LYR/LMS Aspinall "1008" Class 2-4-2T
LYR | WR | LMS (1923) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 10705 | 50705 | 02/1895 | 25/10/1958 | 63.67 | ||||||||
39 | 10706 | 02/1895 | 08/1930 | 35.5 | |||||||||
1258 | 10707 | 02/1895 | 09/1946 | 51.58 | |||||||||
1259 | 10708 | 02/1895 | 08/1930 | 35.5 | |||||||||
1260 | 10709 | 02/1895 | 04/1938 | 43.17 | |||||||||
1261 | 10710 | 03/1895 | 12/1930 | 35.75 | |||||||||
1262 | 10711 | 50711 | 03/1895 | 06/1949 | 54.25 | ||||||||
1263 | 10712 | 50712 | 03/1895 | 03/1959 | 64 | ||||||||
1264 | 10713 | 03/1895 | 03/1938 | 43 | |||||||||
1265 | 10714 | 50714 | 03/1895 | 08/1953 | 58.42 | ||||||||
1266 | 10715 | 50715 | 03/1895 | 05/02/1955 | 59.92 | ||||||||
1267 | 10716 | 04/1895 | 04/1934 | 39 | |||||||||
1268 | 10717 | 04/1895 | 10/1947 | 52.5 | |||||||||
1269 | 10718 | 04/1895 | 03/1939 | 43.92 | |||||||||
1270 | 10719 | 05/1895 | 01/1947 | 51.67 | |||||||||
1271 | 10720 | 50720 | 05/1895 | 29/12/1951 | 56.58 | ||||||||
1272 | 10721 | 50721 | 05/1895 | 14/01/1961 | 65.67 | ||||||||
1273 | 10722 | 05/1895 | 12/1946 | 51.58 | |||||||||
1274 | 10723 | 05/1895 | 05/1934 | 39 | |||||||||
1275 | 10724 | 05/1895 | 05/1945 | 50 | |||||||||
24 | 10725 | 50725 | 03/1896 | 02/10/1958 | 62.58 | ||||||||
31 | 10726 | 03/1896 | 06/1934 | 38.25 | |||||||||
38 | 10922 | 03/1896 | 01/1929 | 08/1914 to 6 Rbld |
32.83 | ||||||||
63 | 10727 | 03/1896 | 11/1934 | 38.67 | |||||||||
76 | 10728 | 50728 | 03/1896 | 07/08/1948 | 52.42 | ||||||||
84 | 10729 | 03/1896 | 10/1945 | 49.58 | |||||||||
88 | 10730 | 03/1896 | 06/1937 | 41.25 | |||||||||
97 | 10731 | 50731 | 04/1896 | 05/11/1955 | 59.58 | ||||||||
104 | 10732 | 50732 | 04/1896 | 06/1949 | 53.17 | ||||||||
107 | 10733 | 04/1896 | 08/1937 | 41.33 | |||||||||
110 | 10734 | 04/1896 | 03/1934 | 37.92 | |||||||||
129 | 10735 | 50735 | 04/1896 | 06/1952 | 56.17 | ||||||||
156 | 10736 | 50736 | 04/1896 | 12/1951 | 55.67 | ||||||||
185 | 10737 | 04/1896 | 06/12/1947 | 51.67 | |||||||||
296 | 10738 | 50738 | 05/1896 | 16/07/1949 | 53.17 | ||||||||
319 | 10739 | 05/1896 | 11/1939 | 43.5 | |||||||||
329 | 10740 | 05/1896 | 04/1934 | 37.92 | |||||||||
362 | 10741 | 05/1896 | 04/1937 | 40.92 | |||||||||
369 | 10742 | 05/1896 | 04/1945 | 48.92 | |||||||||
415 | 10743 | 50743 | 06/1896 | 06/1950 | 54 | ||||||||
1311 | 10744 | 06/1896 | 12/1930 | 34.5 | |||||||||
1312 | 10745 | 06/1896 | 12/1930 | 34.5 | |||||||||
1313 | 10746 | 50746 | 06/1896 | 18/02/1961 | 64.67 | ||||||||
1314 | 10747 | 06/1896 | 11/1936 | 40.42 | |||||||||
1315 | 10748 | 50748 | 06/1896 | 09/1950 | 54.25 | ||||||||
1316 | 10749 | 50749 | 06/1896 | 26/01/1952 | 55.58 | ||||||||
1317 | 10750 | 50750 | 06/1896 | 10/12/1949 | 53.5 | ||||||||
1318 | 10751 | 07/1896 | 01/1937 | 40.5 | |||||||||
1319 | 10752 | 50752 | 07/1896 | 12/08/1957 | 61.08 | ||||||||
1320 | 10753 | 07/1896 | 05/1930 | 33.83 | |||||||||
1321 | 10754 | 07/1896 | 03/1938 | 41.67 | |||||||||
1322 | 10755 | 50755 | 08/1896 | 07/1950 | 53.92 | ||||||||
1323 | 10756 | 08/1896 | 11/1934 | 38.25 | |||||||||
1324 | 10757 | 50757 | 08/1896 | 11/1958 | 62.25 | ||||||||
1325 | 10758 | 08/1896 | 10/1928 | 32.17 | |||||||||
1326 | 10759 | 08/1896 | 03/01/1948 | 51.42 | |||||||||
1327 | 10760 | 08/1896 | 04/1934 | 37.67 | |||||||||
1328 | 10761 | 09/1896 | 08/1938 | 41.92 | |||||||||
1329 | 10762 | 50762 | 09/1896 | 19/12/1953 | 57.25 | ||||||||
1330 | 10763 | 09/1896 | 07/1938 | 41.83 | |||||||||
1331 | 10764 | 50764 | 01/1897 | 07/07/1956 | 59.5 | ||||||||
1332 | 10765 | 50765 | 01/1897 | 12/06/1954 | 57.42 | ||||||||
1333 | 10766 | 50766 | 01/1897 | 25/08/1951 | 54.58 | ||||||||
1334 | 10767 | 02/1897 | 12/1936 | 39.83 | |||||||||
1335 | 10768 | 02/1897 | 05/1934 | 37.25 | |||||||||
1336 | 10769 | 02/1897 | 12/1930 | 33.83 | |||||||||
1337 | 10770 | 02/1897 | 12/1930 | 33.83 | |||||||||
1338 | 10771 | 02/1897 | 04/1938 | 41.17 | |||||||||
1339 | 10772 | 02/1897 | 07/1936 | 39.42 | |||||||||
1340 | 10773 | 03/1897 | 09/1930 | 33.5 | |||||||||
1341 | 10774 | 03/1897 | 06/1930 | 33.25 | |||||||||
1342 | 10775 | 03/1897 | 05/1934 | 37.17 | |||||||||
1343 | 10776 | 03/1897 | 20/12/1947 | 50.75 | |||||||||
1344 | 10777 | 50777 | 03/1897 | 03/10/1958 | 61.58 | ||||||||
1345 | 10778 | 50778 | 03/1897 | 07/03/1953 | 56 | ||||||||
1346 | 10779 | 04/1897 | 07/1937 | 40.25 | |||||||||
1347 | 10780 | 04/1897 | 06/1945 | 48.17 | |||||||||
1348 | 10781 | 50781 | 04/1897 | 06/02/1960 | 62.83 | ||||||||
1349 | 10782 | 04/1897 | 01/1940 | 42.75 | |||||||||
1350 | 10783 | 04/1897 | 10/1939 | 42.5 | |||||||||
1361 | 10784 | 03/1898 | 07/1930 | 32.33 | |||||||||
1362 | 10785 | 03/1898 | 11/1938 | 40.67 | |||||||||
1367 | 10786 | 03/1898 | 09/1940 | 42.5 | |||||||||
1370 | 10787 | 04/1898 | 06/1946 | 48.17 | |||||||||
1371 | 10788 | 50788 | 04/1898 | 11/08/1956 | 58.33 | ||||||||
1372 | 10789 | 04/1898 | 02/1936 | 37.83 | |||||||||
1373 | 10790 | 04/1898 | 12/1933 | 35.67 | |||||||||
1374 | 10791 | 04/1898 | 01/1934 | 35.75 | |||||||||
1375 | 10792 | 04/1898 | 12/1933 | 35.67 | |||||||||
1376 | 10793 | 50793 | 05/1898 | 02/1950 | 51.75 | ||||||||
1377 | 10794 | 05/1898 | 09/1928 | 30.33 | |||||||||
1378 | 10795 | 50795 | 05/1898 | 16/11/1959 | 61.5 | ||||||||
1379 | 10796 | 05/1895 | 20/12/1947 | 52.58 | |||||||||
1380 | 10931 | 05/1895 | 11/1930 | 08/1915 to 6 Rbld |
35.5 | ||||||||
1381 | 10797 | 05/1898 | 06/1937 | 39.08 | |||||||||
1382 | 10798 | 50798 | 05/1898 | 07/1950 | 52.17 | ||||||||
1383 | 10799 | 50799 | 06/1898 | 16/08/1952 | 54.17 | ||||||||
1384 | 10800 | 50800 | 06/1898 | 07/08/1948 | 50.17 | ||||||||
1385 | 10801 | 50801 | 06/1898 | 04/12/1948 | 50.5 | ||||||||
1386 | 10802 | 50802 | 06/1898 | 05/07/1952 | 54.08 | ||||||||
1387 | 10803 | 06/1898 | 10/1946 | 48.33 | |||||||||
1388 | 10804 | 50804 | 07/1898 | 02/1950 | 51.58 | ||||||||
1389 | 10805 | 07/1898 | 04/1940 | 41.75 | |||||||||
1390 | 10806 | 50806 | 07/1898 | 23/02/1952 | 53.58 | ||||||||
1391 | 10807 | 50807 | 07/1898 | 05/1955 | 56.83 | ||||||||
686 | 10808 | 07/1898 | 12/1933 | 35.42 | |||||||||
693 | 10927 | 07/1898 | 11/1929 | 03/1915 to 6 Rbld |
31.33 | ||||||||
696 | 10809 | 07/1898 | 06/1946 | 47.92 | |||||||||
699 | 10810 | 08/1898 | 02/1947 | 48.5 | |||||||||
701 | 10811 | 08/1898 | 10/1939 | 41.17 | |||||||||
703 | 10812 | 50812 | 08/1898 | 10/05/1952 | 53.75 | ||||||||
721 | 10813 | 50813 | 08/1898 | 05/1949 | 50.75 | ||||||||
723 | 10814 | 08/1898 | 12/1934 | 36.33 | |||||||||
724 | 10815 | 50815 | 08/1898 | 02/1951 | 52.5 | ||||||||
725 | 10816 | 09/1898 | 02/1934 | 35.42 | |||||||||
728 | 10817 | 09/1898 | 08/1935 | 36.92 | |||||||||
730 | 10818 | 50818 | 09/1898 | 03/10/1958 | 60.08 | ||||||||
732 | 10819 | 09/1898 | 20/12/1947 | 49.25 | |||||||||
733 | 10820 | 09/1898 | 06/1934 | 35.75 | |||||||||
734 | 10821 | 09/1898 | 08/1944 | 45.92 |