LMS Ivatt "4MT" Class 2-6-0
Date | Number (at time) | Depot (at time) | Code | Details | Ref | Link |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thu 05/08/1954 | 43064 | 35A | Stratford Works visit: Around the works. | RO 9/1954 | ||
Thu 05/08/1954 | 43058, 43149 |
35A, ?? |
Stratford Works visit: Around the works. - Freshly painted on shed/yard. Stratford Works visit: Around the works. - Freshly painted on shed/yard. |
RO 9/1954 | ||
Sat 11/02/1961 | 43016, 43053, 43055, 43071 |
55F, 51C, 50A, 50A |
Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard. Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard. Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard. Darlington Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard. |
|||
Sun 26/02/1961 | 43080, 43158 |
40F, 40A |
Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Erecting shop. Doncaster Works visit.: Around the works. - Works yard. |
|||
Sat 11/11/1961 | 43141 | 65C | Darlington Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. | SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sat 02/12/1961 | 43160 | 40E | Doncaster Works visit: Around the Works - Ex-Works on Doncaster shed. | SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sat 09/12/1961 | 43007, 43009, 43052 |
24J, 12H, 24J |
Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Casual repair shop. Horwich Works visit: Around the Works - Erecting shop. |
SLS 1/1962 | ||
Sun 25/03/1962 | 43055, 43070, 43075, 43101, 43117, 43129 |
50A, 51L, 51L, 51L, ??, 51A |
Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Darlington shed. Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Waiting entry to works on Da Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Waiting entry to works on Da Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Ex-works on Darlington shed. Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Stripping shop yard. Darlington Works visit: Around the works - Works yard. |
SLS 5/1962 | ||
Sun 15/04/1962 | 43017, 43017 |
21A, MRM3 |
Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Test house yard. Horwich Works visit: Around the works - Test house yard. |
SLS 5/1962 | ||
Sat 21/07/1962 | 43158 | 40F | Seen SW of John O'Gaunt running light towards Melton Mowbray after working a train to Leicester Belgrave Road | BackTrack Jan 2007 | ||
Sat 14/11/1964 | 43064, 43091, 43093 |
41D, 41D, 41D |
A visit to Canklow shed: On shed A visit to Canklow shed: On shed A visit to Canklow shed: On shed |
John Thickitt | ||
Sun 29/11/1964 | 43003, 43003, 43012, 43112, 43112 |
5D, W15S, 9F, 5D, W15S |
Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop |
RO 1/1965 | ||
Sun 29/11/1964 | 43001, 43137 |
5B, 56A |
Swindon Works visit: Yard Swindon Works visit: Yard |
RO 1/1965 | ||
Thu 29/04/1965 | 43064, 43091, 43108, 43109 |
41D, 41D, 41D, 41D |
An afternoon at Sheffield Midland station: Sheffield Midland station | John Thickitt - station visit |