LTSR/LMS Whitelegg "37" Class 4-4-2T
Class | LTSR | MR | LMS (1929) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tilbury Tanks | 37 | 2146 | 2135 | 41953 | 03/1897 | 13C 33A 33A W |
Tilbury Plaistow Plaistow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/07/1951 21/07/1951 25/08/1951 |
25/08/1951 |
Tilbury Tanks | 38 | 2147 | 2136 | 41954 | 04/1897 | 13A 13A W |
Plaistow Plaistow Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 25/08/1951 |
25/08/1951 |
Tilbury Tanks | 39 | 2148 | 2137 | 41955 | 04/1897 | 13A 13C W |
Plaistow Tilbury Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 12/02/1951 |
12/02/1951 |
Tilbury Tanks | 40 | 2149 | 2138 | 41956 | 04/1897 | 13C 33A W |
Tilbury Plaistow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/07/1951 28/09/1951 |
28/09/1951 |
Tilbury Tanks | 41 | 2150 | 2139 | 41957 | 04/1897 | 13A 13A W |
Plaistow Plaistow Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 28/09/1951 |
28/09/1951 |
Tilbury Tanks | 42 | 2151 | 2140 | 41958 | 04/1897 | 19C 16D W |
Canklow Mansfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/07/1948 22/12/1951 |
22/12/1951 |
Tilbury Tanks | 43 | 2152 | 2141 | 41959 | 12/1898 | 13A 33C 33C W |
Plaistow Shoeburyness Shoeburyness Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/07/1951 21/07/1951 28/09/1951 |
28/09/1951 |
Tilbury Tanks | 44 | 2153 | 2142 | 41960 | 12/1898 | 13C W |
Tilbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1951 |
12/02/1951 |
Tilbury Tanks | 45 | 2154 | 2143 | 41961 | 12/1898 | 16D W |
Mansfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/10/1952 |
18/10/1952 |
Tilbury Tanks | 46 | 2155 | 2144 | 41962 | 12/1898 | 19C W |
Canklow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/1951 |
02/1951 |
Tilbury Tanks | 47 | 2156 | 2145 | 41963 | 01/1899 | 13A W |
Plaistow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1951 |
21/02/1951 |
Tilbury Tanks | 48 | 2157 | 2146 | 41964 | 01/1899 | 13A 13C W |
Plaistow Tilbury Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 12/02/1951 |
12/02/1951 |