Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 605 Today
» 1039 Yesterday
» 6136 Week
» 30970 Month
» 65302 Year
» 1730678 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LYR/LMS Aspinall "1008" Class 2-4-2T


Company Old Number Company New Number Subtype Date Information
LYR 1041 renumbered to WR 6   m/e 06/1921  
LYR 10 renumbered to LMS 10658 1923   1925  
LYR 1008 renumbered to LMS 10621 1923   1925  
LYR 1009 renumbered to LMS 10622 1923   1925  
LYR 1010 renumbered to LMS 10623 1923   1925  
LYR 1011 renumbered to LMS 10624 1923   1925  
LYR 1012 renumbered to LMS 10625 1923   1925  
LYR 1013 renumbered to LMS 10626 1923   1925  
LYR 1014 renumbered to LMS 10627 1923   1925  
LYR 1015 renumbered to LMS 10628 1923   1925  
LYR 1016 renumbered to LMS 10629 1923   1925  
LYR 1017 renumbered to LMS 10630 1923   1925  
LYR 1033 renumbered to LMS 10631 1923   1925  
LYR 1034 renumbered to LMS 10632 1923   1925  
LYR 1035 renumbered to LMS 10932 1923   1925  
LYR 1036 renumbered to LMS 10633 1923   1925  
LYR 1037 renumbered to LMS 10634 1923   1925  
LYR 1038 renumbered to LMS 10635 1923   1925  
LYR 1039 renumbered to LMS 10636 1923   1925  
LYR 104 renumbered to LMS 10732 1923   1925  
LYR 1040 renumbered to LMS 10637 1923   1925  
LYR 1042 renumbered to LMS 10639 1923   1925  
LYR 1043 renumbered to LMS 10640 1923   1925  
LYR 1044 renumbered to LMS 10641 1923   1925  
LYR 1045 renumbered to LMS 10642 1923   1925  
LYR 1046 renumbered to LMS 10643 1923   1925  
LYR 1047 renumbered to LMS 10644 1923   1925  
LYR 1048 renumbered to LMS 10645 1923   1925  
LYR 1049 renumbered to LMS 10646 1923   1925  
LYR 1050 renumbered to LMS 10930 1923   1925  
LYR 1051 renumbered to LMS 10936 1923   1925  
LYR 1052 renumbered to LMS 10647 1923   1925  
LYR 1065 renumbered to LMS 10656 1923   1925  
LYR 1066 renumbered to LMS 10657 1923   1925  
LYR 107 renumbered to LMS 10733 1923   1925  
LYR 110 renumbered to LMS 10734 1923   1925  
LYR 1157 renumbered to LMS 10648 1923   1925  
LYR 1158 renumbered to LMS 10649 1923   1925  
LYR 1159 renumbered to LMS 10650 1923   1925  
LYR 1160 renumbered to LMS 10651 1923   1925  
LYR 1161 renumbered to LMS 10652 1923   1925  
LYR 1162 renumbered to LMS 10653 1923   1925  
LYR 1163 renumbered to LMS 10654 1923   1925  
LYR 1164 renumbered to LMS 10655 1923   1925  
LYR 1167 renumbered to LMS 10659 1923   1925  
LYR 1168 renumbered to LMS 10660 1923   1925  
LYR 1169 renumbered to LMS 10661 1923   1925  
LYR 1170 renumbered to LMS 10668 1923   1925  
LYR 1171 renumbered to LMS 10669 1923   1925  
LYR 1172 renumbered to LMS 10670 1923   1925  
LYR 1173 renumbered to LMS 10671 1923   1925  
LYR 1174 renumbered to LMS 10672 1923   1925  
LYR 1175 renumbered to LMS 10673 1923   1925  
LYR 1176 renumbered to LMS 10674 1923   1925  
LYR 1177 renumbered to LMS 10675 1923   1925  
LYR 1178 renumbered to LMS 10676 1923   1925  
LYR 1179 renumbered to LMS 10677 1923   1925  
LYR 119 renumbered to LMS 10689 1923   1925  
LYR 120 renumbered to LMS 10953 1923   1925  
LYR 1210 renumbered to LMS 10695 1923   1925  
LYR 1211 renumbered to LMS 10696 1923   1925  
LYR 1212 renumbered to LMS 10697 1923   1925  
LYR 1213 renumbered to LMS 10698 1923   1925  
LYR 1214 renumbered to LMS 10699 1923   1925  
LYR 1215 renumbered to LMS 10700 1923   1925  
LYR 1216 renumbered to LMS 10701 1923   1925  
LYR 1217 renumbered to LMS 10702 1923   1925  
LYR 1218 renumbered to LMS 10703 1923   1925  
LYR 1219 renumbered to LMS 10704 1923   1925  
LYR 1258 renumbered to LMS 10707 1923   1925  
LYR 1259 renumbered to LMS 10708 1923   1925  
LYR 1260 renumbered to LMS 10709 1923   1925  
LYR 1261 renumbered to LMS 10710 1923   1925  
LYR 1262 renumbered to LMS 10711 1923   1925  
LYR 1263 renumbered to LMS 10712 1923   1925  
LYR 1264 renumbered to LMS 10713 1923   1925  
LYR 1265 renumbered to LMS 10714 1923   1925  
LYR 1266 renumbered to LMS 10715 1923   1925  
LYR 1267 renumbered to LMS 10716 1923   1925  
LYR 1268 renumbered to LMS 10717 1923   1925  
LYR 1269 renumbered to LMS 10718 1923   1925  
LYR 1270 renumbered to LMS 10719 1923   1925  
LYR 1271 renumbered to LMS 10720 1923   1925  
LYR 1272 renumbered to LMS 10721 1923   1925  
LYR 1273 renumbered to LMS 10722 1923   1925  
LYR 1274 renumbered to LMS 10723 1923   1925  
LYR 1275 renumbered to LMS 10724 1923   1925  
LYR 129 renumbered to LMS 10735 1923   1925  
LYR 1311 renumbered to LMS 10744 1923   1925  
LYR 1312 renumbered to LMS 10745 1923   1925  
LYR 1313 renumbered to LMS 10746 1923   1925  
LYR 1314 renumbered to LMS 10747 1923   1925  
LYR 1315 renumbered to LMS 10748 1923   1925  
LYR 1316 renumbered to LMS 10749 1923   1925  
LYR 1317 renumbered to LMS 10750 1923   1925  
LYR 1318 renumbered to LMS 10751 1923   1925  
LYR 1319 renumbered to LMS 10752 1923   1925  
LYR 1320 renumbered to LMS 10753 1923   1925  
LYR 1321 renumbered to LMS 10754 1923   1925  
LYR 1322 renumbered to LMS 10755 1923   1925  
LYR 1323 renumbered to LMS 10756 1923   1925  
LYR 1324 renumbered to LMS 10757 1923   1925  
LYR 1325 renumbered to LMS 10758 1923   1925  
LYR 1326 renumbered to LMS 10759 1923   1925  
LYR 1327 renumbered to LMS 10760 1923   1925  
LYR 1328 renumbered to LMS 10761 1923   1925  
LYR 1329 renumbered to LMS 10762 1923   1925  
LYR 1330 renumbered to LMS 10763 1923   1925  
LYR 1331 renumbered to LMS 10764 1923   1925  
LYR 1332 renumbered to LMS 10765 1923   1925  
LYR 1333 renumbered to LMS 10766 1923   1925  
LYR 1334 renumbered to LMS 10767 1923   1925  
LYR 1335 renumbered to LMS 10768 1923   1925  
LYR 1336 renumbered to LMS 10769 1923   1925  
LYR 1337 renumbered to LMS 10770 1923   1925  
LYR 1338 renumbered to LMS 10771 1923   1925  
LYR 1339 renumbered to LMS 10772 1923   1925  
LYR 1340 renumbered to LMS 10773 1923   1925  
LYR 1341 renumbered to LMS 10774 1923   1925  
LYR 1342 renumbered to LMS 10775 1923   1925  
LYR 1343 renumbered to LMS 10776 1923   1925  
LYR 1344 renumbered to LMS 10777 1923   1925  
LYR 1345 renumbered to LMS 10778 1923   1925  
LYR 1346 renumbered to LMS 10779 1923   1925  
LYR 1347 renumbered to LMS 10780 1923   1925  
LYR 1348 renumbered to LMS 10781 1923   1925  
LYR 1349 renumbered to LMS 10782 1923   1925  
LYR 1350 renumbered to LMS 10783 1923   1925  
LYR 1361 renumbered to LMS 10784 1923   1925  
LYR 1362 renumbered to LMS 10785 1923   1925  
LYR 1367 renumbered to LMS 10786 1923   1925  
LYR 1370 renumbered to LMS 10787 1923   1925  
LYR 1371 renumbered to LMS 10788 1923   1925  
LYR 1372 renumbered to LMS 10789 1923   1925  
LYR 1373 renumbered to LMS 10790 1923   1925  
LYR 1374 renumbered to LMS 10791 1923   1925  
LYR 1375 renumbered to LMS 10792 1923   1925  
LYR 1376 renumbered to LMS 10793 1923   1925  
LYR 1377 renumbered to LMS 10794 1923   1925  
LYR 1378 renumbered to LMS 10795 1923   1925  
LYR 1379 renumbered to LMS 10796 1923   1925  
LYR 1380 renumbered to LMS 10931 1923   1925  
LYR 1381 renumbered to LMS 10797 1923   1925  
LYR 1382 renumbered to LMS 10798 1923   1925  
LYR 1383 renumbered to LMS 10799 1923   1925  
LYR 1384 renumbered to LMS 10800 1923   1925  
LYR 1385 renumbered to LMS 10801 1923   1925  
LYR 1386 renumbered to LMS 10802 1923   1925  
LYR 1387 renumbered to LMS 10803 1923   1925  
LYR 1388 renumbered to LMS 10804 1923   1925  
LYR 1389 renumbered to LMS 10805 1923   1925  
LYR 1390 renumbered to LMS 10806 1923   1925  
LYR 1391 renumbered to LMS 10807 1923   1925  
LYR 1461 renumbered to LMS 10879 1923   1925  
LYR 1462 renumbered to LMS 10880 1923   1925  
LYR 1463 renumbered to LMS 10881 1923   1925  
LYR 1464 renumbered to LMS 10882 1923   1925  
LYR 1465 renumbered to LMS 10883 1923   1925  
LYR 1466 renumbered to LMS 10884 1923   1925  
LYR 1467 renumbered to LMS 10885 1923   1925  
LYR 1468 renumbered to LMS 10886 1923   1925  
LYR 1469 renumbered to LMS 10938 1923   1925  
LYR 147 renumbered to LMS 10690 1923   1925  
LYR 1470 renumbered to LMS 10887 1923   1925  
LYR 1526 renumbered to LMS 10888 1923   1925  
LYR 1527 renumbered to LMS 10889 1923   1925  
LYR 1528 renumbered to LMS 10921 1923   1925  
LYR 1529 renumbered to LMS 10920 1923   1925  
LYR 1530 renumbered to LMS 10890 1923   1925  
LYR 1531 renumbered to LMS 10891 1923   1925  
LYR 1532 renumbered to LMS 10940 1923   1925  
LYR 1533 renumbered to LMS 10934 1923   1925  
LYR 1534 renumbered to LMS 10941 1923   1925  
LYR 1535 renumbered to LMS 10892 1923   1925  
LYR 1536 renumbered to LMS 10925 1923   1925  
LYR 1537 renumbered to LMS 10893 1923   1925  
LYR 1538 renumbered to LMS 10894 1923   1925  
LYR 1539 renumbered to LMS 10926 1923   1925  
LYR 1540 renumbered to LMS 10895 1923   1925  
LYR 1541 renumbered to LMS 10896 1923   1925  
LYR 1542 renumbered to LMS 10897 1923   1925  
LYR 1543 renumbered to LMS 10945 1923   1925  
LYR 1544 renumbered to LMS 10898 1923   1925  
LYR 1545 renumbered to LMS 10899 1923   1925  
LYR 156 renumbered to LMS 10736 1923   1925  
LYR 16 renumbered to LMS 10678 1923   1925  
LYR 183 renumbered to LMS 10827 1923   1925  
LYR 185 renumbered to LMS 10737 1923   1925  
LYR 189 renumbered to LMS 10691 1923   1925  
LYR 191 renumbered to LMS 10828 1923   1925  
LYR 192 renumbered to LMS 10829 1923   1925  
LYR 206 renumbered to LMS 10692 1923   1925  
LYR 208 renumbered to LMS 10693 1923   1925  
LYR 24 renumbered to LMS 10725 1923   1925  
LYR 26 renumbered to LMS 10928 1923   1925  
LYR 267 renumbered to LMS 10923 1923   1925  
LYR 287 renumbered to LMS 10662 1923   1925  
LYR 289 renumbered to LMS 10663 1923   1925  
LYR 296 renumbered to LMS 10738 1923   1925  
LYR 297 renumbered to LMS 10830 1923   1925  
LYR 299 renumbered to LMS 10694 1923   1925  
LYR 301 renumbered to LMS 10680 1923   1925  
LYR 31 renumbered to LMS 10726 1923   1925  
LYR 316 renumbered to LMS 10831 1923   1925  
LYR 319 renumbered to LMS 10739 1923   1925  
LYR 321 renumbered to LMS 10664 1923   1925  
LYR 323 renumbered to LMS 10665 1923   1925  
LYR 329 renumbered to LMS 10740 1923   1925  
LYR 332 renumbered to LMS 10952 1923   1925  
LYR 334 renumbered to LMS 10666 1923   1925  
LYR 337 renumbered to LMS 10667 1923   1925  
LYR 34 renumbered to LMS 10823 1923   1925  
LYR 340 renumbered to LMS 10681 1923   1925  
LYR 345 renumbered to LMS 10682 1923   1925  
LYR 346 renumbered to LMS 10833 1923   1925  
LYR 349 renumbered to LMS 10683 1923   1925  
LYR 351 renumbered to LMS 10948 1923   1925  
LYR 353 renumbered to LMS 10834 1923   1925  
LYR 356 renumbered to LMS 10950 1923   1925  
LYR 36 renumbered to LMS 10705 1923   1925  
LYR 362 renumbered to LMS 10741 1923   1925  
LYR 369 renumbered to LMS 10742 1923   1925  
LYR 37 renumbered to LMS 10679 1923   1925  
LYR 371 renumbered to LMS 10835 1923   1925  
LYR 379 renumbered to LMS 10954 1923   1925  
LYR 38 renumbered to LMS 10922 1923   1925  
LYR 380 renumbered to LMS 10942 1923   1925  
LYR 39 renumbered to LMS 10706 1923   1925  
LYR 415 renumbered to LMS 10743 1923   1925  
LYR 45 renumbered to LMS 10929 1923   1925  
LYR 46 renumbered to LMS 10687 1923   1925  
LYR 48 renumbered to LMS 10935 1923   1925  
LYR 5 renumbered to LMS 10822 1923   1925  
LYR 514 renumbered to LMS 10852 1923   1925  
LYR 515 renumbered to LMS 10853 1923   1925  
LYR 516 renumbered to LMS 10854 1923   1925  
LYR 525 renumbered to LMS 10855 1923   1925  
LYR 54 renumbered to LMS 10658 1923   1925  
LYR 58 renumbered to LMS 10933 1923   1925  
WR 6 renumbered to LMS 6762 1923   1925  
LYR 627 renumbered to LMS 10926 1923   1925  
LYR 629 renumbered to LMS 10827 1923   1925  
LYR 63 renumbered to LMS 10727 1923   1925  
LYR 630 renumbered to LMS 10937 1923   1925  
LYR 632 renumbered to LMS 10944 1923   1925  
LYR 638 renumbered to LMS 10684 1923   1925  
LYR 641 renumbered to LMS 10856 1923   1925  
LYR 643 renumbered to LMS 10838 1923   1925  
LYR 644 renumbered to LMS 10947 1923   1925  
LYR 645 renumbered to LMS 10839 1923   1925  
LYR 646 renumbered to LMS 10840 1923   1925  
LYR 649 renumbered to LMS 10949 1923   1925  
LYR 651 renumbered to LMS 10685 1923   1925  
LYR 653 renumbered to LMS 10841 1923   1925  
LYR 658 renumbered to LMS 10842 1923   1925  
LYR 661 renumbered to LMS 10946 1923   1925  
LYR 664 renumbered to LMS 10843 1923   1925  
LYR 667 renumbered to LMS 10844 1923   1925  
LYR 668 renumbered to LMS 10845 1923   1925  
LYR 669 renumbered to LMS 10857 1923   1925  
LYR 670 renumbered to LMS 10846 1923   1925  
LYR 671 renumbered to LMS 10847 1923   1925  
LYR 672 renumbered to LMS 10848 1923   1925  
LYR 674 renumbered to LMS 10849 1923   1925  
LYR 675 renumbered to LMS 10850 1923   1925  
LYR 678 renumbered to LMS 10851 1923   1925  
LYR 680 renumbered to LMS 10686 1923   1925  
LYR 686 renumbered to LMS 10808 1923   1925  
LYR 689 renumbered to LMS 10858 1923   1925  
LYR 693 renumbered to LMS 10927 1923   1925  
LYR 696 renumbered to LMS 10809 1923   1925  
LYR 699 renumbered to LMS 10810 1923   1925  
LYR 701 renumbered to LMS 10811 1923   1925  
LYR 703 renumbered to LMS 10812 1923   1925  
LYR 705 renumbered to LMS 10859 1923   1925  
LYR 707 renumbered to LMS 10860 1923   1925  
LYR 714 renumbered to LMS 10861 1923   1925  
LYR 716 renumbered to LMS 10862 1923   1925  
LYR 719 renumbered to LMS 10943 1923   1925  
LYR 721 renumbered to LMS 10813 1923   1925  
LYR 722 renumbered to LMS 10863 1923   1925  
LYR 723 renumbered to LMS 10814 1923   1925  
LYR 724 renumbered to LMS 10815 1923   1925  
LYR 725 renumbered to LMS 10816 1923   1925  
LYR 728 renumbered to LMS 10817 1923   1925  
LYR 730 renumbered to LMS 10818 1923   1925  
LYR 732 renumbered to LMS 10819 1923   1925  
LYR 733 renumbered to LMS 10820 1923   1925  
LYR 734 renumbered to LMS 10821 1923   1925  
LYR 740 renumbered to LMS 10864 1923   1925  
LYR 741 renumbered to LMS 10865 1923   1925  
LYR 742 renumbered to LMS 10866 1923   1925  
LYR 743 renumbered to LMS 10867 1923   1925  
LYR 746 renumbered to LMS 10868 1923   1925  
LYR 76 renumbered to LMS 10728 1923   1925  
LYR 790 renumbered to LMS 10869 1923   1925  
LYR 816 renumbered to LMS 10870 1923   1925  
LYR 817 renumbered to LMS 10871 1923   1925  
LYR 819 renumbered to LMS 10872 1923   1925  
LYR 833 renumbered to LMS 10873 1923   1925  
LYR 839 renumbered to LMS 10874 1923   1925  
LYR 84 renumbered to LMS 10729 1923   1925  
LYR 842 renumbered to LMS 10875 1923   1925  
LYR 867 renumbered to LMS 10876 1923   1925  
LYR 868 renumbered to LMS 10877 1923   1925  
LYR 869 renumbered to LMS 10939 1923   1925  
LYR 878 renumbered to LMS 10878 1923   1925  
LYR 88 renumbered to LMS 10730 1923   1925  
LYR 90 renumbered to LMS 10824 1923   1925  
LYR 97 renumbered to LMS 10731 1923   1925  
LYR 98 renumbered to LMS 10825 1923   1925  
LMS 10852 renumbered to BR 50852     04/1948  
LMS 10953 renumbered to BR 50953     04/1948  
LMS 10630 renumbered to BR 50630     01/05/1948  
LMS 10695 renumbered to BR 50695     08/05/1948  
LMS 10642 renumbered to BR 50642     15/05/1948  
LMS 10829 renumbered to BR 50829     22/05/1948  
LMS 10886 renumbered to BR 50886     22/05/1948  
LMS 10712 renumbered to BR 50712     05/06/1948  
LMS 10872 renumbered to BR 50872     12/06/1948  
LMS 10766 renumbered to BR 50766     31/07/1948  
LMS 10687 renumbered to BR 50687     07/08/1948  
LMS 10678 renumbered to BR 50678     21/08/1948  
LMS 10802 renumbered to BR 50802     21/08/1948  
LMS 10891 renumbered to BR 50891     21/08/1948  
LMS 10806 renumbered to BR 50806     04/09/1948  
LMS 10898 renumbered to BR 50898     11/09/1948  
LMS 10925 renumbered to BR 50925     25/09/1948  
LMS 10640 renumbered to BR 50640     09/10/1948  
LMS 10652 renumbered to BR 50652     09/10/1948  
LMS 10623 renumbered to BR 50623     11/1948  
LMS 10644 renumbered to BR 50644     11/1948  
LMS 10812 renumbered to BR 50812     11/1948  
LMS 10869 renumbered to BR 50869     11/1948  
LMS 10893 renumbered to BR 50893     11/1948  
LMS 10654 renumbered to BR 50654     06/11/1948  
LMS 10746 renumbered to BR 50746     12/1948  
LMS 10749 renumbered to BR 50749     12/1948  
LMS 10762 renumbered to BR 50762     12/1948  
LMS 10795 renumbered to BR 50795     12/1948  
LMS 10873 renumbered to BR 50873     12/1948  
LMS 10646 renumbered to BR 50646     01/1949  
LMS 10675 renumbered to BR 50675     01/1949  
LMS 10859 renumbered to BR 50859     01/1949  
LMS 10648 renumbered to BR 50648     02/1949  
LMS 10656 renumbered to BR 50656     02/1949  
LMS 10681 renumbered to BR 50681     02/1949  
LMS 10752 renumbered to BR 50752     02/1949  
LMS 10621 renumbered to BR 50621     03/1949  
LMS 10636 renumbered to BR 50636     03/1949  
LMS 10651 renumbered to BR 50651     03/1949  
LMS 10720 renumbered to BR 50720     03/1949  
LMS 10625 renumbered to BR 50625     04/1949  
LMS 10653 renumbered to BR 50653     04/1949  
LMS 10634 renumbered to BR 50634     05/1949  
LMS 10650 renumbered to BR 50650     05/1949  
LMS 10840 renumbered to BR 50840     05/1949  
LMS 10671 renumbered to BR 50671     06/1949  
LMS 10781 renumbered to BR 50781     06/1949  
LMS 10764 renumbered to BR 50764     07/1949  
LMS 10818 renumbered to BR 50818     07/1949  
LMS 10721 renumbered to BR 50721     08/1949  
LMS 10788 renumbered to BR 50788     08/1949  
LMS 10639 renumbered to BR 50639     09/1949  
LMS 10647 renumbered to BR 50647     09/1949  
LMS 10842 renumbered to BR 50842     09/1949  
LMS 6762 renumbered to BR 46762   w/e 03/09/1949  
LMS 10633 renumbered to BR 50633     10/1949  
LMS 10731 renumbered to BR 50731     10/1949  
LMS 10778 renumbered to BR 50778     12/11/1949  
LMS 10715 renumbered to BR 50715     26/11/1949  
LMS 10622 renumbered to BR 50622     01/1950  
LMS 10660 renumbered to BR 50660     01/1950  
LMS 10686 renumbered to BR 50686     01/1950  
LMS 10697 renumbered to BR 50697     01/1950  
LMS 10705 renumbered to BR 50705     01/1950  
LMS 10655 renumbered to BR 50655     02/1950  
LMS 10689 renumbered to BR 50689     02/1950  
LMS 10714 renumbered to BR 50714     02/1950  
LMS 10643 renumbered to BR 50643     04/1950  
LMS 10757 renumbered to BR 50757     04/1950  
LMS 10777 renumbered to BR 50777     05/1950  
LMS 10850 renumbered to BR 50850     05/1950  
LMS 10703 renumbered to BR 50703     06/1950  
LMS 10855 renumbered to BR 50855     06/1950  
LMS 10865 renumbered to BR 50865     10/1950  
LMS 10765 renumbered to BR 50765     12/1950  
LMS 10831 renumbered to BR 50831     01/1951  
LMS 10799 renumbered to BR 50799     06/1951  
LMS 10887 renumbered to BR 50887     09/1951  
LMS 10807 renumbered to BR 50807     04/1952