Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 69 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 4561 Week
» 29395 Month
» 63727 Year
» 1729103 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

NSR/LMS Clare "6 Rbld" Class 2-4-2T


NSR LYR LMS LMS (1923) BR Date To Service Rebuilt From Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
52 1454 1879 1898
from 6
08/1932 53.67
35 1455 1881 1898
from 6
10/1932 51.83
40 1456 1881 1898
from 6
07/1932 51.58
1035 10932 05/1890 10/1915
from 1008
08/1930 40.25
1050 10930 09/1890 06/1915
from 1008
11/1929 39.17
1051 10936 09/1890 1916
from 1008
03/1929 38.5
26 10928 09/1892 04/1915
from 1008
10/1928 36.08
45 10929 08/1893 04/1915
from 1008
05/1928 34.75
58 10933 10/1893 01/1916
from 1008
09/1927 33.92
38 10922 03/1896 08/1914
from 1008
01/1929 32.83
1380 10931 05/1895 08/1915
from 1008
11/1930 35.5
693 10927 07/1898 03/1915
from 1008
11/1929 31.33
48 10935 10/1898 12/1918
from 1008
07/1946 47.75
120 10953 50953 10/1898 12/1923
from 1008
08/04/1950 51.5
267 10923 11/1898 08/1914
from 1008
08/11/1947 49
332 10952 50952 11/1898 12/1923
from 1008
19/06/1948 49.58
351 10948 12/1898 10/1922
from 1008
02/1929 30.17
356 10950 50950 12/1898 12/1922
from 1008
21/08/1948 49.67
371 10835 50835 12/1898 06/1924
from 1008
07/08/1948 49.67
379 10954 12/1898 06/1924
from 1008
08/1940 41.67
380 10942 12/1898 06/1921
from 1008
12/1945 47
627 10926 04/1899 01/1915
from 1008
10/1928 29.5
630 10937 05/1899 01/1921
from 1008
06/1931 32.08
644 10947 05/1899 09/1922
from 1008
06/1940 41.08
649 10949 06/1899 12/1922
from 1008
11/1939 40.42
661 10946 07/1899 09/1922
from 1008
01/1944 44.5
670 10846 50951 08/1899 08/1923
from 1008
01/1950 50.42
632 10944 11/1900 01/1922
from 1008
08/1947 46.75
719 10943 50943 12/1900 09/1921
from 1008
18/12/1948 48
868 10877 06/1905 06/1925
from 1008
05/1931 25.92
869 10939 06/1905 02/1921
from 1008
03/1945 39.75
1464 10882 07/1905 06/1926
from 1008
08/1944 39.08
1467 10885 08/1905 11/1924
from 1008
10/1947 42.17
1469 10938 09/1905 03/1921
from 1008
19/10/1946 41.08
1528 10921 01/1910 07/1914
from 1008
03/1947 37.17
1529 10920 02/1910 07/1914
from 1008
10/1929 19.67
1530 10890 02/1910 06/1925
from 1008
03/1945 35.08
1531 10891 50891 02/1910 09/1925
from 1008
04/03/1950 40.08
1532 10940 02/1910 03/1921
from 1008
05/1942 32.25
1533 10934 50934 02/1910 12/1918
from 1008
14/08/1948 38.5
1534 10941 02/1910 04/1921
from 1008
07/1946 36.42
1536 10925 50925 03/1910 09/1914
from 1008
09/08/1952 42.42
1537 10893 50893 03/1910 07/1926
from 1008
29/04/1950 40.08
1538 10894 03/1910 10/1925
from 1008
08/1931 21.42
1539 10926 03/1910 09/1914
from 1008
03/1928 18
1540 10895 03/1910 06/1925
from 1008
04/1932 22.08
1543 10945 50945 04/1910 02/1922
from 1008
01/1949 38.75