LNWR/LMS Webb "F" Class 2-8-0
LNWR | LMS | LMS (1930) | BR | Date To Service | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Rebuilt To | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2570 | 9367 | 49367 | 10/1902 | 08/1906 from B |
02/11/1957 | 10/1921 to G1 |
55.08 | |||||||
899 | 9610 | 8896 | 48896 | 04/1902 | 05/1907 from B |
01/1950 | 06/1923 to G1 |
47.75 | ||||||
352 | 9611 | 05/1902 | 01/1907 from B |
12/1927 | 25.58 | |||||||||
2114 | 9386 | 49386 | 05/1902 | 07/1908 from B |
28/11/1959 | 10/1922 to G1 |
57.5 | |||||||
906 | 9612 | 8897 | 48897 | 05/1902 | 12/1907 from B |
10/1949 | 05/1923 to G1 |
47.42 | ||||||
1036 | 9365 | 49365 | 09/1902 | 04/1907 from B |
16/07/1949 | 10/1921 to G1 |
Speke Junction | 46.83 | ||||||
1038 | 9349 | 49349 | 09/1902 | 04/1907 from E |
12/1949 | 01/1921 to G1 |
47.25 | |||||||
1247 | 9613 | 8898 | 48898 | 04/1903 | 08/1906 from B |
30/06/1962 | 05/1923 to G1 |
59.17 | ||||||
1273 | 9614 | 05/1903 | 05/1906 from B |
12/1928 | 25.58 | |||||||||
2573 | 9373 | 49373 | 05/1903 | 08/1908 from B |
08/12/1962 | 01/1922 to G1 |
59.58 | |||||||
647 | 9615 | 8899 | 48899 | 05/1904 | 10/1908 from E |
03/03/1956 | 02/1925 to G1 |
51.83 | ||||||
1369 | 9372 | 49372 | 07/1904 | 12/1907 from B |
04/1949 | 01/1922 to G1 |
44.75 |