Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 3450 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16856 Week
» 69872 Month
» 189399 Year
» 3216252 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LMS Stanier "4P" Class 2-6-4T
Company |
Old Number |
|
Company |
New Number |
Subtype |
|
Date |
Information |
|
|
renumbered to |
LMS |
2481 |
|
y/e |
0000 |
|
|
|
renumbered to |
LMS |
2487 |
|
y/e |
0000 |
|
LMS |
2589 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42589 |
|
w/e |
10/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
2425 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42425 |
|
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
2540 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42540 |
|
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
2590 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42590 |
|
w/e |
17/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
2460 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42460 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
2595 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42595 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
2643 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42643 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
2647 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42647 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
2659 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42659 |
|
w/e |
24/04/1948 |
|
LMS |
2592 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42592 |
|
m/e |
05/1948 |
|
LMS |
2585 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42585 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
2602 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42602 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
2638 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42638 |
|
w/e |
01/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
2458 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42458 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
2577 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42577 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
2623 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42623 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
2646 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42646 |
|
w/e |
08/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
2431 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42431 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
2434 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42434 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
2479 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42479 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
2661 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42661 |
|
w/e |
15/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
2663 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42663 |
|
w/e |
22/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
2439 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42439 |
|
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
2455 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42455 |
|
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
2558 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42558 |
|
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
2561 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42561 |
|
w/e |
29/05/1948 |
|
LMS |
2467 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42467 |
|
m/e |
06/1948 |
|
LMS |
2645 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42645 |
|
w/e |
05/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
2476 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42476 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
2487 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42487 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
2544 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42544 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
2572 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42572 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
2633 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42633 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
2636 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42636 |
|
w/e |
12/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
2546 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42546 |
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
2605 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42605 |
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
2610 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42610 |
|
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
2437 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42437 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
2484 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42484 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
2631 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42631 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
2632 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42632 |
|
w/e |
26/06/1948 |
|
LMS |
2462 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42462 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
2463 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42463 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
2565 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42565 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
2578 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42578 |
|
w/e |
03/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
2545 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42545 |
|
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
2550 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42550 |
|
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
2671 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42671 |
|
w/e |
24/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
2478 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42478 |
|
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
2580 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42580 |
|
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
2609 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42609 |
|
w/e |
31/07/1948 |
|
LMS |
2471 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42471 |
|
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
2634 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42634 |
|
w/e |
07/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
2448 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42448 |
|
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
2583 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42583 |
|
w/e |
14/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
2596 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42596 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
2620 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42620 |
|
w/e |
21/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
2450 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42450 |
|
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
2547 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42547 |
|
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
2608 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42608 |
|
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
2622 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42622 |
|
w/e |
28/08/1948 |
|
LMS |
2571 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42571 |
|
w/e |
04/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
2435 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42435 |
|
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
2456 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42456 |
|
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
2575 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42575 |
|
w/e |
11/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
2436 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42436 |
|
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
2553 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42553 |
|
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
2619 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42619 |
|
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
2594 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42594 |
|
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
2616 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42616 |
|
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
2656 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42656 |
|
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
2658 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42658 |
|
w/e |
25/09/1948 |
|
LMS |
2537 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42537 |
|
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
2568 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42568 |
|
w/e |
02/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
2441 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42441 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
2552 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42552 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
2593 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42593 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
2664 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42664 |
|
w/e |
09/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
2621 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42621 |
|
w/e |
16/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
2549 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42549 |
|
w/e |
23/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
2472 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42472 |
|
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
2582 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42582 |
|
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
2588 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42588 |
|
w/e |
30/10/1948 |
|
LMS |
2429 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42429 |
|
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
2465 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42465 |
|
w/e |
06/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
2475 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42475 |
|
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
2489 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42489 |
|
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
2666 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42666 |
|
w/e |
13/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
2464 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42464 |
|
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
2555 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42555 |
|
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
2574 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42574 |
|
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
2607 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42607 |
|
w/e |
20/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
2445 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42445 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
2559 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42559 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
2668 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42668 |
|
w/e |
27/11/1948 |
|
LMS |
2443 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42443 |
|
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
2459 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42459 |
|
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
2486 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42486 |
|
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
2569 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42569 |
|
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
2576 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42576 |
|
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
2581 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42581 |
|
w/e |
18/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
2617 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42617 |
|
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
2618 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42618 |
|
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
2648 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42648 |
|
w/e |
25/12/1948 |
|
LMS |
2548 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42548 |
|
w/e |
01/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
2538 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42538 |
|
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
2644 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42644 |
|
w/e |
08/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
2451 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42451 |
|
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
2477 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42477 |
|
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
2560 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42560 |
|
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
2614 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42614 |
|
w/e |
15/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
2482 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42482 |
|
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
2628 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42628 |
|
w/e |
22/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
2438 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42438 |
|
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
2586 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42586 |
|
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
2599 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42599 |
|
w/e |
29/01/1949 |
|
LMS |
2428 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42428 |
|
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
2474 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42474 |
|
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
2554 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42554 |
|
w/e |
05/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
2579 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42579 |
|
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
2624 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42624 |
|
w/e |
12/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
2453 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42453 |
|
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
2562 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42562 |
|
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
2598 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42598 |
|
w/e |
19/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
2446 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42446 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
2652 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42652 |
|
w/e |
26/02/1949 |
|
LMS |
2461 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42461 |
|
m/e |
03/1949 |
|
LMS |
2430 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42430 |
|
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
2452 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42452 |
|
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
2603 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42603 |
|
w/e |
05/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
2612 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42612 |
|
w/e |
12/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
2444 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42444 |
|
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
2473 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42473 |
|
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
2591 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42591 |
|
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
2639 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42639 |
|
w/e |
19/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
2427 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42427 |
|
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
2454 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42454 |
|
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
2481 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42481 |
|
w/e |
26/03/1949 |
|
LMS |
2432 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42432 |
|
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
2449 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42449 |
|
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
2642 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42642 |
|
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
2650 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42650 |
|
w/e |
02/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
2541 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42541 |
|
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
2657 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42657 |
|
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
2660 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42660 |
|
w/e |
09/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
2480 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42480 |
|
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
2611 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42611 |
|
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
2613 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42613 |
|
w/e |
16/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
2563 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42563 |
|
w/e |
23/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
2601 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42601 |
|
w/e |
23/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
2635 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42635 |
|
w/e |
23/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
2584 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42584 |
|
w/e |
30/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
2587 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42587 |
|
w/e |
30/04/1949 |
|
LMS |
2492 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42492 |
|
w/e |
07/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
2440 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42440 |
|
w/e |
14/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
2470 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42470 |
|
w/e |
14/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
2566 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42566 |
|
w/e |
14/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
2490 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42490 |
|
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
2669 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42669 |
|
w/e |
21/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
2543 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42543 |
|
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
2604 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42604 |
|
w/e |
28/05/1949 |
|
LMS |
2542 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42542 |
|
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
2551 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42551 |
|
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
2626 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42626 |
|
w/e |
04/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
2493 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42493 |
|
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
2670 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42670 |
|
w/e |
11/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
2466 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42466 |
|
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
2483 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42483 |
|
w/e |
18/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
2606 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42606 |
|
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
2672 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42672 |
|
w/e |
25/06/1949 |
|
LMS |
2485 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42485 |
|
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
2615 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42615 |
|
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
2662 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42662 |
|
w/e |
02/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
2488 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42488 |
|
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
2630 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42630 |
|
w/e |
23/07/1949 |
|
LMS |
2654 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42654 |
|
w/e |
20/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
2469 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42469 |
|
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
2570 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42570 |
|
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
2651 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42651 |
|
w/e |
27/08/1949 |
|
LMS |
2655 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42655 |
|
w/e |
03/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
2557 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42557 |
|
w/e |
10/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
2629 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42629 |
|
w/e |
24/09/1949 |
|
LMS |
2556 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42556 |
|
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
2653 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42653 |
|
w/e |
01/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
2426 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42426 |
|
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
2597 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42597 |
|
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
2649 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42649 |
|
w/e |
08/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
2491 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42491 |
|
w/e |
15/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
2665 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42665 |
|
w/e |
22/10/1949 |
|
LMS |
2573 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42573 |
|
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
2625 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42625 |
|
w/e |
05/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
2433 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42433 |
|
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
2564 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42564 |
|
w/e |
12/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
2457 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42457 |
|
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
2600 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42600 |
|
w/e |
19/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
2494 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42494 |
|
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
2637 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42637 |
|
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
2667 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42667 |
|
w/e |
26/11/1949 |
|
LMS |
2640 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42640 |
|
w/e |
17/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
2442 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42442 |
|
w/e |
24/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
2567 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42567 |
|
w/e |
31/12/1949 |
|
LMS |
2468 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42468 |
|
w/e |
28/01/1950 |
|
LMS |
2447 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42447 |
|
w/e |
11/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
2641 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42641 |
|
w/e |
25/02/1950 |
|
LMS |
2539 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42539 |
|
w/e |
04/03/1950 |
|
LMS |
2627 |
renumbered to |
BR |
42627 |
|
w/e |
11/03/1950 |
|