Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 836 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 1910 Week
» 27271 Month
» 260191 Year
» 1925567 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

LMS Stanier "3P" Class 2-6-2T


LMS BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs)
71 40071 15/02/1935 23/12/1961 26.83 27.77
72 40072 15/02/1935 01/09/1962 27.58 28.26
73 40073 20/02/1935 18/08/1962 27.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1963 28.17
74 40074 25/02/1935 17/11/1961 26.75 26.82
75 40075 05/03/1935 08/07/1961 26.33 26.63
76 40076 02/03/1935 20/10/1961 26.58 26.89
77 40077 07/03/1935 08/07/1961 26.33 26.63
78 40078 08/03/1935 01/12/1962 27.75 27.87
79 40079 19/03/1935 21/10/1961 26.58 27.77
80 40080 18/03/1935 08/09/1962 27.5 27.84
81 40081 27/03/1935 21/10/1961 26.58 27.49
82 40082 25/03/1935 27/02/1962 26.92 27.03
83 40083 27/03/1935 01/12/1962 27.75 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 13/04/1963 28.07
84 40084 02/04/1935 21/11/1959 24.58 26.22
85 40085 08/05/1935 07/07/1962 27.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 28.04
86 40086 08/04/1935 24/11/1962 27.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 28.12
87 40087 11/04/1935 24/11/1962 27.58 28.36
88 40088 12/04/1935 21/07/1962 27.25 27.68
89 40089 17/04/1935 04/08/1962 27.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 28.10
90 40090 20/04/1935 21/07/1962 27.25 28.17
91 40091 09/05/1935 21/10/1961 26.42 27.71
92 40092 16/05/1935 20/05/1961 26 26.18
93 40093 16/05/1935 27/01/1962 26.67 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 28.02
94 40094 16/05/1935 07/10/1961 26.42 28.10
95 40095 22/05/1935 21/10/1961 26.42 27.08
96 40096 23/05/1935 21/11/1959 24.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 09/1960 25.33
97 40097 25/05/1935 05/08/1961 26.25 26.41
98 40098 29/05/1935 17/11/1962 27.5 27.71
99 40099 30/05/1935 13/10/1962 27.42 27.98
100 40100 06/1935 18/08/1962 27.17 27.71
101 40101 06/06/1935 21/10/1961 26.33 26.79
102 40102 08/06/1935 21/10/1961 26.33 26.79
103 40103 14/06/1935 21/10/1961 26.33 27.69
104 40104 20/06/1935 15/09/1962 27.25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1963 27.84
105 40105 25/06/1935 21/07/1962 27.08 27.99
106 40106 27/06/1935 24/11/1962 27.42 27.62
107 40107 29/06/1935 02/09/1961 26.25 26.40
108 40108 03/07/1935 25/11/1961 26.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 02/1962 26.64
109 40109 06/07/1935 21/07/1962 27 27.88
110 40110 10/07/1935 05/05/1962 26.83 26.95
111 40111 18/07/1935 20/10/1961 26.25 27.68
112 40112 20/07/1935 19/11/1962 27.33 28.18
113 40113 08/1935 21/07/1962 26.92 27.85
114 40114 03/08/1935 19/11/1962 27.25 27.80
115 40115 07/08/1935 21/10/1961 26.17 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 27.79
116 40116 14/08/1935 24/11/1962 27.25 27.43
117 40117 14/08/1935 19/11/1962 27.25 28.44
118 40118 16/08/1935 19/08/1961 26 26.18
119 40119 21/08/1935 18/08/1962 27 27.58
120 40120 23/08/1935 13/10/1962 27.17 27.75
121 40121 30/08/1935 21/10/1961 26.17 26.56
122 40122 08/1935 23/06/1962 26.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 27.77
123 40123 03/09/1935 21/10/1961 26.08 26.88
124 40124 09/09/1935 02/09/1961 26 28.04
125 40125 07/09/1935 21/11/1959 24.17 26.96
126 40126 11/09/1935 20/05/1961 25.67 25.78
127 40127 13/09/1935 21/11/1959 24.17 26.02
128 40128 18/09/1935 21/07/1962 26.83 27.18
129 40129 19/09/1935 21/10/1961 26.08 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 07/09/1962 26.99
130 40130 21/09/1935 21/10/1961 26.08 26.83
131 40131 26/09/1935 21/10/1961 26.08 26.48
132 40132 28/09/1935 21/10/1961 26.08 26.48
133 40133 03/10/1935 21/10/1961 26 26.80
134 40134 04/10/1935 21/10/1961 26 27.13
135 40135 08/10/1935 24/11/1962 27.08 27.87
136 40136 10/10/1935 21/10/1961 26 26.53
137 40137 15/10/1935 17/11/1962 27.08 27.32
138 40138 17/10/1935 22/09/1962 26.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 27.59
139 40139 19/10/1935 29/10/1959 24 24.17
140 40140 24/10/1935 04/11/1961 26.08 26.08
141 40141 30/10/1935 21/10/1961 26 26.64
142 40142 01/11/1935 22/07/1961 25.67 26.31
143 40143 05/11/1935 21/10/1961 25.92 27.30
144 40144 13/11/1935 23/12/1961 26.08 26.87
145 40145 20/07/1937 22/09/1962 25.17 25.92
146 40146 04/08/1937 04/08/1962 25 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 04/1963 25.71
147 40147 14/08/1937 19/11/1962 25.25 26.52
148 40148 20/08/1937 25/08/1962 25 26.59
149 40149 26/08/1937 28/10/1961 24.17 25.57
150 40150 02/09/1937 29/12/1962 25.25 26.05
151 40151 09/09/1937 29/12/1962 25.25 26.28
152 40152 16/09/1937 08/01/1962 24.33 Cut Arnott Young (Troon) 06/1963 25.76
153 40153 22/09/1937 29/12/1962 25.25 26.25
154 40154 24/09/1937 08/01/1962 24.33 26.07
155 40155 10/1937 29/12/1962 25.17 23.76
156 40156 06/10/1937 28/10/1961 24 25.96
157 40157 09/10/1937 01/12/1962 25.17 25.52
158 40158 14/10/1937 08/01/1962 24.25 25.52
159 40159 21/10/1937 12/1962 25.17 26.08
160 40160 28/10/1937 21/11/1959 22.08 22.56
161 40161 04/11/1937 28/12/1960 23.08 23.22
162 40162 10/11/1937 28/10/1961 23.92 24.20
163 40163 16/11/1937 21/11/1959 22 25.18
164 40164 20/11/1937 13/10/1962 24.92 24.99
165 40165 25/11/1937 28/10/1961 23.92 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 25.48
166 40166 12/1937 28/10/1961 23.83 25.10
167 40167 07/12/1937 28/10/1961 23.83 24.62
168 40168 10/12/1937 28/10/1961 23.83 26.12
169 40169 16/12/1937 23/10/1959 21.83 22.26
170 40170 18/12/1937 08/01/1962 24.08 24.93
171 40171 24/12/1937 20/05/1961 23.42 23.49
172 40172 12/1937 21/11/1959 21.92 22.43
173 40173 05/01/1938 21/07/1962 24.5 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 25.37
174 40174 08/01/1938 09/06/1962 24.42 24.95
175 40175 17/03/1938 28/10/1961 23.58 25.52
176 40176 24/03/1938 29/12/1962 24.75 25.66
177 40177 04/1938 29/12/1962 24.67 25.60
178 40178 08/04/1938 28/10/1961 23.5 23.95
179 40179 14/04/1938 27/02/1962 23.83 23.92
180 40180 22/04/1938 20/01/1962 23.75 23.91
181 40181 28/04/1938 30/03/1962 23.92 25.73
182 40182 05/05/1938 28/10/1961 23.42 24.96
183 40183 12/05/1938 28/10/1961 23.42 24.19
184 40184 20/05/1938 28/10/1961 23.42 25.09
185 40185 18/10/1937 24/02/1962 24.33 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 13/04/1963 25.50
186 40186 21/10/1937 29/12/1962 25.17 26.17
187 40187 26/10/1937 29/12/1962 25.17 25.99
188 40188 29/10/1937 29/12/1962 25.17 26.06
189 40189 02/11/1937 29/12/1962 25.08 26.05
190 40190 24/11/1937 19/11/1962 25 26.24
191 40191 01/12/1937 22/09/1962 24.75 25.55
192 40192 09/12/1937 23/12/1961 24 24.87
193 40193 17/12/1937 25/08/1962 24.67 25.93
194 40194 20/12/1937 28/10/1961 23.83 25.09
195 40195 12/1937 25/11/1961 23.92 25.77
196 40196 03/01/1938 29/12/1962 24.92 25.19
197 40197 06/01/1938 21/07/1962 24.5 24.78
198 40198 10/01/1938 21/07/1962 24.5 25.44
199 40199 24/01/1938 28/10/1961 23.75 24.99
200 40200 27/01/1938 29/12/1962 24.92 25.82
201 40201 03/02/1938 21/07/1962 24.42 24.93
202 40202 14/02/1938 15/09/1962 24.58 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 05/1963 25.26
203 40203 21/02/1938 21/07/1962 24.42 25.02
204 40204 03/03/1938 21/11/1959 21.67 23.22
205 40205 09/03/1938 24/11/1962 24.67 24.86
206 40206 18/03/1938 17/02/1962 23.92 24.51
207 40207 21/04/1938 10/02/1962 23.83 Cut Cashmore's (Great Bridge) 11/1962 24.59
208 40208 22/04/1938 28/10/1961 23.5 24.58
209 40209 21/04/1938 28/10/1961 23.5 24.08