Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1000 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14406 Week
» 67422 Month
» 186949 Year
» 3213802 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
LMS Stanier "8F" Class 2-8-0
Class |
LMS |
LNER (1924) |
LNER (1946) |
LNER (1947) |
WD |
BR |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
8F |
8191
|
|
|
|
|
48191
|
05/1942 |
03/08/1968 |
Converted to oil burnng |
13/11/1948 |
8F |
8370
|
|
|
|
|
48370
|
10/1944 |
26/11/1966 |
Converted to oil burnng |
13/11/1948 |
8F |
8385
|
|
|
|
|
48385
|
02/1945 |
03/12/1966 |
Oil burning equipment removed |
27/11/1948 |
8F |
8386
|
|
|
|
|
48386
|
02/1945 |
26/08/1967 |
Oil burning equipment removed |
11/12/1948 |