B Aintree 26E Bacup  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 50656 26E Bacup 26D Bury  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 50777 28B Fleetwood 28B Fleetwood  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 10799 26C Bolton 26C Bolton  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 50873 24C Lostock Hall 24C Lostock Hall  
24/03/1951 Reallocation 10887 25E Sowerby Bridge 25E Sowerby Bridge  
14/04/1951 Reallocation 50712 25E Sowerby Bridge 25A Wakefield  
28/04/1951 Condemned 50654 24B Rose Grove   COND  
28/04/1951 Reallocation 50712 25A Wakefield 28A Blackpool Central  
28/04/1951 Reallocation 50818 26C Bolton 26A Newton Heath  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 50647 26D Bury 24B Rose Grove  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 50652 26E Bacup 27B Aintree  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 50712 28A Blackpool Central 28A Blackpool Central  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 50818 26A Newton Heath 26A Newton Heath  
19/05/1951 Reallocation 50829 26C Bolton 26D Bury  
26/05/1951 Reallocation 50647 24B Rose Grove 26D Bury  
02/06/1951 Reallocation 50757 24E Blackpool Central 26A Newton Heath  
09/06/1951 Reallocation 50652 27B Aintree 24B Rose Grove  
09/06/1951 Reallocation 50655 23B Aintree 26D Bury  
09/06/1951 Reallocation 50715 25E Sowerby Bridge 25A Wakefield  
09/06/1951 Reallocation 50829 26D Bury 27B Aintree  
09/06/1951 Reallocation 50892 25A Wakefield 25E Sowerby Bridge  
16/06/1951 Reallocation 50647 26D Bury 26D Bury  
16/06/1951 Reallocation 50651 26D Bury 27B Aintree  
16/06/1951 Reallocation 50652 24B Rose Grove 24B Rose Grove  
16/06/1951 Reallocation 50655 26D Bury 26D Bury  
16/06/1951 Reallocation 50715 25A Wakefield 25A Wakefield  
16/06/1951 Reallocation 50757 26A Newton Heath 26A Newton Heath  
16/06/1951 Reallocation 50829 27B Aintree 27B Aintree  
16/06/1951 Reallocation 50892 25E Sowerby Bridge 25E Sowerby Bridge  
30/06/1951 Reallocation 50640 24F Fleetwood 27C Southport  
30/06/1951 Reallocation 50736 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 25F Low Moor  
30/06/1951 Reallocation 50762 25A Wakefield 25F Low Moor  
30/06/1951 Reallocation 50886 25A Wakefield 25F Low Moor  
07/07/1951 Reallocation 50764 24C Lostock Hall 24B Rose Grove  
07/07/1951 Reallocation 50831 26C Bolton 24D Lower Darwen  
17/07/1951 Reallocation 50640 27C Southport 27C Southport  
17/07/1951 Reallocation 50736 25F Low Moor 25F Low Moor  
17/07/1951 Reallocation 50764 24B Rose Grove 24B Rose Grove  
17/07/1951 Reallocation 50831 24D Lower Darwen 24D Lower Darwen  
17/07/1951 Reallocation 50886 25F Low Moor 25F Low Moor  
28/07/1951 Reallocation 50765 25E Sowerby Bridge 26C Bolton  
11/08/1951 Reallocation 50651 27B Aintree 26D Bury  
11/08/1951 Reallocation 50720 24F Fleetwood 24C Lostock Hall  
11/08/1951 Reallocation 50765 26C Bolton 26C Bolton  
11/08/1951 Reallocation 50788 26C Bolton 26B Agecroft  
11/08/1951 Reallocation 50840 26C Bolton 26B Agecroft  
11/08/1951 Reallocation 50850 24F Fleetwood 26C Bolton  
25/08/1951 Reallocation 50715 25A Wakefield 25E Sowerby Bridge  
25/08/1951 Reallocation 50731 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 26C Bolton  
25/08/1951 Reallocation 50746 28A Blackpool Central 24D Lower Darwen  
25/08/1951 Condemned 50766 24F Fleetwood   COND  
25/08/1951 Reallocation 50829 27B Aintree 26E Bacup  
25/08/1951 Condemned 50842 20E Manningham   COND  
25/08/1951 Reallocation 50892 25E Sowerby Bridge 25A Wakefield  
08/09/1951 Reallocation 50715 25E Sowerby Bridge 25E Sowerby Bridge  
08/09/1951 Reallocation 50731 26C Bolton 26C Bolton  
08/09/1951 Reallocation 50746 24D Lower Darwen 24D Lower Darwen  
08/09/1951 Reallocation 50829 26E Bacup 26E Bacup  
08/09/1951 Reallocation 50892 25A Wakefield 25A Wakefield  
15/09/1951 Reallocation 50648 23B Aintree 26C Bolton  
29/09/1951 Reallocation 50806 28A Blackpool Central 27C Southport  
29/09/1951 Reallocation 50887 25E Sowerby Bridge 26C Bolton  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 50643 11B Barrow in Furness 10D Plodder Lane  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 50648 26C Bolton 26C Bolton  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 50762 25F Low Moor 25D Mirfield  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 50777 28B Fleetwood 28A Blackpool Central  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 50806 27C Southport 27C Southport  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 50869 25A Wakefield 25D Mirfield  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 50887 26C Bolton 26C Bolton  
06/10/1951 Reallocation 50892 25A Wakefield 25D Mirfield  
13/10/1951 Reallocation 50715 25E Sowerby Bridge 25A Wakefield  
27/10/1951 Reallocation 50778 24E Blackpool Central 25E Sowerby Bridge  
03/11/1951 Reallocation 50731 26C Bolton 26D Bury  
03/11/1951 Reallocation 50752 28A Blackpool Central 28B Fleetwood  
12/1951 Condemned 50736 25F Low Moor   COND  
01/12/1951 Reallocation 50650 26E Bacup 26D Bury  
01/12/1951 Reallocation 50656 26D Bury 26E Bacup  
01/12/1951 Reallocation 50720 24C Lostock Hall 24C Lostock Hall  
01/12/1951 Reallocation 50721 24E Blackpool Central 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
01/12/1951 Reallocation 50781 24C Lostock Hall 27D Wigan Central (L&Y)  
29/12/1951 Condemned 50720 24C Lostock Hall   COND  
29/12/1951 Condemned 50886 25F Low Moor   COND  
26/01/1952 Condemned 50749 28A Blackpool Central   COND  
26/01/1952 Reallocation 50799 26C Bolton 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
26/01/1952 Reallocation 50892 25D Mirfield 25F Low Moor  
16/02/1952 Condemned 46762 10B Preston   COND  
23/02/1952 Reallocation 50731 26D Bury 26C Bolton  
23/02/1952 Condemned 50806 27C Southport   COND  
23/02/1952 Condemned 50840 26B Agecroft   COND  
23/02/1952 Condemned 50898 25E Sowerby Bridge   COND  
01/03/1952 Condemned 50873 24C Lostock Hall   COND  
15/03/1952 Condemned 50671 20E Manningham   COND  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 50647 26D Bury 26C Bolton  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 50715 25A Wakefield 25E Sowerby Bridge  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 50831 24D Lower Darwen 24C Lostock Hall  
22/03/1952 Condemned 50872 26C Bolton   COND  
22/03/1952 Reallocation 50887 26C Bolton 26C Bolton  
19/04/1952 Condemned 50640 27C Southport   COND  
19/04/1952 Reallocation 50764 24B Rose Grove 24C Lostock Hall  
05/1952 Condemned 50892 25F Low Moor   COND  
10/05/1952 Condemned 50812 24F Fleetwood   COND  
17/05/1952 Condemned 50639 10B Preston   COND  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 50650 26D Bury 26C Bolton  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 50651 26D Bury 24B Rose Grove  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 50655 26D Bury 24B Rose Grove  
17/05/1952 Condemned 50697 8B Warrington Dallam   COND  
17/05/1952 Reallocation 50777 28A Blackpool Central 27C Southport  
06/1952 Condemned 50735 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse   COND  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 50643 10D Plodder Lane 10B Preston  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 50648 26C Bolton 26E Bacup  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 50650 26C Bolton 26C Bolton  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 50651 24B Rose Grove 24B Rose Grove  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 50655 24B Rose Grove 24B Rose Grove  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 50777 27C Southport 27C Southport  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 50818 26A Newton Heath 25F Low Moor  
14/06/1952 Reallocation 50859 26A Newton Heath 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
21/06/1952 Condemned 50623 20E Manningham   COND  
21/06/1952 Condemned 50633 20E Manningham   COND  
05/07/1952 Condemned 50681 20E Manningham   COND  
05/07/1952 Condemned 50802 24F Fleetwood   COND  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 50644 10D Plodder Lane 10B Preston  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 50648 26E Bacup 26C Bolton  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 50686 20G Hellifield 20E Manningham  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 50762 25D Mirfield 25F Low Moor  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 50788 26B Agecroft 24F Fleetwood  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 50807 26C Bolton 25F Low Moor  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 50831 24C Lostock Hall 25F Low Moor  
12/07/1952 Reallocation 50865 26C Bolton 25F Low Moor  
19/07/1952 Condemned 50695 10B Preston   COND  
09/08/1952 Condemned 50625 20G Hellifield   COND  
09/08/1952 Reallocation 50644 10B Preston 10B Preston  
09/08/1952 Condemned 50689 20A Holbeck (MR)   COND  
16/08/1952 Condemned 50799 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse   COND  
23/08/1952 Condemned 50622 20E Manningham   COND  
06/09/1952 Reallocation 50752 28B Fleetwood 25E Sowerby Bridge  
06/09/1952 Reallocation 50865 25F Low Moor 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
04/10/1952 Reallocation 50647 26C Bolton 26E Bacup  
18/10/1952 Condemned 50634 20E Manningham   COND  
01/11/1952 Reallocation 50721 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 27C Southport  
29/11/1952 Reallocation 50721 27C Southport 27C Southport  
17/01/1953 Condemned 50852 24C Lostock Hall   COND  
07/03/1953 Condemned 50778 25E Sowerby Bridge   COND  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 50644 10B Preston 8B Warrington Dallam  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 50656 26E Bacup 24B Rose Grove  
21/03/1953 Condemned 50703 8B Warrington Dallam   COND  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 50757 26A Newton Heath 25E Sowerby Bridge  
21/03/1953 Reallocation 50764 24C Lostock Hall 25F Low Moor  
05/1953 Condemned 50687 8B Warrington Dallam   COND  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 50712 28A Blackpool Central 24C Lostock Hall  
11/07/1953 Reallocation 50725 24E Blackpool Central 24C Lostock Hall  
08/1953 Condemned 50714 20E Manningham   COND  
08/08/1953 Reallocation 50648 26C Bolton 24B Rose Grove  
03/10/1953 Reallocation 50650 26C Bolton 26C Bolton  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 50781 27D Wigan Central (L&Y) 27C Southport  
31/10/1953 Reallocation 50869 25D Mirfield 25F Low Moor  
28/11/1953 Reallocation 50643 10B Preston 8B Warrington Dallam  
28/11/1953 Condemned 50859 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse   COND  
19/12/1953 Condemned 50762 25F Low Moor   COND  
26/12/1953 Condemned 50678 10B Preston   COND  
02/01/1954 Reallocation 50765 26C Bolton 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
30/01/1954 Reallocation 50648 24B Rose Grove 27B Aintree  
27/03/1954 Reallocation 50648 27B Aintree 24B Rose Grove  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 50757 25E Sowerby Bridge 25F Low Moor  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 50777 27C Southport 24C Lostock Hall  
24/04/1954 Reallocation 50818 25F Low Moor 25E Sowerby Bridge  
12/06/1954 Condemned 50765 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse   COND  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 50725 24C Lostock Hall 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
19/06/1954 Reallocation 50777 24C Lostock Hall 25E Sowerby Bridge  
11/09/1954 Reallocation 50656 24B Rose Grove 26C Bolton  
18/09/1954 Condemned 50621 20E Manningham   COND  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 50646 26C Bolton 20C Royston  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 50712 24C Lostock Hall 27C Southport  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 50757 25F Low Moor 25E Sowerby Bridge  
09/10/1954 Reallocation 50831 25F Low Moor 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 50647 26E Bacup 26D Bury  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 50650 26C Bolton 20C Royston  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 50829 26E Bacup 26D Bury  
06/11/1954 Reallocation 50887 26C Bolton 26D Bury  
04/12/1954 Reallocation 50746 24D Lower Darwen 27C Southport  
05/02/1955 Condemned 50715 25E Sowerby Bridge   COND  
26/02/1955 Reallocation 50647 26D Bury 26C Bolton  
12/03/1955 Condemned 50656 26C Bolton   COND  
05/1955 Condemned 50807 25F Low Moor   COND  
21/05/1955 Reallocation 50757 25E Sowerby Bridge 25F Low Moor  
20/08/1955 Condemned 50686 20E Manningham   COND  
05/11/1955 Reallocation 50655 24B Rose Grove 26C Bolton  
05/11/1955 Condemned 50731 26C Bolton   COND  
05/11/1955 Condemned 50869 25F Low Moor   COND  
19/11/1955 Condemned 50648 24B Rose Grove   COND  
03/12/1955 Reallocation 50831 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse 25F Low Moor  
17/12/1955 Condemned 50651 24B Rose Grove   COND  
04/02/1956 Condemned 50653 24B Rose Grove   COND  
25/02/1956 Reallocation 50646 20C Royston 15D Bedford  
25/02/1956 Reallocation 50650 20C Royston 15A Wellingborough  
25/02/1956 Reallocation 50655 26C Bolton 24B Rose Grove  
07/07/1956 Condemned 50764 25F Low Moor   COND  
11/08/1956 Condemned 50655 24B Rose Grove   COND  
11/08/1956 Condemned 50788 24F Fleetwood   COND  
08/09/1956 Reallocation 50855 26C Bolton 25F Low Moor  
06/10/1956 Condemned 50650 15A Wellingborough   COND  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 50829 26D Bury 26C Bolton  
06/10/1956 Reallocation 50887 26D Bury 26C Bolton  
13/10/1956 Condemned 50652 24B Rose Grove   COND  
19/07/1957 Condemned 50636 20E Manningham   COND  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 50712 27C Southport 27A Bank Hall  
10/08/1957 Reallocation 50721 27C Southport 27A Bank Hall  
12/08/1957 Condemned 50752 25E Sowerby Bridge   COND  
30/11/1957 Reallocation 50781 27C Southport 27E Walton on the Hill  
14/12/1957 Condemned 50887 26C Bolton   COND  
29/03/1958 Condemned 50660 26C Bolton   COND  
12/04/1958 Condemned 50829 26C Bolton   COND  
09/1958 Condemned 50855 25F Low Moor   COND  
10/1958 Condemned 50643 8B Warrington Dallam   COND  
02/10/1958 Condemned 50725 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse   COND  
03/10/1958 Condemned 50777 25E Sowerby Bridge   COND  
03/10/1958 Condemned 50818 25E Sowerby Bridge   COND  
03/10/1958 Condemned 50865 25B Huddersfield Hillhouse   COND  
25/10/1958 Condemned 50644 8B Warrington Dallam   COND  
25/10/1958 Condemned 50705 8B Warrington Dallam   COND  
11/1958 Condemned 50757 25F Low Moor   COND  
11/1958 Condemned 50831 25F Low Moor   COND  
08/11/1958 Condemned 50646 15D Bedford   COND  
21/02/1959 Condemned 50647 26C Bolton   COND  
03/1959 Condemned 50712 27A Bank Hall   COND  
16/11/1959 Condemned 50795 20E Manningham   COND  
06/02/1960 Condemned 50781 27E Walton on the Hill   COND  
13/06/1960 Reallocation 50850 26C Bolton 27C Southport  
14/01/1961 Condemned 50721 27A Bank Hall   COND  
18/02/1961 Condemned 50746 27C Southport   COND  
11/1961 Condemned 50850 27C Southport   COND