LNWR/LMS Webb "E" Class 2-8-0
LNWR | LMS | LMS (1930) | BR | Date To Service | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
1883 | 9319 | 49319 | 09/1901 | 11/1904 from B |
10/1950 | 09/1918 to G1 |
49.08 | |||||||
1884 | 9266 | 49266 | 09/1901 | 12/1904 from B |
14/11/1959 | 08/1917 to G1 |
58.17 | |||||||
1885 | 9267 | 49267 | 09/1901 | 01/1905 from B |
01/12/1962 | 08/1917 to G1 |
61.25 | |||||||
1886 | 9390 | 49390 | 09/1901 | 08/1904 from B |
21/12/1957 | 01/1923 to G1 |
56.25 | |||||||
1888 | 9600 | 8892 | 48892 | 09/1901 | 12/1904 from B |
01/1949 | 01/1924 to G1 |
47.33 | ||||||
1889 | 9345 | 49345 | 09/1901 | 08/1906 from B |
31/01/1958 | 06/1920 to G1 |
56.33 | |||||||
905 | 9601 | 04/1902 | 11/1905 from B |
07/1928 | 26.25 | |||||||||
18 | 9602 | 05/1902 | 11/1905 from B |
04/1928 | 25.92 | |||||||||
2558 | 9603 | 08/1902 | 03/1906 from B |
12/1928 | 26.33 | |||||||||
2563 | 9604 | 8893 | 48893 | 08/1902 | 06/1908 from B |
31/10/1954 | 11/1924 to G1 |
52.17 | ||||||
1017 | 9605 | 09/1902 | 01/1906 from B |
10/1927 | 25.08 | |||||||||
1038 | 9349 | 49349 | 09/1902 | 12/1905 from B |
12/1949 | 04/1907 to F |
47.25 | |||||||
1042 | 9606 | 10/1902 | 06/1906 from B |
12/1928 | 26.17 | |||||||||
1064 | 9607 | 8894 | 48894 | 11/1902 | 05/1906 from B |
01/1949 | 02/1923 to G1 |
46.17 | ||||||
1065 | 9340 | 49340 | 11/1902 | 10/1906 from B |
01/08/1959 | 09/1919 to G1 |
56.75 | |||||||
1222 | 9608 | 12/1902 | 05/1906 from B |
12/1928 | 26 | |||||||||
1223 | 9368 | 49368 | 12/1902 | 02/1906 from B |
07/03/1959 | 11/1921 to G1 |
56.25 | |||||||
1227 | 9363 | 49363 | 01/1903 | 06/1908 from B |
03/1949 | 08/1921 to G1 |
46.17 | |||||||
1236 | 9351 | 49351 | 01/1903 | 02/1906 from B |
12/11/1949 | 02/1921 to G1 |
46.83 | |||||||
2574 | 9343 | 49343 | 05/1903 | 10/1906 from B |
14/10/1961 | 01/1920 to G1 |
58.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | |||||
1586 | 9353 | 49353 | 01/1904 | 07/1906 from B |
12/1949 | 02/1921 to G1 |
45.92 | |||||||
647 | 9615 | 8899 | 48899 | 05/1904 | 02/1907 from B |
03/03/1956 | 10/1908 to F |
51.83 | ||||||
1585 | 9609 | 8895 | 48895 | 05/1904 | 10/1906 from B |
05/12/1964 | 04/1923 to G1 |
60.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | ||||
2056 | 9359 | 49359 | 05/1904 | 01/1907 from B |
02/02/1952 | 05/1921 to G1 |
47.75 | |||||||
437 | 9374 | 07/1904 | 08/1906 from B |
12/1947 | 02/1922 to G1 |
43.42 | ||||||||
2169 | 9393 | 49393 | 08/1904 | 09/1906 from B |
22/06/1957 | 01/1923 to G1 |
52.83 |