Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

In Touch

Donations

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 15 Online
» 400 Today
» 5773 Yesterday
» 11326 Week
» 104560 Month
» 564501 Year
» 5003938 Total
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)

MR/LMS Johnson "4P" Class 4-4-0


Date Number (at time) Depot (at time) Code Details Ref Link
Sat 25/02/1961 41000 Wdn   Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - New paint shop.    
Fri 15/12/1961 41000 Wdn   Derby Works visit: Around the Works - Paint shop - sheeted. SLS 1/1962  
Fri 06/04/1962 41000 Wdn   Derby Works visit: Around the works - Paint shop. SLS 5/1962  
Fri 08/06/1962 41000 Wdn   Derby Works visit: Around the works - Paint shop. SLS 7/1962