09/12/1935 |
To Service |
2539 |
|
NEW |
5D |
Stoke |
|
11/12/1935 |
To Service |
2538 |
|
NEW |
5D |
Stoke |
|
12/12/1935 |
To Service |
2540 |
|
NEW |
5D |
Stoke |
|
13/12/1935 |
To Service |
2541 |
|
NEW |
5D |
Stoke |
|
16/12/1935 |
To Service |
2542 |
|
NEW |
5D |
Stoke |
|
17/12/1935 |
To Service |
2537 |
|
NEW |
5D |
Stoke |
|
20/12/1935 |
To Service |
2543 |
|
NEW |
5D |
Stoke |
|
23/12/1935 |
To Service |
2544 |
|
NEW |
5D |
Stoke |
|
11/04/1936 |
Reallocation |
2538 |
5D |
Stoke |
1C |
Watford |
|
11/04/1936 |
Reallocation |
2539 |
5D |
Stoke |
1C |
Watford |
|
09/12/1936 |
To Service |
2472 |
|
NEW |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
16/12/1936 |
To Service |
2473 |
|
NEW |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
16/12/1936 |
To Service |
2606 |
|
NEW |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
16/12/1936 |
To Service |
2607 |
|
NEW |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
22/12/1936 |
To Service |
2474 |
|
NEW |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
22/12/1936 |
To Service |
2608 |
|
NEW |
9A |
Longsight |
|
22/12/1936 |
To Service |
2609 |
|
NEW |
9A |
Longsight |
|
30/12/1936 |
To Service |
2475 |
|
NEW |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1937 |
To Service |
2610 |
|
NEW |
3D |
Aston |
|
01/01/1937 |
To Service |
2611 |
|
NEW |
3D |
Aston |
|
09/07/1938 |
Reallocation |
2618 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
23/11/1942 |
To Service |
2668 |
|
NEW |
5D |
Stoke |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
2434 |
|
|
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
2435 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
2446 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
2476 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
2477 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
2546 |
|
|
24A |
Accrington |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
2555 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
2571 |
|
|
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
22/06/1946 |
Reallocation |
2598 |
|
|
1C |
Watford |
|
27/09/1947 |
Reallocation |
2472 |
10C |
Patricroft |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2425 |
|
|
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2426 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2427 |
|
|
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2428 |
|
|
11A |
Carnforth |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2429 |
|
|
11A |
Carnforth |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2430 |
|
|
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2431 |
|
|
11A |
Carnforth |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2432 |
|
|
11A |
Carnforth |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2433 |
|
|
24A |
Accrington |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2434 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2435 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2436 |
|
|
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2437 |
|
|
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2438 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2439 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2440 |
|
|
3D |
Aston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2441 |
|
|
3D |
Aston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2442 |
|
|
2B |
Bletchley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2443 |
|
|
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2444 |
|
|
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2445 |
|
|
1C |
Watford |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2446 |
1A |
Willesden |
1C |
Watford |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2447 |
|
|
5E |
Alsager |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2448 |
|
|
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2449 |
|
|
3D |
Aston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2450 |
|
|
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2451 |
|
|
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2452 |
|
|
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2453 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2454 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2455 |
|
|
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2456 |
|
|
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2457 |
|
|
11D |
Oxenholme |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2458 |
|
|
2B |
Bletchley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2459 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2460 |
|
|
7B |
Bangor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2461 |
|
|
9A |
Longsight |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2462 |
|
|
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2463 |
|
|
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2464 |
|
|
11D |
Oxenholme |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2465 |
|
|
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2466 |
|
|
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2467 |
|
|
9A |
Longsight |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2468 |
|
|
5F |
Uttoxeter |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2469 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2470 |
|
|
3D |
Aston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2471 |
|
|
5E |
Alsager |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2473 |
10C |
Patricroft |
26D |
Bury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2474 |
10C |
Patricroft |
26D |
Bury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2475 |
10C |
Patricroft |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2476 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26D |
Bury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2477 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2478 |
|
|
9A |
Longsight |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2479 |
|
|
14C |
St Albans |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2480 |
|
|
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2481 |
|
|
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2482 |
|
|
1C |
Watford |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2483 |
|
|
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2484 |
|
|
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2485 |
|
|
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2486 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2487 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2488 |
|
|
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2489 |
|
|
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2490 |
|
|
24A |
Accrington |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2491 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2492 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2493 |
|
|
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2494 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2537 |
|
|
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2538 |
1C |
Watford |
3D |
Aston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2539 |
1C |
Watford |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2540 |
|
|
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2541 |
|
|
1C |
Watford |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2542 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2543 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2544 |
|
|
11A |
Carnforth |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2545 |
|
|
26C |
Bolton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2546 |
24A |
Accrington |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2547 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2548 |
|
|
24A |
Accrington |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2549 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2550 |
|
|
26F |
Lees (Oldham) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2551 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2552 |
|
|
3D |
Aston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2553 |
|
|
25D |
Mirfield |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2554 |
|
|
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2555 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2556 |
|
|
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2557 |
|
|
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2558 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2559 |
|
|
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2560 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2561 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2562 |
|
|
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2563 |
|
|
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2564 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2565 |
|
|
26C |
Bolton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2566 |
|
|
2B |
Bletchley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2567 |
|
|
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2568 |
|
|
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2569 |
|
|
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2570 |
|
|
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2571 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2572 |
|
|
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2573 |
|
|
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2574 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2575 |
|
|
9A |
Longsight |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2576 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2577 |
|
|
2A |
Rugby |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2578 |
|
|
3D |
Aston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2579 |
|
|
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2580 |
|
|
9A |
Longsight |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2581 |
|
|
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2582 |
|
|
1C |
Watford |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2583 |
|
|
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2584 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2585 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2586 |
|
|
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2587 |
|
|
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2588 |
|
|
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2589 |
|
|
1C |
Watford |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2590 |
|
|
1C |
Watford |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2591 |
|
|
2B |
Bletchley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2592 |
|
|
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2593 |
|
|
1C |
Watford |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2594 |
|
|
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2595 |
|
|
11D |
Oxenholme |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2596 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2597 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2598 |
1C |
Watford |
1C |
Watford |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2599 |
|
|
9A |
Longsight |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2600 |
|
|
2B |
Bletchley |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2601 |
|
|
11A |
Carnforth |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2602 |
|
|
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2603 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2604 |
|
|
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2605 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2606 |
|
|
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2607 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2608 |
9A |
Longsight |
9A |
Longsight |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2609 |
9A |
Longsight |
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2610 |
3D |
Aston |
1C |
Watford |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2611 |
3D |
Aston |
5E |
Alsager |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2612 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2613 |
|
|
11A |
Carnforth |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2614 |
|
|
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2615 |
|
|
11A |
Carnforth |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2616 |
|
|
3D |
Aston |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2617 |
|
|
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2619 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2620 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2621 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2622 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2623 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2624 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2625 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2626 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2627 |
|
|
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2628 |
|
|
7B |
Bangor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2629 |
|
|
26D |
Bury |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2630 |
|
|
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2631 |
|
|
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2632 |
|
|
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2633 |
|
|
26C |
Bolton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2634 |
|
|
24A |
Accrington |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2635 |
|
|
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2636 |
|
|
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2637 |
|
|
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2638 |
|
|
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2639 |
|
|
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2640 |
|
|
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2641 |
|
|
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2642 |
|
|
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2643 |
|
|
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2644 |
|
|
25F |
Low Moor |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2645 |
|
|
26B |
Agecroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2646 |
|
|
26B |
Agecroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2647 |
|
|
26B |
Agecroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2648 |
|
|
26B |
Agecroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2649 |
|
|
26E |
Bacup |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2650 |
|
|
26E |
Bacup |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2651 |
|
|
26E |
Bacup |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2652 |
|
|
26C |
Bolton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2653 |
|
|
26C |
Bolton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2654 |
|
|
26C |
Bolton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2655 |
|
|
26C |
Bolton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2656 |
|
|
26C |
Bolton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2657 |
|
|
26C |
Bolton |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2658 |
|
|
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2659 |
|
|
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2660 |
|
|
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2661 |
|
|
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2662 |
|
|
10C |
Patricroft |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2663 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2664 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2665 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2666 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2667 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2668 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2669 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2670 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2671 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
01/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2672 |
|
|
5D |
Stoke |
|
17/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2430 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
17/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2573 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
17/01/1948 |
Reallocation |
2581 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
14/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
2472 |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
26C |
Bolton |
|
14/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
2490 |
24A |
Accrington |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
14/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
2596 |
10C |
Patricroft |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
28/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
2450 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
28/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
2451 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
28/02/1948 |
Reallocation |
2663 |
5D |
Stoke |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
|
06/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
2663 |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
5D |
Stoke |
|
06/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
2665 |
5D |
Stoke |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
2583 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
27/03/1948 |
Reallocation |
2602 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
03/04/1948 |
Reallocation |
2570 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
2430 |
11A |
Carnforth |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
2482 |
1C |
Watford |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
2488 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
2491 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
2492 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
2542 |
10C |
Patricroft |
9A |
Longsight |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
2581 |
11A |
Carnforth |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
2613 |
11A |
Carnforth |
11D |
Oxenholme |
|
05/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
2662 |
10C |
Patricroft |
7B |
Bangor |
|
12/06/1948 |
Reallocation |
2549 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
24A |
Accrington |
|
10/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
2427 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
9A |
Longsight |
|
10/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
2430 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
9A |
Longsight |
|
10/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
2594 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
9A |
Longsight |
|
17/07/1948 |
Reallocation |
2427 |
9A |
Longsight |
9C |
Macclesfield |
|
21/08/1948 |
Reallocation |
42610 |
1C |
Watford |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
42439 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
2446 |
1C |
Watford |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
42558 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
23C |
Southport |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
2635 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
26F |
Lees (Oldham) |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
42659 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
02/10/1948 |
Reallocation |
2662 |
7B |
Bangor |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
2442 |
2B |
Bletchley |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
42465 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
Chester (MR) |
|
13/11/1948 |
Reallocation |
42610 |
2B |
Bletchley |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
42465 |
|
|
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
2564 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
11/12/1948 |
Reallocation |
42666 |
5D |
Stoke |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
|
08/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
42455 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
22/01/1949 |
Reallocation |
2427 |
9C |
Macclesfield |
9A |
Longsight |
|
19/02/1949 |
Reallocation |
42431 |
11A |
Carnforth |
5D |
Stoke |
|
05/03/1949 |
Reallocation |
42458 |
2B |
Bletchley |
1C |
Watford |
|
14/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
42644 |
25F |
Low Moor |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
42617 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
7B |
Bangor |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
42644 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
23A |
Bank Hall |
|
28/05/1949 |
Reallocation |
42660 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
7B |
Bangor |
|
25/06/1949 |
Reallocation |
42607 |
5D |
Stoke |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
42479 |
14C |
St Albans |
5D |
Stoke |
|
16/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
42607 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
|
23/07/1949 |
Reallocation |
42479 |
5D |
Stoke |
5D |
Stoke |
|
27/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
42669 |
5D |
Stoke |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
27/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
42670 |
5D |
Stoke |
2C |
Northampton |
|
27/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
42671 |
5D |
Stoke |
2C |
Northampton |
|
27/08/1949 |
Reallocation |
42672 |
5D |
Stoke |
2C |
Northampton |
|
03/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
42671 |
2C |
Northampton |
5D |
Stoke |
|
10/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
42666 |
7A |
Llandudno Junction |
2C |
Northampton |
|
17/09/1949 |
Reallocation |
42588 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
42437 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
24A |
Accrington |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
42454 |
10C |
Patricroft |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
42644 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
01/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
42661 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
24A |
Accrington |
|
29/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
42619 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26E |
Bacup |
|
29/10/1949 |
Reallocation |
42620 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26E |
Bacup |
|
05/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
42453 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
05/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
42670 |
2C |
Northampton |
5D |
Stoke |
|
05/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
42672 |
2C |
Northampton |
5D |
Stoke |
|
30/11/1949 |
Reallocation |
42593 |
1C |
Watford |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
2447 |
5E |
Alsager |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
24/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
42593 |
91M |
To London Midland Region |
1C |
Watford |
|
31/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
42639 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
31/12/1949 |
Reallocation |
42643 |
23A |
Bank Hall |
24A |
Accrington |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
2447 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
42639 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
42643 |
24A |
Accrington |
24A |
Accrington |
|
14/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
42666 |
2C |
Northampton |
2B |
Bletchley |
|
28/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
42443 |
1A |
Willesden |
5D |
Stoke |
|
28/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
42445 |
1C |
Watford |
5D |
Stoke |
|
28/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
42449 |
3D |
Aston |
5D |
Stoke |
|
28/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
42458 |
1C |
Watford |
5D |
Stoke |
|
28/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
42541 |
1C |
Watford |
5D |
Stoke |
|
28/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
42567 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
5D |
Stoke |
|
28/01/1950 |
Reallocation |
42582 |
1C |
Watford |
5D |
Stoke |
|
04/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
42558 |
23C |
Southport |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
25/02/1950 |
Reallocation |
42440 |
3D |
Aston |
5D |
Stoke |
|
04/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
42447 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5E |
Alsager |
|
25/03/1950 |
Reallocation |
42639 |
25B |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
25E |
Sowerby Bridge |
|
20/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
42550 |
26F |
Lees (Oldham) |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
20/05/1950 |
Reallocation |
42635 |
26F |
Lees (Oldham) |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
10/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
42469 |
5D |
Stoke |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
10/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
42588 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
7B |
Bangor |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
42469 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
17/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
42588 |
7B |
Bangor |
7B |
Bangor |
|
24/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
42541 |
5D |
Stoke |
2A |
Rugby |
|
24/06/1950 |
Reallocation |
42585 |
5D |
Stoke |
2A |
Rugby |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
42615 |
11A |
Carnforth |
2A |
Rugby |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
42658 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
3D |
Aston |
|
30/09/1950 |
Reallocation |
42660 |
7B |
Bangor |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
42477 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
25C |
Goole |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
42615 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
42658 |
3D |
Aston |
3D |
Aston |
|
07/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
42660 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
14/10/1950 |
Reallocation |
42469 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
04/11/1950 |
Reallocation |
42469 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
31/12/1950 |
Reallocation |
42553 |
25D |
Mirfield |
25C |
Goole |
|
27/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
42447 |
5E |
Alsager |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
27/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
42489 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3D |
Aston |
|
27/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
42582 |
5D |
Stoke |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
27/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
42667 |
5D |
Stoke |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
42447 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
42489 |
3D |
Aston |
3D |
Aston |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
42582 |
4A |
Bletchley |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
31/01/1951 |
Reallocation |
42667 |
4A |
Bletchley |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
03/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
42584 |
5D |
Stoke |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
24/03/1951 |
Reallocation |
42584 |
4A |
Bletchley |
4A |
Bletchley |
|
09/06/1951 |
Reallocation |
42447 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5E |
Alsager |
|
17/07/1951 |
Reallocation |
42426 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
25/08/1951 |
Reallocation |
42551 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
24A |
Accrington |
|
08/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
42551 |
24A |
Accrington |
24A |
Accrington |
|
29/09/1951 |
Reallocation |
42426 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
42426 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
06/10/1951 |
Reallocation |
42462 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
9A |
Longsight |
|
03/11/1951 |
Reallocation |
42538 |
3D |
Aston |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
29/12/1951 |
Reallocation |
42551 |
24A |
Accrington |
26F |
Lees (Oldham) |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
42448 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
42452 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
42466 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
22/03/1952 |
Reallocation |
42469 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
42446 |
2B |
Bletchley |
2A |
Rugby |
|
17/05/1952 |
Reallocation |
42494 |
5D |
Stoke |
5D |
Stoke |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
42446 |
2A |
Rugby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
42479 |
5D |
Stoke |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
42494 |
5D |
Stoke |
5D |
Stoke |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
42590 |
1C |
Watford |
5D |
Stoke |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
42593 |
1C |
Watford |
5D |
Stoke |
|
14/06/1952 |
Reallocation |
42664 |
5D |
Stoke |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
42455 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6H |
Bangor |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
42466 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
42538 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
42578 |
3D |
Aston |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
42589 |
1C |
Watford |
11E |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
42589 |
11E |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
6K |
Rhyl |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
42589 |
6K |
Rhyl |
11E |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
42598 |
1C |
Watford |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
12/07/1952 |
Reallocation |
42598 |
8E |
Brunswick |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
09/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
42566 |
2B |
Bletchley |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
09/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
42584 |
4A |
Bletchley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
09/08/1952 |
Reallocation |
42666 |
2B |
Bletchley |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
06/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
42600 |
2B |
Bletchley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
06/09/1952 |
Reallocation |
42667 |
4A |
Bletchley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
42563 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
42584 |
5D |
Stoke |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
42612 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
42626 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26C |
Bolton |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
42630 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26C |
Bolton |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
42635 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26C |
Bolton |
|
04/10/1952 |
Reallocation |
42663 |
5D |
Stoke |
6H |
Bangor |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
42444 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
29/11/1952 |
Reallocation |
42663 |
6H |
Bangor |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/01/1953 |
Reallocation |
42666 |
5A |
Crewe North |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
42449 |
5D |
Stoke |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
42468 |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
2A |
Rugby |
|
21/02/1953 |
Reallocation |
42670 |
5D |
Stoke |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
42449 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5D |
Stoke |
|
18/04/1953 |
Reallocation |
42670 |
5A |
Crewe North |
5D |
Stoke |
|
16/05/1953 |
Reallocation |
42468 |
2A |
Rugby |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
42439 |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
42444 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6H |
Bangor |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
42461 |
9A |
Longsight |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
11/07/1953 |
Reallocation |
42672 |
5D |
Stoke |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
05/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
42462 |
9A |
Longsight |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
05/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
42605 |
5D |
Stoke |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
|
05/09/1953 |
Reallocation |
42672 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5D |
Stoke |
|
31/10/1953 |
Reallocation |
42591 |
2B |
Bletchley |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
42473 |
26D |
Bury |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
42474 |
26D |
Bury |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
42476 |
26D |
Bury |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
42597 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
28/11/1953 |
Reallocation |
42629 |
26D |
Bury |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
02/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
42445 |
5D |
Stoke |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
02/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
42580 |
9A |
Longsight |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
02/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
42628 |
7B |
Bangor |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
30/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
42442 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
30/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
42651 |
26E |
Bacup |
26D |
Bury |
|
30/01/1954 |
Reallocation |
42669 |
2B |
Bletchley |
2A |
Rugby |
|
27/02/1954 |
Reallocation |
42445 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
24/04/1954 |
Reallocation |
42580 |
1E |
Bletchley |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
24/04/1954 |
Reallocation |
42582 |
4A |
Bletchley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
42473 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
26D |
Bury |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
42474 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
26D |
Bury |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
42476 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
26D |
Bury |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
42625 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26D |
Bury |
|
19/06/1954 |
Reallocation |
42629 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
26C |
Bolton |
|
17/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
42476 |
26D |
Bury |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
17/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
42591 |
10C |
Patricroft |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
17/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
42596 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
17/07/1954 |
Reallocation |
42664 |
8E |
Brunswick |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
14/08/1954 |
Reallocation |
42427 |
9A |
Longsight |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
14/08/1954 |
Reallocation |
42473 |
26D |
Bury |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
11/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
42474 |
26D |
Bury |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
11/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
42538 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
5C |
Stafford |
|
11/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
42562 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
5C |
Stafford |
|
11/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
42566 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9G |
Northwich |
|
11/09/1954 |
Reallocation |
42578 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
5C |
Stafford |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
42453 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
42625 |
26D |
Bury |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
09/10/1954 |
Reallocation |
42651 |
26D |
Bury |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
42619 |
26E |
Bacup |
26D |
Bury |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
42620 |
26E |
Bacup |
26D |
Bury |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
42649 |
26E |
Bacup |
26D |
Bury |
|
06/11/1954 |
Reallocation |
42650 |
26E |
Bacup |
26D |
Bury |
|
04/12/1954 |
Reallocation |
42566 |
9G |
Northwich |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
29/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
42541 |
2A |
Rugby |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
29/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
42597 |
8E |
Brunswick |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
29/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
42619 |
26D |
Bury |
24A |
Accrington |
|
29/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
42620 |
26D |
Bury |
24A |
Accrington |
|
29/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
42649 |
26D |
Bury |
25F |
Low Moor |
|
29/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
42650 |
26D |
Bury |
25F |
Low Moor |
|
29/01/1955 |
Reallocation |
42669 |
2A |
Rugby |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
26/02/1955 |
Reallocation |
42441 |
3D |
Aston |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
26/02/1955 |
Reallocation |
42541 |
1E |
Bletchley |
2A |
Rugby |
|
26/02/1955 |
Reallocation |
42544 |
11A |
Carnforth |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
26/02/1955 |
Reallocation |
42597 |
1E |
Bletchley |
9A |
Longsight |
|
26/02/1955 |
Reallocation |
42669 |
1E |
Bletchley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
26/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
42537 |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
27C |
Southport |
|
26/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
42601 |
11A |
Carnforth |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
26/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
42659 |
2B |
Bletchley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
26/03/1955 |
Reallocation |
42669 |
5D |
Stoke |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
23/04/1955 |
Reallocation |
42428 |
11A |
Carnforth |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
23/04/1955 |
Reallocation |
42429 |
11A |
Carnforth |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
23/04/1955 |
Reallocation |
42601 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
21/05/1955 |
Reallocation |
42657 |
26C |
Bolton |
26F |
Lees (Oldham) |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
42487 |
2A |
Rugby |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
16/07/1955 |
Reallocation |
42662 |
10C |
Patricroft |
6H |
Bangor |
|
08/10/1955 |
Reallocation |
42662 |
6H |
Bangor |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
05/11/1955 |
Reallocation |
42446 |
2A |
Rugby |
2F |
Market Harborough |
|
05/11/1955 |
Reallocation |
42566 |
5A |
Crewe North |
9A |
Longsight |
|
03/12/1955 |
Reallocation |
42566 |
9A |
Longsight |
6H |
Bangor |
|
28/01/1956 |
Reallocation |
42566 |
6H |
Bangor |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
25/02/1956 |
Reallocation |
42427 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
24/03/1956 |
Reallocation |
42477 |
25C |
Goole |
25D |
Mirfield |
|
24/03/1956 |
Reallocation |
42489 |
3D |
Aston |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
24/03/1956 |
Reallocation |
42552 |
3D |
Aston |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
24/03/1956 |
Reallocation |
42553 |
25C |
Goole |
25D |
Mirfield |
|
24/03/1956 |
Reallocation |
42601 |
3B |
Bushbury |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
24/03/1956 |
Reallocation |
42658 |
3D |
Aston |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
21/04/1956 |
Reallocation |
42427 |
11A |
Carnforth |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
19/05/1956 |
Reallocation |
42467 |
9A |
Longsight |
9G |
Northwich |
|
19/05/1956 |
Reallocation |
42573 |
11A |
Carnforth |
2A |
Rugby |
|
19/05/1956 |
Reallocation |
42575 |
9A |
Longsight |
9G |
Northwich |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
42453 |
10C |
Patricroft |
6H |
Bangor |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
42465 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
16/06/1956 |
Reallocation |
42622 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
25F |
Low Moor |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
42447 |
5E |
Alsager |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
42465 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
42542 |
9A |
Longsight |
11A |
Carnforth |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
42563 |
10C |
Patricroft |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
11/08/1956 |
Reallocation |
42610 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
42425 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
5C |
Stafford |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
42444 |
6H |
Bangor |
26D |
Bury |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
42450 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
42451 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
42453 |
6H |
Bangor |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
42455 |
6H |
Bangor |
26D |
Bury |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
42460 |
7B |
Bangor |
26D |
Bury |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
42461 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
42540 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
42563 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
42568 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
42587 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
42588 |
7B |
Bangor |
26D |
Bury |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
42595 |
11D |
Oxenholme |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
42610 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
42617 |
7B |
Bangor |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
06/10/1956 |
Reallocation |
42660 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
42597 |
9A |
Longsight |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
42599 |
9A |
Longsight |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
03/11/1956 |
Reallocation |
42608 |
9A |
Longsight |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
42445 |
8E |
Brunswick |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
42493 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
42564 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
42601 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
01/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
42652 |
26C |
Bolton |
26D |
Bury |
|
29/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
42487 |
1E |
Bletchley |
1A |
Willesden |
|
29/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
42489 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
2A |
Rugby |
|
29/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
42564 |
6J |
Holyhead |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
29/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
42601 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
29/12/1956 |
Reallocation |
42669 |
1E |
Bletchley |
2A |
Rugby |
|
26/01/1957 |
Reallocation |
42445 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
23/02/1957 |
Reallocation |
42571 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
23/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
42454 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
5D |
Stoke |
|
23/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
42463 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
23/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
42539 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
23/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
42565 |
26C |
Bolton |
26D |
Bury |
|
23/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
42575 |
9G |
Northwich |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
23/03/1957 |
Reallocation |
42663 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
5D |
Stoke |
|
10/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
42618 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26C |
Bolton |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
42542 |
11A |
Carnforth |
9A |
Longsight |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
42550 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26C |
Bolton |
|
20/04/1957 |
Reallocation |
42565 |
26D |
Bury |
26C |
Bolton |
|
18/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
42484 |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
24H |
Hellifield |
|
18/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
42491 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
24H |
Hellifield |
|
18/05/1957 |
Reallocation |
42492 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
24H |
Hellifield |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
42539 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
16/06/1957 |
Reallocation |
42664 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
42426 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
6H |
Bangor |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
42430 |
9A |
Longsight |
6H |
Bangor |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
42449 |
5D |
Stoke |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
42471 |
5E |
Alsager |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
42478 |
9A |
Longsight |
6H |
Bangor |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
42560 |
10C |
Patricroft |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
42566 |
5A |
Crewe North |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
42611 |
5E |
Alsager |
6H |
Bangor |
|
10/08/1957 |
Reallocation |
42634 |
24A |
Accrington |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
42449 |
3B |
Bushbury |
5D |
Stoke |
|
07/09/1957 |
Reallocation |
42566 |
3B |
Bushbury |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
42431 |
5D |
Stoke |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
42440 |
5D |
Stoke |
9G |
Northwich |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
42449 |
5D |
Stoke |
9G |
Northwich |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
42458 |
5D |
Stoke |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
42468 |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
5C |
Stafford |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
42494 |
5D |
Stoke |
5C |
Stafford |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
42552 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3D |
Aston |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
42601 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3D |
Aston |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
42605 |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
5C |
Stafford |
|
05/10/1957 |
Reallocation |
42658 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
42435 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
5D |
Stoke |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
42475 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
5D |
Stoke |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
42488 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
42544 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
2A |
Rugby |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
42560 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
3D |
Aston |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
42566 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2C |
Warwick |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
42594 |
9A |
Longsight |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
42636 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
30/11/1957 |
Reallocation |
42637 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
28/12/1957 |
Reallocation |
42426 |
6H |
Bangor |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
28/12/1957 |
Reallocation |
42430 |
6H |
Bangor |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
28/12/1957 |
Reallocation |
42435 |
5D |
Stoke |
27C |
Southport |
|
28/12/1957 |
Reallocation |
42468 |
5C |
Stafford |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
28/12/1957 |
Reallocation |
42475 |
5D |
Stoke |
27C |
Southport |
|
28/12/1957 |
Reallocation |
42494 |
5C |
Stafford |
5D |
Stoke |
|
28/12/1957 |
Reallocation |
42542 |
9A |
Longsight |
9G |
Northwich |
|
28/12/1957 |
Reallocation |
42571 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
2A |
Rugby |
|
28/12/1957 |
Reallocation |
42602 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
2A |
Rugby |
|
28/12/1957 |
Reallocation |
42605 |
5C |
Stafford |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
|
25/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
42445 |
8E |
Brunswick |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
25/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
42466 |
8E |
Brunswick |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
25/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
42479 |
8E |
Brunswick |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
25/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
42571 |
2A |
Rugby |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
25/01/1958 |
Reallocation |
42602 |
2A |
Rugby |
9A |
Longsight |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
42448 |
8E |
Brunswick |
8E |
Brunswick |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
42480 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
24A |
Accrington |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
42548 |
24A |
Accrington |
24A |
Accrington |
|
22/02/1958 |
Reallocation |
42628 |
8E |
Brunswick |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
42440 |
9G |
Northwich |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
42449 |
9G |
Northwich |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
42467 |
9G |
Northwich |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
42494 |
5D |
Stoke |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
42542 |
9G |
Northwich |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
42560 |
3D |
Aston |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
42578 |
5C |
Stafford |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
42601 |
3D |
Aston |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
22/03/1958 |
Reallocation |
42602 |
9A |
Longsight |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
19/04/1958 |
Reallocation |
42427 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
42427 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
11B |
Workington |
|
17/05/1958 |
Reallocation |
42544 |
2A |
Rugby |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
07/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
42618 |
26C |
Bolton |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
42441 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
3A |
Bescot |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
42477 |
25D |
Mirfield |
50A |
York (North) |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
42482 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
6H |
Bangor |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
42494 |
26F |
Patricroft |
6H |
Bangor |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
42550 |
26C |
Bolton |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
42553 |
25D |
Mirfield |
50A |
York (North) |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
42560 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
3A |
Bescot |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
42586 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
6H |
Bangor |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
42604 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
6H |
Bangor |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
42627 |
3C |
Ryecroft (Walsall) |
6H |
Bangor |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
42637 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
2C |
Warwick |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
42639 |
25E |
Sowerby Bridge |
50A |
York (North) |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
42652 |
26D |
Bury |
26C |
Bolton |
|
14/06/1958 |
Reallocation |
42658 |
3B |
Bushbury |
3D |
Aston |
|
12/07/1958 |
Reallocation |
42429 |
3B |
Bushbury |
2A |
Rugby |
|
12/07/1958 |
Reallocation |
42538 |
5C |
Stafford |
6H |
Bangor |
|
12/07/1958 |
Reallocation |
42576 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
12/07/1958 |
Reallocation |
42621 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
27C |
Southport |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
42429 |
2A |
Rugby |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
42451 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
09/08/1958 |
Reallocation |
42486 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
01/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
42618 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26A |
Neasden |
|
06/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
42427 |
11B |
Workington |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
|
06/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
42450 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
14D |
Neasden |
|
06/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
42451 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
06/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
42461 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
06/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
42488 |
3B |
Bushbury |
3E |
Monument Lane |
|
06/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
42568 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
14D |
Neasden |
|
06/09/1958 |
Reallocation |
42591 |
11A |
Carnforth |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
42437 |
24A |
Accrington |
14D |
Neasden |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
42441 |
3A |
Bescot |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
42461 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
42478 |
6H |
Bangor |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
42482 |
6H |
Bangor |
1A |
Willesden |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
42490 |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
14D |
Neasden |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
42494 |
6H |
Bangor |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
42538 |
6H |
Bangor |
1A |
Willesden |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
42550 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
26D |
Bury |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
42556 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
14D |
Neasden |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
42560 |
3A |
Bescot |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
42586 |
6H |
Bangor |
1A |
Willesden |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
42588 |
26D |
Bury |
14D |
Neasden |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
42604 |
6H |
Bangor |
1A |
Willesden |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
42611 |
6H |
Bangor |
1A |
Willesden |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
42627 |
6H |
Bangor |
1A |
Willesden |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
42629 |
26C |
Bolton |
14D |
Neasden |
|
04/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
42636 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
14D |
Neasden |
|
05/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
42618 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
14D |
Neasden |
|
11/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
42477 |
50A |
York (North) |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
11/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
42553 |
50A |
York (North) |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
11/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
42639 |
50A |
York (North) |
50B |
Neville Hill |
|
25/10/1958 |
Reallocation |
42475 |
27C |
Southport |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
01/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
42453 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
14D |
Neasden |
|
01/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
42595 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
14D |
Neasden |
|
08/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
42463 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
24K |
Preston |
|
08/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
42616 |
3D |
Aston |
24K |
Preston |
|
15/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
42566 |
2C |
Warwick |
2A |
Rugby |
|
15/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
42579 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
24K |
Preston |
|
15/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
42616 |
24K |
Preston |
3D |
Aston |
|
22/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
42615 |
2A |
Rugby |
2E |
Northampton |
|
29/11/1958 |
Reallocation |
42566 |
2A |
Rugby |
84D |
Leamington |
|
20/12/1958 |
Reallocation |
42566 |
84D |
Leamington |
2A |
Rugby |
|
03/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
42648 |
26B |
Agecroft |
24H |
Hellifield |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
42490 |
14D |
Neasden |
18C |
Hasland |
|
10/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
42636 |
14D |
Neasden |
16D |
Annesley |
|
17/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
42636 |
16D |
Annesley |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
31/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
42477 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50D |
Starbeck |
|
31/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
42553 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50D |
Starbeck |
|
31/01/1959 |
Reallocation |
42639 |
50B |
Neville Hill |
50D |
Starbeck |
|
14/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
42463 |
24K |
Preston |
1A |
Willesden |
|
14/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
42579 |
24K |
Preston |
1A |
Willesden |
|
21/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
42560 |
3B |
Bushbury |
9G |
Gorton |
|
21/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
42566 |
2A |
Rugby |
84D |
Leamington |
|
28/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
42430 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
28/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
42467 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
28/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
42489 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
28/02/1959 |
Reallocation |
42585 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
07/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
42548 |
24A |
Accrington |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
07/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
42549 |
24A |
Accrington |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
14/03/1959 |
Reallocation |
42429 |
3B |
Bushbury |
9G |
Gorton |
|
04/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
42428 |
3B |
Bushbury |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
04/04/1959 |
Reallocation |
42587 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
14C |
St Albans |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
42425 |
5C |
Stafford |
6H |
Bangor |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
42440 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
42451 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
27C |
Southport |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
42455 |
26D |
Bury |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
42477 |
50D |
Starbeck |
50A |
York (North) |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
42478 |
26F |
Patricroft |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
42480 |
24A |
Accrington |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
42482 |
1A |
Willesden |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
42487 |
1A |
Willesden |
6H |
Bangor |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
42489 |
1A |
Willesden |
6H |
Bangor |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
42540 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
14D |
Neasden |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
42544 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6H |
Bangor |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
42553 |
50D |
Starbeck |
50A |
York (North) |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
42562 |
5C |
Stafford |
6H |
Bangor |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
42567 |
5D |
Stoke |
6H |
Bangor |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
42601 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
6H |
Bangor |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
42639 |
50D |
Starbeck |
50A |
York (North) |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
42657 |
26F |
Lees (Oldham) |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
20/06/1959 |
Reallocation |
42666 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
|
11/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
42574 |
10C |
Patricroft |
8E |
Northwich |
|
11/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
42576 |
1A |
Willesden |
8E |
Northwich |
|
18/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
42490 |
18C |
Hasland |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
25/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
42568 |
14D |
Neasden |
91X |
To Scottish Region |
|
25/07/1959 |
Reallocation |
42594 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
6H |
Bangor |
|
08/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
42551 |
26F |
Lees (Oldham) |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
08/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
42568 |
91X |
To Scottish Region |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
08/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
42574 |
8E |
Northwich |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
08/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
42576 |
8E |
Northwich |
1A |
Willesden |
|
15/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
42441 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
15/08/1959 |
Reallocation |
42602 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
42429 |
9G |
Gorton |
27E |
Walton on the Hill |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
42467 |
1E |
Bletchley |
2A |
Rugby |
|
05/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
42594 |
6H |
Bangor |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
19/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
42568 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
14D |
Neasden |
|
26/09/1959 |
Reallocation |
42621 |
27C |
Southport |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
10/10/1959 |
Reallocation |
42429 |
27E |
Walton on the Hill |
9G |
Gorton |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
42432 |
11A |
Carnforth |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
42467 |
2A |
Rugby |
2E |
Northampton |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
42582 |
5D |
Stoke |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
42591 |
24L |
Carnforth |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
|
07/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
42659 |
5D |
Stoke |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
14/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
42425 |
6H |
Bangor |
6J |
Holyhead |
|
14/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
42472 |
26C |
Bolton |
26C |
Gorton |
|
14/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
42622 |
25F |
Low Moor |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
14/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
42649 |
25F |
Low Moor |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
14/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
42650 |
25F |
Low Moor |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
28/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
42562 |
6H |
Bangor |
14D |
Neasden |
|
28/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
42645 |
26B |
Agecroft |
87E |
Landore |
|
28/11/1959 |
Reallocation |
42651 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
87E |
Landore |
|
12/1959 |
Reallocation |
42472 |
26C |
Bolton |
9G |
Gorton |
|
05/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
42425 |
6J |
Holyhead |
6H |
Bangor |
|
12/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
42459 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
1A |
Willesden |
|
12/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
42567 |
6H |
Bangor |
14D |
Neasden |
|
12/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
42583 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
1A |
Willesden |
|
12/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
42597 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
14D |
Neasden |
|
12/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
42601 |
6H |
Bangor |
14D |
Neasden |
|
12/12/1959 |
Reallocation |
42616 |
3D |
Aston |
1A |
Willesden |
|
02/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
42459 |
1A |
Willesden |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
02/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
42583 |
1A |
Willesden |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
02/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
42616 |
1A |
Willesden |
3D |
Aston |
|
09/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
42433 |
24A |
Accrington |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
09/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
42439 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
09/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
42474 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
09/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
42560 |
9G |
Gorton |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
09/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
42619 |
24A |
Accrington |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
09/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
42661 |
24A |
Accrington |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
23/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
42620 |
24A |
Accrington |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
30/01/1960 |
Reallocation |
42562 |
14D |
Neasden |
6H |
Bangor |
|
06/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
42428 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
06/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
42437 |
14D |
Neasden |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
06/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
42453 |
14D |
Neasden |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
06/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
42456 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
06/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
42467 |
2E |
Northampton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
06/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
42587 |
14C |
St Albans |
17A |
Derby |
|
06/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
42595 |
14D |
Neasden |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
20/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
42567 |
14D |
Neasden |
6H |
Bangor |
|
20/02/1960 |
Reallocation |
42597 |
14D |
Neasden |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
05/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
42449 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
11C |
Oxenholme |
|
05/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
42542 |
12A |
Carlisle Kingmoor |
9A |
Longsight |
|
05/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
42601 |
14D |
Neasden |
1B |
Camden |
|
12/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
42568 |
14D |
Neasden |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
19/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
42437 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
19/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
42453 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
19/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
42464 |
11D |
Oxenholme |
5D |
Stoke |
|
19/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
42556 |
14D |
Neasden |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
26/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
42478 |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
2A |
Rugby |
|
26/03/1960 |
Reallocation |
42564 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
2A |
Rugby |
|
16/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
42459 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
5D |
Stoke |
|
16/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
42651 |
87E |
Landore |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
30/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
42446 |
2F |
Market Harborough |
21A |
Saltley |
|
30/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
42624 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
30/04/1960 |
Reallocation |
42662 |
10C |
Patricroft |
24A |
Accrington |
|
07/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
42463 |
1A |
Willesden |
14D |
Neasden |
|
14/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
42463 |
14D |
Neasden |
1A |
Willesden |
|
14/05/1960 |
Condemned |
42490 |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
COND |
|
21/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
42588 |
14D |
Neasden |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
28/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
42539 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
9A |
Longsight |
|
28/05/1960 |
Reallocation |
42628 |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
27F |
Brunswick |
|
04/06/1960 |
Condemned |
42450 |
14D |
Neasden |
|
COND |
|
11/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
42464 |
5D |
Stoke |
12G |
Oxenholme |
|
11/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
42563 |
10C |
Patricroft |
26C |
Bolton |
|
11/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
42567 |
6H |
Bangor |
6H |
Bangor |
|
11/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
42571 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
11/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
42578 |
5A |
Crewe North |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
11/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
42601 |
1B |
Camden |
6H |
Bangor |
|
13/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
42446 |
21A |
Saltley |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
42440 |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
42454 |
5D |
Stoke |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
42459 |
5D |
Stoke |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
42477 |
50A |
York (North) |
50F |
Malton |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
42478 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
42555 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
42570 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9C |
Macclesfield |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
42583 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
9A |
Longsight |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
42639 |
50A |
York (North) |
50F |
Malton |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
42649 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
42650 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
18/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
42662 |
24A |
Accrington |
27C |
Southport |
|
25/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
42564 |
2A |
Rugby |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
25/06/1960 |
Reallocation |
42645 |
87E |
Landore |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
02/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
42571 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
12G |
Oxenholme |
|
02/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
42645 |
26B |
Agecroft |
27C |
Southport |
|
09/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
42594 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12G |
Oxenholme |
|
16/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
42576 |
1A |
Willesden |
6H |
Bangor |
|
16/07/1960 |
Reallocation |
42579 |
1A |
Willesden |
6H |
Bangor |
|
06/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
42431 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6H |
Bangor |
|
06/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
42482 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6H |
Bangor |
|
20/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
42431 |
6H |
Bangor |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
20/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
42446 |
15C |
Leicester Midland |
6H |
Bangor |
|
20/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
42482 |
6H |
Bangor |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
20/08/1960 |
Reallocation |
42658 |
3D |
Aston |
9A |
Longsight |
|
10/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
42622 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
42425 |
6H |
Bangor |
9A |
Longsight |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
42562 |
6H |
Bangor |
5D |
Stoke |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
42576 |
6H |
Bangor |
2E |
Northampton |
|
17/09/1960 |
Reallocation |
42579 |
6H |
Bangor |
2E |
Northampton |
|
22/10/1960 |
Reallocation |
42449 |
11C |
Oxenholme |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
05/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
42440 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
12/11/1960 |
Reallocation |
42562 |
5D |
Stoke |
2A |
Rugby |
|
17/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
42579 |
2E |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
31/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
42566 |
84D |
Leamington |
87E |
Landore |
|
31/12/1960 |
Reallocation |
42579 |
1A |
Willesden |
2E |
Northampton |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
42430 |
1A |
Willesden |
2E |
Northampton |
|
07/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
42586 |
1A |
Willesden |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
14/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
42463 |
1A |
Willesden |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
14/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
42538 |
1A |
Willesden |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
14/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
42542 |
9A |
Longsight |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
14/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
42583 |
9A |
Longsight |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
14/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
42606 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
14/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
42658 |
9A |
Longsight |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
14/01/1961 |
Reallocation |
42660 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
26F |
Patricroft |
|
04/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
42426 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
04/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
42462 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
04/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
42578 |
24L |
Carnforth |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
04/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
42664 |
12A |
Carlisle Upperby |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
11/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
42426 |
65C |
Parkhead |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
11/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
42430 |
2E |
Northampton |
2A |
Rugby |
|
11/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
42462 |
65C |
Parkhead |
65C |
Parkhead |
|
11/02/1961 |
Condemned |
42539 |
9A |
Longsight |
|
COND |
|
18/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
42470 |
3D |
Aston |
1C |
Watford |
|
25/02/1961 |
Condemned |
42438 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
25/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
42566 |
87E |
Landore |
84D |
Leamington |
|
25/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
42576 |
2E |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
25/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
42616 |
3D |
Aston |
1A |
Willesden |
|
25/02/1961 |
Reallocation |
42617 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
14D |
Neasden |
|
04/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
42587 |
17A |
Derby |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
04/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
42643 |
24A |
Accrington |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
11/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
42426 |
65C |
Parkhead |
65E |
Kipps |
|
11/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
42664 |
65C |
Parkhead |
65E |
Kipps |
|
18/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
42430 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
18/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
42579 |
2E |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
25/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
42443 |
5D |
Stoke |
1A |
Willesden |
|
25/03/1961 |
Reallocation |
42663 |
5D |
Stoke |
1A |
Willesden |
|
15/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
42485 |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
15/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
42551 |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
27C |
Southport |
|
15/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
42558 |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
15/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
42559 |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
15/04/1961 |
Reallocation |
42607 |
8B |
Warrington Dallam |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
13/05/1961 |
Reallocation |
42440 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
|
13/05/1961 |
Reallocation |
42449 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
|
20/05/1961 |
Reallocation |
42430 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Rugby |
|
20/05/1961 |
Reallocation |
42443 |
1A |
Willesden |
5D |
Stoke |
|
20/05/1961 |
Reallocation |
42579 |
1A |
Willesden |
2E |
Northampton |
|
20/05/1961 |
Reallocation |
42663 |
1A |
Willesden |
5D |
Stoke |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
42470 |
1C |
Watford |
1A |
Willesden |
|
10/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
42570 |
9C |
Macclesfield |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
42447 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
42454 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6H |
Bangor |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
42485 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
27C |
Southport |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
42579 |
2E |
Northampton |
6H |
Bangor |
|
17/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
42599 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
6H |
Bangor |
|
24/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
42448 |
8E |
Brunswick |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
24/06/1961 |
Reallocation |
42596 |
8E |
Brunswick |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
01/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
42615 |
2E |
Northampton |
6H |
Bangor |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
42540 |
14D |
Neasden |
27E |
Walton on the Hill |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
42585 |
1A |
Willesden |
6H |
Bangor |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
42611 |
1A |
Willesden |
6H |
Bangor |
|
08/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
42616 |
1A |
Willesden |
6H |
Bangor |
|
22/07/1961 |
Reallocation |
42628 |
27F |
Brunswick |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
05/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
42429 |
9G |
Gorton |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
05/08/1961 |
Reallocation |
42617 |
14D |
Neasden |
14B |
Kentish Town |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
42445 |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
42454 |
6H |
Bangor |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
42479 |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
42544 |
6H |
Bangor |
2A |
Rugby |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
42580 |
8E |
Brunswick |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
42584 |
8E |
Brunswick |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
42585 |
6H |
Bangor |
1A |
Willesden |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
42588 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
42598 |
8E |
Brunswick |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
42599 |
6H |
Bangor |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
42611 |
6H |
Bangor |
1A |
Willesden |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
42612 |
8E |
Brunswick |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
42615 |
6H |
Bangor |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
16/09/1961 |
Reallocation |
42616 |
6H |
Bangor |
1C |
Watford |
|
07/10/1961 |
Condemned |
42427 |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
|
COND |
|
07/10/1961 |
Condemned |
42428 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
07/10/1961 |
Condemned |
42467 |
2A |
Rugby |
|
COND |
|
07/10/1961 |
Condemned |
42471 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
07/10/1961 |
Condemned |
42475 |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
COND |
|
07/10/1961 |
Condemned |
42479 |
1E |
Bletchley |
|
COND |
|
07/10/1961 |
Condemned |
42552 |
3D |
Aston |
|
COND |
|
07/10/1961 |
Condemned |
42570 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
07/10/1961 |
Condemned |
42627 |
1A |
Willesden |
|
COND |
|
07/10/1961 |
Condemned |
42635 |
26C |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
07/10/1961 |
Condemned |
42637 |
2C |
Warwick |
|
COND |
|
07/10/1961 |
Condemned |
42648 |
24H |
Hellifield |
|
COND |
|
07/10/1961 |
Condemned |
42669 |
2A |
Rugby |
|
COND |
|
14/10/1961 |
Condemned |
42545 |
26C |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
28/10/1961 |
Reallocation |
42429 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9G |
Gorton |
|
11/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
42426 |
65E |
Kipps |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
11/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
42462 |
65C |
Parkhead |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
11/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
42578 |
65C |
Parkhead |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
11/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
42664 |
65E |
Kipps |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
13/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
42618 |
14D |
Neasden |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
18/11/1961 |
Condemned |
42549 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
18/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
42629 |
14D |
Neasden |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
25/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
42477 |
50F |
Malton |
51A |
Darlington |
|
25/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
42553 |
50A |
York (North) |
51A |
Darlington |
|
25/11/1961 |
Reallocation |
42639 |
50F |
Malton |
51A |
Darlington |
|
09/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
42452 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
09/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
42544 |
2A |
Rugby |
21E |
Monument Lane |
|
09/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
42564 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
5D |
Stoke |
|
09/12/1961 |
Reallocation |
42628 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
06/01/1962 |
Condemned |
42448 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
06/01/1962 |
Reallocation |
42578 |
24L |
Carnforth |
9A |
Longsight |
|
10/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
42426 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
10/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
42434 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
24F |
Fleetwood |
|
10/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
42469 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
10/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
42488 |
3E |
Monument Lane |
21D |
Aston |
|
10/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
42544 |
21E |
Monument Lane |
2A |
Rugby |
|
10/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
42634 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
10/02/1962 |
Reallocation |
42664 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
10/03/1962 |
Condemned |
42452 |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
COND |
|
17/03/1962 |
Reallocation |
42486 |
17C |
Rowsley |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
21/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
42541 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
28/04/1962 |
Reallocation |
42486 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
12/05/1962 |
Condemned |
42433 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
12/05/1962 |
Reallocation |
42541 |
1A |
Willesden |
2A |
Rugby |
|
09/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42454 |
1E |
Bletchley |
5D |
Stoke |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42457 |
11D |
Oxenholme |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42464 |
12G |
Oxenholme |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42488 |
21D |
Aston |
5C |
Stafford |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42571 |
12G |
Oxenholme |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42594 |
12G |
Oxenholme |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
16/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42613 |
11D |
Oxenholme |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42538 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
33C |
Shoeburyness |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42576 |
1A |
Willesden |
33C |
Shoeburyness |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42579 |
6H |
Bangor |
33C |
Shoeburyness |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42593 |
5D |
Stoke |
33C |
Shoeburyness |
|
17/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42672 |
5D |
Stoke |
33C |
Shoeburyness |
|
18/06/1962 |
Condemned |
42538 |
33C |
Shoeburyness |
|
COND |
|
18/06/1962 |
Condemned |
42576 |
33C |
Shoeburyness |
|
COND |
|
18/06/1962 |
Condemned |
42579 |
33C |
Shoeburyness |
|
COND |
|
18/06/1962 |
Condemned |
42593 |
33C |
Shoeburyness |
|
COND |
|
18/06/1962 |
Condemned |
42672 |
33C |
Shoeburyness |
|
COND |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42544 |
2A |
Rugby |
5C |
Stafford |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42562 |
2A |
Rugby |
2E |
Northampton |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42573 |
2A |
Rugby |
2E |
Northampton |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42577 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42613 |
12B |
Carlisle Upperby |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
23/06/1962 |
Reallocation |
42615 |
1E |
Bletchley |
1A |
Willesden |
|
07/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
42562 |
2E |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
07/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
42573 |
2E |
Northampton |
1A |
Willesden |
|
07/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
42595 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
07/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
42610 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
42568 |
17C |
Rowsley |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
14/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
42581 |
11B |
Barrow in Furness |
68D |
Beattock |
|
28/07/1962 |
Reallocation |
42617 |
14B |
Kentish Town |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
11/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
42564 |
5D |
Stoke |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
|
11/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
42581 |
68D |
Beattock |
12E |
Barrow in Furness |
|
11/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
42581 |
12E |
Barrow in Furness |
1A |
Willesden |
|
11/08/1962 |
Condemned |
42596 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
12/08/1962 |
Reallocation |
42566 |
84D |
Leamington |
1A |
Willesden |
|
08/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
42617 |
17C |
Rowsley |
27E |
Walton on the Hill |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
42444 |
26D |
Bury |
26C |
Bolton |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
42460 |
26D |
Bury |
26C |
Bolton |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
42550 |
26D |
Bury |
26C |
Bolton |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
42614 |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
42632 |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
15/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
42640 |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
22/09/1962 |
Condemned |
42537 |
27C |
Southport |
|
COND |
|
22/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
42575 |
5A |
Crewe North |
2A |
Rugby |
|
29/09/1962 |
Condemned |
42429 |
9G |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
29/09/1962 |
Condemned |
42470 |
1A |
Willesden |
|
COND |
|
29/09/1962 |
Condemned |
42476 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
29/09/1962 |
Condemned |
42483 |
24D |
Lower Darwen |
|
COND |
|
29/09/1962 |
Reallocation |
42575 |
2A |
Rugby |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
29/09/1962 |
Condemned |
42591 |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
|
COND |
|
29/09/1962 |
Condemned |
42599 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
COND |
|
29/09/1962 |
Condemned |
42615 |
1A |
Willesden |
|
COND |
|
29/09/1962 |
Condemned |
42641 |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
COND |
|
29/09/1962 |
Condemned |
42642 |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
COND |
|
29/09/1962 |
Condemned |
42646 |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
COND |
|
29/09/1962 |
Condemned |
42653 |
26C |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
29/09/1962 |
Condemned |
42658 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
29/09/1962 |
Condemned |
42661 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
29/09/1962 |
Condemned |
42666 |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
|
COND |
|
06/10/1962 |
Reallocation |
42568 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
13/10/1962 |
Condemned |
42575 |
5A |
Crewe North |
|
COND |
|
13/10/1962 |
Condemned |
42578 |
9A |
Longsight |
|
COND |
|
03/11/1962 |
Condemned |
42472 |
9G |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
03/11/1962 |
Condemned |
42473 |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
COND |
|
03/11/1962 |
Condemned |
42540 |
27E |
Walton on the Hill |
|
COND |
|
03/11/1962 |
Condemned |
42621 |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1962 |
Condemned |
42553 |
51A |
Darlington |
|
COND |
|
17/11/1962 |
Condemned |
42443 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
17/11/1962 |
Condemned |
42457 |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
17/11/1962 |
Condemned |
42580 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
17/11/1962 |
Condemned |
42600 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
17/11/1962 |
Condemned |
42624 |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
COND |
|
24/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
42670 |
5D |
Stoke |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
24/11/1962 |
Reallocation |
42671 |
5D |
Stoke |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
01/12/1962 |
Condemned |
42544 |
5C |
Stafford |
|
COND |
|
01/12/1962 |
Condemned |
42585 |
1A |
Willesden |
|
COND |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
42430 |
2A |
Rugby |
1A |
Willesden |
|
08/12/1962 |
Condemned |
42454 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
08/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
42494 |
26F |
Patricroft |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
08/12/1962 |
Condemned |
42638 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
COND |
|
08/12/1962 |
Condemned |
42671 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
15/12/1962 |
Condemned |
42541 |
2A |
Rugby |
|
COND |
|
15/12/1962 |
Condemned |
42568 |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
COND |
|
29/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
42434 |
24F |
Fleetwood |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
29/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
42447 |
24J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
|
29/12/1962 |
Reallocation |
42634 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
|
12/01/1963 |
Condemned |
42466 |
17F |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
12/01/1963 |
Condemned |
42655 |
26C |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
42451 |
27C |
Southport |
9G |
Gorton |
|
19/01/1963 |
Condemned |
42480 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
19/01/1963 |
Reallocation |
42670 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9A |
Longsight |
|
16/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
42482 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
|
23/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
42431 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
1A |
Willesden |
|
23/02/1963 |
Reallocation |
42542 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
5D |
Stoke |
|
06/04/1963 |
Condemned |
42659 |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
COND |
|
20/04/1963 |
Reallocation |
42491 |
24H |
Hellifield |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
04/05/1963 |
Condemned |
42469 |
9F |
Heaton Mersey |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1963 |
Condemned |
42547 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1963 |
Condemned |
42592 |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
COND |
|
04/05/1963 |
Condemned |
42636 |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
COND |
|
11/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
42449 |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
11/05/1963 |
Condemned |
42543 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
11/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
42589 |
11E |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
42440 |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
18/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
42583 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
1A |
Willesden |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
42566 |
1A |
Willesden |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
25/05/1963 |
Condemned |
42582 |
3B |
Bushbury |
|
COND |
|
25/05/1963 |
Condemned |
42603 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
25/05/1963 |
Reallocation |
42606 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
1A |
Willesden |
|
01/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42604 |
1A |
Willesden |
21C |
Bushbury |
|
08/06/1963 |
Condemned |
42485 |
27C |
Southport |
|
COND |
|
15/06/1963 |
Condemned |
42632 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42439 |
26F |
Patricroft |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42445 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42447 |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
12E |
Barrow in Furness |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42482 |
6G |
Llandudno Junction |
6H |
Bangor |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42484 |
24H |
Hellifield |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42492 |
24H |
Hellifield |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42584 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
22/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42634 |
12C |
Carlisle Canal |
12E |
Barrow in Furness |
|
29/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42425 |
9A |
Longsight |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
29/06/1963 |
Reallocation |
42670 |
9A |
Longsight |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
06/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
42587 |
16A |
Nottingham |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
20/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
42482 |
6H |
Bangor |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
20/07/1963 |
Reallocation |
42634 |
12E |
Barrow in Furness |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
27/07/1963 |
Condemned |
42556 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
COND |
|
17/08/1963 |
Reallocation |
42546 |
24B |
Rose Grove |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
17/08/1963 |
Condemned |
42668 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
09/1963 |
Condemned |
42486 |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
COND |
|
07/09/1963 |
Condemned |
42425 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
07/09/1963 |
Condemned |
42487 |
6H |
Bangor |
|
COND |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
42447 |
12E |
Barrow in Furness |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
42464 |
24L |
Carnforth |
10B |
Blackpool Central |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
42492 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
10G |
Skipton |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
42622 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
|
14/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
42670 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
9A |
Longsight |
|
21/09/1963 |
Condemned |
42595 |
17C |
Rowsley |
|
COND |
|
28/09/1963 |
Condemned |
42440 |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
COND |
|
28/09/1963 |
Condemned |
42491 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
28/09/1963 |
Reallocation |
42492 |
10G |
Skipton |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
19/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
42474 |
26B |
Agecroft |
9K |
Bolton |
|
19/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
42492 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
19/10/1963 |
Condemned |
42557 |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
COND |
|
26/10/1963 |
Condemned |
42458 |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
26/10/1963 |
Reallocation |
42647 |
26B |
Agecroft |
8P |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
42446 |
6H |
Bangor |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
09/11/1963 |
Condemned |
42561 |
10C |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
42567 |
6H |
Bangor |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
09/11/1963 |
Condemned |
42571 |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
09/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
42601 |
6H |
Bangor |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
09/11/1963 |
Condemned |
42617 |
27E |
Walton on the Hill |
|
COND |
|
16/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
42474 |
9K |
Bolton |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
16/11/1963 |
Condemned |
42563 |
26C |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
23/11/1963 |
Reallocation |
42464 |
10B |
Blackpool Central |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
|
30/11/1963 |
Condemned |
42598 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
14/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
42446 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
6H |
Bangor |
|
14/12/1963 |
Condemned |
42643 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
COND |
|
14/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
42665 |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
2J |
Aston |
|
21/12/1963 |
Reallocation |
42455 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
04/01/1964 |
Condemned |
42562 |
1A |
Willesden |
|
COND |
|
04/01/1964 |
Reallocation |
42665 |
2J |
Aston |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
|
11/01/1964 |
Condemned |
42441 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
11/01/1964 |
Condemned |
42572 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
25/01/1964 |
Condemned |
42463 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
25/01/1964 |
Condemned |
42569 |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
|
COND |
|
25/01/1964 |
Condemned |
42612 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
|
COND |
|
25/01/1964 |
Condemned |
42628 |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
COND |
|
25/01/1964 |
Condemned |
42633 |
26C |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
01/02/1964 |
Condemned |
42607 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
08/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
42560 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
42564 |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
5D |
Stoke |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
42605 |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
5D |
Stoke |
|
15/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
42665 |
5F |
Uttoxeter |
5D |
Stoke |
|
22/02/1964 |
Reallocation |
42586 |
1E |
Bletchley |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
22/02/1964 |
Condemned |
42623 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
12/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
42618 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
16B |
Neville Hill |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
42464 |
10J |
Lancaster Green Ayre |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
14/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
42484 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
9K |
Bolton |
|
22/03/1964 |
Reallocation |
42618 |
16B |
Annesley |
55H |
Neville Hill |
|
28/03/1964 |
Condemned |
42434 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
28/03/1964 |
Condemned |
42461 |
26B |
Agecroft |
|
COND |
|
04/04/1964 |
Condemned |
42550 |
26C |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
42494 |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
42554 |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
42555 |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
18/04/1964 |
Condemned |
42560 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
42589 |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
42631 |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
42634 |
27D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
42644 |
23D |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
18/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
42647 |
8P |
Wigan Central (L&Y) |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
25/04/1964 |
Reallocation |
42439 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
10B |
Blackpool Central |
|
25/04/1964 |
Condemned |
42446 |
6H |
Bangor |
|
COND |
|
25/04/1964 |
Condemned |
42594 |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
02/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
42437 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
02/05/1964 |
Condemned |
42493 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
02/05/1964 |
Reallocation |
42610 |
17C |
Rowsley |
16C |
Derby |
|
16/05/1964 |
Condemned |
42444 |
26C |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
16/05/1964 |
Condemned |
42453 |
15E |
Leicester (G.C.) |
|
COND |
|
16/05/1964 |
Condemned |
42614 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
23/05/1964 |
Condemned |
42437 |
9B |
Stockport Edgeley |
|
COND |
|
30/05/1964 |
Condemned |
42619 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
07/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
42618 |
55H |
Neville Hill |
55G |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
13/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
42639 |
51A |
Darlington |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
13/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
42656 |
26C |
Bolton |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
42455 |
8C |
Speke Junction |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
42478 |
1A |
Willesden |
6H |
Bangor |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
42488 |
5C |
Stafford |
6H |
Bangor |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
42586 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
42606 |
1A |
Willesden |
6H |
Bangor |
|
20/06/1964 |
Reallocation |
42660 |
26F |
Patricroft |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
25/06/1964 |
Condemned |
42652 |
26C |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
11/07/1964 |
Reallocation |
42439 |
10B |
Blackpool Central |
12E |
Tebay |
|
18/07/1964 |
Condemned |
42584 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
22/08/1964 |
Condemned |
42608 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
07/09/1964 |
Condemned |
42639 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
12/09/1964 |
Condemned |
42589 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
12/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
42622 |
56C |
Copley Hill (Leeds) |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
12/09/1964 |
Condemned |
42631 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
42558 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
19/09/1964 |
Condemned |
42559 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
|
COND |
|
19/09/1964 |
Condemned |
42620 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
42625 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
19/09/1964 |
Condemned |
42630 |
26C |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
19/09/1964 |
Condemned |
42651 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
19/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
42657 |
24E |
Blackpool Central |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
26/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
42460 |
26C |
Bolton |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
26/09/1964 |
Condemned |
42481 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
26/09/1964 |
Reallocation |
42565 |
26C |
Bolton |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
26/09/1964 |
Condemned |
42640 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
03/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
42670 |
9A |
Longsight |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
10/10/1964 |
Condemned |
42451 |
9G |
Gorton |
|
COND |
|
17/10/1964 |
Condemned |
42445 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
24/10/1964 |
Condemned |
42474 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
24/10/1964 |
Condemned |
42588 |
16A |
Nottingham |
|
COND |
|
24/10/1964 |
Condemned |
42629 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
|
COND |
|
31/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
42478 |
6H |
Bangor |
5D |
Stoke |
|
31/10/1964 |
Reallocation |
42488 |
6H |
Bangor |
5D |
Stoke |
|
07/11/1964 |
Condemned |
42657 |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
COND |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
42435 |
27C |
Southport |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
14/11/1964 |
Condemned |
42449 |
24L |
Carnforth |
|
COND |
|
14/11/1964 |
Condemned |
42489 |
6H |
Bangor |
|
COND |
|
14/11/1964 |
Condemned |
42586 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
14/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
42587 |
16B |
Kirkby in Ashfield |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
21/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
42426 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9K |
Bolton |
|
21/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
42554 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9K |
Bolton |
|
21/11/1964 |
Condemned |
42573 |
1A |
Willesden |
|
COND |
|
21/11/1964 |
Condemned |
42654 |
26C |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
28/11/1964 |
Reallocation |
42555 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
9K |
Bolton |
|
28/11/1964 |
Condemned |
42565 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
05/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
42664 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
05/12/1964 |
Condemned |
42670 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
12/12/1964 |
Reallocation |
42478 |
5D |
Stoke |
2J |
Aston |
|
12/12/1964 |
Condemned |
42551 |
27C |
Southport |
|
COND |
|
12/12/1964 |
Condemned |
42662 |
27C |
Southport |
|
COND |
|
19/12/1964 |
Condemned |
42605 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
26/12/1964 |
Condemned |
42602 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
42494 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
09/01/1965 |
Condemned |
42634 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
09/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
42660 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
23/01/1965 |
Condemned |
42459 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
30/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
42460 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
30/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
42478 |
2J |
Aston |
5D |
Stoke |
|
31/01/1965 |
Reallocation |
42649 |
56A |
Wakefield |
16C |
Derby |
|
06/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
42478 |
5D |
Stoke |
6H |
Bangor |
|
06/02/1965 |
Condemned |
42478 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
06/02/1965 |
Condemned |
42649 |
16C |
Derby |
|
COND |
|
13/02/1965 |
Condemned |
42465 |
10A |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
13/02/1965 |
Reallocation |
42488 |
5D |
Stoke |
6H |
Bangor |
|
13/02/1965 |
Condemned |
42488 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
13/02/1965 |
Condemned |
42609 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
13/02/1965 |
Condemned |
42667 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
27/02/1965 |
Condemned |
42590 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
13/03/1965 |
Condemned |
42447 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
13/03/1965 |
Condemned |
42567 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
27/03/1965 |
Condemned |
42430 |
1A |
Willesden |
|
COND |
|
27/03/1965 |
Reallocation |
42442 |
10C |
Patricroft |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
03/04/1965 |
Condemned |
42435 |
9H |
Patricroft |
|
COND |
|
03/04/1965 |
Condemned |
42554 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
03/04/1965 |
Condemned |
42601 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
03/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
42616 |
1C |
Watford |
1A |
Willesden |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
42574 |
26F |
Patricroft |
9K |
Bolton |
|
10/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
42610 |
16C |
Derby |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
17/04/1965 |
Condemned |
42558 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
17/04/1965 |
Reallocation |
42604 |
21C |
Bushbury |
2J |
Aston |
|
17/04/1965 |
Condemned |
42660 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
24/04/1965 |
Condemned |
42456 |
2F |
Woodford Halse |
|
COND |
|
24/04/1965 |
Condemned |
42482 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
01/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
42468 |
10C |
Patricroft |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
08/05/1965 |
Condemned |
42494 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
COND |
|
08/05/1965 |
Condemned |
42555 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
08/05/1965 |
Condemned |
42564 |
5D |
Stoke |
|
COND |
|
08/05/1965 |
Condemned |
42604 |
2J |
Aston |
|
COND |
|
22/05/1965 |
Condemned |
42566 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
29/05/1965 |
Reallocation |
42431 |
1A |
Willesden |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
12/06/1965 |
Condemned |
42492 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
12/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
42606 |
6H |
Bangor |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
20/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
42477 |
51A |
Darlington |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
26/06/1965 |
Condemned |
42477 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
|
COND |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
42542 |
5D |
Stoke |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
42583 |
1A |
Willesden |
5D |
Stoke |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
42606 |
6A |
Chester (MR) |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
26/06/1965 |
Reallocation |
42616 |
1A |
Willesden |
5D |
Stoke |
|
12/07/1965 |
Condemned |
42618 |
55G |
Huddersfield Hillhouse |
|
COND |
|
17/07/1965 |
Condemned |
42542 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
42577 |
1A |
Willesden |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
42581 |
1A |
Willesden |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
42583 |
5D |
Stoke |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
42611 |
1A |
Willesden |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
24/07/1965 |
Reallocation |
42616 |
5D |
Stoke |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
07/08/1965 |
Condemned |
42442 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
14/08/1965 |
Condemned |
42439 |
12E |
Tebay |
|
COND |
|
14/08/1965 |
Condemned |
42464 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
|
COND |
|
21/08/1965 |
Condemned |
42432 |
11A |
Barrow in Furness |
|
COND |
|
21/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
42663 |
5D |
Stoke |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
21/08/1965 |
Reallocation |
42665 |
5D |
Stoke |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
28/08/1965 |
Condemned |
42460 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
|
COND |
|
11/09/1965 |
Condemned |
42645 |
27C |
Southport |
|
COND |
|
25/09/1965 |
Condemned |
42468 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
02/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
42665 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8M |
Southport |
|
23/10/1965 |
Condemned |
42597 |
6C |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
23/10/1965 |
Condemned |
42626 |
26C |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
30/10/1965 |
Reallocation |
42581 |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
11/12/1965 |
Condemned |
42426 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
25/12/1965 |
Reallocation |
42574 |
9K |
Bolton |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
08/01/1966 |
Reallocation |
42663 |
10A |
Carnforth |
8A |
Edge Hill |
|
29/01/1966 |
Condemned |
42484 |
9K |
Bolton |
|
COND |
|
05/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
42663 |
8A |
Edge Hill |
10A |
Carnforth |
|
12/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
42616 |
10A |
Carnforth |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
12/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
42663 |
10A |
Carnforth |
9K |
Bolton |
|
19/02/1966 |
Reallocation |
42431 |
10C |
Fleetwood |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
19/03/1966 |
Condemned |
42581 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
26/03/1966 |
Reallocation |
42613 |
24L |
Carnforth |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
02/04/1966 |
Condemned |
42455 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
23/04/1966 |
Condemned |
42610 |
12C |
Barrow in Furness |
|
COND |
|
07/05/1966 |
Condemned |
42431 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
07/05/1966 |
Condemned |
42625 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
14/05/1966 |
Condemned |
42462 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
28/05/1966 |
Condemned |
42436 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
11/06/1966 |
Reallocation |
42665 |
8M |
Southport |
12E |
Tebay |
|
23/07/1966 |
Reallocation |
42611 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
12E |
Tebay |
|
23/07/1966 |
Reallocation |
42647 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
06/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
42548 |
26A |
Newton Heath |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
13/08/1966 |
Reallocation |
42656 |
9D |
Newton Heath |
9K |
Bolton |
|
10/09/1966 |
Reallocation |
42664 |
56F |
Low Moor |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
15/10/1966 |
Condemned |
42606 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
29/10/1966 |
Condemned |
42583 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
42574 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
12/11/1966 |
Reallocation |
42587 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
12/1966 |
Condemned |
42664 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
03/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
42574 |
56A |
Wakefield |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
03/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
42656 |
9K |
Bolton |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
03/12/1966 |
Reallocation |
42663 |
9K |
Bolton |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
07/01/1967 |
Reallocation |
42611 |
12E |
Tebay |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
14/01/1967 |
Condemned |
42577 |
8F |
Springs Branch (Wigan) |
|
COND |
|
04/02/1967 |
Condemned |
42548 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
18/02/1967 |
Reallocation |
42663 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
20/02/1967 |
Condemned |
42622 |
55A |
Holbeck (MR) |
|
COND |
|
11/03/1967 |
Condemned |
42644 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
15/03/1967 |
Condemned |
42611 |
10D |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
18/03/1967 |
Condemned |
42663 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
01/04/1967 |
Condemned |
42546 |
24C |
Lostock Hall |
|
COND |
|
22/04/1967 |
Condemned |
42613 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
29/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
42587 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
29/04/1967 |
Reallocation |
42665 |
12E |
Tebay |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
06/05/1967 |
Condemned |
42656 |
9E |
Trafford Park (LMS) |
|
COND |
|
13/05/1967 |
Condemned |
42647 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
|
COND |
|
27/05/1967 |
Reallocation |
42616 |
8H |
Birkenhead Mollington Street |
91E |
To Eastern Region |
|
06/06/1967 |
Condemned |
42650 |
56A |
Wakefield |
|
COND |
|
12/06/1967 |
Condemned |
42587 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
12/06/1967 |
Condemned |
42665 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|
17/06/1967 |
Reallocation |
42616 |
91E |
To Eastern Region |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
15/07/1967 |
Reallocation |
42574 |
56A |
Wakefield |
55E |
Normanton |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
42574 |
55E |
Normanton |
|
COND |
|
10/1967 |
Condemned |
42616 |
56F |
Low Moor |
|
COND |
|