Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 988 Today
» 1177 Yesterday
» 3294 Week
» 28128 Month
» 62460 Year
» 1727836 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LYR/LMS Aspinall "1008" Class 2-4-2T


LYR WR LMS (1923) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Rebuilt To Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
1008 10621 50621 02/1889 18/09/1954 65.58 Prs Preserved
1009 10622 50622 03/1889 23/08/1952 63.42
1010 10623 50623 03/1889 21/06/1952 63.25
1011 10624 04/1889 01/1944 54.75
1012 10625 50625 05/1889 09/08/1952 63.25
1013 10626 05/1889 12/1937 48.58
1014 10627 06/1889 11/1935 46.42
1015 10628 06/1889 08/1930 41.17
1016 10629 07/1889 08/1938 49.08
1017 10630 50630 07/1889 14/10/1950 61.25
1033 10631 50631 04/1890 20/11/1948 58.58
1034 10632 04/1890 01/1939 48.75
1035 10932 05/1890 08/1930 10/1915
to 6 Rbld
40.25
1036 10633 50633 05/1890 21/06/1952 62.08
1037 10634 50634 06/1890 18/10/1952 62.33
1038 10635 06/1890 03/1930 39.75
1039 10636 50636 06/1890 19/07/1957 67.08
1040 10637 06/1890 02/1934 43.67
1041 6 6762 46762 07/1890 16/02/1952 61.58
1042 10639 50639 07/1890 17/05/1952 61.83
1043 10640 50640 07/1890 19/04/1952 61.75
1044 10641 07/1890 06/1939 48.92
1045 10642 50642 08/1890 24/03/1951 60.58
1046 10643 50643 08/1890 10/1958 68.17
1047 10644 50644 08/1890 25/10/1958 68.17
1048 10645 08/1890 11/1930 40.25
1049 10646 50646 08/1890 08/11/1958 68.25
1050 10930 09/1890 11/1929 06/1915
to 6 Rbld
39.17
1051 10936 09/1890 03/1929 1916
to 6 Rbld
38.5
1052 10647 50647 09/1890 21/02/1959 68.42