Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 117 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2282 Week
» 2282 Month
» 69144 Year
» 1734520 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LYR/LMS Aspinall "1008" Class 2-4-2T


LYR WR LMS (1923) BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Rebuilt To Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
816 10870 04/1905 05/1943 38.08
817 10871 04/1905 06/1946 41.17
819 10872 50872 04/1905 22/03/1952 46.92
833 10873 50873 05/1905 01/03/1952 46.83
839 10874 05/1905 08/1946 41.25
842 10875 50875 05/1905 22/05/1948 43
867 10876 05/1905 03/1946 40.83
868 10877 06/1905 05/1931 06/1925
to 6 Rbld
25.92
869 10939 06/1905 03/1945 02/1921
to 6 Rbld
39.75
878 10878 06/1905 05/1946 40.92
1461 10879 06/1905 01/1946 40.58
1462 10880 50880 06/1905 10/1949 44.33
1463 10881 07/1905 06/1946 40.92
1464 10882 07/1905 08/1944 06/1926
to 6 Rbld
39.08
1465 10883 07/1905 10/1944 39.25
1466 10884 07/1905 11/1944 39.33
1467 10885 08/1905 10/1947 11/1924
to 6 Rbld
42.17
1468 10886 50886 09/1905 29/12/1951 46.25
1469 10938 09/1905 19/10/1946 03/1921
to 6 Rbld
41.08
1470 10887 50887 10/1905 14/12/1957 52.17
1526 10888 01/1910 03/1946 36.17
1527 10889 50889 01/1910 10/1949 39.75
1528 10921 01/1910 03/1947 07/1914
to 6 Rbld
37.17
1529 10920 02/1910 10/1929 07/1914
to 6 Rbld
19.67
1530 10890 02/1910 03/1945 06/1925
to 6 Rbld
35.08
1531 10891 50891 02/1910 04/03/1950 09/1925
to 6 Rbld
40.08
1532 10940 02/1910 05/1942 03/1921
to 6 Rbld
32.25
1533 10934 50934 02/1910 14/08/1948 12/1918
to 6 Rbld
38.5
1534 10941 02/1910 07/1946 04/1921
to 6 Rbld
36.42
1535 10892 50892 03/1910 05/1952 42.17
1536 10925 50925 03/1910 09/08/1952 09/1914
to 6 Rbld
42.42
1537 10893 50893 03/1910 29/04/1950 07/1926
to 6 Rbld
40.08
1538 10894 03/1910 08/1931 10/1925
to 6 Rbld
21.42
1539 10926 03/1910 03/1928 09/1914
to 6 Rbld
18
1540 10895 03/1910 04/1932 06/1925
to 6 Rbld
22.08
1541 10896 50896 03/1910 04/12/1948 38.75
1542 10897 04/1910 11/1945 35.58
1543 10945 50945 04/1910 01/1949 02/1922
to 6 Rbld
38.75
1544 10898 50898 04/1910 23/02/1952 41.83
1545 10899 50899 04/1910 23/10/1948 38.5