Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 646 Today
» 5387 Yesterday
» 29223 Week
» 89517 Month
» 549458 Year
» 4988895 Total
|
Record: 12282 (30/03/2025)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
MR/LMS Johnson "2203" Class 4-4-0
Class |
MR |
MR (1907) |
BR |
Built |
Date Withdrawn |
Modification |
Modification Date |
2203 |
2203
|
428
|
|
1893 |
04/1927 |
Rebuilt (no details available) |
1903 |
2203 |
2204
|
429
|
|
1893 |
10/1926 |
Rebuilt (no details available) |
1903 |
2203 |
2205
|
430
|
40430
|
02/1893 |
12/04/1952 |
H boiler fitted |
1904 |
2203 |
2206
|
431
|
|
1893 |
08/1925 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
2207
|
432
|
40432
|
02/1893 |
10/1953 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
2208
|
433
|
40433
|
02/1893 |
11/1957 |
H boiler fitted |
1904 |
2203 |
2209
|
434
|
40434
|
02/1893 |
10/11/1956 |
H boiler fitted |
1906 |
2203 |
2210
|
435
|
|
1893 |
09/1927 |
H boiler fitted |
1906 |
2203 |
2211
|
436
|
40436
|
03/1893 |
25/09/1954 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
2212
|
437
|
(40437)
|
03/1893 |
05/1949 |
H boiler fitted |
1906 |
2203 |
2213
|
438
|
40438
|
03/1893 |
14/08/1954 |
H boiler fitted |
1906 |
2203 |
2214
|
439
|
40439
|
03/1893 |
28/01/1961 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
2215
|
440
|
|
1893 |
06/1926 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
2216
|
441
|
|
1893 |
10/1925 |
H boiler fitted |
1906 |
2203 |
2217
|
442
|
|
1893 |
10/1926 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
184
|
443
|
40443
|
02/1894 |
28/01/1961 |
H boiler fitted |
1904 |
2203 |
185
|
444
|
40444
|
02/1894 |
11/07/1953 |
H boiler fitted |
1906 |
2203 |
186
|
445
|
|
1894 |
06/1926 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
187
|
446
|
(40446)
|
03/1894 |
17/06/1950 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
188
|
447
|
40447
|
03/1894 |
03/05/1958 |
Rebuilt (no details available) |
1902 |
2203 |
189
|
448
|
40448
|
04/1894 |
12/11/1955 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
190
|
449
|
|
1894 |
03/1925 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
191
|
450
|
40450
|
04/1894 |
16/03/1957 |
H boiler fitted |
1906 |
2203 |
192
|
451
|
|
1894 |
02/1926 |
H boiler fitted |
1906 |
2203 |
193
|
452
|
40452
|
05/1894 |
28/01/1961 |
H boiler fitted |
1904 |
2203 |
194
|
453
|
40453
|
06/1894 |
22/09/1962 |
H boiler fitted |
1906 |
2203 |
195
|
454
|
40454
|
06/1894 |
10/09/1960 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
196
|
455
|
40455
|
06/1894 |
07/1954 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
197
|
456
|
(40456)
|
06/1894 |
10/1949 |
H boiler fitted |
1904 |
2203 |
198
|
457
|
|
1894 |
06/1926 |
H boiler fitted |
1906 |
2203 |
199
|
458
|
40458
|
08/1894 |
02/02/1957 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
161
|
459
|
40459
|
08/1894 |
31/12/1949 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
162
|
460
|
|
1894 |
02/1930 |
Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted |
1910 |
2203 |
163
|
461
|
40461
|
09/1894 |
14/02/1959 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
164
|
462
|
40462
|
09/1894 |
28/04/1951 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
230
|
463
|
40463
|
08/1895 |
07/1956 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
231
|
464
|
40464
|
09/1895 |
01/03/1958 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
232
|
465
|
|
1895 |
11/1931 |
Boiler with Belpaire Firebox fitted |
1910 |
2203 |
233
|
466
|
(40466)
|
10/1895 |
03/1949 |
H boiler fitted |
1906 |
2203 |
234
|
467
|
|
1895 |
06/1926 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
235
|
468
|
(40468)
|
11/1895 |
05/1950 |
H boiler fitted |
1904 |
2203 |
236
|
469
|
|
1895 |
12/1926 |
H boiler fitted |
1906 |
2203 |
237
|
470
|
40470
|
11/1895 |
12/05/1951 |
H boiler fitted |
1906 |
2203 |
238
|
471
|
40471
|
12/1895 |
05/01/1952 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
239
|
472
|
40472
|
12/1895 |
10/09/1955 |
H boiler fitted |
1906 |
2203 |
2581
|
473
|
|
02/1900 |
06/1927 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
2582
|
474
|
|
03/1900 |
10/1925 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
2583
|
475
|
|
03/1900 |
10/1926 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
2584
|
476
|
|
03/1900 |
08/1927 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
2585
|
477
|
40477
|
03/1900 |
24/02/1951 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
2586
|
478
|
40478
|
04/1900 |
14/10/1950 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
2587
|
479
|
(40479)
|
04/1900 |
11/1949 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
2588
|
480
|
40480
|
04/1900 |
06/02/1954 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
2589
|
481
|
|
05/1900 |
04/1926 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |
2203 |
2590
|
482
|
40482
|
05/1900 |
07/1957 |
H boiler fitted |
1905 |