Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 945 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 5437 Week
» 30271 Month
» 64603 Year
» 1729979 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NSR/LMS Clare "6 Rbld" Class 2-4-2T


Class NSR LYR LMS LMS (1923) BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
6 Rbld 52   1454     1879 W Withdrawn 08/1932 08/1932
6 Rbld 35   1455     1881 W Withdrawn 10/1932 10/1932
6 Rbld 40   1456     1881 W Withdrawn 07/1932 07/1932
6 Rbld   1035   10932   05/1890       08/1930
6 Rbld   1050   10930   09/1890       11/1929
6 Rbld   1051   10936   09/1890       03/1929
6 Rbld   26   10928   09/1892       10/1928
6 Rbld   45   10929   08/1893       05/1928
6 Rbld   58   10933   10/1893       09/1927
6 Rbld   38   10922   03/1896       01/1929
6 Rbld   1380   10931   05/1895       11/1930
6 Rbld   693   10927   07/1898       11/1929
6 Rbld   48   10935   10/1898       07/1946
6 Rbld   120   10953 50953 10/1898       08/04/1950
6 Rbld   267   10923   11/1898       08/11/1947
6 Rbld   332   10952 50952 11/1898       19/06/1948
6 Rbld   351   10948   12/1898       02/1929
6 Rbld   356   10950 50950 12/1898       21/08/1948
6 Rbld   371   10835 50835 12/1898       07/08/1948
6 Rbld   379   10954   12/1898       08/1940
6 Rbld   380   10942   12/1898       12/1945
6 Rbld   627   10926   04/1899       10/1928
6 Rbld   630   10937   05/1899       06/1931
6 Rbld   644   10947   05/1899       06/1940
6 Rbld   649   10949   06/1899       11/1939
6 Rbld   661   10946   07/1899       01/1944
6 Rbld   670   10846 50951 08/1899       01/1950
6 Rbld   632   10944   11/1900       08/1947
6 Rbld   719   10943 50943 12/1900       18/12/1948
6 Rbld   868   10877   06/1905       05/1931
6 Rbld   869   10939   06/1905       03/1945
6 Rbld   1464   10882   07/1905       08/1944
6 Rbld   1467   10885   08/1905       10/1947
6 Rbld   1469   10938   09/1905       19/10/1946
6 Rbld   1528   10921   01/1910       03/1947
6 Rbld   1529   10920   02/1910       10/1929
6 Rbld   1530   10890   02/1910       03/1945
6 Rbld   1531   10891 50891 02/1910       04/03/1950
6 Rbld   1532   10940   02/1910       05/1942
6 Rbld   1533   10934 50934 02/1910       14/08/1948
6 Rbld   1534   10941   02/1910       07/1946
6 Rbld   1536   10925 50925 03/1910       09/08/1952
6 Rbld   1537   10893 50893 03/1910       29/04/1950
6 Rbld   1538   10894   03/1910       08/1931
6 Rbld   1539   10926   03/1910       03/1928
6 Rbld   1540   10895   03/1910       04/1932
6 Rbld   1543   10945 50945 04/1910       01/1949