LMS Ivatt "4MT" Class 2-6-0
Class | LMS | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
4MT | 3000 | 43000 | 06/12/1947 | 5B 2B 1D 1D 2B 12B 12C 12A 52F W |
Crewe South Bletchley Devons Road (Bow) Devons Road (Bow) Nuneaton Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Canal Carlisle Kingmoor Blyth (North) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/03/1948 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 30/11/1957 15/04/1961 10/11/1962 22/06/1963 27/08/1966 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 |
4MT | 3001 | 43001 | 20/12/1947 | 5B 2B 91M 1D 1D 2B 5B 5D 5B W |
Crewe South Bletchley To London Midland Region Devons Road (Bow) Devons Road (Bow) Nuneaton Crewe South Stoke Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/03/1948 27/10/1950 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 30/11/1957 22/06/1963 12/03/1966 12/08/1967 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 |
4MT | 3002 | 43002 | 31/12/1947 | 5B 2B 31A 2B 5D 12D W |
Crewe South Bletchley Cambridge Nuneaton Stoke Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 04/11/1950 03/10/1953 26/03/1966 12/08/1967 30/12/1967 |
30/12/1967 |
4MT | 3003 | 43003 | 17/01/1948 | 2B 2B 5D 5B W |
Bletchley Nuneaton Stoke Crewe South Withdrawn |
21/02/1948 03/10/1953 21/09/1963 12/08/1967 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 |
4MT | 3004 | 43004 | 24/01/1948 | 12D 12B 12A 10A 10D W |
Workington Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Carnforth Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
31/12/1950 22/06/1963 02/05/1964 30/04/1966 24/06/1967 09/1967 |
09/1967 |
4MT | 3005 | 43005 | 07/02/1948 | 2B 31A 2B 12D 2B W |
Bletchley Cambridge Nuneaton Workington Nuneaton Withdrawn |
28/02/1948 27/10/1950 03/10/1953 23/04/1955 12/07/1958 06/11/1965 |
06/11/1965 |
4MT | 3006 | 43006 | 14/02/1948 | 12D 2B 12F 10D W |
Workington Nuneaton Workington Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
20/03/1948 19/08/1961 09/09/1961 06/01/1968 02/03/1968 |
02/03/1968 |
4MT | 3007 | 43007 | 21/02/1948 | 2B 24J 2B 1C 1A 5D 5B W |
Nuneaton Lancaster Green Ayre Nuneaton Watford Willesden Stoke Crewe South Withdrawn |
12/07/1958 07/11/1959 17/02/1962 16/06/1962 03/04/1965 02/10/1965 12/08/1967 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 |
4MT | 3008 | 43008 | 28/02/1948 | 10D W |
Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
06/01/1968 02/03/1968 |
02/03/1968 |
4MT | 3009 | 43009 | 06/03/1948 | 2B 12H W |
Nuneaton Tebay Withdrawn |
25/06/1960 17/09/1960 26/11/1966 |
26/11/1966 |
4MT | 43010 | 20/03/1948 | 21A 14D 15A 9F 12D W |
Saltley Neasden Wellingborough Heaton Mersey Workington Withdrawn |
11/08/1956 10/10/1959 02/04/1960 14/12/1963 18/09/1965 30/12/1967 |
30/12/1967 | |
4MT | 43011 | 25/03/1948 | 21A 2B 2B 11D 12B 12A 10A 12D W |
Saltley Nuneaton Nuneaton Tebay Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Carnforth Workington Withdrawn |
10/12/1949 24/03/1951 26/01/1952 18/05/1957 09/07/1960 22/06/1963 24/10/1964 25/09/1965 11/02/1967 |
11/02/1967 | |
4MT | 43012 | 10/04/1948 | 21A 19A 15B 21B 21A 15A 9F 52F W |
Saltley Sheffield Grimesthorpe Kettering Bournville Saltley Wellingborough Heaton Mersey Blyth (North) Withdrawn |
30/01/1954 27/03/1954 05/10/1957 10/01/1959 20/02/1960 22/09/1962 04/01/1964 27/08/1966 05/1967 |
05/1967 | |
4MT | 43013 | 17/04/1948 | 22C 17A 21A 21A 15A 9F W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Derby Saltley Saltley Wellingborough Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
13/08/1949 23/02/1952 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 22/09/1962 14/12/1963 16/10/1965 |
16/10/1965 | |
4MT | 43014 | 24/04/1948 | 21A 20B 50A 55F W |
Saltley Stourton York (North) Manningham Withdrawn |
25/12/1948 22/03/1952 07/11/1959 14/09/1963 03/04/1966 |
03/04/1966 | |
4MT | 43015 | 07/05/1948 | 53A 53A 51C 51L W |
Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates West Hartlepool Thornaby Withdrawn |
16/02/1952 23/02/1952 23/07/1955 23/06/1962 01/07/1967 |
01/07/1967 | |
4MT | 43016 | 15/05/1948 | 52B 52B 55F W |
Heaton Heaton Manningham Withdrawn |
16/02/1952 23/02/1952 20/07/1957 30/01/1966 |
30/01/1966 | |
4MT | 43017 | 22/05/1948 | 21A 22C 22C 21A 1E 12D W |
Saltley Bath Green Park (S&D) Bath Green Park (S&D) Saltley Bletchley Workington Withdrawn |
25/12/1948 10/12/1949 24/12/1949 11/07/1953 28/11/1964 10/07/1965 02/12/1967 |
02/12/1967 | |
4MT | 43018 | 29/05/1948 | 16A 15C 24J 12D 12A 1C 1A 5D W |
Nottingham Leicester Midland Lancaster Green Ayre Kirkby Stephen Carlisle Kingmoor Watford Willesden Stoke Withdrawn |
31/07/1948 12/07/1952 08/11/1958 30/04/1960 09/07/1960 23/06/1962 03/04/1965 02/10/1965 22/10/1966 |
22/10/1966 | |
4MT | 43019 | 12/06/1948 | 21A 16A 16A 14A 14A 15A 5D 10H 10D W |
Saltley Nottingham Nottingham Cricklewood East Cricklewood East Wellingborough Stoke Lower Darwen Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
25/12/1948 10/12/1949 24/12/1949 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 22/09/1962 28/09/1963 06/02/1965 19/02/1966 04/05/1968 |
04/05/1968 | |
4MT | 43020 | 17/12/1948 | 2D 1D 1D 2B W |
Nuneaton Devons Road (Bow) Devons Road (Bow) Nuneaton Withdrawn |
08/01/1949 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 22/03/1958 08/10/1966 |
08/10/1966 | |
4MT | 43021 | 22/12/1948 | 2D 1D 1D 8G 24J 2B 1C 5D 5B W |
Nuneaton Devons Road (Bow) Devons Road (Bow) Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Lancaster Green Ayre Nuneaton Watford Stoke Crewe South Withdrawn |
08/01/1949 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 22/03/1958 04/10/1958 17/02/1962 16/06/1962 03/04/1965 03/06/1967 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
4MT | 43022 | 30/12/1948 | 1D 1D 3A 1D 8G 2B 21B 5D W |
Devons Road (Bow) Devons Road (Bow) Bescot Devons Road (Bow) Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Nuneaton Bescot Stoke Withdrawn |
27/01/1951 31/01/1951 10/08/1957 07/09/1957 22/03/1958 06/06/1959 19/01/1963 28/11/1964 19/11/1966 |
19/11/1966 | |
4MT | 43023 | 08/01/1949 | 2B 12D 12A 10A 12D W |
Nuneaton Kirkby Stephen Carlisle Kingmoor Carnforth Workington Withdrawn |
31/01/1951 30/04/1960 09/07/1960 30/04/1966 01/04/1967 30/12/1967 |
30/12/1967 | |
4MT | 43024 | 21/01/1949 | 1D 1D 2B W |
Devons Road (Bow) Devons Road (Bow) Nuneaton Withdrawn |
27/01/1951 31/01/1951 30/11/1957 27/05/1967 |
27/05/1967 | |
4MT | 43025 | 28/01/1949 | 10E 10E 12C W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Workington Withdrawn |
30/11/1950 02/12/1950 26/01/1957 18/09/1965 |
18/09/1965 | |
4MT | 43026 | 10/02/1949 | 10E 12C 2B 11B 2E W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Workington Nuneaton Workington Northampton Withdrawn |
02/04/1949 26/01/1957 03/01/1959 30/01/1960 23/06/1962 24/09/1966 |
24/09/1966 | |
4MT | 43027 | 19/02/1949 | 10E 2B 2B 21A 21A 17A 17A 21B 21A 12D 12A 10A 12D 10D W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Nuneaton Nuneaton Saltley Saltley Derby Derby Bournville Saltley Kirkby Stephen Carlisle Kingmoor Carnforth Workington Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
02/04/1949 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 24/03/1951 26/01/1952 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 10/01/1959 20/06/1959 23/04/1960 09/07/1960 24/10/1964 01/04/1967 06/01/1968 04/05/1968 |
04/05/1968 | |
4MT | 43028 | 03/03/1949 | 10E 11D 12B 12C 12A 9F 12A 12D 12A W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Tebay Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Canal Carlisle Kingmoor Heaton Mersey Carlisle Kingmoor Workington Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
02/04/1949 26/01/1957 09/07/1960 10/11/1962 22/06/1963 25/01/1964 07/03/1964 13/05/1967 21/10/1967 02/12/1967 |
02/12/1967 | |
4MT | 43029 | 15/03/1949 | 10E 11D 12B 12H 10D W |
Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Tebay Carlisle Upperby Tebay Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
02/04/1949 26/01/1957 09/07/1960 17/09/1960 22/04/1967 30/09/1967 |
30/09/1967 | |
4MT | 43030 | 25/03/1949 | 52B 52B 55F W |
Heaton Heaton Manningham Withdrawn |
16/02/1952 23/02/1952 20/07/1957 11/1966 |
11/1966 | |
4MT | 43031 | 05/04/1949 | 14A 15A 9F W |
Cricklewood East Wellingborough Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
21/02/1953 22/09/1962 14/12/1963 12/03/1966 |
12/03/1966 | |
4MT | 43032 | 14/04/1949 | 19B 40E W |
Sheffield Millhouses Colwick Withdrawn |
04/10/1952 16/09/1961 10/01/1965 |
10/01/1965 | |
4MT | 43033 | 05/05/1949 | 16A 17A 21B 21A 9E 9F 12E 10D W |
Nottingham Derby Bournville Saltley Trafford Park (LMS) Heaton Mersey Tebay Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
14/06/1952 16/06/1957 10/01/1959 20/02/1960 22/09/1962 08/02/1964 27/11/1965 22/04/1967 02/03/1968 |
02/03/1968 | |
4MT | 43034 | 18/05/1949 | 2B W |
Nuneaton Withdrawn |
04/12/1954 03/06/1967 |
03/06/1967 | |
4MT | 43035 | 26/05/1949 | 2B 10E 11D W |
Nuneaton Sutton Oak (Peasley Cross) Tebay Withdrawn |
04/12/1954 26/03/1955 26/01/1957 20/11/1965 |
20/11/1965 | |
4MT | 43036 | 03/06/1949 | 22C 21A 22A 21A 14D 21A 9E 12A 10A 12D W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Saltley Bristol Barrow Road Saltley Neasden Saltley Trafford Park (LMS) Carlisle Kingmoor Carnforth Workington Withdrawn |
13/08/1949 11/07/1953 08/08/1953 03/10/1953 10/09/1960 26/11/1960 22/09/1962 07/03/1964 24/10/1964 18/09/1965 07/05/1966 |
07/05/1966 | |
4MT | 43037 | 15/06/1949 | 19A 19C 19C 41C 41D 36E 41E W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Canklow Canklow Sheffield Millhouses Canklow Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
15/06/1949 28/10/1950 04/11/1950 07/05/1960 06/01/1962 29/09/1962 04/05/1963 11/04/1965 |
11/04/1965 | |
4MT | 43038 | 16/07/1949 | 19A 53A 53A 51H 51D 55B W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Hull Dairycoates Hull Dairycoates Kirkby Stephen Middlesbrough Stourton Withdrawn |
16/07/1949 16/02/1952 23/02/1952 18/06/1955 12/11/1955 21/09/1957 23/05/1964 |
23/05/1964 | |
4MT | 43039 | 16/07/1949 | 20A W |
Holbeck (MR) Withdrawn |
16/07/1949 07/12/1966 |
07/12/1966 | |
4MT | 43040 | 30/07/1949 | 17A 21B 21A 9E 12A 52F W |
Derby Bournville Saltley Trafford Park (LMS) Carlisle Kingmoor Blyth (North) Withdrawn |
19/04/1958 10/01/1959 20/06/1959 22/09/1962 27/06/1964 27/08/1966 26/11/1966 |
26/11/1966 | |
4MT | 43041 | 18/08/1949 | 21A 17A 21A 9E 10H 10D W |
Saltley Derby Saltley Trafford Park (LMS) Lower Darwen Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
27/03/1954 19/06/1954 10/01/1959 22/09/1962 13/02/1965 19/02/1966 12/08/1967 |
12/08/1967 | |
4MT | 43042 | 27/08/1949 | 15B 9F W |
Kettering Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
05/10/1957 22/09/1962 19/02/1966 |
19/02/1966 | |
4MT | 43043 | 15/09/1949 | 52B 52B 55A 55H 55E W |
Heaton Heaton Holbeck (MR) Neville Hill Normanton Withdrawn |
16/02/1952 23/02/1952 20/07/1957 07/03/1964 12/09/1964 10/1967 |
10/1967 | |
4MT | 43044 | 29/09/1949 | 20B 55F 55A W |
Stourton Manningham Holbeck (MR) Withdrawn |
22/03/1952 08/10/1966 20/05/1967 30/09/1967 |
30/09/1967 | |
4MT | 43045 | 10/10/1949 | 24J 12D 12C 12A 10A 12D W |
Lancaster Green Ayre Kirkby Stephen Carlisle Canal Carlisle Kingmoor Carnforth Workington Withdrawn |
08/11/1958 30/04/1960 11/11/1961 22/06/1963 31/10/1964 18/09/1965 03/09/1966 |
03/09/1966 | |
4MT | 43046 | 19/10/1949 | 22A 21A 21A 9F 10H 10D W |
Bristol Barrow Road Saltley Saltley Heaton Mersey Lower Darwen Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
14/06/1952 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 22/09/1962 19/06/1965 19/02/1966 25/11/1967 |
25/11/1967 | |
4MT | 43047 | 02/11/1949 | 21A 15A 9F 12D W |
Saltley Wellingborough Heaton Mersey Workington Withdrawn |
11/07/1953 22/09/1962 14/12/1963 14/05/1966 30/12/1967 |
30/12/1967 | |
4MT | 43048 | 12/11/1949 | 15B 9F 9E 9F 52F W |
Kettering Heaton Mersey Trafford Park (LMS) Heaton Mersey Blyth (North) Withdrawn |
05/10/1957 22/09/1962 22/06/1963 21/09/1963 27/08/1966 10/05/1967 |
10/05/1967 | |
4MT | 43049 | 25/11/1949 | 17A 21A 9F 12A W |
Derby Saltley Heaton Mersey Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
25/11/1949 11/08/1956 22/09/1962 14/11/1964 05/08/1967 |
05/08/1967 | |
4MT | 43050 | 31/08/1950 | 51D 51D 51G 51A 51C 55F 56A 52F W |
Middlesbrough Middlesbrough Haverton Hill Darlington West Hartlepool Manningham Wakefield Blyth (North) Withdrawn |
24/09/1950 21/10/1950 25/05/1956 17/11/1956 23/04/1966 23/04/1966 20/05/1967 20/05/1967 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |
4MT | 43051 | 31/07/1950 | 51D 51D 55B 50C 50B 50C 50B 55B 55F W |
Middlesbrough Middlesbrough Stourton Selby Neville Hill Selby Neville Hill Stourton Manningham Withdrawn |
24/09/1950 21/10/1950 21/09/1957 11/10/1958 14/03/1959 11/04/1959 23/05/1959 28/12/1963 15/02/1964 23/01/1967 |
23/01/1967 | |
4MT | 43052 | 10/07/1950 | 50B 50C 21A 24J 2B 2B 24J 2B 2E W |
Neville Hill Selby Saltley Lancaster Green Ayre Nuneaton Nuneaton Lancaster Green Ayre Nuneaton Northampton Withdrawn |
07/07/1951 21/07/1951 16/05/1959 11/07/1959 17/10/1959 07/11/1959 17/09/1960 17/02/1962 16/06/1962 05/11/1966 |
05/11/1966 | |
4MT | 43053 | 31/08/1950 | 56F 51C 55F W |
Low Moor West Hartlepool Manningham Withdrawn |
20/06/1959 07/11/1959 14/09/1963 20/04/1964 |
20/04/1964 | |
4MT | 43054 | 31/08/1950 | 51A 51D 51D 51K 51D 51K 51D 51L 50C 50B 50C 50B 55F W |
Darlington Middlesbrough Middlesbrough Saltburn Middlesbrough Saltburn Middlesbrough Thornaby Selby Neville Hill Selby Neville Hill Manningham Withdrawn |
31/08/1950 24/09/1950 21/10/1950 21/08/1954 16/02/1957 16/03/1957 21/09/1957 14/06/1958 22/11/1958 14/03/1959 11/04/1959 23/05/1959 26/02/1966 07/12/1966 |
07/12/1966 | |
4MT | 43055 | 31/08/1950 | 51A 51C 51C 51H 52A 52B 55A 50A 51C 51A 52F 52F W |
Darlington West Hartlepool West Hartlepool Kirkby Stephen Gateshead Heaton Holbeck (MR) York (North) West Hartlepool Darlington Blyth (North) Blyth (North) Withdrawn |
31/08/1950 26/01/1952 16/02/1952 18/06/1955 16/06/1956 15/12/1956 20/07/1957 07/11/1959 04/12/1965 04/12/1965 13/08/1966 05/11/1966 01/07/1967 |
01/07/1967 | |
4MT | 43056 | 31/08/1950 | 51A 51F 52C 52B 55A 50A 51A 51C W |
Darlington West Auckland Blaydon Heaton Holbeck (MR) York (North) Darlington West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
31/08/1950 18/06/1955 16/06/1956 20/10/1956 20/07/1957 07/11/1959 17/06/1961 26/03/1966 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 | |
4MT | 43057 | 31/08/1950 | 51A 51F 52C 52D 51D 51L 50C 50A 50B 50A 51L 51A 51C W |
Darlington West Auckland Blaydon Tweedmouth Middlesbrough Thornaby Selby York (North) Neville Hill York (North) Thornaby Darlington West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
31/08/1950 18/06/1955 16/06/1956 17/11/1956 20/07/1957 14/06/1958 22/11/1958 19/09/1959 26/09/1959 24/10/1959 18/02/1961 11/05/1963 04/12/1965 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 | |
4MT | 43058 | 29/09/1950 | 35A 35B 35B 35A 40F 40E W |
New England Grantham Grantham New England Boston Colwick Withdrawn |
29/09/1950 29/11/1952 13/12/1952 20/03/1954 14/06/1958 11/01/1964 26/12/1964 |
26/12/1964 | |
4MT | 43059 | 11/10/1950 | 35A 40F 40E 41E W |
New England Boston Colwick Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
11/10/1950 08/01/1958 05/01/1963 20/06/1964 10/01/1965 |
10/01/1965 | |
4MT | 43060 | 20/10/1950 | 35A 40F 40E 40A 40E W |
New England Boston Colwick Lincoln Colwick Withdrawn |
20/10/1950 14/06/1958 01/08/1959 14/11/1959 29/09/1962 26/12/1964 |
26/12/1964 | |
4MT | 43061 | 27/10/1950 | 35A 40F 40E W |
New England Boston Colwick Withdrawn |
27/10/1950 08/01/1958 05/01/1963 05/01/1964 |
05/01/1964 | |
4MT | 43062 | 03/11/1950 | 35A 40F 40E 41E W |
New England Boston Colwick Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
03/11/1950 08/01/1958 05/01/1963 28/09/1963 20/06/1965 |
20/06/1965 | |
4MT | 43063 | 10/11/1950 | 35A 38E 21A 9F 52F W |
New England Woodford Halse Saltley Heaton Mersey Blyth (North) Withdrawn |
10/11/1950 16/06/1956 24/03/1962 15/09/1962 27/08/1966 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |
4MT | 43064 | 17/11/1950 | 35A 35C 35A 40F 40E 41D 41J W |
New England Spital Bridge New England Boston Colwick Canklow Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
17/11/1950 23/12/1950 20/03/1954 08/01/1958 05/01/1963 31/10/1964 19/06/1965 20/06/1965 |
20/06/1965 | |
4MT | 43065 | 24/11/1950 | 35A 34E 35A 40F 40E W |
New England Neasden New England Boston Colwick Withdrawn |
24/11/1950 21/03/1953 25/09/1954 08/01/1958 05/01/1963 10/01/1965 |
10/01/1965 | |
4MT | 43066 | 01/12/1950 | 35A 34E 35A 40F 40E 10A W |
New England Neasden New England Boston Colwick Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/12/1950 21/03/1953 25/09/1954 14/06/1958 05/01/1963 10/10/1964 07/01/1967 |
07/01/1967 | |
4MT | 43067 | 14/12/1950 | 35A 35A 34E 35A 41E W |
New England New England Neasden New England Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
14/12/1950 31/12/1950 21/03/1953 25/09/1954 30/11/1963 11/04/1965 |
11/04/1965 | |
4MT | 43068 | 20/12/1950 | 35A 35A 34E 31D 40F W |
New England New England Neasden South Lynn Boston Withdrawn |
20/12/1950 31/12/1950 21/03/1953 21/08/1954 07/03/1959 05/01/1964 |
05/01/1964 | |
4MT | 43069 | 31/12/1950 | 35A 35A 34E 34E 53A 55A 55F W |
New England New England Neasden Neasden Hull Dairycoates Holbeck (MR) Manningham Withdrawn |
31/12/1950 31/12/1950 14/04/1951 21/04/1951 19/04/1952 19/06/1965 26/02/1966 04/09/1966 |
04/09/1966 | |
4MT | 43070 | 31/08/1950 | 55A 55F 50A 51L 56A 56F 56B 56A 51C 52F W |
Holbeck (MR) Manningham York (North) Thornaby Wakefield Low Moor Ardsley Wakefield West Hartlepool Blyth (North) Withdrawn |
20/07/1957 24/01/1959 07/11/1959 18/02/1961 04/08/1962 11/01/1964 30/01/1965 06/11/1965 25/02/1967 15/07/1967 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |
4MT | 43071 | 31/08/1950 | 51A 51F 52C 52D 51D 51L 50C 50A 50B 50A 52F W |
Darlington West Auckland Blaydon Tweedmouth Middlesbrough Thornaby Selby York (North) Neville Hill York (North) Blyth (North) Withdrawn |
31/08/1950 18/06/1955 16/06/1956 17/11/1956 20/07/1957 14/06/1958 22/11/1958 19/09/1959 26/09/1959 24/10/1959 10/09/1966 06/03/1967 |
06/03/1967 | |
4MT | 43072 | 06/09/1950 | 51A 51D 51D 51L 51A 56A 56F 56B W |
Darlington Middlesbrough Middlesbrough Thornaby Darlington Wakefield Low Moor Ardsley Withdrawn |
06/09/1950 17/03/1951 24/03/1951 14/06/1958 17/09/1960 04/08/1962 25/08/1962 30/03/1963 11/11/1964 |
11/11/1964 | |
4MT | 43073 | 13/09/1950 | 51A 51D 51D 51L 51E 9F 24J 12B 5B 5D 1E 12D W |
Darlington Middlesbrough Middlesbrough Thornaby Stockton Heaton Mersey Lancaster Green Ayre Carlisle Upperby Crewe South Stoke Bletchley Workington Withdrawn |
13/09/1950 17/03/1951 24/03/1951 14/06/1958 07/03/1959 16/05/1959 23/05/1959 06/08/1960 10/11/1962 21/09/1963 23/01/1965 10/07/1965 19/08/1967 |
19/08/1967 | |
4MT | 43074 | 20/09/1950 | 51A 51D 51D 55E 55F W |
Darlington Middlesbrough Middlesbrough Normanton Manningham Withdrawn |
20/09/1950 17/03/1951 24/03/1951 21/09/1957 27/01/1962 26/06/1966 |
26/06/1966 | |
4MT | 43075 | 27/09/1950 | 51A 51F 52A 52B 56B 56A 56B 56A 51L 51C 55B 55H W |
Darlington West Auckland Gateshead Heaton Ardsley Wakefield Ardsley Wakefield Thornaby West Hartlepool Stourton Neville Hill Withdrawn |
27/09/1950 18/06/1955 16/06/1956 15/12/1956 20/07/1957 21/09/1957 14/06/1958 13/06/1959 11/03/1961 26/01/1963 03/08/1963 07/03/1964 29/04/1965 |
29/04/1965 | |
4MT | 43076 | 04/10/1950 | 53A 55D 55A 56F W |
Hull Dairycoates Royston Holbeck (MR) Low Moor Withdrawn |
04/10/1950 09/10/1965 15/07/1967 09/09/1967 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |
4MT | 43077 | 11/10/1950 | 53A 50D 55D 55F W |
Hull Dairycoates Goole Royston Manningham Withdrawn |
11/10/1950 14/08/1965 09/10/1965 25/02/1967 05/1967 |
05/1967 | |
4MT | 43078 | 19/10/1950 | 53A 55D W |
Hull Dairycoates Royston Withdrawn |
19/10/1950 09/10/1965 05/12/1966 |
05/12/1966 | |
4MT | 43079 | 20/10/1950 | 53A 55D W |
Hull Dairycoates Royston Withdrawn |
20/10/1950 09/10/1965 12/1966 |
12/1966 | |
4MT | 43080 | 26/10/1950 | 35A 35C 35A 40F 40E 41E W |
New England Spital Bridge New England Boston Colwick Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
26/10/1950 20/03/1954 25/09/1954 08/01/1958 05/01/1963 16/01/1965 20/06/1965 |
20/06/1965 | |
4MT | 43081 | 27/10/1950 | 35A W |
New England Withdrawn |
27/10/1950 03/01/1965 |
03/01/1965 | |
4MT | 43082 | 03/11/1950 | 35A 41E 41J W |
New England Staveley (Barrow Hill) Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
03/11/1950 30/11/1963 09/10/1965 14/11/1965 |
14/11/1965 | |
4MT | 43083 | 11/11/1950 | 35A 40F W |
New England Boston Withdrawn |
11/11/1950 08/01/1958 28/12/1963 |
28/12/1963 | |
4MT | 43084 | 15/11/1950 | 35A 35B 35B 35A 35A 41E 55B 55F 56A 52F 55E 55A 56F W |
New England Grantham Grantham New England New England Staveley (Barrow Hill) Stourton Manningham Wakefield Blyth (North) Normanton Holbeck (MR) Low Moor Withdrawn |
15/11/1950 14/06/1952 21/06/1952 15/11/1952 29/11/1952 20/06/1964 18/07/1965 28/01/1967 20/05/1967 20/05/1967 15/07/1967 15/07/1967 09/09/1967 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |
4MT | 43085 | 21/11/1950 | 35A 40F 41E W |
New England Boston Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
21/11/1950 08/01/1958 30/11/1963 10/01/1965 |
10/01/1965 | |
4MT | 43086 | 24/11/1950 | 35A 32G 35A 31B 31A 31B 40A 34E W |
New England Melton Constable New England March Cambridge March Lincoln New England Withdrawn |
24/11/1950 20/07/1957 19/10/1957 07/01/1961 22/07/1961 23/06/1962 22/09/1962 11/01/1964 26/12/1964 |
26/12/1964 | |
4MT | 43087 | 29/11/1950 | 35A 35B 35A 31A 31C 41H 41E 34E W |
New England Grantham New England Cambridge Kings Lynn Staveley (G.C.) Staveley (Barrow Hill) New England Withdrawn |
29/11/1950 15/11/1952 13/12/1952 20/07/1957 04/07/1959 02/04/1960 18/05/1963 01/02/1964 26/12/1964 |
26/12/1964 | |
4MT | 43088 | 01/12/1950 | 35A 41E 5B 5D 6C 5B 10D W |
New England Staveley (Barrow Hill) Crewe South Stoke Croes Newydd Crewe South Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/12/1950 09/03/1963 10/10/1964 12/03/1966 22/04/1967 03/06/1967 19/08/1967 23/12/1967 |
23/12/1967 | |
4MT | 43089 | 08/12/1950 | 35A 35A 34E 34E 31A 32G 31A 31C 31B 41B 34E 41E 41J W |
New England New England Neasden Neasden Cambridge Melton Constable Cambridge Kings Lynn March Sheffield Grimesthorpe New England Staveley (Barrow Hill) Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
08/12/1950 31/12/1950 14/04/1951 21/04/1951 25/09/1954 20/07/1957 19/10/1957 14/12/1957 26/11/1960 18/02/1961 15/07/1961 20/06/1964 09/10/1965 14/11/1965 |
14/11/1965 | |
4MT | 43090 | 09/12/1950 | 31D 31C 31B 41E 41E W |
South Lynn Kings Lynn March Staveley (Barrow Hill) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
09/12/1950 07/03/1959 26/11/1960 16/09/1961 18/05/1963 11/04/1965 |
11/04/1965 | |
4MT | 43091 | 13/12/1950 | 31D 40F 40E 41D W |
South Lynn Boston Colwick Canklow Withdrawn |
13/12/1950 07/03/1959 11/01/1964 31/10/1964 06/06/1965 |
06/06/1965 | |
4MT | 43092 | 16/12/1950 | 31D 40F 34E 41E W |
South Lynn Boston New England Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
16/12/1950 07/03/1959 11/01/1964 09/01/1965 11/04/1965 |
11/04/1965 | |
4MT | 43093 | 20/12/1950 | 31D 40F 40E 41D W |
South Lynn Boston Colwick Canklow Withdrawn |
20/12/1950 07/03/1959 11/01/1964 31/10/1964 17/01/1965 |
17/01/1965 | |
4MT | 43094 | 22/12/1950 | 31D 91W 82C 31A 31D 31D 31C 40A 34E W |
South Lynn To Western Region / GWR Swindon Cambridge South Lynn South Lynn Kings Lynn Lincoln New England Withdrawn |
22/12/1950 28/02/1951 30/04/1951 03/11/1951 18/10/1952 01/11/1952 07/03/1959 24/09/1960 26/11/1960 05/01/1964 |
05/01/1964 | |
4MT | 43095 | 23/12/1950 | 31D 40F 40A 34E 10A W |
South Lynn Boston Lincoln New England Carnforth Withdrawn |
23/12/1950 07/03/1959 12/09/1959 11/01/1964 10/10/1964 26/11/1966 |
26/11/1966 | |
4MT | 43096 | 30/12/1950 | 50C 50B 50C 50A 50B 50A 50B 56D 56B 55B 55F W |
Selby Neville Hill Selby York (North) Neville Hill York (North) Hull Dairycoates Mirfield Ardsley Stourton Manningham Withdrawn |
30/12/1950 20/07/1957 21/09/1957 19/09/1959 26/09/1959 24/10/1959 17/06/1961 28/07/1962 15/12/1962 06/11/1965 31/12/1966 03/1967 |
03/1967 | |
4MT | 43097 | 01/1951 | 50C 53A 50A 52F W |
Selby Hull Dairycoates York (North) Blyth (North) Withdrawn |
01/1951 19/09/1959 04/08/1962 10/09/1966 03/01/1967 |
03/01/1967 | |
4MT | 43098 | 31/01/1951 | 50C 53A 55E W |
Selby Hull Dairycoates Normanton Withdrawn |
31/01/1951 19/09/1959 09/10/1965 06/1967 |
06/1967 | |
4MT | 43099 | 31/01/1951 | 50C 56C 56B 51A 55E 55F W |
Selby Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Darlington Normanton Manningham Withdrawn |
31/01/1951 20/06/1959 10/10/1959 07/11/1959 09/10/1965 05/11/1966 07/12/1966 |
07/12/1966 | |
4MT | 43100 | 28/02/1951 | 53A 56C 56B 51C W |
Hull Dairycoates Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
28/02/1951 20/06/1959 10/10/1959 07/11/1959 05/02/1967 |
05/02/1967 | |
4MT | 43101 | 28/02/1951 | 53A 51D 51D 51H 52A 52B 56B 56F 56B 56A 51L 56A 56C 56B 52F W |
Hull Dairycoates Middlesbrough Middlesbrough Kirkby Stephen Gateshead Heaton Ardsley Low Moor Ardsley Wakefield Thornaby Wakefield Copley Hill (Leeds) Ardsley Blyth (North) Withdrawn |
28/02/1951 14/06/1952 21/06/1952 12/11/1955 16/06/1956 15/12/1956 20/07/1957 21/09/1957 14/06/1958 13/06/1959 11/03/1961 04/08/1962 11/01/1964 12/09/1964 06/11/1965 04/1967 |
04/1967 | |
4MT | 43102 | 02/03/1951 | 53A 51D 51D 51L 51A 55B W |
Hull Dairycoates Middlesbrough Middlesbrough Thornaby Darlington Stourton Withdrawn |
02/03/1951 14/06/1952 21/06/1952 14/06/1958 17/09/1960 09/10/1965 07/12/1966 |
07/12/1966 | |
4MT | 43103 | 09/03/1951 | 53A 21A 12D 12A 10A W |
Hull Dairycoates Saltley Kirkby Stephen Carlisle Kingmoor Carnforth Withdrawn |
09/03/1951 16/05/1959 23/04/1960 09/07/1960 24/10/1964 19/11/1966 |
19/11/1966 | |
4MT | 43104 | 16/03/1951 | 31D 31D 40F 40A W |
South Lynn South Lynn Boston Lincoln Withdrawn |
16/03/1951 31/03/1951 07/03/1959 12/09/1959 05/01/1964 |
05/01/1964 | |
4MT | 43105 | 30/03/1951 | 31D 31D 30A 31B 31A 31B 40A 34E 10A W |
South Lynn South Lynn Stratford March Cambridge March Lincoln New England Carnforth Withdrawn |
30/03/1951 31/03/1951 07/03/1959 17/06/1961 22/07/1961 23/06/1962 22/09/1962 11/01/1964 10/10/1964 27/05/1967 |
27/05/1967 | |
4MT | 43106 | 10/04/1951 | 31D 38E 21A 15A 15B 9E 9F 12A 10D W |
South Lynn Woodford Halse Saltley Wellingborough Kettering Trafford Park (LMS) Heaton Mersey Carlisle Kingmoor Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
10/04/1951 21/07/1956 31/03/1962 23/06/1962 23/03/1963 17/08/1963 21/09/1963 27/08/1966 23/09/1967 22/06/1968 |
22/06/1968 | |
4MT | 43107 | 18/05/1951 | 35A 31D 34E 31D 40F W |
New England South Lynn Neasden South Lynn Boston Withdrawn |
18/05/1951 23/06/1951 21/03/1953 24/07/1954 07/03/1959 28/12/1963 |
28/12/1963 | |
4MT | 43108 | 25/05/1951 | 31D 31D 40F 40E 40F 40E 34E 41E 41D 41E 41J W |
South Lynn South Lynn Boston Colwick Boston Colwick New England Staveley (Barrow Hill) Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
25/05/1951 23/06/1951 07/03/1959 01/08/1959 28/01/1961 05/01/1963 11/01/1964 09/01/1965 13/03/1965 19/06/1965 09/10/1965 14/11/1965 |
14/11/1965 | |
4MT | 43109 | 14/06/1951 | 31D 40F 41E 41D 41E 41J W |
South Lynn Boston Staveley (Barrow Hill) Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
14/06/1951 07/03/1959 30/11/1963 13/03/1965 19/06/1965 09/10/1965 14/11/1965 |
14/11/1965 | |
4MT | 43110 | 14/06/1951 | 31D 31C 31D 40F W |
South Lynn Kings Lynn South Lynn Boston Withdrawn |
14/06/1951 20/07/1957 21/09/1957 07/03/1959 28/12/1963 |
28/12/1963 | |
4MT | 43111 | 04/07/1951 | 31D 40F 40E 41B 41E 41E W |
South Lynn Boston Colwick Sheffield Grimesthorpe Staveley (Barrow Hill) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
04/07/1951 07/03/1959 01/08/1959 14/11/1959 29/04/1961 18/05/1963 20/06/1965 |
20/06/1965 | |
4MT | 43112 | 29/03/1951 | 23A 24J 2B 2E 5D 5B W |
Skipton Lancaster Green Ayre Nuneaton Northampton Stoke Crewe South Withdrawn |
29/03/1951 25/10/1958 17/02/1962 16/06/1962 21/09/1963 12/08/1967 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
4MT | 43113 | 13/04/1951 | 23A 24J 2B W |
Skipton Lancaster Green Ayre Nuneaton Withdrawn |
13/04/1951 25/10/1958 17/02/1962 03/09/1966 |
03/09/1966 | |
4MT | 43114 | 09/05/1951 | 19A 20A 20D W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Holbeck (MR) Normanton Withdrawn |
09/05/1951 24/03/1956 11/08/1956 25/11/1963 |
25/11/1963 | |
4MT | 43115 | 19/05/1951 | 19A 17A 24J 2B 2E 5D W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Derby Lancaster Green Ayre Nuneaton Northampton Stoke Withdrawn |
19/05/1951 30/11/1957 04/10/1958 17/02/1962 16/06/1962 21/09/1963 27/05/1967 |
27/05/1967 | |
4MT | 43116 | 01/06/1951 | 20D W |
Normanton Withdrawn |
11/08/1956 22/05/1966 |
22/05/1966 | |
4MT | 43117 | 09/06/1951 | 55B 55F 56A 52F W |
Stourton Manningham Wakefield Blyth (North) Withdrawn |
09/10/1965 05/11/1966 20/05/1967 20/05/1967 01/07/1967 |
01/07/1967 | |
4MT | 43118 | 21/06/1951 | 16A 14A 14A 15A 5D 10H 10D 12D W |
Nottingham Cricklewood East Cricklewood East Wellingborough Stoke Lower Darwen Lostock Hall Workington Withdrawn |
21/06/1951 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 22/09/1962 28/09/1963 06/02/1965 19/02/1966 11/03/1967 18/11/1967 |
18/11/1967 | |
4MT | 43119 | 30/06/1951 | 16A 14C 14A 15A 15B 9E 10H 10D 12E 10A 10D W |
Nottingham St Albans Cricklewood East Wellingborough Kettering Trafford Park (LMS) Lower Darwen Lostock Hall Tebay Carnforth Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
30/06/1951 08/10/1955 16/01/1960 22/09/1962 30/03/1963 17/08/1963 13/02/1965 19/02/1966 26/11/1966 31/12/1966 24/06/1967 12/08/1967 |
12/08/1967 | |
4MT | 43120 | 11/07/1951 | 14A 15A 9F 12A W |
Cricklewood East Wellingborough Heaton Mersey Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
11/07/1951 22/09/1962 14/12/1963 19/06/1965 26/08/1967 |
26/08/1967 | |
4MT | 43121 | 10/08/1951 | 14A 15A 9F 12A W |
Cricklewood East Wellingborough Heaton Mersey Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
10/08/1951 22/09/1962 14/12/1963 19/06/1965 18/11/1967 |
18/11/1967 | |
4MT | 43122 | 21/08/1951 | 53A 51H 53A 21A 1E 12D W |
Hull Dairycoates Kirkby Stephen Hull Dairycoates Saltley Bletchley Workington Withdrawn |
21/08/1951 18/06/1955 16/06/1956 16/05/1959 28/11/1964 10/07/1965 18/03/1967 |
18/03/1967 | |
4MT | 43123 | 28/08/1951 | 50C 53A 51C 50A 52F W |
Selby Hull Dairycoates West Hartlepool York (North) Blyth (North) Withdrawn |
28/08/1951 19/09/1959 17/06/1961 21/05/1966 05/11/1966 01/07/1967 |
01/07/1967 | |
4MT | 43124 | 30/09/1951 | 53A 51H 51A 55A W |
Hull Dairycoates Kirkby Stephen Darlington Holbeck (MR) Withdrawn |
30/09/1951 18/06/1955 21/07/1956 21/09/1957 07/12/1966 |
07/12/1966 | |
4MT | 43125 | 30/09/1951 | 53A 52B 50C 51F 50C 53E 55E 55F 56A 55E W |
Hull Dairycoates Heaton Selby West Auckland Selby Goole Normanton Manningham Wakefield Normanton Withdrawn |
30/09/1951 03/11/1951 22/05/1954 18/06/1955 16/06/1956 19/09/1959 09/10/1965 25/03/1967 20/05/1967 15/07/1967 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |
4MT | 43126 | 05/12/1951 | 53A 52C 52B 56B 56E 52B 52A 52G 52B 52A 52F 50A W |
Hull Dairycoates Blaydon Heaton Ardsley Sowerby Bridge Heaton Gateshead Sunderland Heaton Gateshead Blyth (North) York (North) Withdrawn |
05/12/1951 20/06/1953 23/07/1955 20/07/1957 21/09/1957 25/07/1959 18/06/1960 17/09/1960 11/02/1961 03/06/1961 26/08/1961 16/09/1961 05/04/1966 |
05/04/1966 | |
4MT | 43127 | 12/10/1951 | 53A 34E 35A 35C 34E 36E 41E W |
Hull Dairycoates Neasden New England Spital Bridge New England Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
12/10/1951 19/04/1952 24/07/1954 25/09/1954 06/02/1960 13/05/1961 04/05/1963 10/01/1965 |
10/01/1965 | |
4MT | 43128 | 31/10/1951 | 53A 52B 52C 51H 51C W |
Hull Dairycoates Heaton Blaydon Kirkby Stephen West Hartlepool Withdrawn |
31/10/1951 03/11/1951 20/06/1953 18/06/1955 21/07/1956 12/07/1965 |
12/07/1965 | |
4MT | 43129 | 31/10/1951 | 51A 55E W |
Darlington Normanton Withdrawn |
20/07/1957 26/03/1966 07/1967 |
07/1967 | |
4MT | 43130 | 31/10/1951 | 51H 51A 55A W |
Kirkby Stephen Darlington Holbeck (MR) Withdrawn |
18/06/1955 20/10/1956 21/09/1957 07/1967 |
07/1967 | |
4MT | 43131 | 30/11/1951 | W | Withdrawn | 09/12/1963 | 09/12/1963 | |
4MT | 43132 | 30/11/1951 | 63D 65A 65E 66D 67B 56A 56F 56B 52F W |
Fort William Eastfield Kipps Greenock Ladyburn Hurlford Wakefield Low Moor Ardsley Blyth (North) Withdrawn |
16/05/1953 11/07/1953 17/03/1956 24/03/1962 22/12/1962 09/11/1963 11/01/1964 30/01/1965 06/11/1965 01/12/1966 |
01/12/1966 | |
4MT | 43133 | 30/11/1951 | 65A 63D 65A 65E 66B 66D 67B 51F 50D 50A 52F 52F W |
Eastfield Fort William Eastfield Kipps Motherwell Greenock Ladyburn Hurlford West Auckland Goole York (North) Blyth (North) Blyth (North) Withdrawn |
30/11/1951 16/05/1953 11/07/1953 22/12/1956 24/03/1962 24/03/1962 22/12/1962 02/11/1963 08/02/1964 25/07/1964 13/08/1966 05/11/1966 01/12/1966 |
01/12/1966 | |
4MT | 43134 | 30/11/1951 | 65A 65E 66D 67B 56B W |
Eastfield Kipps Greenock Ladyburn Hurlford Ardsley Withdrawn |
30/11/1951 17/03/1956 24/03/1962 19/01/1963 02/11/1963 24/02/1965 |
24/02/1965 | |
4MT | 43135 | 31/12/1951 | 65A 63D 65A 65C 65D 51L 55B 55F W |
Eastfield Fort William Eastfield Parkhead Dawsholm Thornaby Stourton Manningham Withdrawn |
31/12/1951 16/05/1953 11/07/1953 30/07/1960 21/10/1961 26/10/1963 30/05/1964 16/07/1966 11/1966 |
11/1966 | |
4MT | 43136 | 31/12/1951 | 65A 63A 65A 65C 65D 56B W |
Eastfield Perth South Eastfield Parkhead Dawsholm Ardsley Withdrawn |
31/12/1951 16/04/1955 14/05/1955 30/07/1960 21/10/1961 02/11/1963 20/07/1964 |
20/07/1964 | |
4MT | 43137 | 13/07/1951 | 31D 65A 65A 63D 65A 65F 56A 56C 56A 56B 56A 52F W |
South Lynn Eastfield Eastfield Fort William Eastfield Grangemouth Wakefield Copley Hill (Leeds) Wakefield Ardsley Wakefield Blyth (North) Withdrawn |
13/07/1951 14/07/1951 15/07/1951 16/05/1953 11/07/1953 11/03/1961 02/11/1963 11/01/1964 12/09/1964 30/01/1965 06/11/1965 10/09/1966 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |
4MT | 43138 | 20/07/1951 | 65A 64F 65C 64G 51F 50B 50A 52F 52F W |
Eastfield Bathgate Parkhead Hawick West Auckland Hull Dairycoates York (North) Blyth (North) Blyth (North) Withdrawn |
20/07/1951 17/04/1954 30/07/1960 21/10/1961 12/10/1963 08/02/1964 12/09/1964 13/08/1966 05/11/1966 04/1967 |
04/1967 | |
4MT | 43139 | 27/07/1951 | 12B 12A W |
Carlisle Canal Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
27/07/1951 22/06/1963 30/09/1967 |
30/09/1967 | |
4MT | 43140 | 08/08/1951 | 64E 65B 65C 65D 51F 51L 51A 52F 55B 55E W |
Polmont St Rollox (Balornock) Parkhead Dawsholm West Auckland Thornaby Darlington Blyth (North) Stourton Normanton Withdrawn |
08/08/1951 11/04/1959 30/07/1960 18/11/1961 26/10/1963 07/12/1963 13/06/1964 21/11/1964 19/06/1965 28/01/1967 06/1967 |
06/1967 | |
4MT | 43141 | 15/08/1951 | 64E 64G 65C 66A 51F 50B 56F 56B 55E W |
Polmont Hawick Parkhead Polmadie West Auckland Hull Dairycoates Low Moor Ardsley Normanton Withdrawn |
15/08/1951 05/07/1958 30/07/1960 30/12/1961 19/10/1963 08/02/1964 13/06/1964 28/11/1964 06/11/1965 11/1966 |
11/1966 | |
4MT | 43142 | 22/08/1951 | 31D 40F 36E 40F W |
South Lynn Boston Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Boston Withdrawn |
22/08/1951 07/03/1959 06/05/1961 27/05/1961 28/12/1963 |
28/12/1963 | |
4MT | 43143 | 30/08/1951 | 31D 41E W |
South Lynn Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
30/08/1951 30/11/1963 20/06/1965 |
20/06/1965 | |
4MT | 43144 | 05/09/1951 | 31D 34E 31D 30A 40F 34E 41E W |
South Lynn Neasden South Lynn Stratford Boston New England Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
05/09/1951 21/03/1953 21/08/1954 07/03/1959 03/12/1960 11/01/1964 09/01/1965 11/04/1965 |
11/04/1965 | |
4MT | 43145 | 20/09/1951 | 32F 32F 32G 32G 32A 41H 40E W |
Yarmouth Beach Yarmouth Beach Melton Constable Melton Constable Norwich Thorpe Staveley (G.C.) Colwick Withdrawn |
20/09/1951 06/10/1951 16/02/1952 23/02/1952 07/03/1959 19/03/1960 29/09/1962 10/01/1965 |
10/01/1965 | |
4MT | 43146 | 28/09/1951 | 32G 32A 41B 34E W |
Melton Constable Norwich Thorpe Sheffield Grimesthorpe New England Withdrawn |
28/09/1951 07/03/1959 30/01/1960 15/07/1961 03/01/1965 |
03/01/1965 | |
4MT | 43147 | 08/10/1951 | 32G 40F 34E W |
Melton Constable Boston New England Withdrawn |
08/10/1951 07/03/1959 11/01/1964 26/12/1964 |
26/12/1964 | |
4MT | 43148 | 17/10/1951 | 32G 30A 40E 40F 41E W |
Melton Constable Stratford Colwick Boston Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
17/10/1951 07/03/1959 20/02/1960 28/01/1961 30/11/1963 11/04/1965 |
11/04/1965 | |
4MT | 43149 | 24/10/1951 | 30A 31B 31A 31B 40A 40E 41D 41E 41J W |
Stratford March Cambridge March Lincoln Colwick Canklow Staveley (Barrow Hill) Langwith Junction Withdrawn |
07/03/1959 14/01/1961 22/07/1961 23/06/1962 22/09/1962 11/01/1964 31/10/1964 19/06/1965 09/10/1965 14/11/1965 |
14/11/1965 | |
4MT | 43150 | 07/11/1951 | 30A 34E W |
Stratford New England Withdrawn |
07/03/1959 06/02/1960 03/01/1965 |
03/01/1965 | |
4MT | 43151 | 09/11/1951 | 30A 40E 34E 41E 5B W |
Stratford Colwick New England Staveley (Barrow Hill) Crewe South Withdrawn |
07/03/1959 05/03/1960 19/03/1960 09/03/1963 10/10/1964 18/12/1967 |
18/12/1967 | |
4MT | 43152 | 23/11/1951 | 30E 30A 40E W |
Colchester Stratford Colwick Withdrawn |
07/03/1959 12/12/1959 27/02/1960 05/01/1964 |
05/01/1964 | |
4MT | 43153 | 04/12/1951 | 30E 30A 40A 34E 41E W |
Colchester Stratford Lincoln New England Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
07/03/1959 12/12/1959 24/09/1960 26/11/1960 28/09/1963 20/06/1965 |
20/06/1965 | |
4MT | 43154 | 14/12/1951 | 40F 40E 40A 40E W |
Boston Colwick Lincoln Colwick Withdrawn |
07/03/1959 21/03/1959 14/11/1959 29/09/1962 26/12/1964 |
26/12/1964 | |
4MT | 43155 | 28/12/1951 | 32G 40F 40E W |
Melton Constable Boston Colwick Withdrawn |
28/12/1951 07/03/1959 21/03/1959 10/01/1965 |
10/01/1965 | |
4MT | 43156 | 07/01/1952 | 32G 32F 32F 32G 32G 32A 40E W |
Melton Constable Yarmouth Beach Yarmouth Beach Melton Constable Melton Constable Norwich Thorpe Colwick Withdrawn |
07/01/1952 16/02/1952 23/02/1952 04/10/1952 18/10/1952 07/03/1959 13/02/1960 10/01/1965 |
10/01/1965 | |
4MT | 43157 | 03/07/1952 | 32F 32A 40F 36E 41E W |
Yarmouth Beach Norwich Thorpe Boston Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
03/07/1952 07/03/1959 18/04/1959 15/04/1961 04/05/1963 10/01/1965 |
10/01/1965 | |
4MT | 43158 | 16/07/1952 | 32F 40F 40E 40A 36E 40F 34E W |
Yarmouth Beach Boston Colwick Lincoln Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) Boston New England Withdrawn |
16/07/1952 07/03/1959 21/03/1959 14/11/1959 04/03/1961 15/04/1961 11/01/1964 03/01/1965 |
03/01/1965 | |
4MT | 43159 | 01/08/1952 | 32F 32A 40F 40E 41B 41E 41E W |
Yarmouth Beach Norwich Thorpe Boston Colwick Sheffield Grimesthorpe Staveley (Barrow Hill) Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
01/08/1952 07/03/1959 18/04/1959 01/08/1959 07/11/1959 29/04/1961 18/05/1963 20/06/1965 |
20/06/1965 | |
4MT | 43160 | 14/08/1952 | 32F 32A 41H 41B 40E W |
Yarmouth Beach Norwich Thorpe Staveley (G.C.) Sheffield Grimesthorpe Colwick Withdrawn |
14/08/1952 07/03/1959 03/12/1960 04/02/1961 16/09/1961 10/01/1965 |
10/01/1965 | |
4MT | 43161 | 03/09/1952 | 32F 34E 32F 32A 41H 41B 40E 41E W |
Yarmouth Beach Neasden Yarmouth Beach Norwich Thorpe Staveley (G.C.) Sheffield Grimesthorpe Colwick Staveley (Barrow Hill) Withdrawn |
03/09/1952 21/03/1953 24/07/1954 07/03/1959 03/12/1960 18/02/1961 16/09/1961 09/03/1963 20/06/1965 |
20/06/1965 |