LTSR/LMS Whitelegg "37" Class 4-4-2T
LTSR | MR | LMS (1929) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
37 | 2146 | 2135 | 41953 | 03/1897 | 25/08/1951 | 54.42 | 54.54 | |||||
38 | 2147 | 2136 | 41954 | 04/1897 | 25/08/1951 | 54.33 | 54.37 | |||||
39 | 2148 | 2137 | 41955 | 04/1897 | 12/02/1951 | 53.83 | 53.87 | |||||
40 | 2149 | 2138 | 41956 | 04/1897 | 28/09/1951 | 54.42 | 54.53 | |||||
41 | 2150 | 2139 | 41957 | 04/1897 | 28/09/1951 | 54.42 | 54.53 | |||||
42 | 2151 | 2140 | 41958 | 04/1897 | 22/12/1951 | 54.67 | 54.79 | |||||
43 | 2152 | 2141 | 41959 | 12/1898 | 28/09/1951 | 52.75 | ||||||
44 | 2153 | 2142 | 41960 | 12/1898 | 12/02/1951 | 52.17 | 52.20 | |||||
45 | 2154 | 2143 | 41961 | 12/1898 | 18/10/1952 | 53.83 | 53.87 | |||||
46 | 2155 | 2144 | 41962 | 12/1898 | 02/1951 | 52.17 | 52.20 | |||||
47 | 2156 | 2145 | 41963 | 01/1899 | 21/02/1951 | 52.08 | 52.19 | |||||
48 | 2157 | 2146 | 41964 | 01/1899 | 12/02/1951 | 52.08 | 52.19 |