Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 5 Online
» 95 Today
» 1070 Yesterday
» 95 Week
» 95 Month
» 66957 Year
» 1732333 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

160


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
59188 06/06/1958 51A Darlington (New) 06/06/1958
59189 16/06/1958   (New) 16/06/1958
59190 26/06/1958 51A Darlington (New) 26/06/1958
59191 04/07/1958   (New) 04/07/1958
59192 11/07/1958   (New) 11/07/1958
59193 18/07/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 18/07/1958
59194 25/07/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 25/07/1958
59195 19/08/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 19/08/1958
59196 28/08/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 28/08/1958
59197 05/09/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 05/09/1958
59198 12/09/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 12/09/1958
59199 19/09/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 19/09/1958
59200 25/09/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 25/09/1958
59201 02/10/1958   (New) 02/10/1958
59202 10/10/1958   (New) 10/10/1958
59203 18/10/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 18/10/1958
59204 25/10/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 25/10/1958
59205 04/11/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 04/11/1958
59206 13/11/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 13/11/1958
59207 26/11/1958 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 26/11/1958
59208 04/12/1958 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 04/12/1958
59230 18/12/1958 50A
NH
York (North) (New)
Newton Heath
18/12/1958
20/09/1987
59231 29/12/1958 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 29/12/1958
59232 15/01/1959 50B Neville Hill (New) 15/01/1959
59233 31/01/1959   (New) 31/01/1959
59234 12/03/1959 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 12/03/1959