Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 71 Today
» 1129 Yesterday
» 5546 Week
» 5546 Month
» 72408 Year
» 1737784 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

160


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
59188 06/06/1958 Darlington 62.79
59189 16/06/1958 62.76
59190 26/06/1958 Darlington 62.74
59191 04/07/1958 62.72
59192 11/07/1958 62.70
59193 18/07/1958 Hull Springhead 62.68
59194 25/07/1958 Hull Springhead 62.66
59195 19/08/1958 Hull Springhead 62.59
59196 28/08/1958 Hull Springhead 62.56
59197 05/09/1958 Hull Springhead 62.54
59198 12/09/1958 Hull Springhead 62.52
59199 19/09/1958 Hull Springhead 62.50
59200 25/09/1958 Hull Springhead 62.49
59201 02/10/1958 62.47
59202 10/10/1958 62.45
59203 18/10/1958 Hull Springhead 62.42
59204 25/10/1958 Hull Springhead 62.41
59205 04/11/1958 Hull Springhead 62.38
59206 13/11/1958 Hull Springhead 62.35
59207 26/11/1958 Hull Botanic Gardens 62.32
59208 04/12/1958 Hull Botanic Gardens 62.30
59230 18/12/1958 York (North) 62.26
59231 29/12/1958 Hull Botanic Gardens 62.23
59232 15/01/1959 Neville Hill 62.18
59233 31/01/1959 62.14
59234 12/03/1959 Hull Botanic Gardens 62.03