Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 142 Today
» 1069 Yesterday
» 1211 Week
» 1211 Month
» 68073 Year
» 1733449 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NSR/LMS Clare "6 Rbld" Class 2-4-2T


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To Usage
09/1927 Condemned 10933       COND  
03/1928 Condemned 10926       COND  
05/1928 Condemned 10929       COND  
10/1928 Condemned 10928       COND  
10/1928 Condemned 10926       COND  
01/1929 Condemned 10922       COND  
02/1929 Condemned 10948       COND  
03/1929 Condemned 10936       COND  
10/1929 Condemned 10920       COND  
11/1929 Condemned 10930       COND  
11/1929 Condemned 10927       COND  
08/1930 Condemned 10932       COND  
11/1930 Condemned 10931       COND  
05/1931 Condemned 10877       COND  
06/1931 Condemned 10937       COND  
08/1931 Condemned 10894       COND  
04/1932 Condemned 10895       COND  
07/1932 Condemned 1456       COND  
08/1932 Condemned 1454       COND  
10/1932 Condemned 1455       COND  
11/1939 Condemned 10949       COND  
06/1940 Condemned 10947       COND  
08/1940 Condemned 10954       COND  
05/1942 Condemned 10940       COND  
01/1944 Condemned 10946       COND  
08/1944 Condemned 10882       COND  
03/1945 Condemned 10939       COND  
03/1945 Condemned 10890       COND  
12/1945 Condemned 10942       COND  
07/1946 Condemned 10935       COND  
07/1946 Condemned 10941       COND  
19/10/1946 Condemned 10938       COND  
03/1947 Condemned 10921       COND  
08/1947 Condemned 10944       COND  
10/1947 Condemned 10885       COND  
08/11/1947 Condemned 10923       COND  
19/06/1948 Condemned 50952       COND  
07/08/1948 Condemned 50835       COND  
14/08/1948 Condemned 50934       COND  
21/08/1948 Condemned 50950       COND  
18/12/1948 Condemned 50943       COND  
01/1949 Condemned 50945       COND  
01/1950 Condemned 50951       COND  
04/03/1950 Condemned 50891       COND  
08/04/1950 Condemned 50953       COND  
29/04/1950 Condemned 50893       COND  
09/08/1952 Condemned 50925       COND