LMS Fowler "3P" Class 2-6-2T
Class | LMS | LMS (1934) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
3P | 15500 | 1 | 40001 | 18/03/1930 | 11A 8A 1A 1A 3D 8B 8B 1A 6K 9F W |
Carnforth Edge Hill Willesden Willesden Aston Warrington Dallam Warrington Dallam Willesden Rhyl Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/09/1950 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 15/09/1951 29/09/1951 06/10/1951 05/09/1953 21/05/1955 08/10/1955 21/01/1961 |
21/01/1961 |
3P | 15501 | 2 | 40002 | 17/03/1930 | 7A 2E 2E 1A 6D W |
Llandudno Junction Warwick Warwick Willesden Chester Northgate Wolverton Works Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/06/1949 16/07/1949 18/04/1953 03/11/1956 16/06/1957 07/11/1959 |
07/11/1959 |
3P | 15502 | 3 | 40003 | 21/03/1930 | 2A 8A 9B 9B 10B 10A 9B 2B 1A 2C 6H 1A 8D W |
Rugby Edge Hill Stockport Edgeley Stockport Edgeley Preston Springs Branch (Wigan) Stockport Edgeley Nuneaton Willesden Warwick Bangor Willesden Widnes Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/09/1950 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 29/11/1952 21/02/1953 05/09/1953 31/10/1953 19/06/1954 09/10/1954 05/11/1955 10/08/1957 27/08/1960 18/02/1961 |
18/02/1961 |
3P | 15503 | 4 | 40004 | 24/03/1930 | 1C 6D 2A 17E 16C 9F W |
Watford Chester Northgate Rugby Heaton Mersey Mansfield Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/11/1956 23/03/1957 16/06/1957 07/03/1959 04/04/1959 07/11/1959 |
07/11/1959 |
3P | 15504 | 5 | 40005 | 28/03/1930 | 4A 1A W |
Shrewsbury Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/10/1958 07/02/1959 |
07/02/1959 |
3P | 15505 | 6 | 40006 | 01/04/1930 | 8A 1A 3C 1A 1A W |
Edge Hill Willesden Ryecroft (Walsall) Willesden Wolverton Works Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 27/01/1951 19/05/1951 07/02/1959 06/05/1961 13/10/1962 |
13/10/1962 |
3P | 15506 | 7 | 40007 | 08/04/1930 | 8A 8B 2A 8A 1A 1A 8D W |
Edge Hill Warrington Dallam Rugby Edge Hill Willesden Willesden Widnes Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 26/02/1949 16/09/1950 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 27/08/1960 22/07/1961 |
22/07/1961 |
3P | 15507 | 8 | 40008 | 12/04/1930 | 4A 84K 6G W |
Shrewsbury Wrexham Rhosddu Llandudno Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/11/1958 10/01/1959 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 |
3P | 15508 | 9 | 40009 | 23/04/1930 | 2E 1A 9E 9F W |
Warwick Willesden Trafford Park (LMS) Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/03/1949 21/02/1953 08/07/1961 19/05/1962 |
19/05/1962 |
3P | 15509 | 10 | 40010 | 01/05/1930 | 1C 3C 1C 1A 2B 5C 2E 1A W |
Watford Ryecroft (Walsall) Watford Willesden Nuneaton Stafford Northampton Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/12/1956 29/12/1956 14/06/1958 21/05/1960 24/12/1960 18/03/1961 17/06/1961 22/07/1961 |
22/07/1961 |
3P | 15510 | 11 | 40011 | 07/05/1930 | 3C 11A 11A 61C 67A 24L W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Carnforth Carnforth Keith Corkerhill Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/03/1951 29/09/1951 12/04/1958 01/08/1959 29/08/1959 06/08/1960 |
06/08/1960 |
3P | 15511 | 12 | 40012 | 13/05/1930 | 26F 53B 53D 2A 17F 21A 14E 14B 14E W |
Lees (Oldham) Hull Botanic Gardens (on loan) Bridlington Rugby Trafford Park (LMS) Saltley Bedford Kentish Town Bedford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/09/1954 08/04/1956 02/11/1956 16/06/1957 22/03/1958 12/09/1959 07/11/1959 28/11/1959 12/11/1960 |
12/11/1960 |
3P | 15512 | 13 | 40013 | 19/05/1930 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 |
3P | 15513 | 14 | 40014 | 22/05/1930 | 26A 26F 26A W |
Newton Heath Lees (Oldham) Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/05/1950 08/10/1955 07/05/1960 |
07/05/1960 |
3P | 15514 | 15 | 40015 | 30/05/1930 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/03/1961 |
04/03/1961 |
3P | 15515 | 16 | 40016 | 17/11/1930 | 11E 2C 1A 24L W |
Tebay Warwick Willesden Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/10/1950 18/04/1953 13/08/1960 08/07/1961 |
08/07/1961 |
3P | 15516 | 17 | 40017 | 24/11/1930 | 3C 2E 1A 2C 1A 9E 2A 17F W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Warwick Willesden Warwick Willesden Trafford Park (LMS) Rugby Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 19/03/1949 10/03/1951 24/03/1951 21/02/1953 01/12/1956 16/06/1957 07/11/1959 |
07/11/1959 |
3P | 15517 | 18 | 40018 | 01/12/1930 | 2D 1A 3E 3E 1A 9E W |
Nuneaton Willesden Monument Lane Monument Lane Willesden Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/04/1948 06/09/1952 27/12/1952 11/07/1953 29/01/1955 22/07/1961 |
22/07/1961 |
3P | 15518 | 19 | 40019 | 08/12/1930 | 3C 1A W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1952 05/12/1959 |
05/12/1959 |
3P | 15519 | 20 | 40020 | 15/12/1930 | 1C 2C 1C 1A 14E 14B 14E W |
Watford Warwick Watford Willesden Bedford Kentish Town Bedford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/08/1956 06/10/1956 14/06/1958 31/01/1959 24/10/1959 28/11/1959 08/07/1961 |
08/07/1961 |
3P | 15520 | 21 | 40021 | 22/12/1930 | 20G 14B 14B 68D 14B W |
Hellifield Kentish Town Kentish Town Beattock Kentish Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 05/09/1953 14/08/1954 12/09/1959 |
12/09/1959 |
3P | 15521 | 22 | 40022 | 01/01/1931 | 14B 14C 14B 14A 14B 14A W |
Kentish Town St Albans Kentish Town Cricklewood East Kentish Town Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/01/1948 06/02/1960 09/04/1960 18/02/1961 18/08/1962 15/12/1962 |
15/12/1962 |
3P | 15522 | 23 | 40023 | 12/01/1931 | 14B 14A W |
Kentish Town Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 07/11/1959 |
07/11/1959 |
3P | 15523 | 24 | 40024 | 19/01/1931 | 14B 14C 14B 14A 14B W |
Kentish Town St Albans Kentish Town Cricklewood East Kentish Town Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 06/02/1960 25/06/1960 13/08/1960 03/03/1962 |
03/03/1962 |
3P | 15524 | 25 | 40025 | 26/01/1931 | 14A 14C 14A 14C 14E 14B W |
Cricklewood East St Albans Cricklewood East St Albans Bedford Kentish Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1948 10/09/1949 10/01/1959 11/07/1959 19/09/1959 05/12/1959 |
05/12/1959 |
3P | 15525 | 26 | 40026 | 02/02/1931 | 14B 14A 14C 14E 14B W |
Kentish Town Cricklewood East St Albans Bedford Kentish Town Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 10/09/1949 16/01/1960 28/04/1962 01/12/1962 |
01/12/1962 |
3P | 15526 | 27 | 40027 | 09/02/1931 | 14B 14B W |
Kentish Town Kentish Town Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 07/11/1959 |
07/11/1959 |
3P | 15527 | 28 | 40028 | 16/02/1931 | 14B 14B W |
Kentish Town Kentish Town Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 03/12/1960 |
03/12/1960 |
3P | 15528 | 29 | 40029 | 23/02/1931 | 14B 14A 14B 22A 14B 14A 14B W |
Kentish Town Cricklewood East Kentish Town Bristol Barrow Road Kentish Town Cricklewood East Kentish Town Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 08/05/1948 17/07/1948 18/02/1950 16/04/1960 18/02/1961 22/07/1961 |
22/07/1961 |
3P | 15529 | 30 | 40030 | 02/03/1931 | 14A 68D 14A 14B W |
Cricklewood East Beattock Cricklewood East Kentish Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/09/1953 19/06/1954 10/01/1959 29/08/1959 |
29/08/1959 |
3P | 15530 | 31 | 40031 | 09/03/1931 | 14A 14B 14A 14B W |
Cricklewood East Kentish Town Cricklewood East Kentish Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/09/1949 09/04/1960 16/07/1960 01/12/1962 |
01/12/1962 |
3P | 15531 | 32 | 40032 | 16/03/1931 | 14A 14B W |
Cricklewood East Kentish Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/09/1949 22/07/1961 |
22/07/1961 |
3P | 15532 | 33 | 40033 | 23/03/1931 | 14A 14B 14A 14B W |
Cricklewood East Kentish Town Cricklewood East Kentish Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/09/1949 09/04/1960 18/02/1961 23/09/1961 |
23/09/1961 |
3P | 15533 | 34 | 40034 | 30/03/1931 | 14C 14A 14B W |
St Albans Cricklewood East Kentish Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1948 10/09/1949 22/07/1961 |
22/07/1961 |
3P | 15534 | 35 | 40035 | 08/04/1931 | 14B W |
Kentish Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/07/1961 |
22/07/1961 |
3P | 15535 | 36 | 40036 | 20/04/1931 | 14B 14A W |
Kentish Town Cricklewood East Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/04/1960 04/06/1960 |
04/06/1960 |
3P | 15536 | 37 | 40037 | 27/04/1931 | 14B 14C 14B W |
Kentish Town St Albans Kentish Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/12/1956 06/02/1960 22/07/1961 |
22/07/1961 |
3P | 15537 | 38 | 40038 | 04/05/1931 | 14A 14B 14A 14B W |
Cricklewood East Kentish Town Cricklewood East Kentish Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/05/1948 16/04/1960 18/02/1961 22/07/1961 |
22/07/1961 |
3P | 15538 | 39 | 40039 | 11/05/1931 | 14C W |
St Albans Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/12/1959 |
05/12/1959 |
3P | 15539 | 40 | 40040 | 18/05/1931 | 14B 22B 14B W |
Kentish Town Gloucester Barnwood Kentish Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/07/1948 24/01/1953 12/12/1959 |
12/12/1959 |
3P | 15540 | 41 | 40041 | 27/05/1931 | 11A W |
Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1960 |
01/10/1960 |
3P | 15541 | 42 | 40042 | 02/06/1931 | 3C 11B 8B 1A W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Barrow in Furness Warrington Dallam Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 03/07/1948 11/07/1953 22/07/1961 |
22/07/1961 |
3P | 15542 | 43 | 40043 | 15/06/1931 | 1C 6H 1C 1A W |
Watford Bangor Watford Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/11/1955 03/12/1955 14/06/1958 21/11/1959 |
21/11/1959 |
3P | 15543 | 44 | 40044 | 22/06/1931 | 2E 2E 1A W |
Warwick Warwick Willesden Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 17/09/1949 21/11/1959 |
21/11/1959 |
3P | 15544 | 45 | 40045 | 29/06/1931 | 3C 3D 3E 1A 1A 53B 50B 2A 1A W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Aston Monument Lane Willesden Willesden Hull Botanic Gardens Neville Hill Rugby Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1952 09/08/1952 06/09/1952 27/12/1952 18/12/1954 16/06/1956 01/12/1956 16/06/1957 21/11/1959 |
21/11/1959 |
3P | 15545 | 46 | 40046 | 06/07/1931 | 1C 1A W |
Watford Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1948 07/11/1959 |
07/11/1959 |
3P | 15546 | 47 | 40047 | 13/07/1931 | 3B 3C 5D 2B 1A 1A W |
Bushbury Ryecroft (Walsall) Stoke Nuneaton Willesden Wolverton Works Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 23/02/1952 12/07/1952 29/11/1952 22/02/1958 22/03/1958 07/11/1959 |
07/11/1959 |
3P | 15547 | 48 | 40048 | 20/07/1931 | 4A 1A 6G W |
Shrewsbury Willesden Llandudno Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/11/1952 01/11/1958 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 |
3P | 15548 | 49 | 40049 | 27/07/1931 | 3B 2B 1A 67B 1A W |
Bushbury Nuneaton Willesden Hurlford Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/08/1952 01/11/1952 14/02/1959 29/08/1959 22/07/1961 |
22/07/1961 |
3P | 15549 | 50 | 40050 | 03/08/1931 | 8A 16C 16B W |
Edge Hill Mansfield Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/11/1959 09/04/1960 03/06/1961 |
03/06/1961 |
3P | 15550 | 51 | 40051 | 10/08/1931 | 9A 3D 1A 2B W |
Longsight Aston Willesden Nuneaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/03/1948 11/07/1953 21/05/1960 22/04/1961 |
22/04/1961 |
3P | 15551 | 52 | 40052 | 14/08/1931 | 2A 1A 9E W |
Rugby Willesden Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 04/12/1954 19/09/1959 |
19/09/1959 |
3P | 15552 | 53 | 40053 | 09/1931 | 3B 2B 1A 9E 1A 14B 14E W |
Bushbury Nuneaton Willesden Trafford Park (LMS) Willesden Kentish Town Bedford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/08/1952 06/09/1952 04/12/1954 29/01/1955 12/12/1959 26/11/1960 22/07/1961 |
22/07/1961 |
3P | 15553 | 54 | 40054 | 14/09/1931 | 3B 8A 1A 62B 16C 16B W |
Bushbury Edge Hill Willesden Dundee Tay Bridge Mansfield Kirkby in Ashfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/03/1950 29/04/1950 15/02/1958 14/11/1959 09/04/1960 18/02/1961 |
18/02/1961 |
3P | 15554 | 55 | 40055 | 21/09/1931 | 9B 4A 8A 1A 9E W |
Stockport Edgeley Shrewsbury Edge Hill Willesden Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/03/1948 28/01/1950 29/04/1950 04/12/1954 07/11/1959 |
07/11/1959 |
3P | 15555 | 56 | 40056 | 28/09/1931 | 26F 53B 2A 17E 9E W |
Lees (Oldham) Hull Botanic Gardens Rugby Heaton Mersey Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1954 01/12/1956 16/06/1957 03/10/1959 21/11/1959 |
21/11/1959 |
3P | 15556 | 57 | 40057 | 05/10/1931 | 26F 53B 2A 17E W |
Lees (Oldham) Hull Botanic Gardens Rugby Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/09/1954 01/12/1956 16/06/1957 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |
3P | 15557 | 58 | 40058 | 12/10/1931 | 4A 84K 6G W |
Shrewsbury Wrexham Rhosddu Llandudno Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/09/1958 08/11/1958 14/11/1959 |
14/11/1959 |
3P | 15558 | 59 | 40059 | 19/10/1931 | 26F 53B 50B 2A 17E W |
Lees (Oldham) Hull Botanic Gardens Neville Hill Rugby Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/09/1954 16/06/1956 01/12/1956 16/06/1957 07/11/1959 |
07/11/1959 |
3P | 15559 | 60 | 40060 | 06/11/1931 | 26F 53B 53D 53B 2A 6K 1A W |
Lees (Oldham) Hull Botanic Gardens Bridlington Hull Botanic Gardens Rugby Rhyl Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/09/1954 22/10/1955 21/04/1956 01/12/1956 23/03/1957 10/08/1957 26/12/1959 |
26/12/1959 |
3P | 15560 | 61 | 40061 | 21/09/1932 | 26F 53B 2A 1C 2A 17E 17E 9F W |
Lees (Oldham) Hull Botanic Gardens Rugby Watford Rugby Heaton Mersey Heaton Mersey Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/09/1954 01/12/1956 23/03/1957 18/05/1957 16/06/1957 05/10/1957 06/09/1958 05/12/1959 |
05/12/1959 |
3P | 15561 | 62 | 40062 | 27/09/1932 | 26F 26A W |
Lees (Oldham) Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/10/1955 03/12/1960 |
03/12/1960 |
3P | 15562 | 63 | 40063 | 10/1932 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/09/1962 |
08/09/1962 |
3P | 15563 | 64 | 40064 | 05/10/1932 | 20G 11D 3B 1A 14B W |
Hellifield Tebay Bushbury Willesden Kentish Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1951 30/01/1954 19/06/1954 05/12/1959 22/07/1961 |
22/07/1961 |
3P | 15564 | 65 | 40065 | 11/10/1932 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/11/1959 |
07/11/1959 |
3P | 15565 | 66 | 40066 | 19/10/1932 | 3B 2B 1A W |
Bushbury Nuneaton Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/08/1952 06/09/1952 07/11/1959 |
07/11/1959 |
3P | 15566 | 67 | 40067 | 25/10/1932 | 11B 11E 9F W |
Barrow in Furness Tebay Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1948 04/12/1954 26/12/1959 |
26/12/1959 |
3P | 15567 | 68 | 40068 | 02/11/1932 | 11B 9A 11A 3C 3C 3C 5D 2B 1A W |
Barrow in Furness Longsight Carnforth Ryecroft (Walsall) Ryecroft (Walsall) Ryecroft (Walsall) Stoke Nuneaton Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1948 16/10/1948 17/03/1951 24/03/1951 29/09/1951 23/02/1952 12/07/1952 29/11/1952 05/12/1959 |
05/12/1959 |
3P | 15568 | 69 | 40069 | 09/11/1932 | 3C 2E 1A 6D 1A W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Warwick Willesden Chester Northgate Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 18/04/1953 03/11/1956 10/08/1957 05/12/1959 |
05/12/1959 |
3P | 15569 | 70 | 40070 | 16/11/1932 | 11E 11A 6E 6D 1A W |
Tebay Carnforth Wrexham Rhosddu Chester Northgate Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/07/1950 19/05/1956 03/11/1956 10/08/1957 12/03/1960 |
12/03/1960 |