Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 719 Today
» 1177 Yesterday
» 3025 Week
» 27859 Month
» 62191 Year
» 1727567 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

160


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
06/06/1958 To Service 59188   NEW 51A Darlington
26/06/1958 To Service 59190   NEW 51A Darlington
18/07/1958 To Service 59193   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
25/07/1958 To Service 59194   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
19/08/1958 To Service 59195   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
28/08/1958 To Service 59196   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
05/09/1958 To Service 59197   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
12/09/1958 To Service 59198   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
19/09/1958 To Service 59199   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
25/09/1958 To Service 59200   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
18/10/1958 To Service 59203   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
25/10/1958 To Service 59204   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
04/11/1958 To Service 59205   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
13/11/1958 To Service 59206   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
26/11/1958 To Service 59207   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
04/12/1958 To Service 59208   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
18/12/1958 To Service 59230   NEW 50A York (North)
29/12/1958 To Service 59231   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
15/01/1959 To Service 59232   NEW 50B Neville Hill
12/03/1959 To Service 59234   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
20/09/1987 Reallocation 59230 50A York (North) NH Newton Heath