Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 663 Today
» 1016 Yesterday
» 1679 Week
» 19731 Month
» 252651 Year
» 1918027 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Ivatt "4MT" Class 2-6-0


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
3000 43000 06/12/1947 09/09/1967 19.75 19.96
3001 43001 20/12/1947 16/09/1967 19.75 20.00
3002 43002 31/12/1947 30/12/1967 20 20.30
3003 43003 17/01/1948 16/09/1967 19.67 19.92
3004 43004 24/01/1948 09/1967 19.67 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 04/1968 20.24
3005 43005 07/02/1948 06/11/1965 17.75 18.04
3006 43006 14/02/1948 02/03/1968 20.08 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 05/1968 20.26
3007 43007 21/02/1948 16/09/1967 19.58 19.83
3008 43008 28/02/1948 02/03/1968 20.08 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 06/1968 20.31
3009 43009 06/03/1948 26/11/1966 18.67 19.12
43010 20/03/1948 30/12/1967 19.75 20.08
43011 25/03/1948 11/02/1967 18.92 19.40
43012 10/04/1948 05/1967 19.08 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 08/1967 19.36
43013 17/04/1948 16/10/1965 17.5 17.76
43014 24/04/1948 03/04/1966 18 18.15
43015 07/05/1948 01/07/1967 19.17 19.54
43016 15/05/1948 30/01/1966 17.67 18.01
43017 22/05/1948 02/12/1967 Workington 19.58 19.78
43018 29/05/1948 22/10/1966 18.42 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 04/1967 18.89
43019 12/06/1948 04/05/1968 Lostock Hall 19.92 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 09/1968 20.27
43020 17/12/1948 08/10/1966 17.83 18.09
43021 22/12/1948 16/09/1967 18.75 18.99
43022 30/12/1948 19/11/1966 17.92 18.38
43023 08/01/1949 30/12/1967 18.92 19.28
43024 21/01/1949 27/05/1967 18.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1967 18.74
43025 28/01/1949 18/09/1965 16.67 16.98
43026 10/02/1949 24/09/1966 17.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 01/1967 17.94
43027 19/02/1949 04/05/1968 Lostock Hall 19.25 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 09/1968 19.58
43028 03/03/1949 02/12/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 18.75 19.00
43029 15/03/1949 30/09/1967 18.5 18.97
43030 25/03/1949 11/1966 17.67 17.82
43031 05/04/1949 12/03/1966 16.92 17.21
43032 14/04/1949 10/01/1965 15.75 16.01
43033 05/05/1949 02/03/1968 18.83 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 05/1968 19.04
43034 18/05/1949 03/06/1967 18.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1967 18.51
43035 26/05/1949 20/11/1965 16.5 16.74
43036 03/06/1949 07/05/1966 16.92 17.38
43037 15/06/1949 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 11/04/1965 15.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 16.09
43038 16/07/1949 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 23/05/1964 14.83 15.18
43039 16/07/1949 Holbeck (MR) 07/12/1966 17.42 17.67
43040 30/07/1949 26/11/1966 17.33 17.64
43041 18/08/1949 12/08/1967 18 18.34
43042 27/08/1949 19/02/1966 16.5 16.81
43043 15/09/1949 10/1967 18.08 18.26
43044 29/09/1949 30/09/1967 18 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1968 18.56
43045 10/10/1949 03/09/1966 16.92 17.28
43046 19/10/1949 25/11/1967 Lostock Hall 18.08 18.37
43047 02/11/1949 30/12/1967 18.08 Cut Arnott Young (Carmyle) 28/02/1968 18.33
43048 12/11/1949 10/05/1967 17.5 18.02
43049 25/11/1949 Derby 05/08/1967 17.75 18.07
43050 31/08/1950 09/09/1967 17.08 17.22
43051 31/07/1950 23/01/1967 16.5 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 04/1967 16.72
43052 10/07/1950 05/11/1966 16.33 16.61
43053 31/08/1950 20/04/1964 13.67 13.97
43054 31/08/1950 Darlington 07/12/1966 16.33 16.55
43055 31/08/1950 Darlington 01/07/1967 16.92 17.22
43056 31/08/1950 Darlington 31/12/1966 16.33 16.55
43057 31/08/1950 Darlington 31/12/1966 16.33 16.55
43058 29/09/1950 New England 26/12/1964 14.25 14.55
43059 11/10/1950 New England 10/01/1965 14.25 14.44
43060 20/10/1950 New England 26/12/1964 14.17 14.50
43061 27/10/1950 New England 05/01/1964 13.25 13.64
43062 03/11/1950 New England 20/06/1965 14.58 14.88
43063 10/11/1950 New England 09/09/1967 16.83 16.94
43064 17/11/1950 New England 20/06/1965 14.58 14.84
43065 24/11/1950 New England 10/01/1965 14.17 14.40
43066 01/12/1950 New England 07/01/1967 16.08 16.46
43067 14/12/1950 New England 11/04/1965 14.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 14.59
43068 20/12/1950 New England 05/01/1964 13.08 13.50
43069 31/12/1950 New England 04/09/1966 15.75 15.97
43070 31/08/1950 09/09/1967 17.08 17.22
43071 31/08/1950 Darlington 06/03/1967 16.58 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 11/1967 17.22
43072 06/09/1950 Darlington 11/11/1964 14.17 14.20
43073 13/09/1950 Darlington 19/08/1967 16.92 17.27
43074 20/09/1950 Darlington 26/06/1966 15.75 16.08
43075 27/09/1950 Darlington 29/04/1965 14.58 14.89
43076 04/10/1950 Hull Dairycoates 09/09/1967 16.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 28/02/1968 17.41
43077 11/10/1950 Hull Dairycoates 05/1967 16.58 16.85
43078 19/10/1950 Hull Dairycoates 05/12/1966 16.17 16.41
43079 20/10/1950 Hull Dairycoates 12/1966 16.17 16.50
43080 26/10/1950 New England 20/06/1965 14.67 14.90
43081 27/10/1950 New England 03/01/1965 14.25 14.48
43082 03/11/1950 New England 14/11/1965 15 15.21
43083 11/11/1950 New England 28/12/1963 13.08 13.52
43084 15/11/1950 New England 09/09/1967 16.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 28/02/1968 17.30
43085 21/11/1950 New England 10/01/1965 14.17 14.41
43086 24/11/1950 New England 26/12/1964 14.08 14.40
43087 29/11/1950 New England 26/12/1964 14.08 14.39
43088 01/12/1950 New England 23/12/1967 17 17.38
43089 08/12/1950 New England 14/11/1965 14.92 15.36
43090 09/12/1950 South Lynn 11/04/1965 14.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 14.61
43091 13/12/1950 South Lynn 06/06/1965 14.5 14.60
43092 16/12/1950 South Lynn 11/04/1965 14.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 14.59
43093 20/12/1950 South Lynn 17/01/1965 14.08 14.33
43094 22/12/1950 South Lynn 05/01/1964 13.08 13.41
43095 23/12/1950 South Lynn 26/11/1966 15.92 16.32
43096 30/12/1950 Selby 03/1967 16.25 16.89
43097 01/1951 Selby 03/01/1967 16 16.51
43098 31/01/1951 Selby 06/1967 16.42 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 09/1967 16.63
43099 31/01/1951 Selby 07/12/1966 15.92 16.13
43100 28/02/1951 Hull Dairycoates 05/02/1967 16 16.05
43101 28/02/1951 Hull Dairycoates 04/1967 16.17 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 11/1967 16.72
43102 02/03/1951 Hull Dairycoates 07/12/1966 15.75 16.05
43103 09/03/1951 Hull Dairycoates 19/11/1966 15.67 16.03
43104 16/03/1951 South Lynn 05/01/1964 12.83 13.09
43105 30/03/1951 South Lynn 27/05/1967 16.17 16.64
43106 10/04/1951 South Lynn 22/06/1968 17.17 Prs Preserved
43107 18/05/1951 New England 28/12/1963 12.58 13.09
43108 25/05/1951 South Lynn 14/11/1965 14.5 14.90
43109 14/06/1951 South Lynn 14/11/1965 14.42 14.60
43110 14/06/1951 South Lynn 28/12/1963 12.5 13.35
43111 04/07/1951 South Lynn 20/06/1965 13.92 14.29
43112 29/03/1951 Skipton 16/09/1967 16.5 16.64
43113 13/04/1951 Skipton 03/09/1966 15.42 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 12/1966 15.68
43114 09/05/1951 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 25/11/1963 12.5 12.70
43115 19/05/1951 Sheffield Grimesthorpe 27/05/1967 16 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 10/1967 16.42
43116 01/06/1951 22/05/1966 14.92 15.22
43117 09/06/1951 01/07/1967 16.08 16.45
43118 21/06/1951 Nottingham 18/11/1967 Workington 16.42 16.75
43119 30/06/1951 Nottingham 12/08/1967 16.17
43120 11/07/1951 Cricklewood East 26/08/1967 16.08 16.44
43121 10/08/1951 Cricklewood East 18/11/1967 Carlisle Kingmoor 16.25 16.56
43122 21/08/1951 Hull Dairycoates 18/03/1967 15.58 16.41
43123 28/08/1951 Selby 01/07/1967 15.92 16.23
43124 30/09/1951 Hull Dairycoates 07/12/1966 15.25 15.47
43125 30/09/1951 Hull Dairycoates 09/09/1967 16 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1968 16.55
43126 05/12/1951 Hull Dairycoates 05/04/1966 14.33 14.62
43127 12/10/1951 Hull Dairycoates 10/01/1965 13.25 13.43
43128 31/10/1951 Hull Dairycoates 12/07/1965 13.75 13.97
43129 31/10/1951 07/1967 15.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1967 16.05
43130 31/10/1951 07/1967 15.75 Cut Cohens (Kettering) 11/1967 16.05
43131 30/11/1951 09/12/1963 12.08 12.13
43132 30/11/1951 01/12/1966 15.08 15.38
43133 30/11/1951 Eastfield 01/12/1966 15.08 15.38
43134 30/11/1951 Eastfield 24/02/1965 13.25 13.47
43135 31/12/1951 Eastfield 11/1966 14.92 15.05
43136 31/12/1951 Eastfield 20/07/1964 12.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1964 12.88
43137 13/07/1951 South Lynn 09/09/1967 16.17 16.35
43138 20/07/1951 Eastfield 04/1967 15.75 Cut Arnott Young (Dinsdale) 11/1967 16.33
43139 27/07/1951 Carlisle Canal 30/09/1967 16.17 16.60
43140 08/08/1951 Polmont 06/1967 15.83 16.28
43141 15/08/1951 Polmont 11/1966 15.25 15.43
43142 22/08/1951 South Lynn 28/12/1963 12.33 12.82
43143 30/08/1951 South Lynn 20/06/1965 13.83 14.14
43144 05/09/1951 South Lynn 11/04/1965 13.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 13.87
43145 20/09/1951 Yarmouth Beach 10/01/1965 13.33 13.58
43146 28/09/1951 Melton Constable 03/01/1965 13.33 13.56
43147 08/10/1951 Melton Constable 26/12/1964 13.17 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 11/1965 14.12
43148 17/10/1951 Melton Constable 11/04/1965 13.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/1965 13.75
43149 24/10/1951 14/11/1965 14.08 14.32
43150 07/11/1951 03/01/1965 13.17 13.36
43151 09/11/1951 18/12/1967 16.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 08/1967 15.78
43152 23/11/1951 05/01/1964 12.17 12.57
43153 04/12/1951 20/06/1965 13.5 13.79
43154 14/12/1951 26/12/1964 13 13.35
43155 28/12/1951 Melton Constable 10/01/1965 13.08 Cut Cashmore's (Newport) 02/1965 13.15
43156 07/01/1952 Melton Constable 10/01/1965 13 13.28
43157 03/07/1952 Yarmouth Beach 10/01/1965 12.5 12.71
43158 16/07/1952 Yarmouth Beach 03/01/1965 12.5 12.67
43159 01/08/1952 Yarmouth Beach 20/06/1965 12.83 13.21
43160 14/08/1952 Yarmouth Beach 10/01/1965 12.42 12.68
43161 03/09/1952 Yarmouth Beach 20/06/1965 12.75 12.96