LTSR/LMS Whitelegg "79" Class 4-4-2T
Class | LTSR | MR | LMS | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
79 | 79 | 2176 | 2147 | 41965 | 05/1909 | 13A 13C W |
Plaistow Tilbury Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 12/02/1951 |
12/02/1951 |
79 | 80 | 2177 | 2148 | 41966 | 05/1909 | 13C 15A 18A W |
Tilbury Wellingborough Toton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 21/02/1953 06/1956 |
06/1956 |
79 | 81 | 2178 | 2149 | 41967 | 06/1909 | 13A 13D 33B 33B W |
Plaistow Shoeburyness Tilbury Tilbury Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 21/04/1951 07/07/1951 22/11/1952 |
22/11/1952 |
79 | 82 | 2179 | 2150 | 41968 | 07/1909 | 13A 13D W |
Plaistow Shoeburyness Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 17/02/1951 |
17/02/1951 |
79 Mod | 2110 | 41928 | 05/1923 | 13C 33A W |
Tilbury Plaistow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/07/1951 16/02/1959 |
16/02/1959 | ||
79 Mod | 2111 | 41929 | 06/1923 | 13C 33A W |
Tilbury Plaistow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/07/1951 01/09/1951 |
01/09/1951 | ||
79 Mod | 2112 | 41930 | 06/1923 | 13A 33B 33B 33A W |
Plaistow Tilbury Tilbury Plaistow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/07/1951 21/07/1951 19/04/1952 23/08/1952 |
23/08/1952 | ||
79 Mod | 2113 | 41931 | 07/1923 | 13C 13A W |
Tilbury Plaistow Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 10/03/1951 |
10/03/1951 | ||
79 Mod | 2114 | 41932 | 07/1923 | 13A W |
Plaistow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/09/1951 |
01/09/1951 | ||
79 Mod | 2115 | 41933 | 07/1923 | 13C 13C 33A W |
Tilbury Tilbury Plaistow Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 07/07/1951 18/08/1951 |
18/08/1951 | ||
79 Mod | 2116 | 41934 | 07/1923 | 13C 13D 33A 33A W |
Tilbury Shoeburyness Plaistow Plaistow Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 07/07/1951 21/07/1951 09/1951 |
09/1951 | ||
79 Mod | 2117 | 41935 | 08/1923 | 13A W |
Plaistow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/09/1951 |
28/09/1951 | ||
79 Mod | 2118 | 41936 | 08/1923 | 13C 33B 30A 30E 30A W |
Tilbury Tilbury Stratford Colchester Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/04/1952 20/02/1954 25/05/1956 15/06/1957 11/09/1958 |
11/09/1958 | ||
79 Mod | 2119 | 41937 | 08/1923 | 13C 13D 33A W |
Tilbury Shoeburyness Plaistow Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 07/07/1951 21/03/1952 |
21/03/1952 | ||
79 Mod | 2120 | 41938 | 08/1925 | 15C 16D 16D 15C 15C W |
Leicester Midland Mansfield Mansfield Leicester Midland Leicester Midland Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 10/03/1951 24/03/1951 12/02/1955 |
12/02/1955 | ||
79 Mod | 2121 | 41939 | 08/1925 | 13C W |
Tilbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/02/1959 |
16/02/1959 | ||
79 Mod | 2122 | 41940 | 08/1925 | 16D W |
Mansfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/04/1956 |
14/04/1956 | ||
79 Mod | 2123 | 41941 | 08/1925 | 13C 13D 33A W |
Tilbury Shoeburyness Plaistow Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 07/07/1951 16/02/1959 |
16/02/1959 | ||
79 Mod | 2124 | 41942 | 08/1925 | 13A W |
Plaistow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/12/1956 |
19/12/1956 | ||
79 Mod | 2125 | 41943 | 05/1927 | 16D 19C 16D W |
Mansfield Canklow Mansfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1948 24/04/1948 25/02/1956 |
25/02/1956 | ||
79 Mod | 2126 | 41944 | 05/1927 | 13A 33B 33B 33C 33C 30A W |
Plaistow Tilbury Tilbury Shoeburyness Shoeburyness Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/07/1951 21/07/1951 13/10/1951 20/10/1951 23/01/1954 29/12/1956 |
29/12/1956 | ||
79 Mod | 2127 | 41945 | 06/1927 | 13A 33B 33B 33A W |
Plaistow Tilbury Tilbury Plaistow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/07/1951 21/07/1951 15/12/1956 16/02/1959 |
16/02/1959 | ||
79 Mod | 2128 | 41946 | 06/1927 | 13C 33A W |
Tilbury Plaistow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/12/1956 17/02/1959 |
17/02/1959 | ||
79 Mod | 2129 | 41947 | 06/1927 | 16D 18A W |
Mansfield Toton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/02/1956 03/12/1960 |
03/12/1960 | ||
79 Mod | 2130 | 41948 | 06/1927 | 13A W |
Plaistow Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/02/1959 |
17/02/1959 | ||
79 Mod | 2131 | 41949 | 06/1927 | 13A 33B 30A 30E 30A 35C 31C 31B 31F 31B W |
Plaistow Tilbury Stratford Colchester Stratford Spital Bridge Kings Lynn March Spital Bridge March Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/10/1951 23/01/1954 18/02/1956 15/06/1957 08/03/1958 01/08/1959 15/08/1959 24/10/1959 06/02/1960 07/04/1960 |
07/04/1960 | ||
79 Mod | 2132 | 41950 | 07/1927 | 13C 13A 33B 33A W |
Tilbury Plaistow Tilbury Plaistow Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 19/04/1952 23/01/1954 17/02/1959 |
17/02/1959 | ||
79 Mod | 2133 | 41951 | 07/1927 | 13C 13A 33B 33B 33A 30A W |
Tilbury Plaistow Tilbury Tilbury Plaistow Stratford Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 07/07/1951 21/07/1951 19/04/1952 20/02/1954 19/12/1956 |
19/12/1956 | ||
79 Mod | 2134 | 41952 | 07/1927 | 13A 30A W |
Plaistow Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/12/1953 29/12/1956 |
29/12/1956 | ||
79 Mod | 2151 | 41969 | 01/1930 | 13A 13A 33B 33B 33A 33C 33A 31F 31C 31B W |
Plaistow Plaistow Tilbury Tilbury Plaistow Shoeburyness Plaistow Spital Bridge Kings Lynn March Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 07/07/1951 21/07/1951 23/01/1954 15/12/1956 15/11/1958 31/01/1959 01/08/1959 15/08/1959 07/04/1960 |
07/04/1960 | ||
79 Mod | 2152 | 41970 | 01/1930 | 13A 33B 33B 30A W |
Plaistow Tilbury Tilbury Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/07/1951 21/07/1951 23/01/1954 19/12/1956 |
19/12/1956 | ||
79 Mod | 2153 | 41971 | 02/1930 | 13A 13D 29C 31B 20F W |
Plaistow Shoeburyness Dundee West Stirling Skipton Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 28/02/1948 20/03/1948 19/06/1948 12/02/1955 |
12/02/1955 | ||
79 Mod | 2154 | 41972 | 02/1930 | 29C 29C 20F W |
Dundee West Dundee West Skipton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 19/06/1948 12/02/1955 |
12/02/1955 | ||
79 Mod | 2155 | 41973 | 02/1930 | 29C 29C 20F W |
Dundee West Dundee West Skipton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 19/06/1948 12/02/1955 |
12/02/1955 | ||
79 Mod | 2156 | 41974 | 02/1930 | 13A 29C 20F W |
Plaistow Dundee West Skipton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/02/1948 19/06/1948 12/02/1955 |
12/02/1955 | ||
79 Mod | 2157 | 41975 | 02/1930 | 13A 33B 30A 30E 30A 35C W |
Plaistow Tilbury Stratford Colchester Stratford Spital Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1953 19/12/1953 22/09/1956 15/06/1957 08/03/1958 26/11/1959 |
26/11/1959 | ||
79 Mod | 2158 | 41976 | 02/1930 | 13A 30A W |
Plaistow Stratford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/02/1954 19/12/1956 |
19/12/1956 | ||
79 Mod | 2159 | 41977 | 03/1930 | 13C W |
Tilbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/02/1959 |
17/02/1959 | ||
79 Mod | 2160 | 41978 | 03/1930 | 13C 13D 33B 33B 33A W |
Tilbury Shoeburyness Tilbury Tilbury Plaistow Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 07/07/1951 21/07/1951 19/04/1952 17/02/1959 |
17/02/1959 |