Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 109 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4601 Week
» 29435 Month
» 63767 Year
» 1729143 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LYR/LMS Aspinall "1008" Class 2-4-2T


LYR WR LMS (1923) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Rebuilt To Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
5 10822 10/1898 11/1945 47.08
34 10823 50823 10/1898 04/12/1948 50.17
48 10935 10/1898 07/1946 12/1918
to 6 Rbld
47.75
90 10824 10/1898 10/1938 40
98 10825 10/1898 01/1947 48.25
120 10953 50953 10/1898 08/04/1950 12/1923
to 6 Rbld
51.5
183 10827 10/1898 01/1944 45.25
191 10828 11/1898 02/1939 40.25
192 10829 50829 11/1898 12/04/1958 59.42
267 10923 11/1898 08/11/1947 08/1914
to 6 Rbld
49
297 10830 11/1898 01/1937 38.17
316 10831 50831 11/1898 11/1958 60
332 10952 50952 11/1898 19/06/1948 12/1923
to 6 Rbld
49.58
346 10833 12/1898 06/1939 40.5
351 10948 12/1898 02/1929 10/1922
to 6 Rbld
30.17
353 10834 12/1898 08/1936 37.67
356 10950 50950 12/1898 21/08/1948 12/1922
to 6 Rbld
49.67
371 10835 50835 12/1898 07/08/1948 06/1924
to 6 Rbld
49.67
379 10954 12/1898 08/1940 06/1924
to 6 Rbld
41.67
380 10942 12/1898 12/1945 06/1921
to 6 Rbld
47
627 10926 04/1899 10/1928 01/1915
to 6 Rbld
29.5
629 10827 04/1899 02/1937 37.83
630 10937 05/1899 06/1931 01/1921
to 6 Rbld
32.08
643 10838 05/1899 03/1939 39.83
644 10947 05/1899 06/1940 09/1922
to 6 Rbld
41.08
645 10839 06/1899 12/1939 40.5
646 10840 50840 06/1899 23/02/1952 52.67
649 10949 06/1899 11/1939 12/1922
to 6 Rbld
40.42
653 10841 06/1899 11/1946 47.42
658 10842 50842 07/1899 25/08/1951 52.08
661 10946 07/1899 01/1944 09/1922
to 6 Rbld
44.5
664 10843 07/1899 11/1945 46.33
667 10844 50844 08/1899 09/1950 51.08
668 10845 08/1899 07/1936 36.92
670 10846 50951 08/1899 01/1950 08/1923
to 6 Rbld
50.42
671 10847 09/1899 06/12/1947 48.25
672 10848 09/1899 04/1930 30.58
674 10849 50849 09/1899 02/1950 50.42
675 10850 50850 09/1899 11/1961 62.17
678 10851 10/1899 10/1938 39
514 10852 50852 10/1900 17/01/1953 52.25
515 10853 11/1900 12/1936 36.08
516 10854 11/1900 11/1939 39
525 10855 50855 11/1900 09/1958 57.83
632 10944 11/1900 08/1947 01/1922
to 6 Rbld
46.75
641 10856 11/1900 10/1944 43.92
669 10857 12/1900 20/12/1947 47
689 10858 12/1900 04/1940 39.33
705 10859 50859 12/1900 28/11/1953 52.92
707 10860 12/1900 08/1938 37.67
714 10861 12/1900 10/1946 45.83
716 10862 12/1900 09/1938 37.75
719 10943 50943 12/1900 18/12/1948 09/1921
to 6 Rbld
48
722 10863 01/1901 11/1938 37.83
740 10864 01/1901 04/1944 43.25
741 10865 50865 01/1901 03/10/1958 57.75
742 10866 01/1901 07/1936 35.5
743 10867 02/1901 12/1938 37.83
746 10868 02/1901 09/1938 37.58
790 10869 50869 02/1901 05/11/1955 54.75