LNWR/LMS Webb "F" Class 2-8-0
Class | LNWR | LMS | LMS (1930) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
F | 2570 | 9367 | 49367 | 10/1902 | 3A W |
Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/11/1957 |
02/11/1957 | |
F | 899 | 9610 | 8896 | 48896 | 04/1902 | 2D 3A W |
Nuneaton Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/07/1948 01/1950 |
01/1950 |
F | 352 | 9611 | 05/1902 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1927 | 12/1927 | ||
F | 2114 | 9386 | 49386 | 05/1902 | 9D 8B 10C W |
Buxton (LNWR) Warrington Dallam Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 29/04/1950 28/11/1959 |
28/11/1959 | |
F | 906 | 9612 | 8897 | 48897 | 05/1902 | 2E W |
Warwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1949 |
10/1949 |
F | 1036 | 9365 | 49365 | 09/1902 | 8C W |
Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1949 |
16/07/1949 | |
F | 1038 | 9349 | 49349 | 09/1902 | 3C W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/1949 |
12/1949 | |
F | 1247 | 9613 | 8898 | 48898 | 04/1903 | 8A 4A 4A 9D W |
Edge Hill Bletchley Bletchley Buxton (LNWR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 03/02/1962 30/06/1962 |
30/06/1962 |
F | 1273 | 9614 | 05/1903 | W 25E |
Withdrawn Sowerby Bridge |
12/1928 21/05/1949 |
12/1928 | ||
F | 2573 | 9373 | 49373 | 05/1903 | 5B 2A 3C 3A 2B 21B W |
Crewe South Rugby Ryecroft (Walsall) Bescot Nuneaton Bescot Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 05/11/1949 14/06/1958 15/07/1961 05/05/1962 08/12/1962 |
08/12/1962 | |
F | 647 | 9615 | 8899 | 48899 | 05/1904 | 4D 85C W |
Abergavenny Hereford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1955 03/03/1956 |
03/03/1956 |
F | 1369 | 9372 | 49372 | 07/1904 | 2B W |
Bletchley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/1949 |
04/1949 |