MR/LMS Johnson "2203" Class 4-4-0
Class | MR | MR (1907) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
2203 | 2203 | 428 | 1893 | 04/1927 | ||||
2203 | 2204 | 429 | 1893 | 10/1926 | ||||
2203 | 2205 | 430 | 40430 | 02/1893 | 2D 6A 9F 9F W |
Nuneaton Chester (MR) Heaton Mersey Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/09/1950 07/07/1951 17/07/1951 12/04/1952 |
12/04/1952 |
2203 | 2206 | 431 | 1893 | 08/1925 | ||||
2203 | 2207 | 432 | 40432 | 02/1893 | 17B W |
Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1953 |
10/1953 |
2203 | 2208 | 433 | 40433 | 02/1893 | 2D 2A 2D 2A TFD 7D 7D 2B 9D 9D 9F 9A 19B 14B W |
Nuneaton Rugby Nuneaton Rugby Trafford Park (LNER) Rhyl Rhyl Nuneaton Buxton (LNWR) Buxton (LNWR) Heaton Mersey Longsight Sheffield Millhouses Kentish Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 17/07/1948 24/07/1948 16/07/1949 17/06/1950 24/06/1950 17/07/1951 28/07/1951 11/08/1951 19/06/1954 01/12/1956 23/03/1957 10/08/1957 11/1957 |
11/1957 |
2203 | 2209 | 434 | 40434 | 02/1893 | 10C W |
Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/11/1956 |
10/11/1956 |
2203 | 2210 | 435 | 1893 | 09/1927 | ||||
2203 | 2211 | 436 | 40436 | 03/1893 | 17B W |
Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/09/1954 |
25/09/1954 |
2203 | 2212 | 437 | 40437 | 03/1893 | 22B W |
Gloucester Barnwood Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1949 |
05/1949 |
2203 | 2213 | 438 | 40438 | 03/1893 | 9D 2A 2D 2B 10C W |
Buxton (LNWR) Rugby Nuneaton Bletchley Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/06/1948 24/07/1948 17/06/1950 09/08/1952 14/08/1954 |
14/08/1954 |
2203 | 2214 | 439 | 40439 | 03/1893 | 21B 21A 18A W |
Bournville Saltley Toton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/02/1960 23/04/1960 28/01/1961 |
28/01/1961 |
2203 | 2215 | 440 | 1893 | 06/1926 | ||||
2203 | 2216 | 441 | 1893 | 10/1925 | ||||
2203 | 2217 | 442 | 1893 | 10/1926 | ||||
2203 | 184 | 443 | 40443 | 02/1894 | 5C 21A 18A W |
Stafford Saltley Toton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/03/1957 23/04/1960 28/01/1961 |
28/01/1961 |
2203 | 185 | 444 | 40444 | 02/1894 | 20C 20A 20A W |
Royston Holbeck (MR) Holbeck (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/06/1951 16/06/1951 11/07/1953 |
11/07/1953 |
2203 | 186 | 445 | 1894 | 06/1926 | ||||
2203 | 187 | 446 | 40446 | 03/1894 | 12B 20H W |
Carlisle Upperby Lancaster Green Ayre Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 17/06/1950 |
17/06/1950 |
2203 | 188 | 447 | 40447 | 03/1894 | 2D 5A 16A W |
Nuneaton Crewe North Nottingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/10/1952 23/03/1957 03/05/1958 |
03/05/1958 |
2203 | 189 | 448 | 40448 | 04/1894 | 5B 5A 12A W |
Crewe South Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1948 29/07/1950 12/11/1955 |
12/11/1955 |
2203 | 190 | 449 | 1894 | 03/1925 | ||||
2203 | 191 | 450 | 40450 | 04/1894 | 2A 7D 10C 19G W |
Rugby Rhyl Patricroft Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 01/10/1949 24/12/1949 16/03/1957 |
16/03/1957 |
2203 | 192 | 451 | 1894 | 02/1926 | ||||
2203 | 193 | 452 | 40452 | 05/1894 | 20F 16A 15C W |
Skipton Nottingham Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/03/1950 19/06/1954 28/01/1961 |
28/01/1961 |
2203 | 194 | 453 | 40453 | 06/1894 | 15D 17B 26F W |
Bedford Burton Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/08/1949 28/01/1961 22/09/1962 |
22/09/1962 |
2203 | 195 | 454 | 40454 | 06/1894 | 15B 16D 16D 16A W |
Kettering Mansfield Mansfield Nottingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1948 11/12/1948 28/11/1953 10/09/1960 |
10/09/1960 |
2203 | 196 | 455 | 40455 | 06/1894 | 20A 20E W |
Holbeck (MR) Manningham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/04/1950 07/1954 |
07/1954 |
2203 | 197 | 456 | 40456 | 06/1894 | 17B W |
Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1949 |
10/1949 |
2203 | 198 | 457 | 1894 | 06/1926 | ||||
2203 | 199 | 458 | 40458 | 08/1894 | 16A W |
Nottingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/02/1957 |
02/02/1957 |
2203 | 161 | 459 | 40459 | 08/1894 | 20G W |
Hellifield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1949 |
31/12/1949 |
2203 | 162 | 460 | 1894 | 02/1930 | ||||
2203 | 163 | 461 | 40461 | 09/1894 | 5C 16A W |
Stafford Nottingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/03/1957 14/02/1959 |
14/02/1959 |
2203 | 164 | 462 | 40462 | 09/1894 | 9D 3C W |
Buxton (LNWR) Ryecroft (Walsall) Withdrawn |
11/04/1936 01/01/1948 28/04/1951 |
28/04/1951 |
2203 | 230 | 463 | 40463 | 08/1895 | 21A 21B 21B W |
Saltley Bournville Bournville Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/07/1949 16/07/1949 07/1956 |
07/1956 |
2203 | 231 | 464 | 40464 | 09/1895 | 2D 6A TFD 4B 15C W |
Nuneaton Chester (MR) Trafford Park (LNER) Northampton Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/07/1949 16/07/1949 26/01/1952 23/03/1957 01/03/1958 |
01/03/1958 |
2203 | 232 | 465 | 1895 | 11/1931 | ||||
2203 | 233 | 466 | 40466 | 10/1895 | 18C W |
Hasland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/1949 |
03/1949 |
2203 | 234 | 467 | 1895 | 06/1926 | ||||
2203 | 235 | 468 | 40468 | 11/1895 | 15C 15A 15A W |
Leicester Midland Wellingborough Wellingborough Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/11/1948 11/12/1948 05/1950 |
05/1950 |
2203 | 236 | 469 | 1895 | 12/1926 | ||||
2203 | 237 | 470 | 40470 | 11/1895 | 20G W |
Hellifield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/05/1951 |
12/05/1951 |
2203 | 238 | 471 | 40471 | 12/1895 | 5A 5C W |
Crewe North Stafford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/10/1948 05/01/1952 |
05/01/1952 |
2203 | 239 | 472 | 40472 | 12/1895 | 18C 20F W |
Hasland Skipton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/11/1953 10/09/1955 |
10/09/1955 |
2203 | 2581 | 473 | 02/1900 | 06/1927 | ||||
2203 | 2582 | 474 | 03/1900 | 10/1925 | ||||
2203 | 2583 | 475 | 03/1900 | 10/1926 | ||||
2203 | 2584 | 476 | 03/1900 | 08/1927 | ||||
2203 | 2585 | 477 | 40477 | 03/1900 | 14B W |
Kentish Town Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/02/1951 |
24/02/1951 |
2203 | 2586 | 478 | 40478 | 04/1900 | 16A W |
Nottingham Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/10/1950 |
14/10/1950 |
2203 | 2587 | 479 | 40479 | 04/1900 | 9D 5A TFD W |
Buxton (LNWR) Crewe North Trafford Park (LNER) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/03/1948 16/07/1949 11/1949 |
11/1949 |
2203 | 2588 | 480 | 40480 | 04/1900 | 20C W |
Royston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/02/1954 |
06/02/1954 |
2203 | 2589 | 481 | 05/1900 | 04/1926 | ||||
2203 | 2590 | 482 | 40482 | 05/1900 | 20A 17A 16B 9A 19B W |
Holbeck (MR) Derby Spital Bridge Longsight Sheffield Millhouses Withdrawn |
11/04/1936 01/01/1948 04/03/1950 29/11/1952 23/03/1957 07/1957 |
07/1957 |