LMS Stanier "5MT" Class 4-6-0 - 'Black Five'
Class | LMS | BR (BR Tmp) | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Black Five | 44658 | 31/05/1949 | 16A 8F 8B 8F W |
Nottingham Springs Branch (Wigan) Warrington Dallam Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
06/02/1960 06/03/1965 10/04/1965 20/05/1967 18/11/1967 |
18/11/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44659 | 31/05/1949 | 15C 16C 40E 8L W |
Leicester Midland Derby Colwick Aintree Withdrawn |
18/05/1963 30/11/1963 25/12/1965 30/04/1966 17/06/1967 |
17/06/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44660 | 31/05/1949 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1964 | 09/1964 | ||
Black Five | 44661 | 30/06/1949 | 19B 6J 6B 6G 1A 2A 6D 6A 5D W |
Sheffield Millhouses Holyhead Mold Junction Llandudno Junction Willesden Tyseley Shrewsbury Chester (MR) Stoke Withdrawn |
16/07/1955 17/05/1958 09/02/1963 11/05/1963 06/02/1965 02/10/1965 12/11/1966 11/03/1967 15/04/1967 12/08/1967 |
12/08/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44662 | 30/06/1949 | 20A 20A 56F W |
Holbeck (MR) Holbeck (MR) Low Moor Withdrawn |
17/12/1949 14/01/1950 15/07/1967 10/1967 |
10/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44663 | 18/06/1949 | 15C 14A 14B 21A 2A 2B 9F W |
Leicester Midland Cricklewood East Kentish Town Saltley Tyseley Oxley Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
18/06/1949 26/01/1957 07/09/1957 21/11/1959 02/10/1965 12/11/1966 10/12/1966 04/05/1968 |
04/05/1968 | ||
Black Five | 44664 | 16/07/1949 | 18A 19B 21A 15E 21A 16A 15C 17A 24E 9K W |
Toton Sheffield Millhouses Saltley Leicester (G.C.) Saltley Nottingham Leicester Midland Derby Blackpool Central Bolton Withdrawn |
16/07/1949 20/08/1949 27/03/1954 04/10/1958 06/12/1958 30/05/1959 16/09/1961 14/10/1961 25/05/1963 19/09/1964 11/05/1968 |
11/05/1968 | ||
Black Five | 44665 | 16/07/1949 | 19A 19B 17F 16D 16E 40E 9E W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Sheffield Millhouses Trafford Park (LMS) Annesley Kirkby in Ashfield Colwick Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
16/07/1949 20/08/1949 23/03/1957 12/05/1962 23/10/1965 25/12/1965 25/06/1966 02/03/1968 |
02/03/1968 | ||
Black Five | 44666 | 16/07/1949 | 20A 21A 2A 8A W |
Holbeck (MR) Saltley Tyseley Edge Hill Withdrawn |
16/07/1949 12/11/1949 02/10/1965 20/08/1966 18/02/1967 |
18/02/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44667 | 31/07/1949 | 15C 2F 15E 10J 10A W |
Leicester Midland Woodford Halse Leicester (G.C.) Lancaster Green Ayre Carnforth Withdrawn |
10/01/1959 29/09/1962 03/08/1963 02/11/1963 23/04/1966 08/1967 |
08/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44668 | 24/12/1949 | W | Withdrawn | 24/12/1949 09/04/1966 |
09/04/1966 | ||
Black Five | 44669 | 31/12/1949 | W | Withdrawn | 14/10/1967 | 14/10/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44670 | 31/01/1950 | W | Withdrawn | 15/01/1966 | 15/01/1966 | ||
Black Five | 44671 | 28/02/1950 | W | Withdrawn | 18/02/1967 | 18/02/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44672 | 28/02/1950 | 10D W |
Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
06/01/1968 02/03/1968 |
02/03/1968 | ||
Black Five | 44673 | 28/02/1950 | 10D 9E W |
Lostock Hall Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
22/02/1964 06/02/1965 15/05/1965 |
15/05/1965 | ||
Black Five | 44674 | 31/03/1950 | 10D 12A W |
Lostock Hall Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
22/02/1964 10/10/1964 30/12/1967 |
30/12/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44675 | 31/03/1950 | 10D 10C 12A W |
Lostock Hall Fleetwood Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
22/02/1964 13/03/1965 25/09/1965 23/09/1967 |
23/09/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44676 | 30/04/1950 | 12E 12A 27B 26A W |
Barrow in Furness Carlisle Kingmoor Aintree Newton Heath Withdrawn |
07/01/1961 10/11/1962 18/05/1963 22/06/1963 04/07/1964 |
04/07/1964 | ||
Black Five | 44677 | 30/04/1950 | 65B 12A W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
19/05/1951 10/11/1962 28/10/1967 |
28/10/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44678 | 31/05/1950 | 6J 12A 5A 2A 5A 5B 8C 8F W |
Holyhead Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Rugby Crewe North Crewe South Speke Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
03/10/1953 29/12/1956 10/08/1957 03/10/1959 07/11/1959 29/05/1965 21/08/1965 22/01/1966 25/11/1967 |
25/11/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44679 | 31/05/1950 | 5B 8C 8F W |
Crewe South Speke Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
29/05/1965 21/08/1965 22/01/1966 23/09/1967 |
23/09/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44680 | 30/06/1950 | 5B W |
Crewe South Withdrawn |
29/05/1965 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44681 | 17/06/1950 | 5A 6J 5B 5A 5B W |
Crewe North Holyhead Crewe South Crewe North Crewe South Withdrawn |
17/06/1950 03/10/1953 05/10/1957 11/07/1959 29/05/1965 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44682 | 17/06/1950 | 5A 24K 6G 8A 24J 6A 5D 8F W |
Crewe North Preston Llandudno Junction Edge Hill Lancaster Green Ayre Chester (MR) Stoke Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
17/06/1950 20/06/1959 23/04/1960 08/10/1960 19/05/1962 20/06/1964 19/09/1964 19/08/1967 11/1967 |
11/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44683 | 31/07/1950 | 5B 8F 10D W |
Crewe South Springs Branch (Wigan) Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
29/05/1965 24/06/1967 09/12/1967 13/04/1968 |
13/04/1968 | ||
Black Five | 44684 | 31/07/1950 | 5B 5A 5B W |
Crewe South Crewe North Crewe South Withdrawn |
07/03/1964 20/06/1964 19/09/1964 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44685 | 31/08/1950 | 4B 5A 5B W |
Northampton Crewe North Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/12/1951 26/01/1952 29/05/1965 22/04/1967 |
22/04/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44686 | 30/04/1951 | 9A 21E 6G 8M W |
Longsight Monument Lane Llandudno Junction Southport Withdrawn |
30/04/1951 30/04/1960 14/05/1960 14/09/1963 16/10/1965 |
16/10/1965 | ||
Black Five | 44687 | 31/05/1951 | 9A 5B 6G 8M W |
Longsight Crewe South Llandudno Junction Southport Withdrawn |
31/05/1951 10/09/1960 08/10/1960 14/09/1963 22/01/1966 |
22/01/1966 | ||
Black Five | 44688 | 31/08/1950 | 27A 8E 17A 9E 14B 2F 17B 8A W |
Bank Hall Northwich Derby Trafford Park (LMS) Kentish Town Woodford Halse Burton Edge Hill Withdrawn |
31/08/1950 14/06/1958 09/08/1958 21/11/1959 12/11/1960 22/09/1962 22/06/1963 24/07/1965 20/08/1966 |
20/08/1966 | ||
Black Five | 44689 | 30/09/1950 | 27A 24A 24E 27A 24A 24B 27C 12B 12A 12B 12A W |
Bank Hall Accrington Blackpool Central Bank Hall Accrington Rose Grove Southport Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
30/09/1950 05/11/1955 19/05/1956 16/06/1956 11/08/1956 04/03/1961 17/06/1961 18/05/1963 22/06/1963 25/07/1964 07/11/1964 04/03/1967 |
04/03/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44690 | 31/10/1950 | 27A 17A 15C 15E 16C 10F W |
Bank Hall Derby Leicester Midland Leicester (G.C.) Derby Rose Grove Withdrawn |
31/10/1950 14/06/1958 10/01/1959 17/03/1962 23/11/1963 05/03/1966 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | ||
Black Five | 44691 | 31/10/1950 | 27A 17A 14D 15E 17A 14E 2F 15E 2E 2B 12C 12D W |
Bank Hall Derby Neasden Leicester (G.C.) Derby Bedford Woodford Halse Leicester (G.C.) Saltley Oxley Barrow in Furness Workington Withdrawn |
31/10/1950 14/06/1958 21/02/1959 18/06/1960 22/10/1960 10/06/1961 22/09/1962 10/08/1963 02/11/1963 03/04/1965 20/08/1966 17/12/1966 01/04/1967 |
01/04/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44692 | 31/10/1950 | 27A 24A 24B 27C 27B 12A 10D 12A W |
Bank Hall Accrington Rose Grove Southport Aintree Carlisle Kingmoor Lostock Hall Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
31/10/1950 05/11/1955 04/03/1961 17/06/1961 17/03/1962 18/05/1963 11/07/1964 10/10/1964 14/05/1966 |
14/05/1966 | ||
Black Five | 44693 | 11/1950 | 25F 56D 56F W |
Low Moor Mirfield Low Moor Withdrawn |
11/1950 18/04/1964 03/12/1966 29/05/1967 |
29/05/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44694 | 11/1950 | 25F 56D 56F W |
Low Moor Mirfield Low Moor Withdrawn |
11/1950 18/04/1964 10/09/1966 10/1967 |
10/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44695 | 30/11/1950 | 25F 56D 56F W |
Low Moor Mirfield Low Moor Withdrawn |
30/11/1950 18/04/1964 03/12/1966 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44696 | 30/11/1950 | 26A 9E 9B 9D W |
Newton Heath Trafford Park (LMS) Stockport Edgeley Newton Heath Withdrawn |
30/11/1950 22/02/1964 05/09/1964 19/06/1965 13/05/1967 |
13/05/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44697 | 30/11/1950 | 26A 27A 28A 24A 26A 27A 26A 24E 25G 26A W |
Newton Heath Bank Hall Blackpool Central Accrington Newton Heath Bank Hall Newton Heath Blackpool Central Farnley Junction Newton Heath Withdrawn |
30/11/1950 27/01/1951 19/05/1951 16/06/1951 08/09/1951 23/02/1952 14/06/1952 24/01/1953 08/08/1953 05/09/1953 18/11/1967 |
18/11/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44698 | 03/07/1948 | W | Withdrawn | 14/07/1966 | 14/07/1966 | ||
Black Five | 44699 | 10/07/1948 | 67A 67E 67A W |
Corkerhill Dumfries Corkerhill Withdrawn |
01/07/1961 30/05/1964 25/06/1966 01/05/1967 |
01/05/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44700 | 31/07/1948 | 28C W |
Carstairs Withdrawn |
02/10/1948 14/07/1966 |
14/07/1966 | ||
Black Five | 44701 | 07/08/1948 | 28C W |
Carstairs Withdrawn |
02/10/1948 05/1964 |
18/06/1964 | ||
Black Five | 44702 | 21/08/1948 | 65A 66B 64C W |
Eastfield Motherwell Dalry Road Withdrawn |
13/04/1957 19/01/1963 07/09/1963 26/06/1965 |
26/06/1965 | ||
Black Five | 44703 | 28/08/1948 | 68A 61B 65A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Aberdeen Ferryhill Eastfield Withdrawn |
19/05/1951 06/08/1955 26/11/1966 10/12/1966 |
10/12/1966 | ||
Black Five | 44704 | 04/09/1948 | 29A W |
Perth South Withdrawn |
02/10/1948 02/09/1966 |
02/09/1966 | ||
Black Five | 44705 | 11/09/1948 | 29A W |
Perth South Withdrawn |
02/10/1948 02/09/1966 |
02/09/1966 | ||
Black Five | 44706 | 18/09/1948 | W | Withdrawn | 28/12/1963 | 28/12/1963 | ||
Black Five | 44707 | 25/09/1948 | 63D 65A 67A 67E 66E W |
Oban Eastfield Corkerhill Dumfries Carstairs Withdrawn |
14/05/1955 29/10/1955 19/01/1963 13/04/1963 25/12/1965 24/01/1966 |
24/01/1966 | ||
Black Five | 44708 | 02/10/1948 | 7C 6A 10B 10A 10A 5B 5B 5A 10C 9E W |
Holyhead Chester (MR) Preston Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Crewe South Crewe South Crewe North Patricroft Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
12/03/1949 26/03/1949 20/08/1949 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 28/10/1950 04/11/1950 16/05/1953 03/10/1953 14/11/1964 20/01/1968 |
20/01/1968 | ||
Black Five | 44709 | 09/10/1948 | 11A W |
Carnforth Withdrawn |
28/05/1949 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | ||
Black Five | 44710 | 16/10/1948 | 2A 6A 6A 3D 2D 8F W |
Rugby Chester (MR) Chester (MR) Aston Banbury Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
29/04/1950 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 27/02/1960 02/10/1965 20/08/1966 24/12/1966 |
24/12/1966 | ||
Black Five | 44711 | 23/10/1948 | 2A 6J 6D 8F 8A W |
Rugby Holyhead Shrewsbury Springs Branch (Wigan) Edge Hill Withdrawn |
29/04/1950 22/06/1963 17/09/1966 11/03/1967 09/12/1967 04/05/1968 |
04/05/1968 | ||
Black Five | 44712 | 30/10/1948 | 2A 2A 4A 2A 2E 2A 6J W |
Rugby Rugby Bletchley Rugby Northampton Rugby Holyhead Withdrawn |
29/04/1950 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 22/11/1958 06/02/1960 22/06/1963 12/11/1966 |
12/11/1966 | ||
Black Five | 44713 | 06/11/1948 | 2A 1A 5B 2E 6A 5D 10D W |
Rugby Willesden Crewe South Northampton Chester (MR) Stoke Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
29/04/1950 21/04/1956 14/06/1958 10/11/1962 20/06/1964 19/09/1964 24/06/1967 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | ||
Black Five | 44714 | 13/11/1948 | 5A 2A 6J 12A 5A 8A 5A 5B 5A 5D 5B 5A 5B 5D W |
Crewe North Rugby Holyhead Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Edge Hill Crewe North Crewe South Crewe North Stoke Crewe South Crewe North Crewe South Stoke Withdrawn |
16/07/1949 29/04/1950 24/03/1956 29/12/1956 10/08/1957 30/05/1959 20/06/1959 23/06/1962 15/09/1962 15/02/1964 07/03/1964 20/06/1964 19/09/1964 20/03/1965 19/11/1966 |
19/11/1966 | ||
Black Five | 44715 | 20/11/1948 | 2A 5B 12D 9E W |
Rugby Crewe South Workington Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
29/04/1950 08/05/1965 15/04/1967 06/01/1968 27/01/1968 |
27/01/1968 | ||
Black Five | 44716 | 27/11/1948 | 5A 2A 5B W |
Crewe North Rugby Crewe South Withdrawn |
27/11/1948 29/04/1950 08/05/1965 31/07/1965 |
31/07/1965 | ||
Black Five | 44717 | 04/12/1948 | 5A 5A 9E 14B 16D 8A W |
Crewe North Crewe North Trafford Park (LMS) Kentish Town Annesley Edge Hill Withdrawn |
04/12/1948 31/12/1950 24/03/1951 21/07/1962 15/09/1962 31/07/1965 26/08/1967 |
26/08/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44718 | 31/03/1949 | 60A 67B 65D 65B 67C W |
Inverness Hurlford Dawsholm St Rollox (Balornock) Ayr Withdrawn |
28/05/1949 01/11/1952 03/06/1961 02/11/1963 27/06/1964 29/01/1966 29/11/1966 |
29/11/1966 | ||
Black Five | 44719 | 31/03/1949 | 60A 65F W |
Inverness Grangemouth Withdrawn |
30/04/1949 01/11/1952 27/06/1964 30/10/1964 |
30/10/1964 | ||
Black Five | 44720 | 31/03/1949 | 63A 62B W |
Perth South Dundee Tay Bridge Withdrawn |
30/04/1949 29/12/1951 24/09/1966 27/10/1966 |
27/10/1966 | ||
Black Five | 44721 | 31/03/1949 | 63A 66A W |
Perth South Polmadie Withdrawn |
30/04/1949 29/12/1951 26/12/1964 07/1965 |
07/1965 | ||
Black Five | 44722 | 30/04/1949 | 60A 63A 62B 63A W |
Inverness Perth South Dundee Tay Bridge Perth South Withdrawn |
28/05/1949 04/10/1952 27/08/1960 30/04/1966 26/11/1966 22/04/1967 |
22/04/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44723 | 30/04/1949 | 60A 67A 67D 67E 67A W |
Inverness Corkerhill Ardrossan Dumfries Corkerhill Withdrawn |
28/05/1949 29/11/1952 04/06/1960 28/03/1964 30/05/1964 25/06/1966 19/10/1966 |
19/10/1966 | ||
Black Five | 44724 | 30/04/1949 | 60A 63A 67C W |
Inverness Perth South Ayr Withdrawn |
28/05/1949 01/11/1952 27/08/1960 31/07/1965 19/10/1966 |
19/10/1966 | ||
Black Five | 44725 | 30/04/1949 | 8C W |
Speke Junction Withdrawn |
28/05/1949 14/03/1964 14/10/1967 |
14/10/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44726 | 31/05/1949 | W | Withdrawn | 25/06/1949 08/10/1966 |
08/10/1966 | ||
Black Five | 44727 | 31/05/1949 | W | Withdrawn | 25/06/1949 21/10/1967 |
21/10/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44728 | 31/01/1949 | 24E 9K W |
Blackpool Central Bolton Withdrawn |
30/06/1962 19/09/1964 06/01/1968 |
06/01/1968 | ||
Black Five | 44729 | 31/01/1949 | 27B 12A 10C 9B W |
Aintree Carlisle Kingmoor Fleetwood Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
17/03/1962 18/05/1963 11/07/1964 19/02/1966 08/10/1966 |
08/10/1966 | ||
Black Five | 44730 | 28/02/1949 | 8B 8H W |
Warrington Dallam Birkenhead Mollington Street Withdrawn |
05/09/1964 21/01/1967 11/11/1967 |
11/11/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44731 | 28/02/1949 | 8B W |
Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
05/09/1964 05/1966 |
05/1966 | ||
Black Five | 44732 | 28/02/1949 | 8C 8F W |
Speke Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
19/09/1964 28/05/1966 15/07/1967 |
15/07/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44733 | 28/02/1949 | 10A W |
Carnforth Withdrawn |
26/09/1964 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44734 | 28/02/1949 | W | Withdrawn | 16/12/1967 | 16/12/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44735 | 28/02/1949 | 9E 9D 10A W |
Trafford Park (LMS) Newton Heath Carnforth Withdrawn |
14/11/1964 09/03/1968 06/07/1968 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | ||
Black Five | 44736 | 28/02/1949 | 9H 9K 9D W |
Patricroft Bolton Newton Heath Withdrawn |
11/01/1964 27/06/1964 30/04/1966 23/09/1967 |
23/09/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44737 | 31/03/1949 | 24E 24E 9K 8K 8F W |
Blackpool Central Blackpool Central Bolton Bank Hall Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
17/05/1952 14/06/1952 19/09/1964 14/05/1966 22/10/1966 14/01/1967 |
14/01/1967 | ||
Black Five | 44738 | 19/06/1948 | 8C W |
Speke Junction Withdrawn |
09/11/1963 06/06/1964 |
06/06/1964 | ||
Black Five | 44739 | 19/06/1948 | 8C W |
Speke Junction Withdrawn |
09/11/1963 23/01/1965 |
23/01/1965 | ||
Black Five | 44740 | 29/05/1948 | 7A W |
Llandudno Junction Withdrawn |
26/06/1948 13/04/1963 |
13/04/1963 | ||
Black Five | 44741 | 12/06/1948 | 9A 1A 6G 8C W |
Longsight Willesden Llandudno Junction Speke Junction Withdrawn |
03/10/1953 10/09/1960 08/10/1960 23/09/1961 13/03/1965 |
13/03/1965 | ||
Black Five | 44742 | 03/07/1948 | 9A 21D 6G 8C 27A 27C W |
Longsight Aston Llandudno Junction Speke Junction Bank Hall Southport Withdrawn |
03/10/1953 10/09/1960 01/10/1960 23/09/1961 06/01/1962 17/03/1962 02/05/1964 |
02/05/1964 | ||
Black Five | 44743 | 26/06/1948 | 22A 22A 17A 27A 27C 8C W |
Bristol Barrow Road Bristol Barrow Road Derby Bank Hall Southport Speke Junction Withdrawn |
09/07/1949 16/07/1949 18/05/1957 14/06/1958 17/03/1962 14/11/1964 08/01/1966 |
08/01/1966 | ||
Black Five | 44744 | 03/07/1948 | 22A 22A 20A 20A 22A 17A 27A 27C 9A W |
Bristol Barrow Road Bristol Barrow Road Holbeck (MR) Holbeck (MR) Bristol Barrow Road Derby Bank Hall Southport Longsight Withdrawn |
09/07/1949 16/07/1949 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 21/05/1955 18/05/1957 14/06/1958 17/03/1962 18/05/1963 09/11/1963 |
09/11/1963 | ||
Black Five | 44745 | 03/07/1948 | 22A 22A 17A 27A 27C W |
Bristol Barrow Road Bristol Barrow Road Derby Bank Hall Southport Withdrawn |
09/07/1949 16/07/1949 18/05/1957 14/06/1958 17/03/1962 24/10/1964 |
24/10/1964 | ||
Black Five | 44746 | 07/08/1948 | 22A 22A 20A 20A 22A 14A 9A 26A 26A 26A 26C W |
Bristol Barrow Road Bristol Barrow Road Holbeck (MR) Holbeck (MR) Bristol Barrow Road Cricklewood East Longsight Newton Heath Newton Heath Newton Heath Bolton Withdrawn |
09/07/1949 16/07/1949 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 21/05/1955 16/06/1957 14/06/1958 30/04/1960 17/09/1960 01/10/1960 14/04/1962 01/02/1964 |
01/02/1964 | ||
Black Five | 44747 | 31/07/1948 | 22A 22A 17A 9A 26F 9A W |
Bristol Barrow Road Bristol Barrow Road Derby Longsight Patricroft Longsight Withdrawn |
09/07/1949 16/07/1949 10/08/1957 14/06/1958 14/02/1959 09/05/1959 04/05/1963 |
04/05/1963 | ||
Black Five | 4748 | 44748 | 07/02/1948 | W | Withdrawn | 05/09/1964 | 05/09/1964 | |
Black Five | 4749 | 44749 | 14/02/1948 | ARD 8C 6G 8C W |
Ardsley Speke Junction Llandudno Junction Speke Junction Withdrawn |
08/05/1948 10/09/1960 01/10/1960 11/11/1961 05/09/1964 |
05/09/1964 | |
Black Five | 4750 | 44750 | 28/02/1948 | 8B 6G 8C 5D 8C W |
Warrington Dallam Llandudno Junction Speke Junction Stoke Speke Junction Withdrawn |
10/09/1960 08/10/1960 11/11/1961 04/08/1962 18/08/1962 09/1963 |
09/1963 | |
Black Five | 4751 | 44751 | 13/03/1948 | 9B 8C W |
Stockport Edgeley Speke Junction Withdrawn |
10/06/1961 18/11/1961 09/1964 |
09/1964 | |
Black Five | 4752 | 44752 | 20/03/1948 | 9B W |
Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
12/02/1949 10/06/1961 18/04/1964 |
18/04/1964 | |
Black Five | 4753 | 44753 | 27/03/1948 | 10H 8M 8C W |
Lower Darwen Southport Speke Junction Withdrawn |
09/11/1963 30/11/1963 14/11/1964 24/07/1965 |
24/07/1965 | |
Black Five | 44754 | 10/04/1948 | 9B 8C W |
Stockport Edgeley Speke Junction Withdrawn |
16/09/1961 18/11/1961 11/04/1964 |
11/04/1964 | ||
Black Five | 44755 | 01/05/1948 | 20A 9B W |
Holbeck (MR) Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
12/06/1948 16/09/1961 16/11/1963 |
16/11/1963 | ||
Black Five | 44756 | 19/06/1948 | 10H 8M W |
Lower Darwen Southport Withdrawn |
09/11/1963 30/11/1963 09/1964 |
09/1964 | ||
Black Five | 44757 | 31/12/1948 | 10H 8M W |
Lower Darwen Southport Withdrawn |
09/11/1963 30/11/1963 13/11/1965 |
13/11/1965 | ||
Black Five | 4758 | 44758 | 09/1947 | 5A 5A 8F 9A 8A 24J 10A W |
Crewe North Crewe North Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Edge Hill Lancaster Green Ayre Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 20/06/1959 18/06/1960 10/09/1960 23/06/1962 23/04/1966 20/07/1968 |
20/07/1968 | |
Black Five | 4759 | 44759 | 09/1947 | 5A 5A 9A 9A 6A 6A 5A 5B 5A 5B 12D 12A W |
Crewe North Crewe North Longsight Longsight Chester (MR) Chester (MR) Crewe North Crewe South Crewe North Crewe South Workington Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 17/06/1950 24/06/1950 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 24/03/1951 07/03/1964 20/06/1964 19/09/1964 15/04/1967 23/09/1967 18/11/1967 |
18/11/1967 | |
Black Five | 4760 | 44760 | 09/1947 | 5A 5A 9A 9A 8E 8E 8A 5A 6G 6J 9A 5A 3E 2E 2A 6G 1A 2A 5D W |
Crewe North Crewe North Longsight Longsight Brunswick Brunswick Edge Hill Crewe North Llandudno Junction Holyhead Longsight Crewe North Monument Lane Northampton Rugby Llandudno Junction Willesden Tyseley Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 17/06/1950 24/06/1950 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 27/10/1951 14/06/1952 21/02/1953 16/05/1953 11/07/1953 05/10/1957 20/06/1959 07/11/1959 06/02/1960 14/07/1962 06/02/1965 02/10/1965 29/01/1966 22/10/1966 |
22/10/1966 | |
Black Five | 4761 | 44761 | 25/09/1947 | 5A 5A 5B 8F 10D W |
Crewe North (on loan) Crewe North Crewe South Springs Branch (Wigan) Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 10/04/1965 24/06/1967 09/12/1967 13/04/1968 |
13/04/1968 | |
Black Five | 4762 | 44762 | 02/10/1947 | 5A 5A 1G 6B 2A 6C W |
Crewe North (on loan) Crewe North Woodford Halse Mold Junction Tyseley Croes Newydd Withdrawn |
27/12/1947 31/01/1948 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 11/12/1965 12/11/1966 26/11/1966 |
26/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 4763 | 44763 | 09/10/1947 | 5A 5A 9A 9A 12A 12A 5A 5A 1G 1A W |
Crewe North (on loan) Crewe North Longsight Longsight Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Crewe North Woodford Halse Willesden Withdrawn |
27/12/1947 31/01/1948 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 07/07/1951 17/07/1951 18/08/1951 08/09/1951 16/01/1965 08/05/1965 09/1965 |
02/10/1965 | |
Black Five | 4764 | 44764 | 11/1947 | 5A 5A 1G 6B W |
Crewe North Crewe North Woodford Halse Mold Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 09/1965 |
09/1965 | |
Black Five | 4765 | 44765 | 12/1947 | 5A 5B W |
Crewe North Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/05/1965 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 4766 | 44766 | 12/1947 | 5A 3E 21B 21B 2C 6G 6A 5B W |
Crewe North Monument Lane Bescot Bescot Stourbridge Junction Llandudno Junction Chester (MR) Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1959 25/06/1960 24/06/1961 26/03/1966 28/05/1966 08/10/1966 29/04/1967 19/08/1967 |
19/08/1967 | |
Black Five | 4767 | 44767 | 12/1947 | 5A 27A 27C 12A W |
Crewe North Bank Hall Southport Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1950 17/03/1962 14/11/1964 30/12/1967 |
30/12/1967 | |
Black Five | 4768 | 44768 | 04/1947 | 29A 5A 8A W |
Perth South Crewe North Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 29/04/1950 06/1967 |
06/1967 | |
Black Five | 4769 | 44769 | 04/1947 | 29A 5A 8A W |
Perth South Crewe North Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 29/04/1950 07/1965 |
07/1965 | |
Black Five | 4770 | 44770 | 04/1947 | 29A 5A 2A 2A 5A 6J 5A 6J 5A 12A 5A 6J 12B 5A 6J 5D 12A W |
Perth South Crewe North Rugby Rugby Crewe North Holyhead Crewe North Holyhead Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Holyhead Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Holyhead Stoke Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 24/03/1951 29/11/1952 24/01/1953 21/02/1953 21/03/1953 10/09/1955 10/08/1957 14/06/1958 15/11/1958 30/01/1960 22/06/1963 10/12/1966 11/03/1967 10/1967 |
10/1967 | |
Black Five | 4771 | 44771 | 05/1947 | 32A 5A 2A 2A 5A 2A 1E 1A 2A 5E 6J 6A W |
Inverness Crewe North Rugby Rugby Crewe North Rugby Bletchley Willesden Rugby Nuneaton Holyhead Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 24/03/1951 19/04/1952 17/05/1952 21/06/1952 03/10/1953 20/06/1959 29/05/1965 04/06/1966 10/12/1966 18/03/1967 |
18/03/1967 | |
Black Five | 4772 | 44772 | 05/1947 | 32A 5A 8A W |
Inverness Crewe North Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 29/04/1950 10/1967 |
10/1967 | |
Black Five | 4773 | 44773 | 05/1947 | 32A 5A 8A 8A 8A 6A 8A W |
Inverness Crewe North Edge Hill Edge Hill Edge Hill Chester (MR) Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 29/04/1950 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 21/04/1956 19/05/1956 16/12/1967 |
16/12/1967 | |
Black Five | 4774 | 44774 | 05/1947 | 20A 14A 17A 17B 14E 6G 1A 2A 8A W |
Holbeck (MR) Cricklewood East Derby Burton Bedford Llandudno Junction Willesden Tyseley Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/09/1954 28/04/1962 22/09/1962 10/11/1962 25/05/1963 06/02/1965 02/10/1965 20/08/1966 26/08/1967 |
26/08/1967 | |
Black Five | 4775 | 44775 | 06/1947 | 20A 21A 27F 21A 6B 6D 12A W |
Holbeck (MR) Saltley Brunswick Saltley Mold Junction Shrewsbury Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/11/1953 08/08/1959 10/10/1959 19/06/1965 11/12/1965 10/12/1966 10/1967 |
10/1967 | |
Black Five | 4776 | 44776 | 06/1947 | 14B 21A 17A 19B 17A 21A 17A 15C 21A 2A 6C 8F W |
Kentish Town Saltley Derby Sheffield Millhouses Derby Saltley Derby Leicester Midland Saltley Tyseley Croes Newydd Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/04/1948 02/10/1948 11/07/1953 03/10/1953 28/11/1953 13/10/1962 09/03/1963 22/06/1963 02/10/1965 12/11/1966 27/05/1967 21/10/1967 |
21/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 4777 | 44777 | 06/1947 | 14B 20A 14A 17A 17B 17A 14A 2F 15E 2E 2A 2B 6D 8A 9H W |
Kentish Town Holbeck (MR) Cricklewood East Derby Burton Derby Cricklewood East Woodford Halse Leicester (G.C.) Saltley Tyseley Oxley Shrewsbury Edge Hill Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/11/1953 11/09/1954 14/04/1962 22/09/1962 08/12/1962 09/03/1963 18/05/1963 03/08/1963 02/11/1963 02/10/1965 16/04/1966 17/09/1966 18/03/1967 11/05/1968 22/06/1968 |
22/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 4778 | 44778 | 06/1947 | 24E 26A 28A 10A W |
Blackpool Central Newton Heath Blackpool Central Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/05/1951 16/06/1951 26/09/1964 18/11/1967 |
18/11/1967 | |
Black Five | 4779 | 44779 | 07/1947 | 24E 9M 8F 8B W |
Blackpool Central Bury Springs Branch (Wigan) Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/09/1964 20/03/1965 26/06/1965 17/12/1966 |
17/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 4780 | 44780 | 07/1947 | 25A 25B 24B 24J 8F 9A 5A 1E 1A 6A 1A 2A 6D 8H 8F 9D W |
Wakefield Huddersfield Hillhouse Rose Grove Lancaster Green Ayre Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Crewe North Bletchley Willesden Chester (MR) Willesden Tyseley Shrewsbury Birkenhead Mollington Street Springs Branch (Wigan) Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/05/1948 11/08/1956 30/05/1959 07/11/1959 18/06/1960 26/11/1960 06/05/1961 10/06/1961 23/06/1962 06/02/1965 02/10/1965 17/09/1966 18/03/1967 19/08/1967 09/12/1967 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 4781 | 44781 | 08/1947 | 26A 26B 9E 9B 9K 10A W |
Newton Heath Agecroft Trafford Park (LMS) Stockport Edgeley Bolton Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/04/1948 22/10/1966 28/10/1967 11/05/1968 06/07/1968 17/08/1968 |
17/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 4782 | 44782 | 08/1947 | 26A 26B 9B W |
Newton Heath Agecroft Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/04/1948 22/10/1966 24/12/1966 |
24/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 4783 | 44783 | 03/1947 | 12B 32A W |
Carlisle Upperby Inverness Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 05/1964 |
05/1964 | |
Black Five | 4784 | 44784 | 04/1947 | 12B 32A 67A 67C 67A 67E W |
Carlisle Upperby Inverness Corkerhill Ayr Corkerhill Dumfries Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 21/04/1962 21/04/1962 14/07/1962 30/05/1964 06/1964 |
06/1964 | |
Black Five | 4785 | 44785 | 04/1947 | 12B 32A 67A 67C 67A W |
Carlisle Upperby Inverness Corkerhill Ayr Corkerhill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 21/04/1962 21/04/1962 14/07/1962 29/06/1964 |
29/06/1964 | |
Black Five | 4786 | 44786 | 04/1947 | 12B 31A 66C 66B W |
Carlisle Upperby St Rollox (Balornock) Hamilton (West) Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 08/09/1962 24/11/1962 17/08/1966 |
17/08/1966 | |
Black Five | 4787 | 44787 | 05/1947 | 12B 27A 65A 66B W |
Carlisle Upperby Polmadie Eastfield Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 14/05/1955 19/01/1963 22/11/1965 |
22/11/1965 | |
Black Five | 4788 | 44788 | 05/1947 | 5A 32A 63A 65F 67C W |
Crewe North Inverness Perth South Grangemouth Ayr Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 30/07/1960 24/11/1962 30/10/1965 29/11/1966 |
29/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 4789 | 44789 | 05/1947 | 5A 32A 68C 67B W |
Crewe North Inverness Stranraer Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 30/07/1960 16/02/1963 10/12/1964 |
10/12/1964 | |
Black Five | 4790 | 44790 | 06/1947 | 5A 27A 68E 68A W |
Crewe North Polmadie Carlisle Canal Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 17/05/1952 03/10/1953 18/03/1967 |
18/03/1967 | |
Black Five | 4791 | 44791 | 06/1947 | 28A 66A 65C 65C 67B 67B 67A 66E W |
Motherwell Polmadie Parkhead Parkhead Hurlford Hurlford Corkerhill Carstairs Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1949 27/08/1950 23/09/1950 07/04/1951 21/04/1951 04/10/1952 26/06/1965 29/11/1966 |
29/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 4792 | 44792 | 07/1947 | 28A 66A 68E 68A W |
Motherwell Polmadie Carlisle Canal Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1949 17/05/1952 03/10/1953 23/09/1967 |
23/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 4793 | 44793 | 08/1947 | 27A 64D 65B W |
Polmadie Carstairs St Rollox (Balornock) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1954 22/08/1964 10/12/1964 |
10/12/1964 | |
Black Five | 4794 | 44794 | 08/1947 | 27A 61B 63A W |
Polmadie Aberdeen Ferryhill Perth South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1954 31/12/1966 22/04/1967 |
22/04/1967 | |
Black Five | 4795 | 44795 | 08/1947 | 12A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/07/1967 |
29/07/1967 | |
Black Five | 4796 | 44796 | 09/1947 | 29A 66A W |
Perth South Polmadie Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/12/1964 01/05/1967 |
01/05/1967 | |
Black Five | 4797 | 44797 | 09/1947 | 29A W |
Perth South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/09/1966 |
02/09/1966 | |
Black Five | 4798 | 44798 | 10/1947 | 32A 67A W |
Inverness Corkerhill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/06/1960 02/09/1966 |
02/09/1966 | |
Black Five | 4799 | 44799 | 10/1947 | 32A 63A W |
Inverness Perth South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/08/1960 03/07/1965 |
03/07/1965 | |
Black Five | 4800 | 44800 | 05/1944 | 6B 6D 5B 10D W |
Mold Junction Shrewsbury Crewe South Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/04/1966 11/03/1967 19/08/1967 16/03/1968 |
16/03/1968 | |
Black Five | 4801 | 44801 | 05/1944 | 5A 29A 67A 67B W |
Crewe North Perth South Corkerhill Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 21/10/1961 16/02/1963 05/1964 |
05/1964 | |
Black Five | 4802 | 44802 | 06/1944 | 19E 19A 6J 12A 12B 12A 9K W |
Belle Vue Sheffield Grimesthorpe Holyhead Carlisle Kingmoor Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Bolton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1948 17/05/1958 10/11/1962 11/07/1964 07/11/1964 06/01/1968 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 4803 | 44803 | 06/1944 | 19E 26A W |
Belle Vue Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/04/1956 06/1968 |
06/1968 | |
Black Five | 4804 | 44804 | 06/1944 | 22A 20A 19A 21A 22A 21A 27F 21A 15C 16C 9E W |
Bristol Barrow Road Holbeck (MR) Sheffield Grimesthorpe Saltley Bristol Barrow Road Saltley Brunswick Saltley Leicester Midland Derby Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/07/1949 16/07/1949 12/11/1949 05/09/1953 03/10/1953 19/08/1961 09/09/1961 18/05/1963 30/11/1963 10/07/1965 02/03/1968 |
02/03/1968 | |
Black Five | 4805 | 44805 | 06/1944 | 21A 2B 6A 5D 5B W |
Saltley Oxley Chester (MR) Stoke Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/04/1965 11/03/1967 15/04/1967 12/08/1967 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 4806 | 44806 | 07/1944 | 21A 15C 14B 16A 16F 8C 10D W |
Saltley Leicester Midland Kentish Town Nottingham Burton Speke Junction Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/02/1948 29/12/1956 30/11/1957 12/09/1964 13/03/1965 20/04/1968 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 4807 | 44807 | 09/1944 | 5A 9A 6A 5B 5A 5B 5D 3E 3D 3E 24K 8C 6J W |
Crewe North Longsight Chester (MR) Crewe South Crewe North Crewe South Stoke Monument Lane Aston Monument Lane Preston Speke Junction Holyhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/04/1950 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 11/07/1953 16/06/1957 10/08/1957 05/10/1957 14/06/1958 04/10/1958 18/06/1960 17/09/1960 08/07/1961 02/03/1968 |
02/03/1968 | |
Black Five | 4808 | 44808 | 09/1944 | 5A 7A 7C 7C 7A 7A 6J 10C 66B 26F 6J 2F 2B W |
Crewe North Llandudno Junction Holyhead Holyhead Llandudno Junction Llandudno Junction Holyhead Patricroft Motherwell Patricroft Holyhead Bescot Oxley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/10/1949 03/12/1949 24/12/1949 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 11/07/1953 03/10/1953 16/03/1963 22/06/1963 15/08/1964 07/11/1964 03/04/1965 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 4809 | 44809 | 09/1944 | 17A 17F 9A 27C 10A 12A 8M 8K 8L 8B 9D 10A W |
Derby Trafford Park (LMS) Longsight Southport Carnforth Carlisle Kingmoor Southport Bank Hall Aintree Warrington Dallam Newton Heath Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1957 23/02/1963 18/05/1963 24/07/1965 07/08/1965 11/09/1965 18/06/1966 22/10/1966 17/06/1967 07/10/1967 06/07/1968 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 4810 | 44810 | 10/1944 | 21A 14B 21A 5D W |
Saltley Kentish Town Saltley Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1957 21/11/1959 06/03/1965 13/08/1966 |
13/08/1966 | |
Black Five | 4811 | 44811 | 10/1944 | 21A 21B 17B 15C 16C 40E W |
Saltley Bournville Burton Leicester Midland Derby Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 26/03/1955 10/01/1959 23/11/1963 25/12/1965 08/10/1966 |
08/10/1966 | |
Black Five | 4812 | 44812 | 10/1944 | 22A 15C 14B 21A 2B 5B W |
Bristol Barrow Road Leicester Midland Kentish Town Saltley Oxley Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 29/12/1956 21/11/1959 03/04/1965 11/03/1967 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 4813 | 44813 | 10/1944 | 21A 1F 5C 5D W |
Saltley Rugby Stafford Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/04/1964 10/04/1965 24/07/1965 03/09/1966 |
03/09/1966 | |
Black Five | 4814 | 44814 | 10/1944 | 21A 21A 1F 1G 6J 6D 5B W |
Saltley Saltley Rugby Woodford Halse Holyhead Shrewsbury Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/06/1950 18/04/1964 16/01/1965 19/06/1965 02/10/1965 11/03/1967 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 4815 | 44815 | 11/1944 | 17A 15C 21A 15C 16C 9E W |
Derby Leicester Midland Saltley Leicester Midland Derby Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/01/1959 18/05/1963 22/06/1963 23/11/1963 10/07/1965 24/02/1968 |
24/02/1968 | |
Black Five | 4816 | 44816 | 11/1944 | 14B 12B 14A 17A 17B 27C 8K 10D 9K 8K 8L 8B 10D W |
Kentish Town Carlisle Upperby Cricklewood East Derby Burton Southport Bank Hall Lostock Hall Bolton Bank Hall Aintree Warrington Dallam Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/01/1948 10/01/1959 24/03/1962 22/09/1962 25/05/1963 20/06/1964 27/06/1964 18/09/1965 30/04/1966 22/10/1966 17/06/1967 07/10/1967 20/07/1968 |
20/07/1968 | |
Black Five | 4817 | 44817 | 11/1944 | 14A 14B 17B 26C 26A 9J 12A W |
Cricklewood East Kentish Town Burton Bolton Newton Heath Agecroft Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/03/1949 14/04/1962 25/05/1963 22/06/1963 23/11/1963 22/10/1966 12/08/1967 |
12/08/1967 | |
Black Five | 4818 | 44818 | 11/1944 | 17A 21A 17B 26C 26A W |
Derby Saltley Burton Bolton Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/11/1959 07/04/1962 25/05/1963 22/06/1963 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 4819 | 44819 | 11/1944 | 17A 19B 17A 14D 15E 17A 24E 8B 8F W |
Derby Sheffield Millhouses Derby Neasden Leicester (G.C.) Derby Blackpool Central Warrington Dallam Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/06/1956 06/10/1956 21/02/1959 18/06/1960 08/12/1962 25/05/1963 05/09/1964 20/05/1967 11/1967 |
11/1967 | |
Black Five | 4820 | 44820 | 12/1944 | 20A 64A 63D 63A 66B W |
Holbeck (MR) St Margarets Fort William Perth South Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/09/1951 12/06/1954 27/11/1954 02/07/1960 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 4821 | 44821 | 12/1944 | 20A 21A 21A 21B 20A 21A 14B 15E 14B 15E 14A 6H 6J 6D 5B W |
Holbeck (MR) Saltley Saltley Bournville Holbeck (MR) Saltley Kentish Town Leicester (G.C.) Kentish Town Leicester (G.C.) Cricklewood East Bangor Holyhead Shrewsbury Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 21/02/1953 16/05/1953 04/12/1954 30/11/1957 14/06/1958 13/12/1958 17/03/1962 09/03/1963 25/05/1963 19/06/1965 02/10/1965 11/03/1967 10/06/1967 |
10/06/1967 | |
Black Five | 4822 | 44822 | 12/1944 | 14B 17B 26C 26A 9J 9D W |
Kentish Town Burton Bolton Newton Heath Agecroft Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/04/1962 25/05/1963 22/06/1963 23/11/1963 19/06/1965 21/10/1967 |
21/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 4823 | 44823 | 12/1944 | 20A 26B 8F W |
Holbeck (MR) Agecroft Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 14/09/1963 20/11/1965 |
20/11/1965 | |
Black Five | 4824 | 44824 | 12/1944 | 20A 25A 5B 56F 55A 55C 55A 55E W |
Holbeck (MR) Wakefield Crewe South Low Moor Holbeck (MR) Farnley Junction Holbeck (MR) Normanton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 05/10/1957 21/03/1959 12/09/1959 14/09/1963 18/01/1964 15/07/1967 10/1967 |
10/1967 | |
Black Five | 4825 | 44825 | 12/1944 | 16A 14B 21A 17A 17B 40E 12A W |
Nottingham Kentish Town Saltley Derby Burton Colwick Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/10/1952 21/11/1959 07/04/1962 22/09/1962 25/12/1965 12/11/1966 07/10/1967 |
07/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 4826 | 44826 | 07/1944 | 22C 20A 55C 55A W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Holbeck (MR) Farnley Junction Holbeck (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/10/1953 14/09/1963 03/12/1966 10/1967 |
10/1967 | |
Black Five | 4827 | 44827 | 07/1944 | 5B 5B 5B 5A 10A 5B 12A 5A 9A 24K 6G 8B 8C 8A W |
Crewe South Crewe South Crewe South Crewe North Springs Branch (Wigan) Crewe South Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Longsight Preston Llandudno Junction Warrington Dallam Speke Junction Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 16/05/1953 28/01/1956 25/02/1956 05/10/1957 30/11/1957 14/06/1958 12/09/1959 23/04/1960 08/10/1960 19/05/1962 20/06/1964 03/07/1965 |
03/07/1965 | |
Black Five | 4828 | 44828 | 07/1944 | 20A W |
Holbeck (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 4829 | 44829 | 08/1944 | 22A 18A 5B 5A 5B 3E 3E 3B 6J 2E 5B 12D 9K W |
Bristol Barrow Road Toton Crewe South Crewe North Crewe South Monument Lane Monument Lane Bushbury Holyhead Saltley Crewe South Workington Bolton Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 28/02/1948 10/07/1948 13/11/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 24/03/1951 22/06/1963 05/10/1963 19/06/1965 29/04/1967 06/01/1968 11/05/1968 |
11/05/1968 | |
Black Five | 4830 | 44830 | 08/1944 | 22C 22C 19B 14D 15E 16C 40E 9F W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Bath Green Park (S&D) Sheffield Millhouses Neasden Leicester (G.C.) Derby Colwick Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 03/10/1953 17/05/1958 18/06/1960 23/11/1963 25/12/1965 20/08/1966 19/08/1967 |
19/08/1967 | |
Black Five | 4831 | 44831 | 08/1944 | 2A 5D 2A 5E 6J 6A 8F W |
Rugby Stoke Rugby Nuneaton Holyhead Chester (MR) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/08/1962 18/08/1962 29/05/1965 04/06/1966 10/12/1966 20/05/1967 11/1967 |
11/1967 | |
Black Five | 4832 | 44832 | 08/1944 | 5A 5B W |
Crewe North Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1948 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 4833 | 44833 | 08/1944 | 5A 5B 1A 2A 2A 12A 2A 1A 5B 29F W |
Crewe North Crewe South Willesden Rugby Rugby Carlisle Upperby Rugby Willesden Crewe South Aberdeen Ferryhill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1948 28/05/1949 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 08/09/1956 06/10/1956 20/06/1964 19/06/1965 19/08/1967 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 4834 | 44834 | 08/1944 | 5A 5B 5B 12A 8A W |
Crewe North Crewe South Crewe South Carlisle Upperby Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/11/1948 11/12/1948 07/09/1957 25/03/1967 09/12/1967 |
09/12/1967 | |
Black Five | 4835 | 44835 | 09/1944 | 5A 4A 16B 16E 40E 9E W |
Crewe North Shrewsbury Annesley Kirkby in Ashfield Colwick Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 10/10/1964 23/10/1965 25/12/1965 20/08/1966 22/07/1967 |
22/07/1967 | |
Black Five | 4836 | 44836 | 09/1944 | 5A 2A 5B 9B W |
Crewe North Rugby Crewe South Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 08/05/1965 21/08/1965 04/05/1968 |
04/05/1968 | |
Black Five | 4837 | 44837 | 09/1944 | 5A 9A 9A 9A 12A 12A 2A 2A 11B 21D 21C 21D 1F 1E 8A W |
Crewe North Longsight Longsight Longsight Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Upperby Rugby Rugby Barrow in Furness Aston Bushbury Aston Rugby Bletchley Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/11/1948 11/12/1948 31/12/1950 07/07/1951 17/07/1951 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 10/08/1957 25/11/1961 13/01/1962 15/12/1962 14/09/1963 16/01/1965 10/07/1965 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 4838 | 44838 | 09/1944 | 5A 9A 9A 1A 8A W |
Crewe North Longsight Longsight Willesden Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/11/1948 11/12/1948 12/07/1952 14/05/1960 09/03/1968 |
09/03/1968 | |
Black Five | 4839 | 44839 | 09/1944 | 17A 22C 22C 17A 19B 17A 9E 17A 21A 17A 17B 40E 9F W |
Derby Bath Green Park (S&D) Bath Green Park (S&D) Derby Sheffield Millhouses Derby Trafford Park (LMS) Derby Saltley Derby Burton Colwick Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1949 16/07/1949 03/10/1953 16/06/1957 05/10/1957 04/10/1958 15/11/1958 21/11/1959 07/04/1962 22/09/1962 25/12/1965 28/05/1966 10/12/1966 |
10/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 4840 | 44840 | 10/1944 | 21A 7A 6A 5B 5B 5B 5A 9A 3E 5A 21B 2D 6A 5D 8H W |
Saltley Llandudno Junction Chester (MR) Crewe South Crewe South Crewe South Crewe North Longsight Monument Lane Crewe North Bescot Banbury Chester (MR) Stoke Birkenhead Mollington Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 02/10/1948 01/12/1951 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 18/04/1953 19/05/1956 05/10/1957 02/04/1960 25/06/1960 03/01/1966 10/09/1966 15/04/1967 12/08/1967 11/11/1967 |
11/11/1967 | |
Black Five | 4841 | 44841 | 10/1944 | 16A 21A 15E 21A 2B W |
Nottingham Saltley Leicester (G.C.) Saltley Oxley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/10/1951 04/10/1958 08/11/1958 03/04/1965 22/10/1966 |
22/10/1966 | |
Black Five | 4842 | 44842 | 10/1944 | 21A 15E 21A 27F 27F 9E 9A 21E 1A 21D 6B 5D 6B 8F 9B W |
Saltley Leicester (G.C.) Saltley Brunswick Brunswick Trafford Park (LMS) Longsight Monument Lane Willesden Aston Mold Junction Stoke Mold Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/10/1958 29/11/1958 04/04/1959 20/06/1959 20/06/1959 06/02/1960 30/04/1960 17/09/1960 01/10/1960 12/11/1960 05/08/1961 19/08/1961 05/02/1966 09/12/1967 27/01/1968 |
27/01/1968 | |
Black Five | 4843 | 44843 | 10/1944 | 22A 20A 19A 17B 15C 21A 2B 5B W |
Bristol Barrow Road Holbeck (MR) Sheffield Grimesthorpe Burton Leicester Midland Saltley Oxley Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/07/1949 16/07/1949 29/01/1955 10/01/1959 13/07/1963 19/06/1965 11/03/1967 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 4844 | 44844 | 10/1944 | 5B 6A 5B 3D 5A 1A 5D 1A 6A 1A 5B 8H W |
Crewe South Chester (MR) Crewe South Aston Crewe North Willesden Stoke Willesden Chester (MR) Willesden Crewe South Birkenhead Mollington Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/03/1949 01/12/1951 29/12/1951 12/09/1959 10/06/1961 04/08/1962 18/08/1962 02/11/1963 28/11/1964 19/06/1965 29/04/1967 11/11/1967 |
11/11/1967 | |
Black Five | 4845 | 44845 | 10/1944 | 19E 19A 26G 26A W |
Belle Vue Sheffield Grimesthorpe Belle Vue Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/09/1950 04/11/1950 21/04/1956 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 4846 | 44846 | 11/1944 | 14B 2F 16D 9D W |
Kentish Town Woodford Halse Annesley Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/09/1962 09/03/1963 31/07/1965 13/01/1968 |
13/01/1968 | |
Black Five | 4847 | 44847 | 11/1944 | 20A 21A 17A 19B 14D 15E 16B 16E 40E W |
Holbeck (MR) Saltley Derby Sheffield Millhouses Neasden Leicester (G.C.) Annesley Kirkby in Ashfield Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 02/10/1948 16/07/1955 17/05/1958 18/06/1960 11/07/1964 23/10/1965 18/12/1965 12/11/1966 |
12/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 4848 | 44848 | 11/1944 | 20A 21A 17A 68A 19B 17A 15C 15E 16B 16E 40E 10F W |
Holbeck (MR) Saltley Derby Carlisle Kingmoor Sheffield Millhouses Derby Leicester Midland Leicester (G.C.) Annesley Kirkby in Ashfield Colwick Rose Grove Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 02/10/1948 05/09/1953 03/10/1953 08/10/1955 10/01/1959 17/03/1962 11/07/1964 25/12/1965 25/12/1965 02/04/1966 17/02/1968 |
17/02/1968 | |
Black Five | 4849 | 44849 | 11/1944 | 20A W |
Holbeck (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/12/1964 |
21/12/1964 | |
Black Five | 4850 | 44850 | 11/1944 | 20A 66B W |
Holbeck (MR) Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/09/1951 14/07/1966 |
14/07/1966 | |
Black Five | 4851 | 44851 | 11/1944 | 17A 66A 19B 17A 17B 16A 17B 16A 16F 9E 9D W |
Derby Polmadie Sheffield Millhouses Derby Burton Nottingham Burton Nottingham Burton Trafford Park (LMS) Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/08/1953 03/10/1953 08/10/1955 22/09/1962 13/10/1962 09/03/1963 06/04/1963 12/09/1964 05/03/1966 09/03/1968 04/1968 |
04/1968 | |
Black Five | 4852 | 44852 | 11/1944 | 21A 21B 21A 21A 20A W |
Saltley Bournville Saltley Saltley Holbeck (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 28/07/1951 11/08/1951 28/11/1953 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 4853 | 44853 | 11/1944 | 20A W |
Holbeck (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/06/1967 |
12/06/1967 | |
Black Five | 4854 | 44854 | 12/1944 | 20A 55E W |
Holbeck (MR) Normanton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/07/1967 10/1967 |
10/1967 | |
Black Five | 4855 | 44855 | 12/1944 | 22A SR 21A 21A 22A 21A 19A 15C 14B 9A 9E 9E 8A 9E 9B 9E 9B W |
Bristol Barrow Road To Southern Region Saltley Saltley Bristol Barrow Road Saltley Sheffield Grimesthorpe Leicester Midland Kentish Town Longsight Trafford Park (LMS) Trafford Park (LMS) Edge Hill Trafford Park (LMS) Stockport Edgeley Trafford Park (LMS) Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/06/1950 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 29/11/1952 21/03/1953 16/05/1953 01/12/1956 29/12/1956 06/02/1960 07/05/1960 17/09/1960 24/09/1960 11/05/1963 08/08/1964 26/06/1965 19/03/1966 04/05/1968 |
04/05/1968 | |
Black Five | 4856 | 44856 | 12/1944 | 20A 17A 21A 16A 21A 2B W |
Holbeck (MR) Derby Saltley Nottingham Saltley Oxley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/08/1953 21/11/1959 12/03/1960 18/05/1963 03/04/1965 18/02/1967 |
18/02/1967 | |
Black Five | 4857 | 44857 | 12/1944 | 20A 55E W |
Holbeck (MR) Normanton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/07/1967 10/1967 |
10/1967 | |
Black Five | 4858 | 44858 | 12/1944 | 19A 16A 21A 17A 17B 16C 16B 8L 12A W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Nottingham Saltley Derby Burton Derby Colwick Aintree Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/05/1958 21/11/1959 07/04/1962 22/09/1962 14/08/1965 27/08/1966 12/11/1966 17/06/1967 30/12/1967 |
30/12/1967 | |
Black Five | 4859 | 44859 | 12/1944 | 19B 16A 16A 21A 2J 2E 2J 2A 5D 8H W |
Sheffield Millhouses Nottingham Nottingham Saltley Aston Saltley Aston Tyseley Stoke Birkenhead Mollington Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 04/12/1954 18/04/1964 16/01/1965 06/03/1965 16/10/1965 10/09/1966 12/08/1967 11/11/1967 |
11/11/1967 | |
Black Five | 4860 | 44860 | 12/1944 | 7A 5A 1A 5A 2A 1A 2D 5D W |
Llandudno Junction Crewe North Willesden Crewe North Rugby Willesden Banbury Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/07/1948 24/12/1949 14/01/1950 29/04/1950 20/06/1964 02/10/1965 17/09/1966 28/01/1967 |
28/01/1967 | |
Black Five | 4861 | 44861 | 01/1945 | 16A 16C 9D W |
Nottingham Derby Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/11/1964 10/07/1965 11/1967 |
11/1967 | |
Black Five | 4862 | 44862 | 01/1945 | 5A 1A 5A 19B 19B 2A 5A 2A 1A 12A W |
Crewe North Willesden Crewe North Sheffield Millhouses Sheffield Millhouses Rugby Crewe North Rugby Willesden Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 02/10/1948 07/01/1950 14/01/1950 29/04/1950 03/10/1959 07/11/1959 20/06/1964 21/08/1965 29/07/1967 |
29/07/1967 | |
Black Five | 4863 | 44863 | 01/1945 | 5A 1A 5A 2A 1E 8A W |
Crewe North Willesden Crewe North Rugby Bletchley Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/12/1949 14/01/1950 29/04/1950 16/01/1965 10/07/1965 06/05/1967 |
06/05/1967 | |
Black Five | 4864 | 44864 | 01/1945 | 5A 7C 6G 8C 8F 8A W |
Crewe North Holyhead Llandudno Junction Speke Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 01/12/1956 08/10/1960 22/06/1963 13/07/1963 04/05/1968 |
04/05/1968 | |
Black Five | 4865 | 44865 | 02/1945 | 5A 7C 6G 21D 6J 6G 1A 2A 2B 5B W |
Crewe North Holyhead Llandudno Junction Aston Holyhead Llandudno Junction Willesden Tyseley Oxley Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 01/12/1956 08/10/1960 22/06/1963 14/09/1963 06/02/1965 02/10/1965 12/11/1966 11/03/1967 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 4866 | 44866 | 02/1945 | 2A 5E 6J W |
Rugby Nuneaton Holyhead Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/05/1965 04/06/1966 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 4867 | 44867 | 02/1945 | 2A 5D 9B W |
Rugby Stoke Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/07/1961 01/12/1962 17/06/1967 |
17/06/1967 | |
Black Five | 4868 | 44868 | 02/1945 | 12B 8A 7C 7C 5B 6J 5B 9B W |
Carlisle Upperby Edge Hill Holyhead Holyhead Crewe South Holyhead Crewe South Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/06/1949 09/09/1950 30/11/1950 03/11/1956 20/06/1959 19/09/1959 10/06/1961 04/05/1968 |
04/05/1968 | |
Black Five | 4869 | 44869 | 03/1945 | 12B 4A 6A 4A 1A 5A 6A 2E 2D 9F W |
Carlisle Upperby Bletchley Chester (MR) Bletchley Willesden Crewe North Chester (MR) Northampton Banbury Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 13/10/1951 03/10/1953 02/04/1960 11/06/1960 11/04/1961 02/10/1965 28/05/1966 09/1966 |
09/1966 | |
Black Five | 4870 | 44870 | 03/1945 | 9A 5A 2A 1E 10F W |
Longsight Crewe North Rugby Bletchley Rose Grove Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/04/1948 29/04/1950 16/01/1965 10/07/1965 17/06/1967 |
17/06/1967 | |
Black Five | 4871 | 44871 | 03/1945 | 9A 12B 5A 5A 7C 5A 5A 5D 5A 5D 5B 5D 9B 9E 9B 9K 10A W |
Longsight Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Crewe North Holyhead Crewe North Crewe North Stoke Crewe North Stoke Crewe South Stoke Stockport Edgeley Trafford Park (LMS) Stockport Edgeley Bolton Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1948 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 26/01/1952 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 12/07/1952 03/10/1953 31/10/1953 22/03/1958 18/06/1960 01/12/1962 22/06/1963 06/11/1965 11/05/1968 06/07/1968 17/08/1968 |
17/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 4872 | 44872 | 03/1945 | 3D 2D 6C 10D W |
Aston Banbury Croes Newydd Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/10/1965 08/10/1966 20/05/1967 30/09/1967 |
30/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 4873 | 44873 | 03/1945 | 3C 3A 2E 5B 8F W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Bescot Saltley Crewe South Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 03/04/1965 19/06/1965 24/07/1965 11/1967 |
11/1967 | |
Black Five | 4874 | 44874 | 04/1945 | 5A 2B 5A 10B 11A 11A 5D 24L W |
Crewe North Bletchley Crewe North Preston Carnforth Carnforth Stoke Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 28/01/1950 29/04/1950 14/10/1950 04/11/1950 05/08/1961 19/08/1961 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 4875 | 44875 | 04/1945 | 5A 2B 1A 1A 21B 2C 6G 6A W |
Crewe North Bletchley Willesden Willesden Bescot Stourbridge Junction Llandudno Junction Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 07/05/1960 26/03/1966 28/05/1966 08/10/1966 20/05/1967 |
20/05/1967 | |
Black Five | 4876 | 44876 | 04/1945 | 12B 3D 3D 2B 6A 5D 8H W |
Carlisle Upperby Aston Aston Oxley Chester (MR) Stoke Birkenhead Mollington Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 16/10/1965 11/03/1967 15/04/1967 12/08/1967 11/11/1967 |
11/11/1967 | |
Black Five | 4877 | 44877 | 04/1945 | 12A 24J 8C 10A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Lancaster Green Ayre Speke Junction Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/05/1962 06/03/1965 11/05/1968 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 4878 | 44878 | 05/1945 | 12A 10D W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/01/1968 06/07/1968 |
06/07/1968 | |
Black Five | 4879 | 44879 | 05/1945 | 12A 63A 62B 63A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Perth South Dundee Tay Bridge Perth South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/07/1950 30/04/1966 26/11/1966 22/04/1967 |
22/04/1967 | |
Black Five | 4880 | 44880 | 05/1945 | 31A 66B W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/01/1963 29/11/1966 |
29/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 4881 | 44881 | 05/1945 | 31A 66B W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/01/1963 17/07/1966 |
17/07/1966 | |
Black Five | 4882 | 44882 | 06/1945 | 12A 12E 12A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Barrow in Furness Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/06/1961 17/12/1966 15/07/1967 |
15/07/1967 | |
Black Five | 4883 | 44883 | 06/1945 | 12A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/07/1967 |
15/07/1967 | |
Black Five | 4884 | 44884 | 06/1945 | 12A 12A 9D W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Carlisle Kingmoor Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/06/1963 06/01/1968 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 4885 | 44885 | 07/1945 | 29A 68B W |
Perth South Dumfries Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/06/1960 26/12/1963 |
26/12/1963 | |
Black Five | 4886 | 44886 | 07/1945 | 12A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/10/1967 |
21/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 4887 | 44887 | 08/1945 | 23C 27B 12A W |
Southport Aintree Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/03/1962 18/05/1963 09/12/1967 |
09/12/1967 | |
Black Five | 4888 | 44888 | 08/1945 | 26A 21A 21A 9E 21A 15C 16C 16F 15E 9B 9H 9E 9B 9K 10D W |
Newton Heath Saltley Saltley Trafford Park (LMS) Saltley Leicester Midland Derby Burton Coalville Stockport Edgeley Patricroft Trafford Park (LMS) Stockport Edgeley Bolton Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 23/02/1952 22/08/1959 26/09/1959 18/05/1963 16/11/1963 12/09/1964 19/12/1964 13/02/1965 06/03/1965 22/05/1965 09/03/1968 11/05/1968 06/07/1968 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 4889 | 44889 | 08/1945 | 26A 24A 24E 24A 24B 24F 24C 10J 10A W |
Newton Heath Accrington Blackpool Central Accrington Rose Grove Fleetwood Lostock Hall Lancaster Green Ayre Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1953 03/10/1953 29/01/1955 30/04/1960 15/09/1962 22/06/1963 23/11/1963 23/04/1966 27/01/1968 |
27/01/1968 | |
Black Five | 4890 | 44890 | 08/1945 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 4891 | 44891 | 08/1945 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 4892 | 44892 | 09/1945 | 10A 10B 10B 12B 11A 11A 26A 24L W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Preston Preston Carlisle Canal Carnforth Carnforth Newton Heath Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 16/06/1951 30/06/1951 17/07/1951 09/08/1958 04/10/1958 08/04/1967 |
08/04/1967 | |
Black Five | 4893 | 44893 | 09/1945 | 26A 27A 26A 9H 9K 9D W |
Newton Heath Bank Hall Newton Heath Patricroft Bolton Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/12/1956 29/12/1956 11/01/1964 27/06/1964 30/04/1966 11/1967 |
11/1967 | |
Black Five | 4894 | 44894 | 09/1945 | 26A 27A 26A 24B 24F 24C 10J 10F 10C 10A W |
Newton Heath Bank Hall Newton Heath Rose Grove Fleetwood Lostock Hall Lancaster Green Ayre Rose Grove Fleetwood Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/11/1958 14/02/1959 13/06/1960 15/09/1962 22/06/1963 30/11/1963 31/10/1964 19/06/1965 10/07/1965 10/08/1968 |
10/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 4895 | 44895 | 09/1945 | 26A 9E W |
Newton Heath Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/11/1964 09/12/1967 |
09/12/1967 | |
Black Five | 4896 | 44896 | 09/1945 | 25G 55A W |
Farnley Junction Holbeck (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/12/1966 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 4897 | 44897 | 09/1945 | 8B 3D 21E 2A 6J 6B 6D 8H 10A W |
Warrington Dallam Aston Monument Lane Rugby Holyhead Mold Junction Shrewsbury Birkenhead Mollington Street Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/03/1952 17/06/1961 02/09/1961 22/06/1963 21/09/1963 23/04/1966 18/03/1967 12/08/1967 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 4898 | 44898 | 09/1945 | 12A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/10/1967 |
28/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 4899 | 44899 | 09/1945 | 12A 10F W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Rose Grove Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/01/1968 20/07/1968 |
20/07/1968 | |
Black Five | 4900 | 44900 | 10/1945 | 12A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | |
Black Five | 4901 | 44901 | 10/1945 | W | Withdrawn | 21/08/1965 | 21/08/1965 | |
Black Five | 4902 | 44902 | 10/1945 | 12A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1967 |
10/1967 | |
Black Five | 4903 | 44903 | 10/1945 | 12A 9F W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1966 06/04/1968 |
06/04/1968 | |
Black Five | 4904 | 44904 | 10/1945 | 8A 11A 6J 11A W |
Edge Hill Carnforth Holyhead Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 10/08/1957 05/10/1957 25/12/1965 |
25/12/1965 | |
Black Five | 4905 | 44905 | 10/1945 | 12B 8A 11B 11A 8A 24L 8A 24L W |
Carlisle Upperby Edge Hill Barrow in Furness Carnforth Edge Hill Carnforth Edge Hill Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1948 28/05/1949 07/10/1950 30/05/1959 20/06/1959 15/08/1959 12/09/1959 11/1967 |
11/1967 | |
Black Five | 4906 | 44906 | 10/1945 | 12B 8A W |
Carlisle Upperby Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1948 02/03/1968 |
02/03/1968 | |
Black Five | 4907 | 44907 | 11/1945 | 12B 12B 8A W |
Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Upperby Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/01/1948 03/09/1949 10/1967 |
10/1967 | |
Black Five | 4908 | 44908 | 11/1945 | 5A 4A 65A 65A 65A 63A 65A 67D 65A 66B W |
Crewe North Shrewsbury Eastfield Eastfield Eastfield Perth South Eastfield Ardrossan Eastfield Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/02/1949 19/04/1952 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 05/09/1953 28/11/1953 26/10/1957 18/01/1958 19/01/1963 02/06/1966 |
02/06/1966 | |
Black Five | 4909 | 44909 | 11/1945 | 2A 2A 1E 10F W |
Rugby Rugby Bletchley Rose Grove Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 16/01/1965 10/07/1965 30/09/1967 |
30/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 4910 | 44910 | 11/1945 | 2A 6A 6A 12A 6A 3D 21B 21E 21B 2E 5B 8L 12A 9D W |
Rugby Chester (MR) Chester (MR) Carlisle Upperby Chester (MR) Aston Bescot Monument Lane Bescot Saltley Crewe South Aintree Carlisle Kingmoor Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 10/09/1955 08/10/1955 27/02/1960 07/05/1960 15/07/1961 02/09/1961 03/04/1965 19/06/1965 21/08/1965 17/06/1967 06/01/1968 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 4911 | 44911 | 11/1945 | 7A 7C 1A 5A 5B 5B 5A 6A 34A 6A 3A 6A 5A 9B 12B 12A W |
Llandudno Junction Holyhead Willesden Crewe North Crewe South Crewe South Crewe North Chester (MR) Kings Cross Chester (MR) Bescot Chester (MR) Crewe North Stockport Edgeley Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/05/1948 28/05/1949 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 18/04/1953 23/04/1955 18/02/1956 18/05/1957 10/08/1957 07/09/1957 09/01/1960 10/06/1961 27/06/1964 07/11/1964 10/1967 |
10/1967 | |
Black Five | 4912 | 44912 | 11/1945 | 25F 56C 56F 55D 55A W |
Low Moor Copley Hill (Leeds) Low Moor Royston Holbeck (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/08/1961 22/06/1963 14/09/1963 18/06/1966 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 4913 | 44913 | 11/1945 | 3A 7B 7B 6A 8H W |
Bescot Bangor Bangor Chester (MR) Birkenhead Mollington Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/06/1949 16/07/1949 10/04/1965 29/04/1967 29/07/1967 |
29/07/1967 | |
Black Five | 4914 | 44914 | 12/1945 | 3A 2D 2B 9F W |
Bescot Banbury Oxley Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/01/1966 08/10/1966 10/12/1966 19/08/1967 |
19/08/1967 | |
Black Five | 4915 | 44915 | 12/1945 | 2C 2A 11A 2A 1E 10D W |
Northampton Rugby Carnforth Rugby Bletchley Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/08/1949 13/05/1950 17/06/1950 16/01/1965 10/07/1965 09/12/1967 |
09/12/1967 | |
Black Five | 4916 | 44916 | 12/1945 | 1A 12A 10B 1A 5D 1A 6A 9A 9B W |
Willesden Carlisle Upperby Preston (on loan) Willesden Stoke Willesden Chester (MR) Longsight Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
03/10/1953 08/09/1956 03/11/1956 01/12/1956 05/08/1961 19/08/1961 23/06/1962 13/10/1962 20/02/1965 16/12/1967 |
16/12/1967 | |
Black Five | 4917 | 44917 | 12/1945 | 14B 17A 17A 15C 17A 71G 6C 24E 6C 6B 6A 5B W |
Kentish Town Derby Derby Leicester Midland Derby Bath Green Park (S&D) Birkenhead Mollington Street Blackpool Central Birkenhead Mollington Street Mold Junction Chester (MR) Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/01/1950 14/01/1950 29/12/1951 26/01/1952 19/03/1952 14/06/1958 09/08/1958 04/10/1958 20/06/1959 23/04/1966 10/06/1967 11/11/1967 |
11/11/1967 | |
Black Five | 4918 | 44918 | 12/1945 | 16A 16A 17B 16A 8F 10D 9E W |
Nottingham Nottingham Burton Nottingham Springs Branch (Wigan) Lostock Hall Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 07/04/1962 07/07/1962 06/03/1965 03/07/1965 18/09/1965 21/01/1967 |
21/01/1967 | |
Black Five | 4919 | 44919 | 12/1945 | 21A 2B W |
Saltley Oxley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/04/1965 17/12/1966 |
17/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 4920 | 44920 | 12/1945 | 21A 15C 16C 40E 8B 8F W |
Saltley Leicester Midland Derby Colwick Warrington Dallam Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/05/1963 23/11/1963 25/12/1965 20/08/1966 20/05/1967 11/1967 |
11/1967 | |
Black Five | 4921 | 44921 | 01/1946 | 19A 19E 24A 65A 68A 63D 63A W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Belle Vue Accrington Eastfield Carlisle Kingmoor Fort William Perth South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1948 02/12/1950 09/09/1951 17/05/1952 12/06/1954 27/11/1954 26/02/1965 |
26/02/1965 | |
Black Five | 4922 | 44922 | 01/1946 | 31A W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1964 |
05/1964 | |
Black Five | 4923 | 44923 | 01/1946 | 31A W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/06/1964 |
29/06/1964 | |
Black Five | 4924 | 44924 | 02/1946 | 29A W |
Perth South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/07/1965 |
03/07/1965 | |
Black Five | 4925 | 44925 | 02/1946 | 29A 64C 64A W |
Perth South Dalry Road St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/09/1965 30/10/1965 02/09/1966 |
02/09/1966 | |
Black Five | 4926 | 44926 | 02/1946 | 23C 24E 24E 9K 9H 9D 10J 8A W |
Southport Blackpool Central Blackpool Central Bolton Patricroft Newton Heath Lancaster Green Ayre Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 19/09/1964 06/03/1965 19/06/1965 08/01/1966 23/04/1966 20/04/1968 |
20/04/1968 | |
Black Five | 4927 | 44927 | 02/1946 | 24E 24E 26A 24E 9K W |
Blackpool Central Blackpool Central Newton Heath Blackpool Central Bolton Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 24/01/1953 16/05/1953 19/09/1964 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 4928 | 44928 | 03/1946 | 24E 24E 25A 25G 25A 25A 27A 26B 12A W |
Blackpool Central Blackpool Central Wakefield Farnley Junction Wakefield Wakefield Bank Hall Agecroft Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 29/12/1951 19/04/1952 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 16/06/1956 13/01/1962 22/10/1966 06/1967 |
06/1967 | |
Black Five | 4929 | 44929 | 03/1946 | 24E 26B 9E 9K W |
Blackpool Central Agecroft Trafford Park (LMS) Bolton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1957 22/10/1966 09/03/1968 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 4930 | 44930 | 03/1946 | 24E 8B 8F 8B W |
Blackpool Central Warrington Dallam Springs Branch (Wigan) Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/09/1964 30/01/1965 10/04/1965 20/05/1967 |
20/05/1967 | |
Black Five | 4931 | 44931 | 04/1946 | 28B 28B 63A W |
Dalry Road Dalry Road Perth South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 11/02/1950 12/10/1965 |
12/10/1965 | |
Black Five | 4932 | 44932 | 09/1945 | 24E 24A 26B 15E 15E 16D 14A 16D 10F 16B 16C 10F W |
Blackpool Central Accrington Agecroft Leicester (G.C.) Leicester (G.C.) Annesley Cricklewood East Annesley Rose Grove Annesley Derby Rose Grove Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/01/1952 23/02/1957 24/10/1959 07/11/1959 09/01/1960 26/01/1963 02/02/1963 03/07/1965 17/07/1965 25/12/1965 05/03/1966 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 4933 | 44933 | 10/1945 | 26A 10J 8A W |
Newton Heath Lancaster Green Ayre Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/01/1966 23/04/1966 14/10/1967 |
14/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 4934 | 44934 | 10/1945 | 26A 8B W |
Newton Heath Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/08/1966 30/09/1967 |
30/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 4935 | 44935 | 10/1945 | 8A 9A 6J 9A 6G 6J 6B 8K 8B 8F 8B W |
Edge Hill Longsight Holyhead Longsight Llandudno Junction Holyhead Mold Junction Bank Hall Warrington Dallam Springs Branch (Wigan) Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 28/11/1953 02/01/1954 05/10/1957 20/06/1959 19/09/1959 25/01/1964 21/11/1964 30/01/1965 10/04/1965 15/10/1966 |
15/10/1966 | |
Black Five | 4936 | 44936 | 11/1945 | 12B 24K 6G 2E 2D 16B 12A W |
Carlisle Upperby Preston Llandudno Junction Northampton Banbury Colwick Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/06/1961 01/07/1961 23/09/1961 02/10/1965 19/02/1966 12/11/1966 12/08/1967 |
12/08/1967 | |
Black Five | 4937 | 44937 | 11/1945 | 9A 5B 3C 9A 5A 9B 12B 12A W |
Longsight Crewe South Ryecroft (Walsall) Longsight Crewe North Stockport Edgeley Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1948 16/10/1948 30/10/1948 26/11/1960 18/11/1961 28/07/1962 17/12/1966 13/05/1967 |
13/05/1967 | |
Black Five | 4938 | 44938 | 11/1945 | 9A 9E 9E 9A 2A 1E 9D W |
Longsight Trafford Park (LMS) Trafford Park (LMS) Longsight Rugby Bletchley Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/06/1950 24/06/1950 06/10/1956 05/10/1957 16/01/1965 10/07/1965 14/10/1967 |
14/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 4939 | 44939 | 11/1945 | 12B 24L 12B 12A 12B W |
Carlisle Upperby Carnforth Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Carlisle Upperby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1959 27/06/1959 22/06/1963 27/06/1964 12/1965 |
12/1965 | |
Black Five | 4940 | 44940 | 11/1945 | 26A 24B 10C 9B W |
Newton Heath Rose Grove Fleetwood Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/11/1953 19/06/1965 19/02/1966 16/03/1968 |
16/03/1968 | |
Black Five | 4941 | 44941 | 12/1945 | BA 7A 7A 9A 17A 14A 17A 17B 40E W |
Bricklayers Arms Llandudno Junction Llandudno Junction Longsight Derby Cricklewood East Derby Burton Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 04/10/1952 14/06/1958 10/01/1959 28/04/1962 22/09/1962 25/12/1965 12/11/1966 |
12/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 4942 | 44942 | 12/1945 | 3A 3A 3D 3E 3D 2D 6D 10D W |
Bescot Bescot Aston Monument Lane Aston Banbury Shrewsbury Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/01/1948 17/07/1948 22/03/1952 24/03/1956 02/10/1965 17/09/1966 11/03/1967 22/06/1968 |
22/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 4943 | 44943 | 12/1945 | 20A 55C 55A W |
Holbeck (MR) Farnley Junction Holbeck (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/09/1963 03/12/1966 10/1967 |
10/1967 | |
Black Five | 4944 | 44944 | 01/1946 | 19G 19A 19C 16A 21A 2B 6A 5B W |
Trafford Park (LMS) Sheffield Grimesthorpe Canklow Nottingham Saltley Oxley Chester (MR) Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/07/1950 10/08/1957 17/05/1958 21/11/1959 02/10/1965 11/03/1967 29/04/1967 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 4945 | 44945 | 01/1946 | 22C 19B 19B 91M 91M 17A 21A 2J 2E 2B W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Sheffield Millhouses Sheffield Millhouses To London Midland Region To London Midland Region Derby Saltley Aston Saltley Oxley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 05/05/1951 19/05/1951 01/12/1951 04/12/1954 18/04/1964 19/09/1964 02/10/1965 29/10/1966 |
29/10/1966 | |
Black Five | 4946 | 44946 | 01/1946 | 23A 25F 56D 56F 56A W |
Bank Hall Low Moor Mirfield Low Moor Wakefield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 18/04/1964 10/09/1966 31/12/1966 22/05/1967 |
22/05/1967 | |
Black Five | 4947 | 44947 | 02/1946 | 24E 24E 24A 28A 9K W |
Blackpool Central Blackpool Central Accrington Blackpool Central Bolton Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 26/01/1952 22/03/1952 19/09/1964 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 4948 | 44948 | 02/1946 | 24F 25B 24B 24H 24L W |
Fleetwood Huddersfield Hillhouse Rose Grove Hellifield Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 11/08/1956 02/02/1963 22/06/1963 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 4949 | 44949 | 02/1946 | 25A 25B 24B 9H 9D W |
Wakefield Huddersfield Hillhouse Rose Grove Patricroft Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/05/1948 11/08/1956 13/02/1965 19/06/1965 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 4950 | 44950 | 03/1946 | 24E 24E 8C 10D W |
Blackpool Central Blackpool Central Speke Junction Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 19/09/1964 20/04/1968 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 4951 | 44951 | 03/1946 | 26A 25F 56D 56A 56F 56D 56F W 56A |
Newton Heath Low Moor Mirfield Wakefield Low Moor Mirfield Low Moor Withdrawn Wakefield |
01/01/1948 13/05/1950 26/08/1961 26/05/1962 23/06/1962 18/04/1964 10/09/1966 14/12/1966 31/12/1966 |
14/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 4952 | 44952 | 03/1946 | 5A 28C W |
Crewe North Carstairs Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 19/10/1966 |
19/10/1966 | |
Black Five | 4953 | 44953 | 03/1946 | 28C 28C W |
Carstairs Carstairs Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 10/12/1966 |
10/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 4954 | 44954 | 04/1946 | 5A 28C 66E W |
Crewe North Carstairs Carstairs Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/02/1948 01/10/1949 07/05/1960 23/09/1966 |
23/09/1966 | |
Black Five | 4955 | 44955 | 04/1946 | 28C 28C 67B W |
Carstairs Carstairs Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 27/06/1964 07/1965 |
07/1965 | |
Black Five | 4956 | 44956 | 04/1946 | 31A 65A 66E W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Eastfield Carstairs Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1954 19/01/1963 14/06/1966 |
14/06/1966 | |
Black Five | 4957 | 44957 | 05/1946 | 31A 65A 67A 67E W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Eastfield Corkerhill Dumfries Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1954 19/01/1963 13/04/1963 05/1964 |
05/1964 | |
Black Five | 4958 | 44958 | 05/1946 | 29A 68A 27B 10D W |
Perth South Carlisle Kingmoor Aintree Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/08/1952 18/05/1963 03/07/1965 04/03/1967 |
04/03/1967 | |
Black Five | 4959 | 44959 | 05/1946 | 29A W |
Perth South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/07/1965 |
10/07/1965 | |
Black Five | 4960 | 44960 | 05/1946 | 29A 63B 63A W |
Perth South Fort William Perth South Withdrawn |
05/1946 22/12/1962 11/05/1963 17/01/1966 |
17/01/1966 | |
Black Five | 4961 | 44961 | 15/06/1946 | 29A W |
Perth South Withdrawn |
15/06/1946 29/06/1964 |
29/06/1964 | |
Black Five | 4962 | 44962 | 15/06/1946 | 17A 22A 20A 20A 19B 21A 15C 16C 16F 8F 9D W |
Derby Bristol Barrow Road Holbeck (MR) Holbeck (MR) Sheffield Millhouses Saltley Leicester Midland Derby Burton Springs Branch (Wigan) Newton Heath Withdrawn |
15/06/1946 15/01/1949 09/07/1949 16/07/1949 13/08/1949 01/12/1951 18/05/1963 23/11/1963 12/09/1964 02/04/1966 09/12/1967 30/12/1967 |
30/12/1967 | |
Black Five | 4963 | 44963 | 22/06/1946 | 19B 17A 19B 17A 21A 5A 5C 8B 8H 10A W |
Sheffield Millhouses Derby Sheffield Millhouses Derby Saltley Crewe North Stafford Warrington Dallam Birkenhead Mollington Street Carnforth Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 19/04/1952 11/07/1953 03/10/1953 04/12/1954 18/04/1964 19/09/1964 24/07/1965 31/12/1966 12/08/1967 20/07/1968 |
20/07/1968 | |
Black Five | 4964 | 44964 | 07/1946 | 19B 21A 21A 9E 8A W |
Sheffield Millhouses Saltley Saltley Trafford Park (LMS) Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/03/1954 19/06/1954 15/08/1959 11/05/1963 14/10/1967 |
14/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 4965 | 44965 | 08/1946 | 19B 17A 21A 2B 9E 9K W |
Sheffield Millhouses Derby Saltley Oxley Trafford Park (LMS) Bolton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/10/1952 04/12/1954 02/10/1965 06/08/1966 09/03/1968 04/1968 |
04/1968 | |
Black Five | 4966 | 44966 | 08/1946 | 21A 22A 21A 2J 2E 6J 6D W |
Saltley Bristol Barrow Road Saltley Aston Saltley Holyhead Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/12/1956 20/04/1957 18/04/1964 19/09/1964 19/06/1965 02/10/1965 17/09/1966 |
17/09/1966 | |
Black Five | 4967 | 44967 | 04/1946 | 5A 31A 65A 67A 67E W |
Crewe North St Rollox (Balornock) Eastfield Corkerhill Dumfries Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 13/04/1957 19/01/1963 13/04/1963 05/1964 |
05/1964 | |
Black Five | 4968 | 44968 | 04/1946 | 2B 31A 30A 65A 66B W |
Bletchley St Rollox (Balornock) Corkerhill Eastfield Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 19/06/1948 12/06/1954 19/01/1963 05/1964 |
05/1964 | |
Black Five | 4969 | 44969 | 04/1946 | 9A 31A 30A 28A W |
Longsight St Rollox (Balornock) Corkerhill Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 19/06/1948 06/11/1948 28/12/1963 |
28/12/1963 | |
Black Five | 4970 | 44970 | 04/1946 | 9A 31A 65A 65F 65A W |
Longsight St Rollox (Balornock) Eastfield Grangemouth Eastfield Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 11/05/1957 26/09/1964 26/06/1965 20/09/1965 |
20/09/1965 | |
Black Five | 4971 | 44971 | 04/1946 | 19B 20A 19A 19B 14B 19B 9A 6A 7A 8A 8A 5A 5A 2A 3A 3A 12A 1A 9A 6G 8A 8A 5B 2A 3A 12A 11B 6B 6J 6B 6A 6G 6D 10D W |
Sheffield Millhouses Holbeck (MR) Sheffield Grimesthorpe Sheffield Millhouses Kentish Town Sheffield Millhouses Longsight Chester (MR) Llandudno Junction Edge Hill Edge Hill Crewe North Crewe North Rugby Bescot Bescot Carlisle Upperby Willesden Longsight Llandudno Junction Edge Hill Edge Hill Crewe South Rugby Bescot Carlisle Upperby Barrow in Furness Mold Junction Holyhead Mold Junction Chester (MR) Llandudno Junction Shrewsbury Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1948 28/02/1948 15/01/1949 14/05/1949 11/06/1949 14/01/1950 17/06/1950 09/09/1950 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 24/03/1951 09/06/1951 16/06/1951 01/12/1951 26/01/1952 12/07/1952 04/10/1952 27/12/1952 03/01/1953 11/07/1953 02/01/1954 27/03/1954 17/07/1954 16/06/1956 11/08/1956 10/06/1961 23/09/1961 23/04/1966 23/07/1966 17/09/1966 01/04/1967 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 4972 | 44972 | 04/1946 | 29A 63D 66A 67B W |
Perth South Fort William Polmadie Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1954 30/12/1961 07/09/1963 29/11/1966 |
29/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 4973 | 44973 | 05/1946 | 29A 63D 66A 66E W |
Perth South Fort William Polmadie Carstairs Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/09/1954 30/12/1961 30/05/1964 20/09/1965 |
20/09/1965 | |
Black Five | 4974 | 44974 | 05/1946 | 29A 63D 66A 67D 67C W |
Perth South Fort William Polmadie Ardrossan Ayr Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1954 30/12/1961 07/09/1963 27/02/1965 26/06/1966 |
26/06/1966 | |
Black Five | 4975 | 44975 | 05/1946 | 29A 63D 64C W |
Perth South Fort William Dalry Road Withdrawn |
05/1946 27/11/1954 29/09/1962 20/09/1965 |
20/09/1965 | |
Black Five | 4976 | 44976 | 05/1946 | 29A 63D 64C W |
Perth South Fort William Dalry Road Withdrawn |
05/1946 27/11/1954 08/09/1962 03/02/1964 |
03/02/1964 | |
Black Five | 4977 | 44977 | 15/06/1946 | 29A 63D 67D 67C W |
Perth South Fort William Ardrossan Ayr Withdrawn |
15/06/1946 27/11/1954 21/04/1962 08/09/1962 29/11/1966 |
29/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 4978 | 44978 | 15/06/1946 | 27A 29A W |
Polmadie Perth South Withdrawn |
15/06/1946 07/02/1948 10/07/1965 |
10/07/1965 | |
Black Five | 4979 | 44979 | 22/06/1946 | 27A 29A W |
Polmadie Perth South Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 07/02/1948 03/07/1965 |
03/07/1965 | |
Black Five | 4980 | 44980 | 06/1946 | 27A 29A W |
Polmadie Perth South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1948 03/07/1965 |
03/07/1965 | |
Black Five | 4981 | 44981 | 07/1946 | 14A 14B 14B 17B 21B 21A 6J 6D W |
Cricklewood East Kentish Town Kentish Town Burton Bournville Saltley Holyhead Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/03/1949 19/06/1954 29/01/1955 26/03/1955 20/06/1959 19/06/1965 02/10/1965 14/01/1967 |
14/01/1967 | |
Black Five | 4982 | 44982 | 09/1946 | 23A 25F 24E 24F 12A W |
Bank Hall Low Moor Blackpool Central Fleetwood Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 03/10/1953 18/06/1960 18/09/1965 06/05/1967 |
06/05/1967 | |
Black Five | 4983 | 44983 | 09/1946 | 20A W |
Holbeck (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/1967 |
10/1967 | |
Black Five | 4984 | 44984 | 09/1946 | 14B 15D 14B 15E 14E 14A 15D 16B 16A 40E W |
Kentish Town Bedford Kentish Town Leicester (G.C.) Bedford Cricklewood East Leicester (G.C.) Annesley Toton Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/06/1956 06/02/1960 17/03/1962 18/05/1963 06/07/1963 01/02/1964 11/07/1964 25/12/1965 25/12/1965 12/11/1966 |
12/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 4985 | 44985 | 10/1946 | 14B 14A 14E 6G 1A 2A 5D 8F W |
Kentish Town Cricklewood East Bedford Llandudno Junction Willesden Tyseley Stoke Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/11/1960 16/09/1961 25/05/1963 06/02/1965 02/10/1965 29/01/1966 20/05/1967 10/1967 |
10/1967 | |
Black Five | 4986 | 44986 | 10/1946 | 20A 19B 20A 20A 17A 19B 6J 8B 6B W |
Holbeck (MR) Sheffield Millhouses Holbeck (MR) Holbeck (MR) Derby Sheffield Millhouses Holyhead Warrington Dallam Mold Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1948 28/07/1951 11/08/1951 27/10/1951 19/04/1952 17/05/1958 15/10/1960 14/04/1962 07/05/1967 |
07/05/1967 | |
Black Five | 4987 | 44987 | 11/1946 | 26A 25A 26B 10A W |
Newton Heath Wakefield Agecroft Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1953 21/03/1953 08/01/1966 22/10/1966 |
22/10/1966 | |
Black Five | 4988 | 44988 | 12/1946 | 24E 24F 9B W |
Blackpool Central Fleetwood Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1960 19/02/1966 30/12/1967 |
30/12/1967 | |
Black Five | 4989 | 44989 | 12/1946 | 23C 17B 12A W |
Southport Burton Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/05/1963 24/07/1965 04/02/1967 |
04/02/1967 | |
Black Five | 4990 | 44990 | 12/1946 | 23A 25F 56D 56F 56A 55E W |
Bank Hall Low Moor Mirfield Low Moor Wakefield Normanton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/05/1950 18/04/1964 03/12/1966 31/12/1966 15/07/1967 10/1967 |
10/1967 | |
Black Five | 4991 | 44991 | 12/1947 | 32A 66B W |
Inverness Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/05/1962 01/05/1967 |
01/05/1967 | |
Black Five | 4992 | 44992 | 01/1947 | 32A 68C 65B 67B W |
Inverness Stranraer St Rollox (Balornock) Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/07/1960 30/07/1960 06/05/1961 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 4993 | 44993 | 01/1947 | 12A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/12/1967 |
16/12/1967 | |
Black Five | 4994 | 44994 | 01/1947 | 12A 64C 64A 64C W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Dalry Road St Margarets Dalry Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/04/1952 21/03/1953 11/07/1953 13/07/1964 |
13/07/1964 | |
Black Five | 4995 | 44995 | 02/1947 | 31A 65A 68B 67A W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Eastfield Dumfries Corkerhill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1954 21/01/1956 25/06/1966 29/11/1966 |
29/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 4996 | 44996 | 02/1947 | 31A 65A 67A 67E W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Eastfield Corkerhill Dumfries Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/12/1954 19/01/1963 13/04/1963 17/04/1964 |
17/04/1964 | |
Black Five | 4997 | 44997 | 03/1947 | 2A 29A W |
Rugby Perth South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 01/05/1967 |
01/05/1967 | |
Black Five | 4998 | 44998 | 03/1947 | 2A 29A W |
Rugby Perth South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 04/04/1967 |
04/04/1967 | |
Black Five | 4999 | 44999 | 03/1947 | 2A 29A 67F W |
Rugby Perth South Stranraer Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 25/07/1964 02/09/1966 |
02/09/1966 | |
Black Five | 5000 | 45000 | 03/1935 | 2A 8C 2A 5A 5B 12A 5B 6J 5B 24L 5B 6J 6A 10D W |
Rugby Speke Junction Rugby Crewe North Crewe South Carlisle Upperby Crewe South Holyhead Crewe South Carnforth Crewe South Holyhead Chester (MR) Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/01/1952 23/02/1952 24/03/1956 03/11/1956 23/02/1957 28/12/1957 20/06/1959 19/09/1959 10/06/1961 16/09/1961 22/06/1963 02/11/1963 27/05/1967 28/10/1967 |
28/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 5001 | 45001 | 04/1935 | 8B 7C 7C 5A 5A 8C 6B 5B 5A 5B 1F 5E 6J 10A W |
Warrington Dallam Holyhead Holyhead Crewe North Crewe North Speke Junction Mold Junction Crewe South Crewe North Crewe South Rugby Nuneaton Holyhead Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/07/1951 17/07/1951 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 26/01/1952 23/02/1952 07/11/1959 20/06/1964 19/09/1964 28/11/1964 29/05/1965 04/06/1966 10/12/1966 16/03/1968 |
16/03/1968 | |
Black Five | 5002 | 45002 | 04/1935 | 2A 5A 6B 12A 5B 6J 5B 24L 24K 5B W |
Rugby Crewe North Mold Junction Carlisle Upperby Crewe South Holyhead Crewe South Carnforth Preston Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/03/1956 11/08/1956 07/09/1957 05/10/1957 20/06/1959 19/09/1959 10/06/1961 15/07/1961 09/09/1961 03/07/1965 |
03/07/1965 | |
Black Five | 5003 | 45003 | 04/1935 | 5B 2A 1A 5A 5B 5A 5B 5D 5A 5D W |
Crewe South Rugby Willesden Crewe North Crewe South Crewe North Crewe South Stoke Crewe North Stoke Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 01/01/1948 31/10/1953 21/04/1956 03/11/1956 26/01/1957 30/11/1957 20/06/1959 12/09/1959 10/06/1961 06/1967 |
06/1967 | |
Black Five | 5004 | 45004 | 04/1935 | 2A 11A 11A 10C 5B 10A 1E 9A 5A 5B 6G W |
Rugby Carnforth Carnforth Patricroft Crewe South Springs Branch (Wigan) Bletchley Longsight Crewe North Crewe South Llandudno Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/11/1950 30/11/1950 11/07/1953 05/09/1953 28/11/1953 26/02/1955 14/06/1958 04/10/1958 06/01/1962 22/06/1963 09/1966 |
09/1966 | |
Black Five | 5005 | 45005 | 04/1935 | 12A 8A 6G 6G 6J 10C 8A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Edge Hill Llandudno Junction Llandudno Junction Holyhead Patricroft Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/04/1949 27/12/1952 03/01/1953 11/07/1953 03/10/1953 24/04/1954 27/01/1968 |
27/01/1968 | |
Black Five | 5006 | 45006 | 04/1935 | 12A 5A 5B 6J 6A 6J 5A 9E 17A 14D 17A 21A 2B 5B W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Crewe North Crewe South Holyhead Chester (MR) Holyhead Crewe North Trafford Park (LMS) Derby Neasden Derby Saltley Oxley Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/06/1949 01/10/1949 12/07/1952 04/10/1952 11/07/1953 03/10/1953 27/02/1954 30/11/1957 10/01/1959 18/06/1960 04/03/1961 03/04/1965 11/03/1967 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5007 | 45007 | 04/1935 | 28A 29A 65A 63A 65B 65B 68A 64C 67A 67B W |
Motherwell Perth South Eastfield Perth South St Rollox (Balornock) St Rollox (Balornock) Carlisle Kingmoor Dalry Road Corkerhill Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 11/02/1950 02/07/1950 11/08/1951 09/09/1951 17/05/1952 08/06/1957 02/08/1958 24/09/1960 23/07/1964 |
23/07/1964 | |
Black Five | 5008 | 45008 | 04/1935 | 28A W |
Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1964 |
05/1964 | |
Black Five | 5009 | 45009 | 04/1935 | 29A 12A 66B W |
Perth South Carlisle Kingmoor Motherwell Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 04/02/1950 22/11/1965 |
22/11/1965 | |
Black Five | 5010 | 45010 | 04/1935 | 29A 65A 67A 67A 67B 67B W |
Perth South Eastfield Corkerhill Corkerhill Hurlford Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/02/1950 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 07/04/1951 21/04/1951 29/08/1963 |
29/08/1963 | |
Black Five | 5011 | 45011 | 04/1935 | 29A 65A 63A 68A 65F 65F 65A 67A 64D W |
Perth South Eastfield Perth South Carlisle Kingmoor Grangemouth Grangemouth Eastfield Corkerhill Carstairs Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/02/1950 02/07/1950 29/12/1951 22/03/1952 19/04/1952 12/06/1954 09/07/1955 29/10/1955 28/12/1965 |
28/12/1965 | |
Black Five | 5012 | 45012 | 04/1935 | 28A 60A 60A 68A 12B 12A 12C W |
Motherwell Inverness Inverness Carlisle Kingmoor Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Barrow in Furness Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/06/1950 01/07/1950 04/10/1952 10/03/1962 22/06/1963 23/04/1966 08/10/1966 |
08/10/1966 | |
Black Five | 5013 | 45013 | 04/1935 | 12A 5A 5B 68A 65F 65F 68A 9B W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Crewe North Crewe South Carlisle Kingmoor Grangemouth Grangemouth Carlisle Kingmoor Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/04/1949 01/10/1949 09/09/1951 22/03/1952 19/04/1952 06/09/1952 06/01/1968 05/1968 |
05/1968 | |
Black Five | 5014 | 45014 | 04/1935 | 12A 5A 5B CAR 9A 9A 12A 12A 4B 4B 10C 11A 24J 10A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Crewe North Crewe South Carlisle Canal Longsight Longsight Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Upperby Northampton Northampton Patricroft Carnforth Lancaster Green Ayre Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/04/1949 01/10/1949 08/10/1949 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 07/07/1951 17/07/1951 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 16/06/1956 06/10/1956 02/06/1962 23/04/1966 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | |
Black Five | 5015 | 45015 | 04/1935 | 12A 5A 5B 3E 3E 3B 3B 8A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Crewe North Crewe South Monument Lane Monument Lane Bushbury Bushbury Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 01/10/1949 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 18/11/1961 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5016 | 45016 | 05/1935 | 28A 67C W |
Motherwell Ayr Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1949 28/08/1965 14/07/1966 |
14/07/1966 | |
Black Five | 5017 | 45017 | 05/1935 | 12A 8A 2A 2A 8A 11A 8F 27C 9D 9E 10A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Edge Hill Rugby Rugby Edge Hill Carnforth Springs Branch (Wigan) Southport Newton Heath Trafford Park (LMS) Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 24/03/1951 11/08/1951 02/05/1959 20/07/1963 20/06/1964 14/11/1964 21/08/1965 10/08/1968 |
10/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5018 | 45018 | 05/1935 | 28A 60A 60B 68A 64A 68A 8B 26C 12A W |
Motherwell Inverness Aviemore Carlisle Kingmoor St Margarets Carlisle Kingmoor Warrington Dallam Bolton Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/12/1949 18/04/1950 01/11/1952 05/09/1953 03/10/1953 28/07/1962 18/05/1963 23/11/1963 24/12/1966 |
24/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 5019 | 45019 | 05/1935 | 8A 10C 10A 8A 8A 11A 11A 8F W |
Edge Hill Patricroft Springs Branch (Wigan) Edge Hill Edge Hill Carnforth Carnforth Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 08/02/1936 01/01/1948 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 07/07/1951 17/07/1951 02/05/1959 13/05/1967 |
13/05/1967 | |
Black Five | 5020 | 45020 | 08/1934 | 2A 8A 1E 2E 1A 1E 1A 1E 1A 5D 6G 5D W |
Rugby Edge Hill Bletchley Northampton Willesden Bletchley Willesden Bletchley Willesden Stoke Llandudno Junction Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/10/1953 26/02/1955 05/11/1960 19/11/1960 07/01/1961 08/04/1961 09/09/1961 10/11/1962 20/04/1963 22/06/1963 29/06/1963 11/12/1965 |
11/12/1965 | |
Black Five | 5021 | 45021 | 08/1934 | 12B 2C 10C 12A 5A 5B 5A 5B W |
Carlisle Upperby Northampton Patricroft Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Crewe South Crewe North Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/11/1949 10/08/1957 05/10/1957 30/11/1957 23/06/1962 15/09/1962 14/09/1963 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5022 | 45022 | 08/1934 | 8A 8A 12A W |
Edge Hill Edge Hill Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 30/11/1935 01/01/1948 16/09/1963 |
16/09/1963 | |
Black Five | 5023 | 45023 | 08/1934 | 12A 66A 66A 64C W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Polmadie Polmadie Dalry Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 06/10/1951 16/09/1963 |
16/09/1963 | |
Black Five | 5024 | 45024 | 08/1934 | 1A 2A 24K 5B 8F 9A 8F W |
Willesden Rugby Preston Crewe South Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1960 10/12/1960 09/09/1961 09/12/1961 16/12/1961 30/12/1961 13/05/1967 |
13/05/1967 | |
Black Five | 5025 | 45025 | 08/1934 | 2B 5A 5B 1A 1A 12B 24J 10A W |
Bletchley Crewe North Crewe South Willesden Willesden Carlisle Upperby Lancaster Green Ayre Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/03/1948 23/10/1948 11/12/1948 18/12/1948 12/07/1958 22/06/1963 23/04/1966 10/08/1968 |
10/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5026 | 45026 | 09/1934 | 8B 10C 10C 10A 10A 24E 10C 10F 9H 9D W |
Warrington Dallam Patricroft Patricroft Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Blackpool Central Fleetwood Rose Grove Patricroft Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 18/12/1948 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 27/07/1963 09/11/1963 05/12/1964 06/02/1965 19/06/1965 09/10/1965 |
09/10/1965 | |
Black Five | 5027 | 45027 | 09/1934 | 5A 1A 6B 2A 5E 2J 1G 1E 10A 9B W |
Crewe North Willesden Mold Junction Rugby Nuneaton Aston Woodford Halse Bletchley Carnforth Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 01/01/1948 23/06/1962 19/01/1963 07/03/1964 18/07/1964 16/01/1965 27/02/1965 10/07/1965 25/09/1965 04/05/1968 |
04/05/1968 | |
Black Five | 5028 | 45028 | 09/1934 | 5B 8B 7C 8A 5A 5B 5B 5A 5A 5B 6B 6J 6B 12B 12A W |
Crewe South Warrington Dallam Holyhead Edge Hill Crewe North Crewe South Crewe South Crewe North Crewe North Crewe South Mold Junction Holyhead Mold Junction Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/05/1948 29/04/1950 21/10/1950 04/11/1950 02/12/1950 31/12/1950 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 18/04/1953 16/07/1955 10/06/1961 23/09/1961 10/11/1962 22/06/1963 25/03/1967 |
25/03/1967 | |
Black Five | 5029 | 45029 | 09/1934 | 28B 66B W |
Dalry Road Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/04/1951 19/10/1966 |
19/10/1966 | |
Black Five | 5030 | 45030 | 09/1934 | 10A 5B 63A 66A 67A 66A 67A 64C W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Crewe South Perth South Polmadie Corkerhill Polmadie Corkerhill Dalry Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/10/1948 09/09/1951 24/01/1953 05/09/1953 03/10/1953 07/08/1954 29/10/1955 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
Black Five | 5031 | 45031 | 09/1934 | 19E 26A 6B 2A 6A 8C W |
Belle Vue Newton Heath Mold Junction Rugby Chester (MR) Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/04/1956 23/01/1960 19/01/1963 22/06/1963 18/03/1967 06/1967 |
06/1967 | |
Black Five | 5032 | 45032 | 09/1934 | 8B 8A 8C W |
Warrington Dallam Edge Hill Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 04/03/1961 08/02/1964 |
08/02/1964 | |
Black Five | 5033 | 45033 | 09/1934 | 2A 5A 12A 12A 5A 12A 5A 9A 5A 5B 5A 5B W |
Rugby Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Carlisle Upperby (on loan) Crewe North Longsight Crewe North Crewe South Crewe North Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/03/1951 18/08/1951 08/09/1951 21/02/1953 03/11/1956 03/11/1956 10/08/1957 05/10/1957 06/01/1962 02/03/1963 14/09/1963 24/12/1966 |
24/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 5034 | 45034 | 09/1934 | 2A 5B 3D 3E 9A 5A 24J 8C 10D 8C W |
Rugby Crewe South Aston Monument Lane Longsight Crewe North Lancaster Green Ayre Speke Junction Lostock Hall Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/02/1954 16/07/1955 03/11/1956 29/10/1960 26/11/1960 10/06/1961 09/09/1961 20/06/1964 11/07/1964 03/02/1968 |
03/02/1968 | |
Black Five | 5035 | 45035 | 09/1934 | 8B 24E 10C W |
Warrington Dallam Blackpool Central Fleetwood Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/06/1963 14/09/1963 21/11/1964 |
21/11/1964 | |
Black Five | 5036 | 45036 | 09/1934 | 29A 64A 64C 64C 66A 66A 64A 64A 66A 66A 64A 66A 67A 64C W |
Perth South St Margarets Dalry Road Dalry Road Polmadie Polmadie St Margarets St Margarets Polmadie Polmadie St Margarets Polmadie Corkerhill Dalry Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/02/1950 25/11/1950 30/11/1950 23/12/1950 31/12/1950 20/01/1951 31/01/1951 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 06/10/1951 17/05/1952 07/08/1954 29/10/1955 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
Black Five | 5037 | 45037 | 09/1934 | 10C 12A 11A 9A 5A 1E 1A 5D W |
Patricroft Carlisle Upperby Carnforth Longsight Crewe North Bletchley Willesden Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/01/1955 28/01/1956 07/11/1959 09/01/1960 06/05/1961 10/11/1962 20/04/1963 27/11/1965 |
27/11/1965 | |
Black Five | 5038 | 45038 | 09/1934 | 5B 3D 3E 6G 21D 2A 5D 12A 9B W |
Crewe South Aston Monument Lane Llandudno Junction Aston Tyseley Stoke Carlisle Kingmoor Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1955 04/10/1958 02/07/1960 08/10/1960 02/10/1965 29/01/1966 24/06/1967 06/01/1968 17/02/1968 |
17/02/1968 | |
Black Five | 5039 | 45039 | 10/1934 | 11A 11A 8A W |
Carnforth Carnforth Edge Hill Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 11/08/1951 26/08/1967 |
26/08/1967 | |
Black Five | 5040 | 45040 | 10/1935 | 20A 21A 21A 22A 21A 2B 5B W |
Holbeck (MR) Saltley Saltley Bristol Barrow Road Saltley Oxley Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 01/12/1956 20/04/1957 03/04/1965 25/03/1967 22/07/1967 |
22/07/1967 | |
Black Five | 5041 | 45041 | 10/1935 | 5B 1A 5B 5B 12A 26F 6A 8C 6J 8A 8K 8B 10D W |
Crewe South Willesden Crewe South Crewe South Carlisle Upperby Patricroft Chester (MR) Speke Junction Holyhead Edge Hill Bank Hall Warrington Dallam Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 23/02/1957 14/06/1958 04/10/1958 09/01/1960 10/06/1961 28/10/1961 19/10/1963 21/11/1964 07/10/1967 09/12/1967 |
09/12/1967 | |
Black Five | 5042 | 45042 | 10/1935 | 19G 6A 7A 6A 6J 6B 6J 6B 6G 6A 5B W |
Trafford Park (LMS) Chester (MR) Llandudno Junction Chester (MR) Holyhead Mold Junction Holyhead Mold Junction Llandudno Junction Chester (MR) Crewe South Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 01/01/1948 11/12/1948 04/10/1958 20/06/1959 19/09/1959 22/06/1963 14/09/1963 23/04/1966 08/10/1966 10/06/1967 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5043 | 45043 | 10/1935 | 20A 25F 28A 28A 63A 68A 64A 6A 6B 6J 6B 6J 8C W |
Holbeck (MR) Low Moor Blackpool Central Blackpool Central Perth South Carlisle Kingmoor St Margarets Chester (MR) Mold Junction Holyhead Mold Junction Holyhead Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/08/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 09/09/1951 17/05/1952 05/09/1953 03/10/1953 08/10/1955 22/06/1963 14/09/1963 23/04/1966 10/12/1966 25/11/1967 |
25/11/1967 | |
Black Five | 5044 | 45044 | 10/1935 | 5B 5D 5D 9A 12B 1A 2E 2A 1A 6A W |
Crewe South Stoke Stoke Longsight Carlisle Upperby Willesden Northampton Rugby Willesden Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1959 18/06/1960 29/10/1960 19/11/1960 31/03/1962 09/02/1963 17/08/1963 26/10/1963 02/11/1963 10/1966 |
10/1966 | |
Black Five | 5045 | 45045 | 10/1935 | 8A 7A 12B 5A 10A 6A 7C 7C 51B 5A 5B 6J 6G 6D 6C 9F W |
Edge Hill Llandudno Junction Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Springs Branch (Wigan) Chester (MR) Holyhead Holyhead Newport (Teeside) Crewe North Crewe South Holyhead Llandudno Junction Shrewsbury Croes Newydd Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 26/06/1948 25/12/1948 08/01/1949 28/05/1949 07/07/1951 17/07/1951 06/10/1956 31/12/1960 06/01/1962 08/12/1962 02/03/1963 02/10/1965 27/11/1965 06/08/1966 29/10/1966 |
29/10/1966 | |
Black Five | 5046 | 45046 | 10/1935 | 12B 11B 3A 10C 11A 9A 5A 5B 5A 5B 9B 9K W |
Carlisle Upperby Barrow in Furness Bescot Patricroft Carnforth Longsight Crewe North Crewe South Crewe North Crewe South Stockport Edgeley Bolton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/02/1948 19/05/1956 16/06/1956 06/10/1956 07/11/1959 09/01/1960 23/06/1962 15/09/1962 14/09/1963 21/08/1965 11/05/1968 22/06/1968 |
22/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 5047 | 45047 | 10/1935 | 30A 67C 63D 63A 64C 64A W |
Corkerhill Ayr Fort William Perth South Dalry Road St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/05/1952 12/06/1954 27/11/1954 25/09/1965 30/10/1965 17/07/1966 |
17/07/1966 | |
Black Five | 5048 | 45048 | 10/1935 | 5B 1A 5B 6J 5A 5A 5B 2A 5B 5A 2F 2C 6J 8F W |
Crewe South Willesden Crewe South Holyhead Crewe North Crewe North Crewe South Rugby Crewe South Crewe North Bescot Stourbridge Junction Holyhead Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 23/10/1948 12/07/1952 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 18/04/1953 21/04/1956 16/06/1956 20/06/1964 19/09/1964 26/03/1966 28/05/1966 10/12/1966 11/1967 |
11/1967 | |
Black Five | 5049 | 45049 | 11/1935 | 30A 67C 63D 63A 63B W |
Corkerhill Ayr Fort William Perth South Stirling Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/05/1952 07/08/1954 27/11/1954 01/09/1956 29/08/1963 |
29/08/1963 | |
Black Five | 5050 | 45050 | 11/1935 | 11A 12A 2A 2E 1A 8B 6G 2A 2E 6A 5D W |
Carnforth Carlisle Upperby Rugby Northampton Willesden Warrington Dallam Llandudno Junction Rugby Northampton Chester (MR) Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/07/1952 24/01/1953 06/10/1956 19/11/1960 14/01/1961 01/07/1961 23/09/1961 17/11/1962 20/06/1964 19/09/1964 12/08/1967 |
12/08/1967 | |
Black Five | 5051 | 45051 | 11/1935 | 3D 3E 3E 3A 3D 21E 21B 24J 2E 2A 6D W |
Aston Monument Lane Monument Lane Bescot Aston Monument Lane Bescot Lancaster Green Ayre Northampton Tyseley Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/07/1951 17/07/1951 19/05/1956 20/06/1959 01/07/1961 02/09/1961 14/10/1961 13/01/1962 02/10/1965 12/11/1966 19/11/1966 |
19/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 5052 | 45052 | 11/1935 | 2A 5B 3D 3E 21D 2E 2J 2A 6D 6A 5D 5B W |
Rugby Crewe South Aston Monument Lane Aston Saltley Aston Tyseley Shrewsbury Chester (MR) Stoke Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/05/1948 05/06/1948 04/10/1958 02/07/1960 16/01/1965 06/03/1965 02/10/1965 12/11/1966 11/03/1967 15/04/1967 12/08/1967 30/09/1967 |
30/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5053 | 45053 | 11/1935 | 32A 63A 67A 67D 64C 64A W |
Inverness Perth South Corkerhill Ardrossan Dalry Road St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/03/1953 04/07/1959 22/10/1960 01/07/1961 30/10/1965 19/11/1966 |
19/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 5054 | 45054 | 11/1935 | 8A 5A 11B 11A 11A W |
Edge Hill Crewe North Barrow in Furness Carnforth Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1948 14/02/1948 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 10/02/1968 |
10/02/1968 | |
Black Five | 5055 | 45055 | 11/1935 | 10C 10A 6B 8F 27C 51C 50A 8K 8L 8B 8A 9H 10D W |
Patricroft Springs Branch (Wigan) Mold Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Southport West Hartlepool York (North) Bank Hall Aintree Warrington Dallam Edge Hill Patricroft Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/10/1952 21/05/1955 15/09/1962 20/07/1963 23/04/1966 23/04/1966 18/06/1966 22/10/1966 13/05/1967 07/10/1967 11/05/1968 06/07/1968 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5056 | 45056 | 11/1935 | 22C 19A 19B 6J 6G 2A 5E 1F 1H 1F 5B 8C W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Sheffield Grimesthorpe Sheffield Millhouses Holyhead Llandudno Junction Rugby Nuneaton Rugby Northampton Rugby Crewe South Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1949 27/03/1954 17/05/1958 11/04/1961 23/09/1961 07/03/1964 18/07/1964 09/01/1965 27/02/1965 10/04/1965 18/03/1967 19/08/1967 |
19/08/1967 | |
Black Five | 5057 | 45057 | 12/1935 | 2A 10C 10C 6A 10A 26A 8C W |
Rugby Patricroft Patricroft Chester (MR) Springs Branch (Wigan) Newton Heath Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/07/1951 17/07/1951 31/12/1955 08/09/1956 27/07/1963 05/10/1963 12/08/1967 |
12/08/1967 | |
Black Five | 5058 | 45058 | 12/1935 | 3D 2E 2J 6D W |
Aston Saltley Aston Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/01/1965 06/03/1965 16/10/1965 08/10/1966 |
08/10/1966 | |
Black Five | 5059 | 45059 | 12/1935 | 16A 21A 19A 14A 17A 15C 17A 17B 8C W |
Nottingham Saltley Sheffield Grimesthorpe Cricklewood East Derby Leicester Midland Derby Burton Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/10/1951 31/10/1953 04/12/1954 10/02/1962 26/05/1962 23/06/1962 22/09/1962 13/03/1965 08/07/1967 |
08/07/1967 | |
Black Five | 5060 | 45060 | 12/1935 | 5B 5D 21B 5D W |
Crewe South Stoke Bescot Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1959 03/09/1960 10/09/1960 04/03/1967 |
04/03/1967 | |
Black Five | 5061 | 45061 | 12/1935 | 23C 28A 27C 28A 28A 24A 24B 24E 27C 27B 12A W |
Southport Blackpool Central Southport Blackpool Central Blackpool Central Accrington Rose Grove Blackpool Central Southport Aintree Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/03/1951 19/05/1951 16/06/1951 30/06/1951 26/01/1952 06/09/1952 11/07/1953 09/10/1954 17/03/1962 18/05/1963 18/11/1967 |
18/11/1967 | |
Black Five | 5062 | 45062 | 12/1935 | 25F 23A 25G 19A 19A 17A 14A 17A 17B 16C 16F 9J 9E W |
Low Moor Bank Hall Farnley Junction Sheffield Grimesthorpe Sheffield Grimesthorpe Derby Cricklewood East Derby Burton Derby Burton Agecroft Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 29/04/1950 02/12/1950 23/02/1952 05/10/1957 10/01/1959 17/02/1962 22/09/1962 23/11/1963 12/09/1964 03/07/1965 22/10/1966 15/04/1967 |
15/04/1967 | |
Black Five | 5063 | 45063 | 12/1935 | 25G 26A 25G 55H 55A W |
Farnley Junction Newton Heath Farnley Junction Neville Hill Holbeck (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/08/1953 05/09/1953 07/03/1964 13/06/1964 10/10/1966 |
10/10/1966 | |
Black Five | 5064 | 45064 | 12/1935 | 5B 1A 21B 1E 2F 2C 6G 6A W |
Crewe South Willesden Bescot Bletchley Bescot Stourbridge Junction Llandudno Junction Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 07/05/1960 26/01/1963 14/03/1964 26/03/1966 28/05/1966 08/10/1966 11/03/1967 |
11/03/1967 | |
Black Five | 5065 | 45065 | 12/1935 | 20A 5A 3D 3D 3E 3D 2A 2E 1A 2A 5B 1F 5E 9F W |
Holbeck (MR) Crewe North Aston Aston Monument Lane Aston Rugby Northampton Willesden Rugby Crewe South Rugby Nuneaton Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1948 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 12/09/1959 07/11/1959 23/02/1963 30/03/1963 22/06/1963 17/08/1963 19/09/1964 28/11/1964 29/05/1965 28/05/1966 05/1968 |
05/1968 | |
Black Five | 5066 | 45066 | 01/1935 | 22B 32A 66A W |
Gloucester Barnwood Inverness Polmadie Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 12/03/1960 06/02/1964 |
06/02/1964 | |
Black Five | 5067 | 45067 | 01/1935 | 5B 3C 5B 5A 2F 2E 9F W |
Crewe South Ryecroft (Walsall) Crewe South Crewe North Bescot Saltley Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/08/1957 07/09/1957 20/06/1964 19/09/1964 26/03/1966 28/05/1966 21/10/1967 |
21/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 5068 | 45068 | 01/1935 | 20A 23A 26A 27A 27A 24A 24B 8L 8B W |
Holbeck (MR) Bank Hall Newton Heath Bank Hall Bank Hall Accrington Rose Grove Aintree Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/03/1949 27/01/1951 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 05/11/1955 04/03/1961 25/01/1964 03/07/1965 12/1965 |
12/1965 | |
Black Five | 5069 | 45069 | 01/1935 | 5B 3C 3B 3E 3A 3C 3C 3A 3A 2A 2A 8A 2E 2A 8A 5B 8A 6J 8C 9E 8F 8A W |
Crewe South Ryecroft (Walsall) Bushbury Monument Lane Bescot Ryecroft (Walsall) Ryecroft (Walsall) Bescot Bescot Rugby Rugby Edge Hill Northampton Rugby Edge Hill Crewe South Edge Hill Holyhead Speke Junction Trafford Park (LMS) Springs Branch (Wigan) Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 02/10/1948 28/05/1949 01/10/1949 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 09/06/1951 16/06/1951 22/03/1952 14/06/1952 12/07/1952 03/10/1953 16/09/1961 09/12/1961 23/06/1962 15/09/1962 16/02/1963 22/06/1963 06/07/1963 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | |
Black Five | 5070 | 45070 | 05/1935 | 1A 10A 6A 5A 7C 6A 6A 8A 3D 1E 1E 12A 10C 12A 5A 6J 6B 8F 8B W |
Willesden Springs Branch (Wigan) Chester (MR) Crewe North Holyhead Chester (MR) Chester (MR) Edge Hill Aston Bletchley Bletchley Carlisle Upperby Patricroft Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Holyhead Mold Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1948 08/05/1948 21/08/1948 28/05/1949 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 24/03/1951 29/12/1951 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 11/07/1953 16/07/1955 05/10/1957 30/01/1960 11/06/1960 17/09/1960 15/09/1962 26/06/1965 20/05/1967 |
20/05/1967 | |
Black Five | 5071 | 45071 | 05/1935 | 1A 1E 1E 5A 12A 3E 21C 21E 8C W |
Willesden Bletchley Bletchley Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Monument Lane Bushbury Monument Lane Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 05/09/1953 10/09/1955 10/08/1957 17/09/1960 17/06/1961 28/10/1961 22/07/1967 |
22/07/1967 | |
Black Five | 5072 | 45072 | 06/1935 | 5B 8B 11A 11A 2A 11A 24L 8A 6J 6B 12B 24L W |
Crewe South Warrington Dallam Carnforth Carnforth Rugby Barrow in Furness Carnforth Edge Hill Holyhead Mold Junction Carlisle Upperby Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/05/1948 14/10/1950 04/11/1950 19/04/1958 12/07/1958 06/09/1958 14/05/1960 11/06/1960 17/09/1960 10/11/1962 22/06/1963 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5073 | 45073 | 06/1935 | 5B 12A 3D 12A 5A 24J 8C 8F 26A 9E 9B 9K 10D W |
Crewe South Carlisle Upperby Aston Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Lancaster Green Ayre Speke Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Newton Heath Trafford Park (LMS) Stockport Edgeley Bolton Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1957 10/08/1957 07/09/1957 30/11/1957 10/06/1961 09/09/1961 21/07/1962 27/07/1963 28/11/1964 28/10/1967 13/04/1968 06/07/1968 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5074 | 45074 | 06/1935 | 5B 5B 5B 5D W |
Crewe South Crewe South Crewe South Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 15/12/1962 18/09/1965 |
18/09/1965 | |
Black Five | 5075 | 45075 | 02/1935 | 25G 55A 55E W |
Farnley Junction Holbeck (MR) Normanton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/09/1964 15/07/1967 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5076 | 45076 | 03/1935 | 25G 26A W |
Farnley Junction Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/09/1956 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 5077 | 45077 | 03/1935 | 25G 24E 25A 25G 25A 24E 27C 24E 27A 24E 10C 10F 9H 9D W |
Farnley Junction Blackpool Central Wakefield Farnley Junction Wakefield Blackpool Central Southport Blackpool Central Bank Hall Blackpool Central Fleetwood Rose Grove Patricroft Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1948 29/12/1951 19/04/1952 14/06/1952 12/07/1952 09/10/1954 16/07/1955 01/12/1956 26/01/1957 23/11/1963 05/12/1964 13/02/1965 19/06/1965 14/08/1965 |
14/08/1965 | |
Black Five | 5078 | 45078 | 03/1935 | 25G 27C 27C 27C 24A 24E 8B W |
Farnley Junction Southport Southport Southport Accrington Blackpool Central Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 11/07/1953 19/06/1954 09/01/1960 05/09/1964 30/10/1965 |
30/10/1965 | |
Black Five | 5079 | 45079 | 03/1935 | 26A 25G 25B 25B 25G 55A W |
Newton Heath Farnley Junction Huddersfield Hillhouse Huddersfield Hillhouse Farnley Junction Holbeck (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/12/1950 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 21/02/1953 18/01/1964 08/03/1967 |
08/03/1967 | |
Black Five | 5080 | 45080 | 03/1935 | 25G 55B 55A W |
Farnley Junction Stourton Holbeck (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/10/1966 28/01/1967 10/1967 |
10/1967 | |
Black Five | 5081 | 45081 | 03/1935 | 12A 12B 12A 12B W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Carlisle Upperby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/03/1962 22/06/1963 27/06/1964 16/10/1965 |
16/10/1965 | |
Black Five | 5082 | 45082 | 03/1935 | 12A 12B 12A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/08/1962 22/06/1963 09/07/1966 |
09/07/1966 | |
Black Five | 5083 | 45083 | 03/1935 | 12A 12B 27C 9D W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Carlisle Upperby Southport Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/08/1962 18/05/1963 20/06/1964 16/12/1967 |
16/12/1967 | |
Black Five | 5084 | 45084 | 03/1935 | 12A 63B 67A 66E W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Stirling Corkerhill Carstairs Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/04/1952 25/06/1966 25/06/1966 29/11/1966 |
29/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 5085 | 45085 | 03/1935 | 29A 64A 64C 64C 66A 66A 66B W |
Perth South St Margarets Dalry Road Dalry Road Polmadie Polmadie Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/02/1950 25/11/1950 30/11/1950 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 06/10/1951 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
Black Five | 5086 | 45086 | 03/1935 | 29A 61B 64D 64D 64C W |
Perth South Aberdeen Ferryhill Carstairs Carstairs Dalry Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1949 29/10/1949 11/08/1951 09/09/1951 06/10/1951 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
Black Five | 5087 | 45087 | 03/1935 | 29A 60A 60A 64D W |
Perth South Inverness Inverness Carstairs Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/06/1949 16/07/1949 22/10/1949 26/07/1963 |
26/07/1963 | |
Black Five | 5088 | 45088 | 04/1935 | 17A 19B 19A 15C 16A 21A 15C 16C W |
Derby Sheffield Millhouses Sheffield Grimesthorpe Leicester Midland Nottingham Saltley Leicester Midland Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/05/1948 15/01/1949 12/11/1949 28/11/1953 21/11/1959 10/08/1963 30/11/1963 12/09/1964 |
12/09/1964 | |
Black Five | 5089 | 45089 | 04/1935 | 19A 5B 1A 6J 1E 2F 2D 6A 5B W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Crewe South Willesden Holyhead Bletchley Bescot Banbury Chester (MR) Crewe South Withdrawn |
11/04/1936 01/01/1948 28/05/1949 12/07/1958 04/10/1958 14/03/1964 02/10/1965 10/09/1966 29/04/1967 26/08/1967 |
26/08/1967 | |
Black Five | 5090 | 45090 | 04/1935 | 32A 63A 66C 66A 66E W |
Inverness Perth South Hamilton (West) Polmadie Carstairs Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 12/03/1960 21/10/1961 24/11/1962 30/05/1964 06/12/1965 |
06/12/1965 | |
Black Five | 5091 | 45091 | 04/1935 | 1A 10B 10B 2C 8A 6G 5B 8F W |
Willesden Preston Preston Northampton Edge Hill Llandudno Junction Crewe South Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
11/04/1936 22/06/1946 01/01/1948 05/11/1949 19/11/1960 02/03/1963 08/05/1965 24/07/1965 10/09/1966 |
10/09/1966 | |
Black Five | 5092 | 45092 | 04/1935 | 20A 5A 2A 1A 11A 6J 8F 5B 8F 12B 24L W |
Holbeck (MR) Crewe North Rugby Willesden Carnforth Holyhead Springs Branch (Wigan) Crewe South Springs Branch (Wigan) Carlisle Upperby Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/03/1949 29/04/1950 31/12/1950 23/02/1952 14/06/1958 04/10/1958 02/04/1960 25/06/1960 16/06/1962 22/06/1963 16/12/1967 |
16/12/1967 | |
Black Five | 5093 | 45093 | 04/1935 | 5B 6J 5B 5D 5A 5B W |
Crewe South Holyhead Crewe South Stoke Crewe North Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1954 06/11/1954 14/06/1958 04/10/1958 14/09/1963 10/1965 |
10/1965 | |
Black Five | 5094 | 45094 | 04/1935 | 8A 5B 3D 8A W |
Edge Hill Crewe South Aston Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/05/1948 05/06/1948 21/10/1961 25/02/1967 |
25/02/1967 | |
Black Five | 5095 | 45095 | 04/1935 | 8B 7A 6A 6A 7C 7C 6A 6A 6B 10C 66B 26F 9J 10A W |
Warrington Dallam Llandudno Junction Chester (MR) Chester (MR) Holyhead Holyhead Chester (MR) Chester (MR) Mold Junction Patricroft Motherwell Patricroft Agecroft Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 09/09/1950 30/11/1950 07/07/1951 17/07/1951 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 14/06/1952 11/07/1953 16/03/1963 22/06/1963 09/11/1963 09/05/1964 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5096 | 45096 | 04/1935 | 12A 5A CAR 10B 10B 26F 9J 9E 10F W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Crewe North Carlisle Canal Preston Preston Patricroft Agecroft Trafford Park (LMS) Rose Grove Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/06/1949 01/10/1949 02/06/1951 16/06/1951 18/04/1959 26/10/1963 22/10/1966 09/03/1968 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5097 | 45097 | 04/1935 | 5B 1A 1A 11A 5B 24L 12A W |
Crewe South Willesden Willesden Carnforth Crewe South Carnforth Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 18/12/1948 05/11/1955 02/04/1960 25/06/1960 10/11/1962 18/06/1966 |
18/06/1966 | |
Black Five | 5098 | 45098 | 04/1935 | 32A 66A W |
Inverness Polmadie Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/04/1960 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
Black Five | 5099 | 45099 | 04/1935 | 25B 24F 63A 66B W |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Fleetwood Perth South Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 09/09/1951 01/12/1951 16/09/1963 |
16/09/1963 | |
Black Five | 5100 | 45100 | 05/1935 | 12A 12C W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Carlisle Canal Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/08/1962 10/1963 |
28/09/1963 | |
Black Five | 5101 | 45101 | 05/1935 | 24A 25F 25A 26A W |
Accrington Low Moor Wakefield Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/02/1956 16/06/1956 08/09/1956 16/03/1968 |
16/03/1968 | |
Black Five | 5102 | 45102 | 05/1935 | 26A 24E 17A W |
Newton Heath Blackpool Central Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/07/1960 25/05/1963 30/01/1965 |
30/01/1965 | |
Black Five | 5103 | 45103 | 05/1935 | 26A 26F 26B 12C 12A 26A 8C 8A W |
Newton Heath Patricroft Agecroft Carlisle Canal Carlisle Kingmoor Newton Heath Speke Junction Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/07/1960 12/11/1960 19/01/1963 22/06/1963 13/07/1963 05/10/1963 11/01/1964 09/1964 |
09/1964 | |
Black Five | 5104 | 45104 | 05/1935 | 26B 26A 26A 8L 9D 9M 9K W |
Agecroft Newton Heath Newton Heath Aintree Newton Heath Bury Bolton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 11/01/1964 27/06/1964 14/11/1964 10/04/1965 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 5105 | 45105 | 05/1935 | 26A 27C 12C 12A W |
Newton Heath Southport Carlisle Canal Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/01/1961 26/01/1963 22/06/1963 29/10/1966 |
29/10/1966 | |
Black Five | 5106 | 45106 | 05/1935 | 12B 10C 12A 12A 12B 12A W |
Carlisle Upperby Patricroft Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/08/1957 05/10/1957 22/06/1963 11/07/1964 07/11/1964 14/01/1967 |
14/01/1967 | |
Black Five | 5107 | 45107 | 05/1935 | 24F 28A 28A 28B 28B 10D W |
Fleetwood Blackpool Central Blackpool Central Fleetwood Fleetwood Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 14/10/1950 04/11/1950 19/02/1966 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5108 | 45108 | 05/1935 | 5B 9A 8F W |
Crewe South Longsight Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1959 12/09/1959 11/12/1965 |
11/12/1965 | |
Black Five | 5109 | 45109 | 05/1935 | 8B 9A 8F 26A 27C 8K 8B W |
Warrington Dallam Longsight Springs Branch (Wigan) Newton Heath Southport Bank Hall Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/07/1952 12/09/1959 27/07/1963 24/08/1963 12/10/1963 21/11/1964 01/04/1967 |
01/04/1967 | |
Black Five | 5110 | 45110 | 06/1935 | 7C 5C 9K 10D W |
Holyhead Stafford Bolton Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/03/1964 24/07/1965 06/07/1968 17/08/1968 |
17/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5111 | 45111 | 06/1935 | 7C 5B 5B 8A 5B 5A 9A 21E 9A 12B 1A 6A 6B 6G 6B 6J 10F W |
Holyhead Crewe South Crewe South Edge Hill Crewe South Crewe North Longsight Monument Lane Longsight Carlisle Upperby Willesden Chester (MR) Mold Junction Llandudno Junction Mold Junction Holyhead Rose Grove Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 26/01/1952 06/11/1954 30/11/1957 14/06/1958 30/04/1960 29/10/1960 19/11/1960 31/03/1962 27/04/1963 02/10/1965 27/11/1965 04/12/1965 23/04/1966 20/08/1966 28/10/1967 |
28/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 5112 | 45112 | 06/1935 | 7A 4A 65A 65A 68A 12B 12A 27B 12A W |
Llandudno Junction Shrewsbury Eastfield Eastfield Carlisle Kingmoor Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Aintree Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1948 01/12/1951 29/12/1951 17/05/1952 14/02/1959 20/06/1959 18/05/1963 23/11/1963 15/10/1966 |
15/10/1966 | |
Black Five | 5113 | 45113 | 06/1935 | 7C 8A 8A 9A 2A 9A 5A 12A 5A 3C 5A 3E 2A 5B 1F 1H 1F 5E W |
Holyhead Edge Hill Edge Hill Longsight Rugby Longsight Crewe North Carlisle Upperby (on loan) Crewe North Ryecroft (Walsall) Crewe North Monument Lane Rugby Crewe South Rugby Northampton Rugby Nuneaton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/11/1950 30/11/1950 24/03/1956 21/04/1956 16/06/1956 03/11/1956 03/11/1956 03/11/1956 10/08/1957 07/09/1957 20/06/1959 17/09/1960 19/09/1964 28/11/1964 09/01/1965 27/02/1965 29/05/1965 03/07/1965 |
03/07/1965 | |
Black Five | 5114 | 45114 | 06/1935 | 5D 11A 3D 12A 3D 3A 3D 5A 3D 2D 16B 9F W |
Stoke Carnforth Aston Carlisle Upperby (on loan) Aston Bescot Aston Crewe North Aston Banbury Colwick Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/03/1952 19/04/1952 03/11/1956 03/11/1956 23/03/1957 20/06/1959 22/08/1959 05/09/1959 02/10/1965 19/02/1966 28/05/1966 13/01/1968 |
13/01/1968 | |
Black Five | 5115 | 45115 | 06/1935 | 31A 67E 67B W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Dumfries Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/01/1965 25/06/1966 29/11/1966 |
29/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 5116 | 45116 | 06/1935 | 12A 31A 26B 15E 15E 16D 14A 2F 6G 6B 6J 6A 8F W |
Carlisle Kingmoor St Rollox (Balornock) Agecroft Leicester (G.C.) Leicester (G.C.) Annesley Cricklewood East Woodford Halse Llandudno Junction Mold Junction Holyhead Chester (MR) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 01/01/1948 23/03/1957 10/10/1959 07/11/1959 09/01/1960 26/01/1963 18/05/1963 02/11/1963 08/05/1965 23/04/1966 10/12/1966 20/05/1967 29/07/1967 |
29/07/1967 | |
Black Five | 5117 | 45117 | 06/1935 | 12A 31A 64D 66A 66A 64A 64A 66A 66A 64A 63A 60A 67A 67B W |
Carlisle Kingmoor St Rollox (Balornock) Carstairs Polmadie Polmadie St Margarets St Margarets Polmadie Polmadie St Margarets Perth South Inverness Corkerhill Hurlford Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 01/01/1948 22/10/1949 23/12/1950 31/12/1950 20/01/1951 31/01/1951 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 06/10/1951 19/04/1952 26/10/1957 21/04/1962 21/04/1962 22/10/1965 |
22/10/1965 | |
Black Five | 5118 | 45118 | 06/1935 | 12A 63A 68A 27B 26A 12A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Perth South Carlisle Kingmoor Aintree Newton Heath Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/07/1950 29/12/1951 18/05/1963 22/06/1963 05/10/1963 08/10/1966 |
08/10/1966 | |
Black Five | 5119 | 45119 | 06/1935 | 12A 63A 67A 67A 65F 65A 65B 63B 65B W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Perth South Corkerhill Corkerhill Grangemouth Eastfield St Rollox (Balornock) Stirling St Rollox (Balornock) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/07/1950 11/08/1951 09/09/1951 06/10/1951 12/06/1954 25/12/1954 01/10/1955 22/12/1956 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
Black Five | 5120 | 45120 | 06/1935 | 28A 60A 68A 27B 12A W |
Motherwell Inverness Carlisle Kingmoor Aintree Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/12/1949 27/12/1952 18/05/1963 23/11/1963 06/1967 |
06/1967 | |
Black Five | 5121 | 45121 | 06/1935 | 28A W |
Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/1964 |
05/1964 | |
Black Five | 5122 | 45122 | 06/1935 | 32A 68A W |
Inverness Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/11/1952 11/04/1964 |
11/04/1964 | |
Black Five | 5123 | 45123 | 07/1935 | 32A 67A 67B W |
Inverness Corkerhill Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/04/1962 21/04/1962 16/09/1963 |
16/09/1963 | |
Black Five | 5124 | 45124 | 07/1935 | 32A 67A 67B 67A 66B 66A W |
Inverness Corkerhill Hurlford Corkerhill Motherwell Polmadie Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/06/1960 11/02/1961 31/12/1966 28/01/1967 29/04/1967 01/05/1967 |
01/05/1967 | |
Black Five | 5125 | 45125 | 05/1935 | 4A 29A 63B 68C 65B 65F W |
Shrewsbury Perth South Stirling Stranraer St Rollox (Balornock) Grangemouth Withdrawn (Re-instd) |
02/11/1935 01/01/1948 25/10/1958 20/12/1958 01/08/1959 08/04/1961 29/12/1962 02/1963 |
29/12/1962 | |
Black Five | 5126 | 45126 | 05/1935 | 12A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/05/1967 |
20/05/1967 | |
Black Five | 5127 | 45127 | 05/1935 | 12A 61B 64C 64C 64A 62B W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Aberdeen Ferryhill Dalry Road Dalry Road St Margarets Dundee Tay Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1949 29/10/1949 08/09/1951 09/09/1951 30/10/1965 24/09/1966 19/11/1966 |
19/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 5128 | 45128 | 05/1935 | 5B 19A 5B 5A 8A 5A 5B 8F W |
Crewe South Sheffield Grimesthorpe Crewe South Crewe North Edge Hill Crewe North Crewe South Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/11/1950 31/12/1950 19/04/1952 14/06/1952 12/07/1952 18/04/1953 24/07/1965 10/09/1966 |
10/09/1966 | |
Black Five | 5129 | 45129 | 05/1935 | 12B 12B 10C 8K 8B W |
Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Upperby Patricroft Bank Hall Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/10/1948 19/06/1954 19/10/1963 21/11/1964 17/09/1966 |
17/09/1966 | |
Black Five | 5130 | 45130 | 05/1935 | 2B 6A 6B 3D 6B 5B 1A 2A 6A 6C 8H W |
Bletchley Chester (MR) Mold Junction Aston Mold Junction Crewe South Willesden Rugby Chester (MR) Croes Newydd Birkenhead Mollington Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/10/1951 23/02/1952 10/08/1957 07/09/1957 07/11/1959 10/06/1961 09/09/1961 22/06/1963 02/10/1965 29/04/1967 11/11/1967 |
11/11/1967 | |
Black Five | 5131 | 45131 | 05/1935 | 5A 5B 6J 8A 6J 8C W |
Crewe North Crewe South Holyhead Edge Hill Holyhead Speke Junction Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 10/06/1961 28/10/1961 23/06/1962 13/10/1962 20/04/1968 |
20/04/1968 | |
Black Five | 5132 | 45132 | 05/1935 | 3D 6B 6A 6A 9E 3D 5A 5D 6J 6D W |
Aston Mold Junction Chester (MR) Chester (MR) Trafford Park (LMS) Aston Crewe North Stoke Holyhead Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1948 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 09/10/1954 06/11/1954 05/09/1959 14/09/1963 20/06/1964 02/10/1965 04/03/1967 |
04/03/1967 | |
Black Five | 5133 | 45133 | 05/1935 | 12B 11A 11A 6J 6G 10C 9J 9D 8B 8A W |
Carlisle Upperby Carnforth Carnforth Holyhead Llandudno Junction Patricroft Agecroft Newton Heath Warrington Dallam Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/11/1950 30/11/1950 16/07/1955 03/12/1955 10/08/1957 09/11/1963 19/06/1965 06/08/1966 07/10/1967 03/02/1968 |
03/02/1968 | |
Black Five | 5134 | 45134 | 05/1935 | 5B 5A 12A 5A 5A 5B 21E 21B 24J 2E 2A 6D 10A W |
Crewe South Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Crewe North Crewe South Monument Lane Bescot Lancaster Green Ayre Northampton Tyseley Shrewsbury Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/07/1952 04/10/1952 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 18/04/1953 18/06/1960 17/09/1960 14/10/1961 13/01/1962 02/10/1965 17/09/1966 10/12/1966 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5135 | 45135 | 05/1935 | 10C 4A 5B 10A 27C 12A W |
Patricroft Bletchley Crewe South Springs Branch (Wigan) Southport Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1951 08/08/1953 28/11/1953 17/08/1963 14/11/1964 07/10/1967 |
07/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 5136 | 45136 | 05/1935 | 32A 60B 63A W |
Inverness Aviemore Perth South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/11/1952 27/08/1960 30/10/1964 |
30/10/1964 | |
Black Five | 5137 | 45137 | 06/1935 | 10C 15D 1A 5A 1A 8C W |
Patricroft Bedford Willesden Crewe North Willesden Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/11/1955 06/02/1960 19/03/1960 02/04/1960 14/01/1961 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 5138 | 45138 | 06/1935 | 32A 32A 68A W |
Inverness Inverness Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 01/11/1952 09/1966 |
09/1966 | |
Black Five | 5139 | 45139 | 06/1935 | 12B 10C 15D 1A 2A 8A 5D 8A 9E 9B W |
Carlisle Upperby Patricroft Bedford Willesden Rugby Edge Hill Stoke Edge Hill Trafford Park (LMS) Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/08/1955 05/11/1955 06/02/1960 18/06/1960 28/07/1962 04/08/1962 18/08/1962 23/02/1963 06/11/1965 19/08/1967 |
19/08/1967 | |
Black Five | 5140 | 45140 | 06/1935 | 1A 12A 24K 8C 8F W |
Willesden Carlisle Upperby Preston Speke Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/01/1952 27/08/1960 10/09/1960 21/07/1962 09/1966 |
09/1966 | |
Black Five | 5141 | 45141 | 06/1935 | 10A 12B 11B 11B 12A 10D W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Carlisle Canal Barrow in Furness Barrow in Furness Carlisle Kingmoor Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/06/1951 30/06/1951 17/07/1951 17/12/1966 28/01/1967 11/03/1967 |
11/03/1967 | |
Black Five | 5142 | 45142 | 06/1935 | 10B 10C 6B 5B 6J 5A 5B 5A 5B W |
Preston Patricroft Mold Junction Crewe South Holyhead Crewe North Crewe South Crewe North Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 06/10/1956 22/11/1958 10/06/1961 23/09/1961 06/01/1962 09/02/1963 14/09/1963 24/04/1965 |
24/04/1965 | |
Black Five | 5143 | 45143 | 14/06/1935 | 5B 5C 4A 6G 6D W |
Crewe South Stafford Shrewsbury Llandudno Junction Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/06/1948 17/07/1948 10/10/1964 02/10/1965 11/12/1965 |
11/12/1965 | |
Black Five | 5144 | 45144 | 06/1935 | 3A 7B 7B 14A 16C W |
Bescot Bangor Bangor Cricklewood East Derby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/06/1949 16/07/1949 25/05/1963 16/05/1964 13/06/1964 |
13/06/1964 | |
Black Five | 5145 | 45145 | 14/06/1935 | 8B 5B 4A 6H 6J 6D 5B W |
Warrington Dallam Crewe South Shrewsbury Bangor Holyhead Shrewsbury Crewe South Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 01/01/1948 17/07/1948 20/06/1964 19/06/1965 02/10/1965 11/03/1967 11/11/1967 |
11/11/1967 | |
Black Five | 5146 | 45146 | 06/1935 | 5B 1A 12A 10C 9A 1B 9A 2A 1A 2A 1A 21B 5D W |
Crewe South Willesden Carlisle Upperby Patricroft Longsight Camden Longsight Rugby Willesden Rugby Willesden Bescot Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 11/07/1953 19/06/1954 09/10/1954 29/11/1958 27/12/1958 10/01/1959 19/09/1959 26/09/1959 05/12/1959 07/05/1960 09/03/1963 19/06/1965 |
19/06/1965 | |
Black Five | 5147 | 45147 | 06/1935 | 10C 1A 12A 1A 2E 1A 8C 6J 2E 1E 5C 8L W |
Patricroft Willesden Carlisle Upperby Willesden Northampton Willesden Speke Junction Holyhead Northampton Bletchley Stafford Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/12/1954 07/09/1957 05/10/1957 22/11/1958 19/11/1960 14/01/1961 10/06/1961 23/09/1961 04/11/1961 07/03/1964 24/07/1965 20/05/1967 |
20/05/1967 | |
Black Five | 5148 | 45148 | 06/1935 | 5B 5A 6J 5A 2A 5A 5B 6J 5A 8A 12A W |
Crewe South Crewe North Holyhead Crewe North Rugby Crewe North Crewe South Holyhead Crewe North Edge Hill Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/04/1953 21/04/1956 19/05/1956 19/04/1958 12/07/1958 17/09/1960 10/06/1961 23/09/1961 03/03/1962 10/11/1962 25/12/1965 |
25/12/1965 | |
Black Five | 5149 | 45149 | 06/1935 | 8B 5D 5B 6A 6G 6D 10D W |
Warrington Dallam Stoke Crewe South Chester (MR) Llandudno Junction Shrewsbury Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/07/1952 22/03/1958 10/06/1961 10/03/1962 17/09/1966 11/03/1967 22/06/1968 |
22/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 5150 | 45150 | 06/1935 | 2C 2A 5A 9A 3E 9A 24K 8B 9D 9E W |
Northampton Rugby Crewe North Longsight Monument Lane Longsight Preston Warrington Dallam Newton Heath Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/08/1949 24/03/1956 10/08/1957 07/09/1957 05/10/1957 12/09/1959 09/09/1961 20/06/1964 14/11/1964 02/03/1968 |
02/03/1968 | |
Black Five | 5151 | 45151 | 06/1935 | 12A 12A 66B W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Carlisle Kingmoor Motherwell Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 04/03/1950 25/03/1950 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
Black Five | 5152 | 45152 | 06/1935 | 12A 12A 66B W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Carlisle Kingmoor Motherwell Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 04/03/1950 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
Black Five | 5153 | 45153 | 06/1935 | 12A 31A 67E W |
Carlisle Kingmoor St Rollox (Balornock) Dumfries Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 25/01/1964 05/1964 |
05/1964 | |
Black Five | 5154 | 45154 | 06/1935 | 12A 31A 26A 8L 9D 10A 10J 8C W |
Carlisle Kingmoor St Rollox (Balornock) Newton Heath Aintree Newton Heath Carnforth Lancaster Green Ayre Speke Junction Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 20/04/1957 11/01/1964 20/06/1964 11/07/1964 18/07/1964 06/03/1965 12/11/1966 |
12/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 5155 | 45155 | 07/1935 | 12A 31A 64A 64C W |
Carlisle Kingmoor St Rollox (Balornock) St Margarets Dalry Road Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 18/01/1958 12/04/1958 12/11/1964 |
12/11/1964 | |
Black Five | 5156 | 45156 | 07/1935 | 12A 31A 26A 26C 8B 8A 9H 10F W |
Carlisle Kingmoor St Rollox (Balornock) Newton Heath Bolton Warrington Dallam Edge Hill Patricroft Rose Grove Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 20/04/1957 22/12/1962 18/05/1963 22/06/1963 11/05/1968 06/07/1968 10/08/1968 |
10/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5157 | 45157 | 07/1935 | 31A W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
Black Five | 5158 | 45158 | 07/1935 | 31A 67D 67E W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Ardrossan Dumfries Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/01/1964 30/05/1964 23/07/1964 |
23/07/1964 | |
Black Five | 5159 | 45159 | 07/1935 | 31A W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Withdrawn (Re-instd) |
01/01/1948 29/12/1962 02/1963 |
29/12/1962 | |
Black Five | 5160 | 45160 | 07/1935 | 32A 67A 67C W |
Inverness Corkerhill Ayr Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/01/1952 21/11/1959 02/09/1966 |
02/09/1966 | |
Black Five | 5161 | 45161 | 07/1935 | 29A 32A 29A 60A 60A 64D 64C 67A 64D 67C 66E W |
Perth South Inverness Perth South Inverness Inverness Carstairs Dalry Road Corkerhill Carstairs Ayr Carstairs Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/06/1948 03/07/1948 25/06/1949 16/07/1949 22/10/1949 06/10/1951 02/08/1958 21/11/1959 27/06/1964 26/11/1966 29/11/1966 |
29/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 5162 | 45162 | 08/1935 | 29A 66A 61B 64C 64A W |
Perth South Polmadie Aberdeen Ferryhill Dalry Road St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/07/1953 04/09/1954 22/08/1964 30/10/1965 19/11/1966 |
19/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 5163 | 45163 | 08/1935 | 29A 67A 68A W |
Perth South Corkerhill Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/04/1950 17/05/1952 15/05/1965 |
15/05/1965 | |
Black Five | 5164 | 45164 | 08/1935 | 29A 66A 63A 62B 67A 67C W |
Perth South Polmadie Perth South Dundee Tay Bridge Corkerhill Ayr Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/07/1953 02/10/1954 19/02/1955 07/05/1960 08/09/1962 09/08/1966 |
09/08/1966 | |
Black Five | 5165 | 45165 | 08/1935 | 29A 66C 66B W |
Perth South Hamilton (West) Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/10/1961 22/12/1962 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
Black Five | 5166 | 45166 | 08/1935 | 29A 67A 64D W |
Perth South Corkerhill Carstairs Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/11/1951 18/02/1956 16/09/1963 |
16/09/1963 | |
Black Five | 5167 | 45167 | 08/1935 | 29A 61B 61A 67D 67C 66E 66B W |
Perth South Aberdeen Ferryhill Kittybrewster Ardrossan Ayr Carstairs Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/08/1956 04/06/1960 03/06/1961 27/02/1965 26/11/1966 26/11/1966 01/05/1967 |
01/05/1967 | |
Black Five | 5168 | 45168 | 08/1935 | 30A 63A 66A 66B 66B 64C 64A W |
Corkerhill Perth South Polmadie Motherwell Motherwell Dalry Road St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/03/1953 04/06/1960 21/10/1961 24/11/1962 07/09/1963 30/10/1965 26/09/1966 |
26/09/1966 | |
Black Five | 5169 | 45169 | 08/1935 | 12A 68B W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Dumfries Withdrawn (Re-instd) |
01/01/1948 03/12/1949 04/11/1951 29/12/1962 02/1963 |
29/12/1962 | |
Black Five | 5170 | 45170 | 08/1935 | 29A 64C W |
Perth South Dalry Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/10/1961 31/03/1964 |
31/03/1964 | |
Black Five | 5171 | 45171 | 08/1935 | 29A 67A 66E W |
Perth South Corkerhill Carstairs Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/07/1961 26/06/1965 29/10/1965 |
29/10/1965 | |
Black Five | 5172 | 45172 | 08/1935 | 29A 66A 66E W |
Perth South Polmadie Carstairs Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/06/1960 21/10/1961 05/1964 |
05/1964 | |
Black Five | 5173 | 45173 | 08/1935 | 29A 66A 63A 66A 67A 64D W |
Perth South Polmadie Perth South Polmadie Corkerhill Carstairs Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1953 05/09/1953 26/12/1953 04/09/1954 17/03/1956 23/07/1964 |
23/07/1964 | |
Black Five | 5174 | 45174 | 08/1935 | 29A 67A 64D W |
Perth South Corkerhill Carstairs Withdrawn (Re-instd) |
01/01/1948 01/04/1950 04/08/1956 29/12/1962 02/1963 |
29/12/1962 | |
Black Five | 5175 | 45175 | 08/1935 | 29A 67A 64D W |
Perth South Corkerhill Carstairs Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/08/1954 18/02/1956 26/07/1963 |
26/07/1963 | |
Black Five | 5176 | 45176 | 08/1935 | 31A 28A W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1948 17/08/1966 |
17/08/1966 | |
Black Five | 5177 | 45177 | 09/1935 | 31A 65F 67C W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Grangemouth Ayr Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/10/1960 30/10/1965 14/07/1966 |
14/07/1966 | |
Black Five | 5178 | 45178 | 09/1935 | 31A 65F 66B W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Grangemouth Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/10/1960 19/01/1963 30/01/1965 |
30/01/1965 | |
Black Five | 5179 | 45179 | 09/1935 | 31A 28A 60A 63A 66C 66B W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Motherwell Inverness Perth South Hamilton (West) Motherwell Withdrawn (Re-instd) |
01/01/1948 06/11/1948 10/12/1949 27/08/1960 21/10/1961 24/11/1962 29/12/1962 02/1963 |
29/12/1962 | |
Black Five | 5180 | 45180 | 09/1935 | 4A 64A 64A 6A 6J 12A 5B 6J 6G 21E 21B 2E 5B W |
Shrewsbury St Margarets St Margarets Chester (MR) Holyhead Carlisle Upperby Crewe South Holyhead Llandudno Junction Monument Lane Bescot Saltley Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/09/1951 04/11/1951 03/10/1953 19/06/1954 29/01/1955 28/01/1956 14/06/1958 04/10/1958 21/05/1960 25/06/1960 03/04/1965 19/06/1965 25/09/1965 |
25/09/1965 | |
Black Five | 5181 | 45181 | 09/1935 | 5B 8A 8A 2A 2A 8A 6J 8C 8F 24L 8C W |
Crewe South Edge Hill Edge Hill Rugby Rugby Edge Hill Holyhead Speke Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Carnforth Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1948 11/12/1948 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 24/03/1951 23/06/1962 13/10/1962 22/06/1963 13/07/1963 14/09/1963 15/01/1966 |
15/01/1966 | |
Black Five | 5182 | 45182 | 09/1935 | 17A 10C 12A 10C 9E 12C W |
Derby Patricroft Carlisle Upperby Patricroft Trafford Park (LMS) Barrow in Furness Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 01/01/1948 06/10/1956 03/11/1956 14/11/1964 16/01/1965 12/03/1966 |
12/03/1966 | |
Black Five | 5183 | 45183 | 09/1935 | 5B 4A 64C 64C W |
Crewe South Shrewsbury Dalry Road Dalry Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/07/1948 06/10/1951 01/12/1951 30/10/1964 |
30/10/1964 | |
Black Five | 5184 | 45184 | 09/1935 | 17A 12B 6J 12A 26F 1E 2A 8C 6J 2E 2A 6A W |
Derby Carlisle Upperby Holyhead Carlisle Upperby Patricroft Bletchley Rugby Speke Junction Holyhead Northampton Rugby Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 16/07/1955 10/09/1955 14/06/1958 04/10/1958 07/11/1959 11/02/1961 10/06/1961 23/09/1961 25/11/1961 22/06/1963 18/09/1965 |
18/09/1965 | |
Black Five | 5185 | 45185 | 09/1935 | 10B 5B 5B 5D 12A 12A 6D W |
Preston Crewe South Crewe South Stoke Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/11/1948 11/12/1948 16/06/1956 23/02/1957 22/06/1963 02/10/1965 06/1966 |
06/1966 | |
Black Five | 5186 | 45186 | 09/1935 | 21A 17A 19B 21A 15E 21A 17A 21A 2B 5B W |
Saltley Derby Sheffield Millhouses Saltley Leicester (G.C.) Saltley Derby Saltley Oxley Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/11/1953 06/11/1954 04/12/1954 14/06/1958 03/01/1959 17/09/1960 04/03/1961 03/04/1965 11/03/1967 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5187 | 45187 | 09/1935 | 20A 2A 1A 8A 9H W |
Holbeck (MR) Rugby Willesden Edge Hill Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1948 06/10/1956 14/05/1960 11/05/1968 06/1968 |
06/1968 | |
Black Five | 5188 | 45188 | 09/1935 | 10C 5B 9A 5A 5B 21E 24K 21E 1A 8A 6J 8F 8A 8C W |
Patricroft Crewe South Longsight Crewe North Crewe South Monument Lane Preston Monument Lane Willesden Edge Hill Holyhead Springs Branch (Wigan) Edge Hill Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1955 10/08/1957 07/09/1957 30/11/1957 18/06/1960 27/08/1960 10/09/1960 17/09/1960 22/10/1960 23/06/1962 15/09/1962 17/08/1963 19/10/1963 22/07/1967 |
22/07/1967 | |
Black Five | 5189 | 45189 | 09/1935 | 5B 5D 5A 5B 5A W |
Crewe South Stoke Crewe North Crewe South Crewe North Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/04/1957 05/10/1957 23/06/1962 15/09/1962 13/07/1963 |
13/07/1963 | |
Black Five | 5190 | 45190 | 10/1935 | 4A 16B 16C 16B 16E 40E 9F W |
Shrewsbury Annesley Derby Annesley Kirkby in Ashfield Colwick Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/10/1964 13/03/1965 14/08/1965 23/10/1965 25/12/1965 28/05/1966 04/05/1968 |
04/05/1968 | |
Black Five | 5191 | 45191 | 10/1935 | 2C 2A 1A 5D W |
Northampton Rugby Willesden Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/09/1960 11/02/1961 29/12/1962 22/07/1967 |
22/07/1967 | |
Black Five | 5192 | 45192 | 10/1935 | 32A 63A 67A 67B 65F W |
Inverness Perth South Corkerhill Hurlford Grangemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/07/1960 06/05/1961 29/07/1961 02/11/1963 21/08/1965 |
21/08/1965 | |
Black Five | 5193 | 45193 | 10/1935 | 12B 24J 10A W |
Carlisle Upperby Lancaster Green Ayre Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/06/1962 23/04/1966 08/1967 |
08/1967 | |
Black Five | 5194 | 45194 | 10/1935 | 30A 67C W |
Corkerhill Ayr Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/11/1959 24/04/1965 |
24/04/1965 | |
Black Five | 5195 | 45195 | 10/1935 | 5B 5A 5A 6J 5A 5B 3C 1E 12A 1E 26F 26B 12C 12A 26A 12A W |
Crewe South Crewe North Crewe North Holyhead Crewe North Crewe South Ryecroft (Walsall) Bletchley Carlisle Upperby Bletchley Patricroft Agecroft Carlisle Canal Carlisle Kingmoor Newton Heath Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/11/1952 29/11/1952 03/01/1953 24/01/1953 18/04/1953 17/07/1954 26/02/1955 07/09/1957 05/10/1957 04/07/1959 17/06/1961 12/01/1963 22/06/1963 13/07/1963 05/10/1963 30/07/1966 |
30/07/1966 | |
Black Five | 5196 | 45196 | 10/1935 | 8B 5A 8B 8A 24J 10F W |
Warrington Dallam Crewe North Warrington Dallam Edge Hill Lancaster Green Ayre Rose Grove Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/04/1960 25/06/1960 09/07/1960 16/03/1963 31/10/1964 30/12/1967 |
30/12/1967 | |
Black Five | 5197 | 45197 | 10/1935 | 5B 8B 6G 6B 6G 14E 14A 8C 10D W |
Crewe South Warrington Dallam Llandudno Junction Mold Junction Llandudno Junction Bedford Cricklewood East Speke Junction Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/03/1962 05/05/1962 09/02/1963 11/05/1963 25/05/1963 06/07/1963 02/05/1964 11/07/1964 14/01/1967 |
14/01/1967 | |
Black Five | 5198 | 45198 | 10/1935 | 5B 5B 9B 1A 6A 6C 8F W |
Crewe South Crewe South Stockport Edgeley Willesden Chester (MR) Croes Newydd Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 10/06/1961 07/04/1962 02/11/1963 02/10/1965 11/03/1967 30/09/1967 |
30/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5199 | 45199 | 10/1935 | 10C 26C 17B W |
Patricroft Bolton Burton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/09/1962 25/05/1963 09/1963 |
09/1963 | |
Black Five | 5200 | 45200 | 10/1935 | 23A 23C 28A 27C 24A 24E 9B 9D 10A W |
Bank Hall Southport Blackpool Central Southport Accrington Blackpool Central Stockport Edgeley Newton Heath Carnforth Withdrawn |
08/02/1936 01/01/1948 24/03/1951 19/05/1951 19/04/1952 03/10/1953 19/02/1966 11/05/1968 06/07/1968 20/07/1968 |
20/07/1968 | |
Black Five | 5201 | 45201 | 10/1935 | 19G 23A 25F 25A 27A 24E 8C W |
Trafford Park (LMS) Bank Hall Low Moor Wakefield Bank Hall Blackpool Central Speke Junction Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 08/02/1936 01/01/1948 03/11/1951 16/06/1956 22/02/1958 21/03/1964 05/1968 |
05/1968 | |
Black Five | 5202 | 45202 | 10/1935 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 5203 | 45203 | 11/1935 | 26A W |
Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 5204 | 45204 | 11/1935 | 25A 25G 55H 55A W |
Wakefield Farnley Junction Neville Hill Holbeck (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/05/1955 07/03/1964 12/09/1964 09/01/1967 |
09/01/1967 | |
Black Five | 5205 | 45205 | 11/1935 | 25A 24A 24A 24B 9D W |
Wakefield Accrington Accrington Rose Grove Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 28/11/1953 12/02/1966 29/10/1966 |
29/10/1966 | |
Black Five | 5206 | 45206 | 11/1935 | 25A 24A 24A 24F 9D 10A W |
Wakefield Accrington Accrington Fleetwood Newton Heath Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 06/09/1952 10/07/1965 06/07/1968 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5207 | 45207 | 11/1935 | 25F 56D 56A 56F 55D W |
Low Moor Mirfield Wakefield Low Moor Royston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/08/1961 26/05/1962 23/06/1962 14/09/1963 11/09/1966 |
11/09/1966 | |
Black Five | 5208 | 45208 | 11/1935 | 25F 56D 56A 56F 56D 56F W |
Low Moor Mirfield Wakefield Low Moor Mirfield Low Moor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/08/1961 26/05/1962 23/06/1962 18/04/1964 03/12/1966 01/10/1967 |
01/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 5209 | 45209 | 11/1935 | 25F 23A 23C 25A 24A 24A 24B 24A 24B 24H 24L 10J 10A W |
Low Moor Bank Hall Southport Wakefield Accrington Accrington Rose Grove Accrington Rose Grove Hellifield Carnforth Lancaster Green Ayre Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/05/1948 30/10/1948 01/01/1949 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 06/09/1952 03/10/1953 28/11/1953 02/02/1963 22/06/1963 07/12/1963 18/04/1964 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 5210 | 45210 | 11/1935 | 25F 26A 25B 25F 25G 25F 25F 27A 27B 12A 10B 10J 10F 12A W |
Low Moor Newton Heath Huddersfield Hillhouse Low Moor Farnley Junction Low Moor Low Moor Bank Hall Aintree Carlisle Kingmoor Blackpool Central Lancaster Green Ayre Rose Grove Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/05/1950 04/11/1950 31/12/1950 19/04/1952 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 08/09/1956 17/03/1962 11/05/1963 01/08/1964 15/08/1964 21/11/1964 07/08/1965 02/04/1966 |
02/04/1966 | |
Black Five | 5211 | 45211 | 11/1935 | 25F 27A 26A 26A 25G 55A 55B 55A W |
Low Moor Polmadie Newton Heath Newton Heath Farnley Junction Holbeck (MR) Stourton Holbeck (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/05/1950 28/10/1950 04/11/1950 31/12/1950 18/01/1964 08/10/1966 28/01/1967 17/05/1967 |
17/05/1967 | |
Black Five | 5212 | 45212 | 11/1935 | 24F 10A 8C 10A 12A 10D W |
Fleetwood Carnforth Speke Junction Carnforth Carlisle Kingmoor Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/10/1964 06/03/1965 26/06/1965 25/09/1965 06/01/1968 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5213 | 45213 | 11/1935 | 29A 63B 67C 66B W |
Perth South Stirling Ayr Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/08/1955 25/06/1966 26/11/1966 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 5214 | 45214 | 11/1935 | 24F 28A 28A 28B 28B 65A 65B 63B 67A W |
Fleetwood Blackpool Central Blackpool Central Fleetwood Fleetwood Eastfield St Rollox (Balornock) Stirling Corkerhill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 14/10/1950 04/11/1950 09/09/1951 25/12/1954 01/10/1955 30/04/1966 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 5215 | 45215 | 11/1935 | 23A 25B 15E 14D 16D 10F W |
Bank Hall Huddersfield Hillhouse Leicester (G.C.) Neasden Annesley Rose Grove Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 08/11/1958 21/02/1959 18/06/1960 03/07/1965 07/10/1967 |
07/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 5216 | 45216 | 11/1935 | 23A 23A 26A 26A 27A 27A 24B W |
Bank Hall Bank Hall Newton Heath Newton Heath Bank Hall Bank Hall Rose Grove Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 21/04/1951 19/05/1951 23/01/1960 12/02/1966 |
12/02/1966 | |
Black Five | 5217 | 45217 | 11/1935 | 23A 23A 5A 8E 16D 12A W |
Bank Hall Bank Hall Crewe North Brunswick Annesley Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 30/11/1950 24/03/1951 25/06/1960 25/05/1963 26/11/1966 |
26/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 5218 | 45218 | 11/1935 | 23A 25B 25G 25G 25B 25B 25A 25B 25A 27C 12C 12A 8P 8F 10F 10C 12A W |
Bank Hall Huddersfield Hillhouse Farnley Junction Farnley Junction Huddersfield Hillhouse Huddersfield Hillhouse Wakefield Huddersfield Hillhouse Wakefield Southport Carlisle Canal Carlisle Kingmoor Wigan Central (L&Y) Springs Branch (Wigan) Rose Grove Fleetwood Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 21/02/1953 04/12/1954 26/03/1955 16/06/1956 12/01/1963 22/06/1963 14/03/1964 18/04/1964 27/06/1964 19/06/1965 18/09/1965 16/04/1966 |
16/04/1966 | |
Black Five | 5219 | 45219 | 11/1935 | 26B 25B 25F 25F 56C 56F 55D 55A W |
Agecroft Huddersfield Hillhouse Low Moor Low Moor Copley Hill (Leeds) Low Moor Royston Holbeck (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/11/1950 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 26/08/1961 22/06/1963 14/09/1963 18/06/1966 10/1967 |
10/1967 | |
Black Five | 5220 | 45220 | 11/1935 | 26B 26A 26A 9E W |
Agecroft Newton Heath Newton Heath Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 22/02/1964 09/1966 |
09/1966 | |
Black Five | 5221 | 45221 | 11/1935 | 25F 14B 15C 15C 15D 16A 17A 21A 16A 16C 16D 8F 8B 9B W |
Low Moor Kentish Town Leicester Midland Leicester Midland Bedford Nottingham Derby Saltley Nottingham Derby Nottingham Springs Branch (Wigan) Warrington Dallam Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/12/1950 24/02/1951 23/02/1952 26/01/1957 23/01/1960 17/09/1960 04/03/1961 06/04/1963 23/11/1963 27/06/1964 06/03/1965 26/06/1965 07/10/1967 30/12/1967 |
30/12/1967 | |
Black Five | 5222 | 45222 | 12/1935 | 26A 25B 2E 1E 2E 1A 2A 1E 2F 2D 16B 9D W |
Newton Heath Huddersfield Hillhouse Northampton Bletchley Northampton Willesden Rugby Bletchley Bescot Banbury Colwick Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 08/11/1958 17/09/1960 05/11/1960 19/11/1960 09/09/1961 14/07/1962 14/03/1964 03/01/1966 19/02/1966 12/11/1966 11/02/1967 |
11/02/1967 | |
Black Five | 5223 | 45223 | 12/1935 | 26B 26A 26B 15E 15E 16D 2F 15E 14A 6H 6J 8C W |
Agecroft Newton Heath Agecroft Leicester (G.C.) Leicester (G.C.) Annesley Woodford Halse Leicester (G.C.) Cricklewood East Bangor Holyhead Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/04/1948 23/02/1957 12/09/1959 07/11/1959 09/01/1960 09/09/1961 17/03/1962 09/03/1963 25/05/1963 19/06/1965 05/02/1966 10/12/1966 |
10/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 5224 | 45224 | 12/1935 | 26A 26C 17B 16C 16B W |
Newton Heath Bolton Burton Derby Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/12/1962 25/05/1963 14/08/1965 27/08/1966 12/11/1966 |
12/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 5225 | 45225 | 08/1936 | 23A 19A 26A 6B 6H 5A 5D 9B W |
Bank Hall Sheffield Grimesthorpe Newton Heath Mold Junction Bangor Crewe North Stoke Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/09/1950 04/11/1950 23/01/1960 23/04/1960 16/09/1961 23/06/1962 24/11/1962 14/10/1967 |
14/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 5226 | 45226 | 08/1936 | 23A 26G 26G 24A 24B 24A 24F 24C W |
Bank Hall Belle Vue Belle Vue Accrington Rose Grove Accrington Fleetwood Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 03/11/1951 06/09/1952 05/09/1953 30/04/1960 22/06/1963 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5227 | 45227 | 08/1936 | 23A 24A 24E 10C 10A 10D W |
Bank Hall Accrington Blackpool Central Fleetwood Carnforth Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/11/1955 09/01/1960 09/11/1963 03/10/1964 01/04/1967 13/01/1968 |
13/01/1968 | |
Black Five | 5228 | 45228 | 08/1936 | 23A 24B 27C 27B 12A W |
Bank Hall Rose Grove Southport Aintree Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1955 08/10/1955 17/03/1962 18/05/1963 18/03/1967 |
18/03/1967 | |
Black Five | 5229 | 45229 | 08/1936 | 23A 24B 8L W |
Bank Hall Rose Grove Aintree Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/07/1955 25/01/1964 04/09/1965 |
04/09/1965 | |
Black Five | 5230 | 45230 | 08/1936 | 12B 11A W |
Carlisle Upperby Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/06/1956 14/08/1965 |
14/08/1965 | |
Black Five | 5231 | 45231 | 08/1936 | 10C 2E 3D 5D 21D 2A 6A 8C 10A W |
Patricroft Northampton Aston Stoke Aston Rugby Chester (MR) Speke Junction Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/10/1954 06/11/1954 05/08/1961 19/08/1961 23/02/1963 22/06/1963 01/04/1967 11/05/1968 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5232 | 45232 | 08/1936 | 26A 26C 17B 8B 8H W |
Newton Heath Bolton Burton Warrington Dallam Birkenhead Mollington Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/12/1962 25/05/1963 05/03/1966 31/12/1966 11/11/1967 |
11/11/1967 | |
Black Five | 5233 | 45233 | 08/1936 | 26A 9E W |
Newton Heath Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/11/1964 07/05/1966 |
07/05/1966 | |
Black Five | 5234 | 45234 | 08/1936 | 26A 26B 15E 15E 16D 14A 16D 10F 9D W |
Newton Heath Agecroft Leicester (G.C.) Leicester (G.C.) Annesley Cricklewood East Annesley Rose Grove Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1956 17/10/1959 07/11/1959 09/01/1960 02/02/1963 09/03/1963 03/07/1965 12/02/1966 09/09/1967 |
09/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5235 | 45235 | 08/1936 | 5B 11A 10A 10B 10A 5A 6B W |
Crewe South Carnforth Springs Branch (Wigan) Preston Springs Branch (Wigan) Crewe North Mold Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/05/1950 17/06/1950 12/07/1952 04/10/1952 21/02/1953 05/05/1962 15/01/1966 |
15/01/1966 | |
Black Five | 5236 | 45236 | 08/1936 | 5B 8A 8A 11B 12B 12A W |
Crewe South Edge Hill Edge Hill Barrow in Furness Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1948 11/12/1948 28/05/1949 07/11/1959 22/06/1963 23/12/1967 |
23/12/1967 | |
Black Five | 5237 | 45237 | 08/1936 | 25B 2E 6E 6A 5A 6B W |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Northampton Chester West Chester (MR) Crewe North Mold Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/11/1958 20/06/1959 19/09/1959 07/11/1959 05/05/1962 25/09/1965 |
25/09/1965 | |
Black Five | 5238 | 45238 | 08/1936 | 25B 19A 19A 20A 19A 17B 20A 15D 14B 14A 14E 2F 15E 16A 9E 10B 8B W |
Huddersfield Hillhouse Sheffield Grimesthorpe Sheffield Grimesthorpe Holbeck (MR) Sheffield Grimesthorpe Burton Holbeck (MR) Bedford Kentish Town Cricklewood East Bedford Woodford Halse Leicester (G.C.) Nottingham Trafford Park (LMS) Blackpool Central Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1950 23/02/1952 30/01/1954 17/07/1954 29/01/1955 16/07/1955 28/01/1956 16/06/1956 07/09/1957 16/09/1961 22/09/1962 12/01/1963 13/04/1963 28/03/1964 25/07/1964 05/09/1964 24/12/1966 |
24/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 5239 | 45239 | 08/1936 | 5B 9E 9J 9K 9E W |
Crewe South Trafford Park (LMS) Agecroft Bolton Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/07/1953 04/01/1964 07/11/1964 30/04/1966 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5240 | 45240 | 08/1936 | 5B 5A 2A 5A 5D W |
Crewe South Crewe North Rugby Crewe North Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/04/1953 19/04/1958 12/07/1958 22/12/1962 21/01/1967 |
21/01/1967 | |
Black Five | 5241 | 45241 | 09/1936 | 12A 5A 7A 11A 11A 8A 11A 5A 5D 5B W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Crewe North Llandudno Junction Carnforth Carnforth Edge Hill Carnforth Crewe North Stoke Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 09/09/1950 14/10/1950 04/11/1950 11/08/1956 03/11/1956 16/09/1961 19/01/1963 12/08/1967 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5242 | 45242 | 09/1936 | 5B 8A 8A W |
Crewe South Edge Hill Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1948 11/12/1948 03/06/1967 |
03/06/1967 | |
Black Five | 5243 | 45243 | 09/1936 | 12B 8A 5A 5B W |
Carlisle Upperby Edge Hill Crewe North Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/09/1949 11/10/1958 29/05/1965 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5244 | 45244 | 09/1936 | 12B 8F 8A W |
Carlisle Upperby Springs Branch (Wigan) Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/06/1963 13/07/1963 03/08/1963 |
03/08/1963 | |
Black Five | 5245 | 45245 | 09/1936 | 4A 61B 61B 63D 63A 64A 64D W |
Shrewsbury Aberdeen Ferryhill Aberdeen Ferryhill Fort William Perth South St Margarets Carstairs Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/09/1951 04/11/1951 12/06/1954 27/11/1954 08/06/1957 06/07/1957 28/08/1965 |
28/08/1965 | |
Black Five | 5246 | 45246 | 09/1936 | 12B 26A W |
Carlisle Upperby Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/06/1963 30/12/1967 |
30/12/1967 | |
Black Five | 5247 | 45247 | 09/1936 | 6A 7C 7C 7A 7A 6J 6A 6B 6H 6J 6A W |
Chester (MR) Holyhead Holyhead Llandudno Junction Llandudno Junction Holyhead Chester (MR) Mold Junction Bangor Holyhead Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/07/1951 17/07/1951 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 12/07/1952 04/10/1952 09/10/1954 23/04/1960 10/04/1965 10/12/1966 08/04/1967 |
08/04/1967 | |
Black Five | 5248 | 45248 | 09/1936 | 5B 8A 8A 12A 12A 6J 12A 24K 6G 5B W |
Crewe South Edge Hill Edge Hill Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Upperby Holyhead Carlisle Upperby Preston Llandudno Junction Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1948 11/12/1948 27/12/1952 03/01/1953 16/07/1955 10/09/1955 20/06/1959 23/04/1960 08/10/1960 26/02/1966 |
26/02/1966 | |
Black Five | 5249 | 45249 | 09/1936 | 7C 10C 10A 8A 3D 8A W |
Holyhead Patricroft Springs Branch (Wigan) Edge Hill Aston Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/10/1951 26/01/1952 11/07/1953 10/08/1957 07/09/1957 10/12/1966 |
10/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 5250 | 45250 | 09/1936 | 2A 8A 5A 2E 5A 6A W |
Rugby Edge Hill Crewe North Saltley Crewe North Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/10/1953 04/10/1958 12/10/1963 18/04/1964 18/07/1964 11/03/1967 |
11/03/1967 | |
Black Five | 5251 | 45251 | 09/1936 | 30A 67D W |
Corkerhill Ardrossan Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1959 28/12/1963 |
28/12/1963 | |
Black Five | 5252 | 45252 | 09/1936 | 8B 26F 9D 9M 9K W |
Warrington Dallam Patricroft Newton Heath Bury Bolton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/06/1959 08/08/1964 05/12/1964 10/04/1965 26/03/1966 |
26/03/1966 | |
Black Five | 5253 | 45253 | 09/1936 | 7A 14B 16A 21A 17A 21A 15C 16C 16D 16F 12A 9F W |
Llandudno Junction Kentish Town Nottingham Saltley Derby Saltley Leicester Midland Derby Nottingham Burton Carlisle Kingmoor Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 30/11/1957 21/11/1959 13/10/1962 09/03/1963 16/03/1963 21/12/1963 15/02/1964 12/09/1964 24/07/1965 06/01/1968 04/1968 |
04/1968 | |
Black Five | 5254 | 45254 | 09/1936 | 5B 6J 5A 9A 5A 8A 12A 9D W |
Crewe South Holyhead Crewe North Longsight Crewe North Edge Hill Carlisle Kingmoor Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/07/1953 03/10/1953 14/06/1958 04/10/1958 06/01/1962 10/11/1962 06/01/1968 05/1968 |
05/1968 | |
Black Five | 5255 | 45255 | 10/1936 | 5B 7C 8B 7A 6H 8B 6J 8B 26F 26A W |
Crewe South Holyhead Warrington Dallam Llandudno Junction Bangor Warrington Dallam Holyhead Warrington Dallam Patricroft Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 01/10/1949 22/03/1952 19/04/1952 12/07/1952 06/11/1954 01/01/1955 27/06/1959 14/01/1961 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 5256 | 45256 | 10/1936 | 8A 6J 8A 5A 8A 8B 6A 9A 9E 9B 9E 10B 8B W |
Edge Hill Holyhead Edge Hill Crewe North Edge Hill Warrington Dallam Chester (MR) Longsight Trafford Park (LMS) Stockport Edgeley Trafford Park (LMS) Blackpool Central Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/01/1953 24/01/1953 04/10/1958 11/10/1958 07/11/1959 23/06/1962 13/10/1962 23/02/1963 12/10/1963 27/06/1964 11/07/1964 05/09/1964 06/1967 |
06/1967 | |
Black Five | 5257 | 45257 | 10/1936 | 5D 3E 8A 5A 5B 5A 1A 5D 6G 5D 6A 5D W |
Stoke Monument Lane Edge Hill Crewe North Crewe South Crewe North Willesden Stoke Llandudno Junction Stoke Chester (MR) Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/01/1957 14/06/1958 04/10/1958 23/06/1962 15/09/1962 16/03/1963 20/04/1963 22/06/1963 29/06/1963 20/06/1964 19/09/1964 10/1965 |
10/1965 | |
Black Five | 5258 | 45258 | 10/1936 | 12B 12E 10J 10D 9K 9J 9E W |
Carlisle Upperby Barrow in Furness Lancaster Green Ayre Lostock Hall Bolton Agecroft Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/07/1960 19/06/1965 14/08/1965 18/09/1965 19/02/1966 22/10/1966 02/03/1968 |
02/03/1968 | |
Black Five | 5259 | 45259 | 10/1936 | 10C 12A 12A W |
Patricroft Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/09/1955 22/06/1963 30/12/1967 |
30/12/1967 | |
Black Five | 5260 | 45260 | 10/1936 | 20A 17A 15C 19B 17A 17A 20A 14B 16A 17A 19B 17A 19B 17A 14D 17A 21A 17A 16F 15E 9K 10D W |
Holbeck (MR) Derby Leicester Midland Sheffield Millhouses Derby Derby Holbeck (MR) Kentish Town Nottingham Derby Sheffield Millhouses Derby Sheffield Millhouses Derby Neasden Derby Saltley Derby Burton Coalville Bolton Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/06/1948 19/06/1948 18/09/1948 29/09/1951 06/10/1951 27/10/1951 06/09/1952 28/11/1953 08/10/1955 16/06/1956 06/10/1956 16/06/1957 05/10/1957 10/01/1959 18/06/1960 04/03/1961 10/08/1963 12/09/1964 19/12/1964 13/02/1965 06/07/1968 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5261 | 45261 | 10/1936 | 17A 25A 25B 25A 27A 26B 8B 8A 9B W |
Derby Wakefield Huddersfield Hillhouse Wakefield Bank Hall Agecroft Warrington Dallam Edge Hill Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 04/12/1954 26/03/1955 16/06/1956 23/02/1957 14/09/1963 08/02/1964 13/11/1965 21/10/1967 |
21/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 5262 | 45262 | 10/1936 | 19A 17B 27F 15C 15E 2F 17A 14A 16C 16F 16C 10F W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Burton Brunswick Leicester Midland Leicester (G.C.) Woodford Halse Derby Cricklewood East Derby Burton Derby Rose Grove Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/01/1955 10/01/1959 16/09/1961 17/03/1962 29/09/1962 01/12/1962 09/03/1963 16/05/1964 27/06/1964 14/08/1965 05/03/1966 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5263 | 45263 | 10/1936 | 19B 19A 19A 15C 17A 15C 16A 21A 2B 9F W |
Sheffield Millhouses Sheffield Grimesthorpe Sheffield Grimesthorpe Leicester Midland Derby Leicester Midland Nottingham Saltley Oxley Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/07/1949 16/07/1949 12/11/1949 08/10/1955 16/06/1957 22/02/1958 21/11/1959 03/04/1965 10/12/1966 21/10/1967 |
21/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 5264 | 45264 | 10/1936 | 14A 14B 19B 17A 19B 17A 17B 15C 21A 2B 2A 2B 5B W |
Cricklewood East Kentish Town Sheffield Millhouses Derby Sheffield Millhouses Derby Burton Leicester Midland Saltley Oxley Tyseley Oxley Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/03/1949 14/05/1949 04/10/1952 19/06/1954 09/10/1954 29/01/1955 10/01/1959 18/05/1963 19/06/1965 13/11/1965 16/04/1966 11/03/1967 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5265 | 45265 | 10/1936 | 21A W |
Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/05/1962 |
19/05/1962 | |
Black Five | 5266 | 45266 | 10/1936 | 12A 67B W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/12/1949 17/05/1952 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
Black Five | 5267 | 45267 | 10/1936 | 14B 15D 14B 16D 14A 15C 16B 16C 16B 40E 8F W |
Kentish Town Bedford Kentish Town Annesley Cricklewood East Leicester Midland Annesley Derby Annesley Colwick Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/06/1956 30/04/1960 15/09/1962 09/03/1963 22/06/1963 24/10/1964 13/03/1965 24/07/1965 18/12/1965 12/11/1966 14/10/1967 |
14/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 5268 | 45268 | 10/1936 | 21A 5D 8F 9D 10A W |
Saltley Stoke Springs Branch (Wigan) Newton Heath Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/04/1964 20/05/1967 09/12/1967 06/07/1968 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5269 | 45269 | 11/1936 | 21A 21B 21A 27F 21A 16A 9E 9B 9K 10D W |
Saltley Bournville Saltley Brunswick Saltley Nottingham Trafford Park (LMS) Stockport Edgeley Bolton Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1953 16/05/1953 14/05/1960 16/07/1960 18/05/1963 28/03/1964 09/03/1968 11/05/1968 06/07/1968 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5270 | 45270 | 11/1936 | 5B 6G 5B 5A 1A 1F 1H 6A 5D 5B W |
Crewe South Llandudno Junction Crewe South Crewe North Willesden Rugby Northampton Chester (MR) Stoke Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1960 17/09/1960 31/12/1960 16/03/1963 26/10/1963 25/01/1964 20/06/1964 19/09/1964 12/08/1967 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5271 | 45271 | 11/1936 | 5B 8B 5A 8B 6H 8B 12A 8B 6G 8B 9D W |
Crewe South Warrington Dallam Crewe North Warrington Dallam Bangor Warrington Dallam Carlisle Upperby Warrington Dallam Llandudno Junction Warrington Dallam Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/07/1953 03/10/1953 31/10/1953 01/12/1956 29/12/1956 07/09/1957 05/10/1957 01/07/1961 29/07/1961 20/06/1964 23/09/1967 |
23/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5272 | 45272 | 11/1936 | 22A 20A 20A 19A 19B 19B 17A 21A 6D 5A 6B 2E 2B W |
Bristol Barrow Road Holbeck (MR) Holbeck (MR) Sheffield Grimesthorpe Sheffield Millhouses Sheffield Millhouses Derby Saltley Shrewsbury Crewe North Mold Junction Saltley Oxley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/07/1949 16/07/1949 28/07/1951 04/08/1951 11/08/1951 01/12/1951 04/12/1954 18/04/1964 20/06/1964 18/07/1964 07/11/1964 03/04/1965 09/10/1965 |
09/10/1965 | |
Black Five | 5273 | 45273 | 11/1936 | 21A 22A 20A 55C 55A W |
Saltley Bristol Barrow Road Holbeck (MR) Farnley Junction Holbeck (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1954 21/05/1955 18/06/1960 13/06/1964 10/1967 |
10/1967 | |
Black Five | 5274 | 45274 | 11/1936 | 21A 21B 21A 21A 22A 20A 14A 17A 24E 10C 12A W |
Saltley Bournville Saltley Saltley Bristol Barrow Road Holbeck (MR) Cricklewood East Derby Blackpool Central Fleetwood Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 28/07/1951 11/08/1951 06/11/1954 21/05/1955 26/01/1957 28/04/1962 25/05/1963 09/11/1963 18/09/1965 13/05/1967 |
13/05/1967 | |
Black Five | 5275 | 45275 | 11/1936 | 6A 6J 10F W |
Chester (MR) Holyhead Rose Grove Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/04/1966 20/08/1966 21/10/1967 |
21/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 5276 | 45276 | 11/1936 | 20A 5B 8A 8A 8B 6J 6B 1A 5D W |
Holbeck (MR) Crewe South Edge Hill Edge Hill Warrington Dallam Holyhead Mold Junction Willesden Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1948 27/11/1948 11/12/1948 07/11/1959 23/07/1960 17/09/1960 10/06/1961 17/08/1963 21/01/1967 |
21/01/1967 | |
Black Five | 5277 | 45277 | 11/1936 | 14A 14B 17B 15E 14A 6G 6B 6G 6A W |
Cricklewood East Kentish Town Burton Leicester (G.C.) Cricklewood East Llandudno Junction Mold Junction Llandudno Junction Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/03/1949 14/04/1962 21/04/1962 09/03/1963 25/05/1963 08/05/1965 04/12/1965 08/10/1966 25/02/1967 |
25/02/1967 | |
Black Five | 5278 | 45278 | 11/1936 | 14B 5D 1A 6J 8F W |
Kentish Town Stoke Willesden Holyhead Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
11/1936 01/01/1948 04/12/1954 23/06/1962 15/09/1962 10/06/1967 |
10/06/1967 | |
Black Five | 5279 | 45279 | 11/1936 | 14B 14B 14A 17A 17B 15C 2F 6G 6D 12A 9F W |
Kentish Town Kentish Town Cricklewood East Derby Burton Leicester Midland Woodford Halse Llandudno Junction Shrewsbury Carlisle Kingmoor Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
11/1936 01/01/1948 14/01/1961 14/04/1962 22/09/1962 09/03/1963 18/05/1963 02/11/1963 17/09/1966 11/03/1967 06/01/1968 23/03/1968 |
23/03/1968 | |
Black Five | 5280 | 45280 | 11/1936 | 14B 20A 21A 22A 21A 9E 21A 6J 6A 8H W |
Kentish Town Holbeck (MR) Saltley Bristol Barrow Road Saltley Trafford Park (LMS) Saltley Holyhead Chester (MR) Birkenhead Mollington Street Withdrawn |
11/1936 01/01/1948 04/12/1954 01/12/1956 20/04/1957 17/05/1958 14/06/1958 19/06/1965 10/12/1966 29/04/1967 11/11/1967 |
11/11/1967 | |
Black Five | 5281 | 45281 | 11/1936 | 14B 4A 65A 65A 68A 84G 91W 8A 5B 8F W |
Kentish Town Shrewsbury Eastfield Eastfield Carlisle Kingmoor Shrewsbury To Western Region / GWR Edge Hill Crewe South Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
11/1936 01/01/1948 01/12/1951 29/12/1951 03/10/1953 21/02/1959 29/08/1959 12/09/1959 16/09/1961 09/12/1961 11/1967 |
11/1967 | |
Black Five | 5282 | 45282 | 11/1936 | 16A 2C 2A 5A 9A 12F 1A 6J 6G 6A 8F 8A W |
Nottingham Northampton Rugby Crewe North Longsight Workington Willesden Holyhead Llandudno Junction Chester (MR) Springs Branch (Wigan) Edge Hill Withdrawn |
11/1936 01/01/1948 12/06/1948 08/10/1955 05/11/1960 19/11/1960 31/03/1962 23/06/1962 02/03/1963 08/10/1966 11/03/1967 09/12/1967 04/05/1968 |
04/05/1968 | |
Black Five | 5283 | 45283 | 11/1936 | 22A 4A 6B 2E 2B W |
Bristol Barrow Road Shrewsbury Mold Junction Saltley Oxley Withdrawn |
11/1936 01/01/1948 19/09/1964 07/11/1964 03/04/1965 21/01/1967 |
21/01/1967 | |
Black Five | 5284 | 45284 | 12/1936 | 20A 19E 26A 1A 2A 1A 8C 6J 8A W |
Holbeck (MR) Belle Vue Newton Heath Willesden Rugby Willesden Speke Junction Holyhead Edge Hill Withdrawn |
12/1936 01/01/1948 14/08/1954 23/01/1960 29/10/1960 19/11/1960 14/01/1961 10/06/1961 28/10/1961 04/05/1968 |
04/05/1968 | |
Black Five | 5285 | 45285 | 12/1936 | 17A 22A 20A 14B 14B 14A 17A 2F 6G 5B 12A W |
Derby Bristol Barrow Road Holbeck (MR) Kentish Town Kentish Town Cricklewood East Derby Woodford Halse Llandudno Junction Crewe South Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 15/01/1949 09/07/1949 14/01/1950 21/01/1950 14/01/1961 28/04/1962 22/09/1962 02/11/1963 11/03/1967 24/06/1967 30/12/1967 |
30/12/1967 | |
Black Five | 5286 | 45286 | 12/1936 | 6B 12A 11B 12A 12A 10B 10A W |
Mold Junction Carlisle Upperby Barrow in Furness Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Blackpool Central Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/07/1953 16/06/1956 06/10/1956 22/06/1963 01/08/1964 26/09/1964 13/03/1965 |
13/03/1965 | |
Black Five | 5287 | 45287 | 12/1936 | 3B 21B 2A 6D 8A 9H 10F W |
Bushbury Bescot Tyseley Shrewsbury Edge Hill Patricroft Rose Grove Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/06/1960 02/10/1965 17/09/1966 18/03/1967 11/05/1968 06/07/1968 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5288 | 45288 | 12/1936 | 22A 6B 12A 1A 2A 1A 1F 5A 2F 2D 16B 9F W |
Bristol Barrow Road Mold Junction Carlisle Upperby Willesden Rugby Willesden Rugby Crewe North Bescot Banbury Colwick Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
12/1936 01/01/1948 11/07/1953 28/01/1956 29/10/1960 19/11/1960 14/09/1963 20/06/1964 19/09/1964 02/10/1965 19/02/1966 28/05/1966 11/1967 |
11/1967 | |
Black Five | 5289 | 45289 | 12/1936 | 22A 20A 5A 2B 5A 9A 9A 10A 10A 8A 10A 11B 5A 6J 5A 6G 6B 6G 14E 14A 15A 16B 16C 16B W |
Bristol Barrow Road Holbeck (MR) Crewe North Bletchley (on loan) Crewe North Longsight Longsight Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Edge Hill Springs Branch (Wigan) Barrow in Furness Crewe North Holyhead Crewe North Llandudno Junction Mold Junction Llandudno Junction Bedford Cricklewood East Leicester Midland Annesley Derby Colwick Withdrawn |
12/1936 01/01/1948 06/11/1948 13/11/1948 11/12/1948 17/06/1950 24/06/1950 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 11/07/1953 05/09/1953 16/06/1956 06/10/1956 20/06/1959 19/09/1959 05/05/1962 09/02/1963 11/05/1963 25/05/1963 06/07/1963 02/05/1964 17/10/1964 13/03/1965 27/08/1966 12/11/1966 |
12/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 5290 | 45290 | 12/1936 | 2C 10C 15D 26A 26C W |
Northampton Patricroft Bedford Newton Heath Bolton Withdrawn |
12/1936 01/01/1948 05/11/1955 23/02/1957 10/02/1962 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 5291 | 45291 | 12/1936 | 2A 11A 11B 11A 11B 11A 5B 9B 9E 9B 9D W |
Rugby Carnforth Barrow in Furness Carnforth Barrow in Furness Carnforth Crewe South Stockport Edgeley Trafford Park (LMS) Stockport Edgeley Newton Heath Withdrawn |
12/1936 01/01/1948 01/05/1948 21/04/1956 16/06/1956 06/10/1956 03/10/1959 10/06/1961 27/06/1964 05/09/1964 26/06/1965 23/10/1965 |
23/10/1965 | |
Black Five | 5292 | 45292 | 12/1936 | 4B 4A 7A 7C 7C 2E 5B 2E 1E 21D 1E 1A 2A 5D 8H W |
Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Shrewsbury Llandudno Junction Holyhead Holyhead Northampton Crewe South Northampton Bletchley Aston Bletchley Willesden Tyseley Stoke Birkenhead Mollington Street Withdrawn |
12/1936 01/01/1948 21/02/1948 07/07/1951 17/07/1951 09/10/1954 02/04/1960 25/06/1960 17/09/1960 01/10/1960 24/12/1960 07/03/1964 02/10/1965 12/11/1966 12/08/1967 11/11/1967 |
11/11/1967 | |
Black Five | 5293 | 45293 | 12/1937 | 4A 12B 12A W |
Shrewsbury Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
12/1937 01/01/1948 22/06/1963 21/08/1965 |
21/08/1965 | |
Black Five | 5294 | 45294 | 12/1937 | 10A 9A 5A 5B 5B 5A 5B 9A 10C 11B 9J 10A 12C 12D 9K W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Longsight Crewe North Crewe South Crewe South Crewe North Crewe South Longsight Patricroft Barrow in Furness Agecroft Carnforth Barrow in Furness Workington Bolton Withdrawn |
12/1937 01/01/1948 21/02/1948 27/11/1948 11/12/1948 12/02/1949 26/03/1949 11/07/1953 03/10/1953 08/10/1955 09/11/1963 09/05/1964 06/03/1965 17/12/1966 06/01/1968 02/03/1968 |
02/03/1968 | |
Black Five | 5295 | 45295 | 12/1937 | 9A 12B 5D 12B 8A 12B 12A W |
Longsight Carlisle Upperby Stoke Carlisle Upperby Edge Hill Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
12/1937 01/01/1948 05/08/1961 19/08/1961 10/03/1962 23/06/1962 22/06/1963 30/12/1967 |
30/12/1967 | |
Black Five | 5296 | 45296 | 12/1937 | 9A 12B 26F 8F 8A W |
Longsight Carlisle Upperby Patricroft Springs Branch (Wigan) Edge Hill Withdrawn |
12/1937 01/01/1948 22/06/1963 26/10/1963 09/12/1967 10/02/1968 |
10/02/1968 | |
Black Five | 5297 | 45297 | 12/1937 | 3E 6A 19B 19B 17A 17A 19B 6J 12B 24K 5B W |
Monument Lane Chester (MR) Sheffield Millhouses Sheffield Millhouses Derby Derby Sheffield Millhouses Holyhead Carlisle Upperby Preston Crewe South Withdrawn |
12/1937 01/01/1948 17/06/1950 31/12/1950 29/09/1951 06/10/1951 19/06/1954 17/05/1958 15/11/1958 25/03/1961 09/09/1961 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5298 | 45298 | 12/1937 | 8A 8A 5A 4A 6H 6J 6B 6G 6A 5B W |
Edge Hill Edge Hill Crewe North Shrewsbury Bangor Holyhead Mold Junction Llandudno Junction Chester (MR) Crewe South Withdrawn |
12/1937 01/01/1948 24/01/1948 28/02/1948 20/06/1964 19/06/1965 13/11/1965 27/11/1965 08/10/1966 10/06/1967 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5299 | 45299 | 01/1937 | 5A 12B 6J 9A 12B 5B 1E 1A 2D 5D 8H W |
Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Holyhead Longsight Carlisle Upperby Crewe South Bletchley Willesden Banbury Stoke Birkenhead Mollington Street Withdrawn |
01/1937 01/01/1948 10/09/1955 08/10/1955 22/03/1958 17/05/1958 26/01/1963 07/03/1964 02/10/1965 08/10/1966 12/08/1967 11/11/1967 |
11/11/1967 | |
Black Five | 5300 | 45300 | 01/1937 | 5A 5B 5A 5B 6J W |
Crewe North Crewe South Crewe North Crewe South Holyhead Withdrawn |
01/1937 01/01/1948 18/04/1953 17/05/1958 22/06/1963 12/1965 |
12/1965 | |
Black Five | 5301 | 45301 | 01/1937 | 3E 6B 7A 5B 5A 6J 5D 5B 3E 21D 2E 1A 6G 14A 16D 16B W |
Monument Lane Mold Junction Llandudno Junction Crewe South Crewe North Holyhead Stoke Crewe South Monument Lane Aston Northampton Willesden Llandudno Junction Cricklewood East Nottingham Annesley Withdrawn |
01/1937 22/06/1946 01/01/1948 11/12/1948 18/04/1953 19/05/1956 16/06/1956 06/10/1956 11/04/1959 17/09/1960 04/03/1961 15/09/1962 02/03/1963 25/05/1963 16/05/1964 18/07/1964 10/07/1965 |
10/07/1965 | |
Black Five | 5302 | 45302 | 01/1937 | 10C 5B 5A 9A 24K 6H 21D 6H 2E 9A 2E 2A 5D W |
Patricroft Crewe South Crewe North Longsight Preston Bangor Aston Bangor Northampton Longsight Northampton Tyseley Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/10/1954 03/11/1956 14/06/1958 12/09/1959 23/04/1960 18/03/1961 08/04/1961 16/09/1961 16/12/1961 30/12/1961 02/10/1965 29/01/1966 22/07/1967 |
22/07/1967 | |
Black Five | 5303 | 45303 | 01/1937 | 7A 7A 5A 5B 5B 5A 8A 11A 10J 10B 8B W |
Llandudno Junction Llandudno Junction Crewe North Crewe South Crewe South Crewe North Edge Hill Carnforth Lancaster Green Ayre Blackpool Central Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 10/07/1948 27/11/1948 11/12/1948 12/02/1949 11/03/1950 10/08/1957 18/07/1964 15/08/1964 05/09/1964 10/06/1967 |
10/06/1967 | |
Black Five | 5304 | 45304 | 01/1937 | 10C 9A 10C 12A 10C 26C W |
Patricroft Longsight Patricroft Carlisle Upperby Patricroft Bolton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/02/1956 24/03/1956 29/12/1956 26/01/1957 15/09/1962 26/08/1967 |
26/08/1967 | |
Black Five | 5305 | 45305 | 01/1937 | 5B 8B 5A 5A 8A 8A 6J 5B 5A 9A 5A 9A 12F 1A 6A 8F 8C 10D W |
Crewe South Warrington Dallam Crewe North Crewe North Edge Hill Edge Hill Holyhead Crewe South Crewe North Longsight Crewe North Longsight Workington Willesden Chester (MR) Springs Branch (Wigan) Speke Junction Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/02/1949 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 27/01/1951 31/01/1951 16/06/1956 06/10/1956 30/11/1957 14/06/1958 04/10/1958 05/11/1960 19/11/1960 31/03/1962 02/11/1963 21/08/1965 09/12/1967 11/05/1968 10/08/1968 |
10/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5306 | 45306 | 01/1937 | 11A 5D 24L W |
Carnforth Stoke Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/08/1962 18/08/1962 30/01/1965 |
30/01/1965 | |
Black Five | 5307 | 45307 | 01/1937 | 12B 9A 6A 6A 3C 5A 5B 5A 1E 3C 1E 2E 8A W |
Carlisle Upperby Longsight Chester (MR) Chester (MR) Ryecroft (Walsall) Crewe North Crewe South Crewe North Bletchley Ryecroft (Walsall) Bletchley Northampton Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/11/1948 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 12/07/1952 04/10/1952 18/04/1953 11/07/1953 26/02/1955 10/08/1957 07/09/1957 14/02/1959 19/11/1960 07/10/1967 |
07/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 5308 | 45308 | 01/1937 | 3C 3E 12A 3E 21C 2D 5D W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Monument Lane Carlisle Upperby Monument Lane Bushbury Banbury Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/11/1956 07/09/1957 05/10/1957 17/09/1960 02/10/1965 08/10/1966 12/08/1967 |
12/08/1967 | |
Black Five | 5309 | 45309 | 01/1937 | 27A 66B 66E W |
Polmadie Motherwell Carstairs Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/11/1949 01/12/1951 05/10/1963 26/09/1966 |
26/09/1966 | |
Black Five | 5310 | 45310 | 01/1937 | 1A 3E 3A 3B 2A 3B 2A 3B 2J 5E 6J 6D 5B 8F 9D 10A W |
Willesden Monument Lane Bescot Bushbury Rugby Bushbury Rugby Bushbury Aston Nuneaton Holyhead Shrewsbury Crewe South Springs Branch (Wigan) Newton Heath Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1948 01/10/1949 27/03/1954 25/02/1956 24/03/1956 19/05/1956 16/06/1956 17/04/1965 19/06/1965 04/06/1966 10/09/1966 11/03/1967 24/06/1967 09/12/1967 06/07/1968 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5311 | 45311 | 02/1937 | 12B 6J 5B 5D 5A 6G 6D W |
Carlisle Upperby Holyhead Crewe South Stoke Crewe North Llandudno Junction Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1954 06/10/1956 14/06/1958 04/10/1958 05/05/1962 02/10/1965 29/10/1966 |
29/10/1966 | |
Black Five | 5312 | 45312 | 02/1937 | 10C 6A 8C 8F 8A 8B 9B 9K W |
Patricroft Chester (MR) Speke Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Edge Hill Warrington Dallam Stockport Edgeley Bolton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1955 09/01/1960 22/06/1963 06/07/1963 12/02/1966 07/10/1967 11/05/1968 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 5313 | 45313 | 02/1937 | 7C 10A 10A W |
Holyhead Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1949 30/11/1950 06/02/1965 |
06/02/1965 | |
Black Five | 5314 | 45314 | 02/1937 | 2B 5B 10A W |
Bletchley Crewe South Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/10/1953 28/11/1953 10/1965 |
10/1965 | |
Black Five | 5315 | 45315 | 02/1937 | 10C 12A 24K 5B W |
Patricroft Carlisle Upperby Preston Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/07/1953 18/06/1960 09/09/1961 09/1963 |
31/08/1963 | |
Black Five | 5316 | 45316 | 02/1937 | 2B 12A 10C 12A 8A 12B 26F 9E W |
Bletchley Carlisle Upperby Patricroft Carlisle Upperby Edge Hill Carlisle Upperby Patricroft Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/07/1953 19/06/1954 08/10/1955 10/03/1962 23/06/1962 22/06/1963 14/11/1964 02/03/1968 |
02/03/1968 | |
Black Five | 5317 | 45317 | 02/1937 | 5B 12A 11B 12A 24L 12B 12A W |
Crewe South Carlisle Upperby Barrow in Furness Carlisle Upperby Carnforth Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/02/1955 11/08/1956 06/10/1956 07/02/1959 21/02/1959 22/06/1963 23/11/1963 |
23/11/1963 | |
Black Five | 5318 | 45318 | 02/1937 | 4A 64A 64A 24E 9M 9K 10D W |
Shrewsbury St Margarets St Margarets Blackpool Central Bury Bolton Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/09/1951 04/11/1951 03/10/1953 19/09/1964 10/04/1965 06/07/1968 10/08/1968 |
10/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5319 | 45319 | 02/1937 | 32A 63A 65F 66E 66B W |
Inverness Perth South Grangemouth Carstairs Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/08/1960 21/10/1961 30/10/1965 26/11/1966 01/05/1967 |
01/05/1967 | |
Black Five | 5320 | 45320 | 02/1937 | 32A 66A 65J W |
Inverness Polmadie Stirling Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/04/1960 07/09/1963 28/10/1963 |
28/10/1963 | |
Black Five | 5321 | 45321 | 02/1937 | 8B 5D 8B 5B 8F W |
Warrington Dallam Stoke Warrington Dallam Crewe South Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/08/1961 19/08/1961 15/02/1964 24/07/1965 07/10/1967 |
07/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 5322 | 45322 | 02/1937 | 3A 2A 3D 5D W |
Bescot Rugby Aston Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/10/1951 01/12/1951 16/10/1965 10/09/1966 |
10/09/1966 | |
Black Five | 5323 | 45323 | 02/1937 | 12B 12A 8L 8B W |
Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Aintree Warrington Dallam Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/06/1963 14/12/1963 03/07/1965 30/09/1967 |
30/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5324 | 45324 | 02/1937 | 5D 1A 2A 1A 2A 1A 2A 5D 2A 5A 2F 2D 16B 9F W |
Stoke Willesden Rugby Willesden Rugby Willesden Rugby Stoke Rugby Crewe North Bescot Banbury Colwick Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/12/1954 20/06/1959 19/09/1959 26/09/1959 05/12/1959 18/06/1960 05/08/1961 19/08/1961 20/06/1964 19/09/1964 03/01/1966 19/02/1966 20/08/1966 12/08/1967 |
12/08/1967 | |
Black Five | 5325 | 45325 | 03/1937 | 5D 11A 12A 2A 6B 6A W |
Stoke Carnforth Carlisle Upperby Rugby Mold Junction Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/03/1952 12/07/1952 28/11/1953 24/04/1954 23/04/1966 20/08/1966 |
20/08/1966 | |
Black Five | 5326 | 45326 | 03/1937 | 5D 11A W |
Stoke Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/03/1952 11/03/1967 |
11/03/1967 | |
Black Five | 5327 | 45327 | 03/1937 | 12B 10B 10C 5B 8C 5B 9A 11A 3D 8A 6G W |
Carlisle Upperby Preston Patricroft Crewe South Speke Junction Crewe South Longsight Carnforth Aston Edge Hill Llandudno Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/02/1949 28/05/1949 29/12/1951 26/01/1952 23/02/1952 11/07/1953 30/01/1954 02/05/1959 21/10/1961 02/03/1963 23/01/1965 |
23/01/1965 | |
Black Five | 5328 | 45328 | 03/1937 | 6B 8B 12A 8B 3C 8B 10A W |
Mold Junction Warrington Dallam Carlisle Upperby Warrington Dallam Ryecroft (Walsall) Warrington Dallam Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/02/1950 06/10/1956 03/11/1956 10/08/1957 07/09/1957 20/06/1964 23/09/1967 |
23/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5329 | 45329 | 03/1937 | 10C 12A 10C 12A 12A 24J 8C 6J 8C 8F 24L 8C W |
Patricroft Carlisle Upperby Patricroft Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Lancaster Green Ayre Speke Junction Holyhead Speke Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Carnforth Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/01/1955 16/07/1955 13/08/1955 20/06/1959 18/06/1960 24/09/1960 23/06/1962 15/09/1962 22/06/1963 13/07/1963 14/09/1963 12/11/1966 |
12/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 5330 | 45330 | 03/1937 | 4A 62C 62B 62C 68A 27B 8B 9D 10A W |
Shrewsbury Dunfermline Upper Dundee Tay Bridge Dunfermline Upper Carlisle Kingmoor Aintree Warrington Dallam Newton Heath Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/09/1951 06/10/1951 04/11/1951 09/08/1952 11/05/1963 13/05/1967 07/10/1967 06/07/1968 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5331 | 45331 | 03/1937 | 2B 4B 4B 6G 1E 1A 2D 8F W |
Bletchley Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) Llandudno Junction Bletchley Willesden Banbury Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 31/10/1953 26/02/1955 07/03/1964 02/10/1965 20/08/1966 11/1967 |
11/1967 | |
Black Five | 5332 | 45332 | 03/1937 | 8A 6A 6A 10B 2E 21D 21C 6A 8C W |
Edge Hill Chester (MR) Chester (MR) Preston Northampton Aston Bushbury Chester (MR) Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 24/03/1951 11/04/1961 02/12/1961 13/01/1962 23/06/1962 15/09/1962 19/11/1966 |
19/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 5333 | 45333 | 03/1937 | 11A 11A 10B 10B 11A 8A 8A 8E 1A 16A 15C 21A 15C 16B 16E 40E W 9E |
Carnforth Carnforth Preston Preston Carnforth Edge Hill Edge Hill Brunswick Willesden Nottingham Leicester Midland Saltley Leicester Midland Annesley Kirkby in Ashfield Colwick Withdrawn Trafford Park (LMS) |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 09/07/1949 16/07/1949 20/08/1949 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 27/10/1951 25/01/1958 20/06/1959 12/12/1959 18/05/1963 22/06/1963 24/10/1964 23/10/1965 25/12/1965 06/1966 25/06/1966 |
06/1966 | |
Black Five | 5334 | 45334 | 03/1937 | 23C 28A 28A 64A 63A 68A 16D W |
Southport Blackpool Central Blackpool Central St Margarets Perth South Carlisle Kingmoor Annesley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/06/1951 17/07/1951 09/09/1951 19/04/1952 17/05/1952 25/05/1963 07/1965 |
07/1965 | |
Black Five | 5335 | 45335 | 03/1937 | 23A 24A 24A 19A 19A 14A 17A 2F 15E 15A 16B W |
Bank Hall Accrington Accrington Sheffield Grimesthorpe Sheffield Grimesthorpe Cricklewood East Derby Woodford Halse Leicester (G.C.) Leicester Midland Annesley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/10/1950 04/11/1950 02/12/1950 23/02/1952 11/09/1954 24/03/1962 22/09/1962 12/01/1963 20/06/1964 19/09/1964 10/07/1965 |
10/07/1965 | |
Black Five | 5336 | 45336 | 03/1937 | 23A 26A 26A W |
Bank Hall Newton Heath Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/10/1950 04/11/1950 14/01/1967 |
14/01/1967 | |
Black Five | 5337 | 45337 | 04/1937 | 26B 27C 12A W |
Agecroft Southport Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/08/1963 14/11/1964 06/02/1965 |
06/02/1965 | |
Black Five | 5338 | 45338 | 04/1937 | 26B 8B 8A 8C W |
Agecroft Warrington Dallam Edge Hill Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/09/1963 08/02/1964 13/02/1965 15/10/1966 |
15/10/1966 | |
Black Five | 5339 | 45339 | 04/1937 | 25A 25B 6A 9A 26A 10F 10D W |
Wakefield Huddersfield Hillhouse Chester (MR) Longsight Newton Heath Rose Grove Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/06/1956 08/11/1958 07/11/1959 30/04/1960 06/08/1966 04/02/1967 06/1967 |
06/1967 | |
Black Five | 5340 | 45340 | 04/1937 | 25G 25B 25B 24K 8F 24K 6G 8A 24L 12C 12B 12A W |
Farnley Junction Huddersfield Hillhouse Huddersfield Hillhouse Preston Springs Branch (Wigan) Preston Llandudno Junction Edge Hill Carnforth Barrow in Furness Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/12/1949 14/01/1950 08/11/1958 07/11/1959 15/04/1961 01/07/1961 21/10/1961 23/06/1962 06/03/1965 18/09/1965 17/12/1966 22/04/1967 |
22/04/1967 | |
Black Five | 5341 | 45341 | 04/1937 | 25G 26A W |
Farnley Junction Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/09/1956 07/01/1967 |
07/01/1967 | |
Black Five | 5342 | 45342 | 04/1937 | 14A 21A 15D 14B 15E 17A 2F 15E 16B 10A W |
Cricklewood East Saltley Bedford Kentish Town Leicester (G.C.) Derby Woodford Halse Leicester (G.C.) Annesley Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/12/1954 28/01/1956 30/04/1960 18/06/1960 24/09/1960 22/09/1962 12/01/1963 11/07/1964 03/07/1965 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5343 | 45343 | 04/1937 | 11A 11A 8A 8A 7C 7C 8A 8B 9D 10F W |
Carnforth Carnforth Edge Hill Edge Hill Holyhead Holyhead Edge Hill Warrington Dallam Newton Heath Rose Grove Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 24/03/1951 07/11/1959 20/06/1964 06/08/1966 24/06/1967 |
24/06/1967 | |
Black Five | 5344 | 45344 | 04/1937 | 8A 5A 3C 6G 3C 3A 12B 24L 5A 5C 5A 6A 6C W |
Edge Hill Crewe North Ryecroft (Walsall) Llandudno Junction Ryecroft (Walsall) Bescot Carlisle Upperby Carnforth Crewe North Stafford Crewe North Chester (MR) Croes Newydd Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/02/1956 24/03/1956 25/01/1958 22/02/1958 14/06/1958 08/11/1958 17/06/1961 16/09/1961 14/09/1963 20/06/1964 12/12/1964 02/10/1965 20/08/1966 |
20/08/1966 | |
Black Five | 5345 | 45345 | 04/1937 | 10B 12B 6J 6B 6H 6J 6G 6A 10D W |
Preston Carlisle Upperby Holyhead Mold Junction Bangor Holyhead Llandudno Junction Chester (MR) Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 10/09/1955 25/02/1956 23/04/1960 19/06/1965 13/11/1965 08/10/1966 20/05/1967 06/1968 |
06/1968 | |
Black Five | 5346 | 45346 | 04/1937 | 7A 7C 7C 8E 15C 17A 14A 16D 16B 10D 9E 9B W |
Llandudno Junction Holyhead Holyhead Brunswick Leicester Midland Derby Cricklewood East Nottingham Annesley Lostock Hall Trafford Park (LMS) Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 24/03/1951 16/09/1961 14/10/1961 09/03/1963 16/05/1964 18/07/1964 03/07/1965 18/09/1965 12/03/1966 06/1967 |
06/1967 | |
Black Five | 5347 | 45347 | 04/1937 | 8A 9E 10A 24E 10C 10D W |
Edge Hill Trafford Park (LMS) Springs Branch (Wigan) Blackpool Central Fleetwood Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/07/1953 21/05/1955 20/07/1963 14/09/1963 19/02/1966 11/11/1967 |
11/11/1967 | |
Black Five | 5348 | 45348 | 04/1937 | 12B 5A 24K 5A 6G 6B 6G 6D W |
Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Preston Crewe North Llandudno Junction Mold Junction Llandudno Junction Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/10/1958 15/08/1959 12/09/1959 05/05/1962 09/02/1963 11/05/1963 02/10/1965 13/08/1966 |
13/08/1966 | |
Black Five | 5349 | 45349 | 05/1937 | 3D 1H 1A 1H 2A 5B W |
Aston Northampton Willesden Northampton Tyseley Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/09/1963 28/11/1964 09/01/1965 02/10/1965 12/11/1966 11/11/1967 |
11/11/1967 | |
Black Five | 5350 | 45350 | 05/1937 | 8A 7C 7C 5B 5B 5A 1A 5D 8F 10F W |
Edge Hill Holyhead Holyhead Crewe South Crewe South Crewe North Willesden Stoke Springs Branch (Wigan) Rose Grove Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 18/04/1953 11/07/1953 02/07/1960 11/03/1967 09/12/1967 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5351 | 45351 | 05/1937 | 8A 12A 12A 24K 12B 12A 9K 10D W |
Edge Hill Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Upperby Preston Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Bolton Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 18/06/1960 09/07/1960 22/06/1963 14/12/1963 26/06/1965 07/08/1965 |
07/08/1965 | |
Black Five | 5352 | 45352 | 05/1937 | 5D 9A 10C 9E W |
Stoke Longsight Patricroft Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/07/1953 03/10/1953 14/11/1964 08/04/1967 |
08/04/1967 | |
Black Five | 5353 | 45353 | 05/1937 | 1A 4A 4A 5B 8A 5B 1A 3D 5A 6B 6J 6B 6A 5B 10D W |
Willesden Bletchley Bletchley Crewe South Edge Hill Crewe South Willesden Aston Crewe North Mold Junction Holyhead Mold Junction Chester (MR) Crewe South Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/09/1950 07/10/1950 08/08/1953 11/08/1956 03/11/1956 23/02/1957 22/11/1958 09/02/1963 30/03/1963 22/06/1963 14/09/1963 07/03/1964 10/06/1967 19/08/1967 20/07/1968 |
20/07/1968 | |
Black Five | 5354 | 45354 | 05/1937 | 12B 5A 8B 6J 8B 24L 10J W |
Carlisle Upperby Crewe North Warrington Dallam Holyhead Warrington Dallam Carnforth Lancaster Green Ayre Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/10/1953 31/10/1953 23/06/1962 15/09/1962 22/06/1963 07/12/1963 10/1965 |
10/1965 | |
Black Five | 5355 | 45355 | 05/1937 | 31A 64B W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Haymarket Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/02/1949 22/10/1949 11/03/1961 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
Black Five | 5356 | 45356 | 05/1937 | 31A 66B W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/09/1962 05/1964 |
05/1964 | |
Black Five | 5357 | 45357 | 05/1937 | 29A 63B 67A W |
Perth South Stirling Corkerhill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/08/1955 30/04/1966 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 5358 | 45358 | 05/1937 | 31A 31B 65B 67B 64C W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Stirling St Rollox (Balornock) Hurlford Dalry Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1948 22/12/1956 16/02/1963 30/11/1963 28/12/1963 |
28/12/1963 | |
Black Five | 5359 | 45359 | 05/1937 | 31A 31B 66B W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Stirling Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1948 25/06/1966 01/05/1967 |
01/05/1967 | |
Black Five | 5360 | 45360 | 05/1937 | 32A 63A 64C W |
Inverness Perth South Dalry Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/08/1960 22/10/1960 03/09/1965 |
03/09/1965 | |
Black Five | 5361 | 45361 | 05/1937 | 32A 63A 67A 65J W |
Inverness Perth South Corkerhill Stirling Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/08/1960 01/07/1961 30/11/1963 13/02/1964 |
13/02/1964 | |
Black Five | 5362 | 45362 | 05/1937 | 31A 64D 64C 64C 67A 65F W 65J |
St Rollox (Balornock) Carstairs Dalry Road Dalry Road Corkerhill Grangemouth Withdrawn Stirling |
01/01/1948 22/10/1949 17/06/1950 01/07/1950 21/04/1951 02/11/1963 29/10/1965 30/10/1965 |
29/10/1965 | |
Black Five | 5363 | 45363 | 06/1937 | 12A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/10/1967 |
28/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 5364 | 45364 | 06/1937 | 12A 12F 12A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Workington Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/04/1961 09/03/1963 13/08/1966 |
13/08/1966 | |
Black Five | 5365 | 45365 | 06/1937 | 29A 67A 67D 67C 66E W |
Perth South Corkerhill Ardrossan Ayr Carstairs Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/07/1960 28/03/1964 27/02/1965 26/11/1966 10/12/1966 |
10/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 5366 | 45366 | 06/1937 | 29A 67A W |
Perth South Corkerhill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/07/1961 17/04/1964 |
17/04/1964 | |
Black Five | 5367 | 45367 | 06/1937 | 24A 25B 61B 63D 61B 63A 64C W |
Accrington Huddersfield Hillhouse Aberdeen Ferryhill Fort William Aberdeen Ferryhill Perth South Dalry Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/01/1950 09/09/1951 12/06/1954 04/09/1954 02/10/1954 22/10/1960 29/11/1963 |
29/11/1963 | |
Black Five | 5368 | 45368 | 06/1937 | 12B 26A 9J W |
Carlisle Upperby Newton Heath Agecroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/06/1963 23/11/1963 11/11/1967 |
11/11/1967 | |
Black Five | 5369 | 45369 | 06/1937 | 5A 5B 5B 5A 5B 5A 5B 5A 6G 6B 6G 2E 6B 6A W |
Crewe North Crewe South Crewe South Crewe North Crewe South Crewe North Crewe South Crewe North Llandudno Junction Mold Junction Llandudno Junction Saltley Mold Junction Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1948 11/12/1948 12/02/1949 05/03/1949 12/07/1952 18/04/1953 11/08/1956 05/05/1962 09/02/1963 11/05/1963 05/10/1963 19/06/1965 23/04/1966 04/03/1967 |
04/03/1967 | |
Black Five | 5370 | 45370 | 06/1937 | 7A 3D 24L 5B 6G 5B 8C W |
Llandudno Junction Aston Carnforth Crewe South Llandudno Junction Crewe South Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1951 12/09/1959 03/10/1959 18/06/1960 17/09/1960 15/10/1960 13/08/1966 |
13/08/1966 | |
Black Five | 5371 | 45371 | 06/1937 | 12B 2A 12A 12A 12D W |
Carlisle Upperby Rugby Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Workington Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/11/1953 30/01/1954 17/12/1966 14/01/1967 15/04/1967 |
15/04/1967 | |
Black Five | 5372 | 45372 | 06/1937 | 2A 1A 9A 8F W |
Rugby Willesden Longsight Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/02/1956 20/06/1959 12/09/1959 26/11/1966 |
26/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 5373 | 45373 | 06/1937 | 10B 10C 8A 5A 8F 24E 10J 10A 10D W |
Preston Patricroft Edge Hill Crewe North Springs Branch (Wigan) Blackpool Central Lancaster Green Ayre Carnforth Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 30/01/1954 27/03/1954 20/06/1959 20/07/1963 14/09/1963 23/04/1966 01/04/1967 23/09/1967 |
23/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5374 | 45374 | 06/1937 | 5A 5B 5B 5A 5B 2A 2A 1A 2A 1A 21B 21D 5C 10A W |
Crewe North Crewe South Crewe South Crewe North Crewe South Rugby Rugby Willesden Rugby Willesden Bescot Aston Stafford Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1948 11/12/1948 12/02/1949 26/03/1949 07/01/1950 14/01/1950 31/12/1950 29/10/1960 19/11/1960 17/03/1962 21/07/1962 16/01/1965 24/07/1965 10/1967 |
10/1967 | |
Black Five | 5375 | 45375 | 06/1937 | 2A 1A 2A 1A 8C 5D 8C 8F 27C 8F 8B 8A W |
Rugby Willesden Rugby Willesden Speke Junction Stoke Speke Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Southport Springs Branch (Wigan) Warrington Dallam Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1956 29/10/1960 19/11/1960 14/01/1961 05/08/1961 19/08/1961 22/06/1963 06/07/1963 13/02/1965 26/06/1965 07/10/1967 27/01/1968 |
27/01/1968 | |
Black Five | 5376 | 45376 | 06/1937 | 8A W |
Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/1968 |
04/1968 | |
Black Five | 5377 | 45377 | 06/1937 | 10C 24F 24E 9M 9K W |
Patricroft Fleetwood Blackpool Central Bury Bolton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/01/1960 18/06/1960 19/09/1964 10/04/1965 09/12/1967 |
09/12/1967 | |
Black Five | 5378 | 45378 | 07/1937 | 12B 10C 2A 10C 26C W |
Carlisle Upperby Patricroft Rugby Patricroft Bolton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/06/1948 21/04/1956 16/06/1956 15/09/1962 06/03/1965 |
06/03/1965 | |
Black Five | 5379 | 45379 | 07/1937 | 2A 2C 5A 1E 1A W |
Rugby Northampton Crewe North Bletchley Willesden Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 16/06/1956 06/05/1961 07/03/1964 31/07/1965 |
31/07/1965 | |
Black Five | 5380 | 45380 | 07/1937 | 8A 8B 8A 8B 6J 8B 8F 26A 9A 9E W |
Edge Hill Warrington Dallam Edge Hill Warrington Dallam Holyhead Warrington Dallam Springs Branch (Wigan) Newton Heath Longsight Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/11/1959 09/04/1960 31/12/1960 23/06/1962 15/09/1962 30/03/1963 27/07/1963 24/08/1963 20/02/1965 27/03/1965 |
27/03/1965 | |
Black Five | 5381 | 45381 | 07/1937 | 5D 5A 5D 1A 8A 8B 9D 9M 9K W |
Stoke Crewe North Stoke Willesden Edge Hill Warrington Dallam Newton Heath Bury Bolton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/10/1953 31/10/1953 04/12/1954 15/10/1960 31/12/1960 20/06/1964 14/11/1964 10/04/1965 04/05/1968 |
04/05/1968 | |
Black Five | 5382 | 45382 | 07/1937 | 6A 7C 7C 5A 12A 6J 12A 6J 9B 9D 10F W |
Chester (MR) Holyhead Holyhead Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Holyhead Carlisle Upperby Holyhead Stockport Edgeley Newton Heath Rose Grove Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 29/01/1955 26/03/1955 16/07/1955 29/12/1956 14/06/1958 25/11/1961 19/06/1965 06/08/1966 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 5383 | 45383 | 07/1937 | 6B 12A W |
Mold Junction Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/12/1966 11/02/1967 |
11/02/1967 | |
Black Five | 5384 | 45384 | 07/1937 | 4A 62B 62B 67A 67D 67C 67F W |
Shrewsbury Dundee Tay Bridge Dundee Tay Bridge Corkerhill Ardrossan Ayr Stranraer Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/10/1951 01/12/1951 07/05/1960 22/10/1960 08/09/1962 06/07/1963 29/06/1964 |
29/06/1964 | |
Black Five | 5385 | 45385 | 07/1937 | 6B 6A 6J 5A 6J 5A 9A 6J 5B 6J 1A 6J 3D 3A 24J 9A 26F 8F W |
Mold Junction Chester (MR) Holyhead Crewe North Holyhead Crewe North Longsight Holyhead Crewe South Holyhead Willesden Holyhead Aston Bescot Lancaster Green Ayre Longsight Patricroft Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/10/1948 11/07/1953 03/10/1953 28/11/1953 02/01/1954 30/01/1954 19/06/1954 09/10/1954 06/11/1954 01/12/1956 29/12/1956 23/02/1957 23/03/1957 14/10/1961 09/12/1961 29/06/1963 26/10/1963 10/1966 |
10/1966 | |
Black Five | 5386 | 45386 | 07/1937 | 10C 8C 6J 8C 10D W |
Patricroft Speke Junction Holyhead Speke Junction Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/09/1960 10/06/1961 08/07/1961 11/05/1968 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5387 | 45387 | 07/1937 | 8A 3D 9A 10B 11A 1A 21B 5D 6G 5D W |
Edge Hill Aston Longsight Preston Carnforth Willesden Bescot Stoke Llandudno Junction Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/02/1948 24/04/1948 01/10/1949 03/11/1951 23/02/1952 07/05/1960 09/03/1963 22/06/1963 29/06/1963 13/03/1965 |
13/03/1965 | |
Black Five | 5388 | 45388 | 07/1937 | 12B 8A 1E 8F 26A 8C 10D W |
Carlisle Upperby Edge Hill Bletchley Springs Branch (Wigan) Newton Heath Speke Junction Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/10/1953 26/02/1955 05/11/1960 27/07/1963 05/10/1963 11/05/1968 10/08/1968 |
10/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5389 | 45389 | 07/1937 | 29A 63B W |
Perth South Stirling Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/05/1957 08/10/1965 |
08/10/1965 | |
Black Five | 5390 | 45390 | 08/1937 | 3D 3E 3E 5A 5B 5A 5B 5D 6J 6B 6J 8A 24L W |
Aston Monument Lane Monument Lane Crewe North Crewe South Crewe North Crewe South Stoke Holyhead Mold Junction Holyhead Edge Hill Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 24/03/1956 03/11/1956 26/01/1957 18/07/1959 18/06/1960 23/07/1960 17/09/1960 10/06/1961 28/10/1961 23/06/1962 10/08/1968 |
10/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5391 | 45391 | 08/1937 | 2A 5B 10D W |
Rugby Crewe South Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/01/1954 12/08/1967 03/02/1968 |
03/02/1968 | |
Black Five | 5392 | 45392 | 08/1937 | 11A 11A 6J 2E 8A 2E 1A 1F 5B 1F 1H 2D 16B 9F W |
Carnforth Carnforth Holyhead Northampton Edge Hill Northampton Willesden Rugby Crewe South Rugby Northampton Banbury Colwick Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 19/06/1954 06/11/1954 19/11/1960 16/09/1961 22/06/1963 14/09/1963 19/09/1964 28/11/1964 09/01/1965 02/10/1965 19/02/1966 28/05/1966 04/05/1968 |
04/05/1968 | |
Black Five | 5393 | 45393 | 08/1937 | 12B 8A 8A 1E 1A 5B W |
Carlisle Upperby Edge Hill Edge Hill Bletchley Willesden Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/11/1949 24/12/1949 26/02/1955 14/03/1964 19/06/1965 17/09/1966 |
17/09/1966 | |
Black Five | 5394 | 45394 | 08/1937 | 2A 1A 2A 12A 24J 8F 24L 10J 10A W |
Rugby Willesden Rugby Carlisle Upperby Lancaster Green Ayre Springs Branch (Wigan) Carnforth Lancaster Green Ayre Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/04/1956 11/08/1956 06/10/1956 18/06/1960 24/09/1960 31/12/1960 18/07/1964 23/04/1966 20/07/1968 |
20/07/1968 | |
Black Five | 5395 | 45395 | 08/1937 | 3C 3B 3D 5A 21D 5D 6B 8F 8A W |
Ryecroft (Walsall) Bushbury Aston Crewe North Aston Stoke Mold Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 20/06/1959 02/04/1960 25/06/1960 22/12/1962 20/06/1964 05/02/1966 09/12/1967 23/03/1968 |
23/03/1968 | |
Black Five | 5396 | 45396 | 08/1937 | 24A 24A 26A 65F 65F 65A 65B 63B W |
Accrington Accrington Newton Heath Grangemouth Grangemouth Eastfield St Rollox (Balornock) Stirling Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/09/1950 16/06/1951 08/09/1951 09/09/1951 12/06/1954 25/12/1954 01/10/1955 01/02/1966 |
01/02/1966 | |
Black Five | 5397 | 45397 | 08/1937 | 3D 12A 24E 10C 10F W |
Aston Carlisle Upperby Blackpool Central Fleetwood Rose Grove Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/10/1957 22/06/1963 14/09/1963 05/12/1964 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5398 | 45398 | 08/1937 | 8A 8B 8A 24L W |
Edge Hill Warrington Dallam Edge Hill Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/11/1959 09/04/1960 23/06/1962 09/1965 |
09/1965 | |
Black Five | 5399 | 45399 | 08/1937 | 8A 24L W |
Edge Hill Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/06/1962 24/12/1966 |
24/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 5400 | 45400 | 08/1937 | 8A 65A 65A 65A 65B 63B W |
Edge Hill Eastfield Eastfield Eastfield St Rollox (Balornock) Stirling Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/12/1951 01/01/1952 26/01/1952 25/12/1954 01/10/1955 04/05/1964 |
04/05/1964 | |
Black Five | 5401 | 45401 | 08/1937 | 10C 8A W |
Patricroft Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/01/1956 11/11/1961 |
11/11/1961 | |
Black Five | 5402 | 45402 | 08/1937 | 10C 6B 6A 6A 3A 10C 5A 12A 24E 10C 8A 10D W |
Patricroft Mold Junction Chester (MR) Chester (MR) Bescot Patricroft Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Blackpool Central Fleetwood Edge Hill Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/07/1948 15/09/1951 06/10/1951 12/07/1952 19/06/1954 17/07/1954 08/09/1956 22/06/1963 01/02/1964 05/12/1964 26/06/1965 22/04/1967 |
22/04/1967 | |
Black Five | 5403 | 45403 | 08/1937 | 6A 10C 5B 6A 2A 5A 3C 3D 3B 9A 6G 6B 5B 6A W |
Chester (MR) Patricroft Crewe South Chester (MR) Rugby Crewe North Ryecroft (Walsall) Aston Bushbury Longsight Llandudno Junction Mold Junction Crewe South Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/12/1948 29/12/1951 31/10/1953 28/11/1953 16/06/1956 11/08/1956 06/10/1956 03/11/1956 10/08/1957 05/10/1957 14/06/1958 22/11/1958 06/04/1963 10/09/1966 |
10/09/1966 | |
Black Five | 5404 | 45404 | 08/1937 | 2A 2B 2A 1A 2A 8C 9E 9A 9E W |
Rugby Bletchley Rugby Willesden Rugby Speke Junction Trafford Park (LMS) Longsight Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 01/10/1949 12/07/1952 29/10/1960 19/11/1960 22/06/1963 26/10/1963 20/02/1965 06/05/1967 |
06/05/1967 | |
Black Five | 5405 | 45405 | 09/1937 | 3B 2J 5E 6J 5D 8H W |
Bushbury Aston Nuneaton Holyhead Stoke Birkenhead Mollington Street Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/04/1965 19/06/1965 04/06/1966 10/12/1966 22/07/1967 26/08/1967 |
26/08/1967 | |
Black Five | 5406 | 45406 | 09/1937 | 4A 16B 16E 40E 8C W |
Shrewsbury Annesley Kirkby in Ashfield Colwick Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/10/1964 23/10/1965 18/12/1965 28/01/1967 08/07/1967 |
08/07/1967 | |
Black Five | 5407 | 45407 | 09/1937 | 19A 19B 17A 21A 17A 14B 16A 17B 8C 10D W |
Sheffield Grimesthorpe Sheffield Millhouses Derby Saltley Derby Kentish Town Nottingham Burton Speke Junction Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/03/1954 06/11/1954 04/12/1954 24/03/1956 16/06/1956 23/01/1960 07/04/1962 13/03/1965 11/05/1968 10/08/1968 |
10/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5408 | 45408 | 09/1937 | 10C 10A 5D 8F W |
Patricroft Springs Branch (Wigan) Stoke Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1951 05/08/1961 19/08/1961 26/11/1966 |
26/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 5409 | 45409 | 09/1937 | 12B 26F 2E 26F 9D 9K 9B W |
Carlisle Upperby Patricroft Northampton Patricroft Newton Heath Bolton Stockport Edgeley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 04/10/1958 27/06/1959 08/08/1964 26/09/1964 30/04/1966 12/08/1967 |
12/08/1967 | |
Black Five | 5410 | 45410 | 09/1937 | 8A 10C 8A 8B 8A 21B 2E 2F 2E W |
Edge Hill Patricroft Edge Hill Warrington Dallam Edge Hill Bescot Saltley Bescot Saltley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/03/1949 24/04/1954 07/11/1959 29/10/1960 15/04/1961 03/04/1965 19/06/1965 26/03/1966 10/09/1966 |
10/09/1966 | |
Black Five | 5411 | 45411 | 09/1937 | 10C 9K 9D W |
Patricroft Bolton Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/10/1963 30/04/1966 06/1968 |
06/1968 | |
Black Five | 5412 | 45412 | 09/1937 | 5A 12B 8A 6H 8C W |
Crewe North Carlisle Upperby Edge Hill Bangor Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 19/06/1948 21/05/1960 23/06/1962 13/10/1962 05/08/1967 |
05/08/1967 | |
Black Five | 5413 | 45413 | 09/1937 | 10A 8A 6H 8C 8F 26F W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Edge Hill Bangor Speke Junction Springs Branch (Wigan) Patricroft Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/09/1953 23/06/1962 13/10/1962 22/06/1963 06/07/1963 19/09/1964 |
19/09/1964 | |
Black Five | 5414 | 45414 | 10/1937 | 12B 5B 12B 24K 8B 5D 8B 8A W |
Carlisle Upperby Crewe South Carlisle Upperby Preston Warrington Dallam Stoke Warrington Dallam Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/04/1960 25/06/1960 09/07/1960 09/09/1961 04/08/1962 18/08/1962 08/02/1964 06/02/1965 |
06/02/1965 | |
Black Five | 5415 | 45415 | 10/1937 | 23C 25B 27C 27C 10C 27A 24A 24E 9M 9K W |
Southport Huddersfield Hillhouse Southport Southport Patricroft Bank Hall Accrington Blackpool Central Bury Bolton Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1952 04/10/1952 01/11/1952 11/07/1953 19/06/1954 05/11/1955 09/01/1960 19/09/1964 10/04/1965 10/1967 |
10/1967 | |
Black Five | 5416 | 45416 | 10/1937 | 12B 3A 3C 3D 6G 3D 9A 17A 14D 17A 14E 15E 16B W |
Carlisle Upperby Bescot Ryecroft (Walsall) Aston Llandudno Junction Aston Longsight Derby Neasden Derby Bedford Leicester (G.C.) Annesley Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/07/1954 16/07/1955 16/06/1956 25/01/1958 22/02/1958 22/03/1958 14/06/1958 21/02/1959 18/06/1960 17/06/1961 18/05/1963 11/07/1964 10/07/1965 |
10/07/1965 | |
Black Five | 5417 | 45417 | 10/1937 | 3A 7B 7B 14A 8C W |
Bescot Bangor Bangor Cricklewood East Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/06/1949 16/07/1949 25/05/1963 02/05/1964 22/07/1967 |
22/07/1967 | |
Black Five | 5418 | 45418 | 10/1937 | 3A 3E 3D 2A 5A 1A 2D W |
Bescot Monument Lane Aston Rugby Crewe North Willesden Banbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 26/06/1948 22/03/1952 23/02/1963 20/06/1964 28/11/1964 02/10/1965 12/02/1966 |
12/02/1966 | |
Black Five | 5419 | 45419 | 10/1937 | 2A 3C 3A 2A 6A W |
Rugby Ryecroft (Walsall) Bescot Rugby Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/08/1957 14/06/1958 22/07/1961 22/06/1963 10/09/1966 |
10/09/1966 | |
Black Five | 5420 | 45420 | 10/1937 | 10C 2A 26F 9J 9D W |
Patricroft Rugby Patricroft Agecroft Newton Heath Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/08/1958 06/09/1958 09/11/1963 19/06/1965 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 5421 | 45421 | 10/1937 | 10C 8A 12E 12A 10C 10D W |
Patricroft Edge Hill Barrow in Furness Carlisle Kingmoor Fleetwood Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/10/1952 23/06/1962 10/11/1962 18/07/1964 19/03/1966 10/02/1968 |
10/02/1968 | |
Black Five | 5422 | 45422 | 10/1937 | 5A 4A 6B 2E 5D W |
Crewe North Shrewsbury Mold Junction Saltley Stoke Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1948 19/09/1964 07/11/1964 06/03/1965 10/09/1966 |
10/09/1966 | |
Black Five | 5423 | 45423 | 10/1937 | 31A 63B 67C 66B W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Stirling Ayr Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1955 28/08/1965 26/11/1966 01/05/1967 |
01/05/1967 | |
Black Five | 5424 | 45424 | 10/1937 | 10C 3D 10C 9J 10A W |
Patricroft Aston Patricroft Agecroft Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/08/1957 07/09/1957 09/11/1963 08/01/1966 20/04/1968 |
20/04/1968 | |
Black Five | 5425 | 45425 | 10/1937 | 10A 10C 10C 10A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Patricroft Patricroft Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/07/1951 17/07/1951 26/01/1952 21/10/1967 |
21/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 5426 | 45426 | 10/1937 | 10C 5B 5A 9A 9E 9A 5A 5B 1H 1A 1H 2D 16B 8A W |
Patricroft Crewe South Crewe North Longsight Trafford Park (LMS) Longsight Crewe North Crewe South Northampton Willesden Northampton Banbury Colwick Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/12/1955 16/06/1957 14/06/1958 07/05/1960 24/09/1960 26/11/1960 23/06/1962 07/11/1964 28/11/1964 09/01/1965 02/10/1965 19/02/1966 20/08/1966 23/03/1968 |
23/03/1968 | |
Black Five | 5427 | 45427 | 10/1937 | 11A 2E 1A 6A W |
Carnforth Northampton Willesden Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/09/1961 15/09/1962 27/04/1963 20/08/1966 |
20/08/1966 | |
Black Five | 5428 | 45428 | 10/1937 | 12B 20A 55C 55B 55A W |
Carlisle Upperby Holbeck (MR) Farnley Junction Stourton Holbeck (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/12/1955 25/04/1959 08/10/1966 28/01/1967 10/1967 |
10/1967 | |
Black Five | 5429 | 45429 | 11/1937 | 12A 5A 3E 3B 2A 1A 2A 3E 6J 6H 6J 6H 5A 2A 6A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Crewe North Monument Lane Bushbury Rugby Willesden Rugby Monument Lane Holyhead Bangor Holyhead Bangor Crewe North Rugby Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 02/07/1949 16/07/1949 01/10/1949 25/02/1956 21/04/1956 26/01/1957 14/06/1958 09/04/1960 18/06/1960 17/09/1960 16/09/1961 19/01/1963 22/06/1963 07/08/1965 |
07/08/1965 | |
Black Five | 5430 | 45430 | 11/1937 | 2A 8A 2A 2A 1A 3D 6D W |
Rugby Edge Hill Rugby Rugby Willesden Aston Shrewsbury Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/03/1952 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 06/10/1956 22/11/1958 16/10/1965 09/1966 |
09/1966 | |
Black Five | 5431 | 45431 | 11/1937 | 1A 2A 12A 1A 12B 24L 8F W |
Willesden Rugby Carlisle Upperby Willesden Carlisle Upperby Carnforth Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/10/1949 10/09/1955 06/09/1958 27/12/1958 27/06/1959 07/11/1959 02/12/1967 |
02/12/1967 | |
Black Five | 5432 | 45432 | 11/1937 | 12A 67C W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Ayr Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 22/10/1949 30/04/1966 19/10/1966 |
19/10/1966 | |
Black Five | 5433 | 45433 | 11/1937 | 3E 3A 66B 66C 66B W |
Monument Lane Bescot Motherwell Hamilton (West) Motherwell Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 09/09/1951 29/10/1955 31/08/1957 03/03/1966 |
03/03/1966 | |
Black Five | 5434 | 45434 | 11/1937 | 3E 3B 2A 2A 5A 1A 5A 9A 12F 1A 1E 5B W |
Monument Lane Bushbury Rugby Rugby Crewe North Willesden Crewe North Longsight Workington Willesden Bletchley Crewe South Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 24/02/1951 28/02/1951 24/03/1951 29/11/1952 24/01/1953 05/11/1960 19/11/1960 31/03/1962 14/09/1963 14/03/1964 08/1966 |
08/1966 | |
Black Five | 5435 | 45435 | 11/1937 | 23C 25A 25F 25A 26A 10J 10A W |
Southport Wakefield Low Moor Wakefield Newton Heath Lancaster Green Ayre Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/05/1952 14/06/1952 13/08/1955 05/11/1955 08/09/1956 15/01/1966 23/04/1966 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 5436 | 45436 | 11/1937 | 5A 4A 64A 64A 24E 8B 8H 10D W |
Crewe North Shrewsbury St Margarets St Margarets Blackpool Central Warrington Dallam Birkenhead Mollington Street Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/11/1948 09/09/1951 04/11/1951 03/10/1953 05/09/1964 21/01/1967 19/08/1967 13/04/1968 |
13/04/1968 | |
Black Five | 5437 | 45437 | 11/1937 | 3B 3A 2A 1A 6G 6J 12A 5D 12B 26A 9J 10A 12A W |
Bushbury Bescot Rugby Willesden Llandudno Junction Holyhead Carlisle Upperby Stoke Carlisle Upperby Newton Heath Agecroft Carnforth Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/07/1952 27/03/1954 25/02/1956 01/12/1956 10/08/1957 05/10/1957 04/08/1962 18/08/1962 22/06/1963 23/11/1963 21/08/1965 25/09/1965 14/10/1967 |
14/10/1967 | |
Black Five | 5438 | 45438 | 11/1937 | 10C 12A 8A 6J 6H 6B 2A 6B 6J 6B 6A W |
Patricroft Carlisle Upperby Edge Hill Holyhead Bangor Mold Junction Rugby Mold Junction Holyhead Mold Junction Chester (MR) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 29/12/1951 21/05/1960 11/06/1960 17/09/1960 08/04/1961 06/05/1961 10/06/1961 22/06/1963 14/09/1963 07/03/1964 08/1966 |
08/1966 | |
Black Five | 5439 | 45439 | 11/1937 | 12B 3A 3B 21D 21C 2J W |
Carlisle Upperby Bescot Bushbury Aston Bushbury Aston Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 01/12/1951 27/03/1954 13/10/1962 15/12/1962 17/04/1965 11/1965 |
11/1965 | |
Black Five | 5440 | 45440 | 11/1937 | 22C 6C 26F 6C 8A W |
Bath Green Park (S&D) Birkenhead Mollington Street Patricroft Birkenhead Mollington Street Edge Hill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/06/1958 14/02/1959 28/03/1959 14/05/1960 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5441 | 45441 | 12/1937 | 2A 9A 6A 6G 6J 8C W |
Rugby Longsight Chester (MR) Llandudno Junction Holyhead Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/10/1955 06/10/1956 26/01/1957 10/08/1957 13/10/1962 04/02/1967 |
04/02/1967 | |
Black Five | 5442 | 45442 | 12/1937 | 10C 24F 24E 17A 16F 15E 12A W |
Patricroft Fleetwood Blackpool Central Derby Burton Coalville Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/01/1960 18/06/1960 25/05/1963 12/09/1964 19/12/1964 13/02/1965 27/08/1966 |
27/08/1966 | |
Black Five | 5443 | 45443 | 12/1937 | 12A 65B 65F W |
Carlisle Kingmoor St Rollox (Balornock) Grangemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/03/1950 08/06/1963 28/08/1965 |
28/08/1965 | |
Black Five | 5444 | 45444 | 12/1937 | 10C 20A 15D 14B 27F 16D 14A 2F 16A 10C 10D W |
Patricroft Holbeck (MR) Bedford Kentish Town Brunswick Annesley Cricklewood East Woodford Halse Nottingham Fleetwood Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/12/1955 28/01/1956 16/06/1956 14/02/1959 02/07/1960 26/01/1963 18/05/1963 22/06/1963 05/12/1964 19/02/1966 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5445 | 45445 | 12/1937 | 4A 5A 9A 10B 12B 12E 10J 10A W |
Shrewsbury Crewe North Longsight Preston Carlisle Upperby Barrow in Furness Lancaster Green Ayre Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/04/1949 28/05/1949 01/10/1949 05/11/1949 18/06/1960 26/06/1965 23/04/1966 29/06/1968 |
29/06/1968 | |
Black Five | 5446 | 45446 | 12/1937 | 3D 5B 5A 5D 5B W |
Aston Crewe South Crewe North Stoke Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/02/1953 18/04/1953 14/09/1963 07/03/1964 11/02/1967 |
11/02/1967 | |
Black Five | 5447 | 45447 | 12/1937 | 21A 21A 19A 14B 21A 6J 6D 12A 10F W |
Saltley Saltley Sheffield Grimesthorpe Kentish Town Saltley Holyhead Shrewsbury Carlisle Kingmoor Rose Grove Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 16/05/1953 17/07/1954 19/05/1956 21/11/1959 19/06/1965 17/09/1966 11/03/1967 06/01/1968 03/08/1968 |
03/08/1968 | |
Black Five | 5448 | 45448 | 12/1937 | 2A 3D 3D 2A 3D 2A 5B 1F 5E 9F W |
Rugby Aston Aston Rugby Aston Rugby Crewe South Rugby Nuneaton Heaton Mersey Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 10/06/1950 17/06/1950 13/10/1951 27/10/1951 23/02/1963 19/09/1964 28/11/1964 29/05/1965 28/05/1966 26/08/1967 |
26/08/1967 | |
Black Five | 5449 | 45449 | 12/1937 | 10A W |
Springs Branch (Wigan) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/1967 |
11/1967 | |
Black Five | 5450 | 45450 | 12/1937 | 12B 19E 28A 26G 26B 15E 15E 16D 10D W |
Carlisle Upperby Belle Vue Blackpool Central Belle Vue Agecroft Leicester (G.C.) Leicester (G.C.) Annesley Lostock Hall Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 04/06/1949 29/12/1951 26/01/1952 08/10/1955 24/10/1959 07/11/1959 09/01/1960 03/07/1965 18/11/1967 |
18/11/1967 | |
Black Five | 5451 | 45451 | 12/1937 | 12B 24K 12B 12A 8L 9D 10A 12C 12B W |
Carlisle Upperby Preston Carlisle Upperby Carlisle Kingmoor Aintree Newton Heath Carnforth Barrow in Furness Carlisle Upperby Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/06/1959 07/11/1959 22/06/1963 07/12/1963 27/06/1964 11/07/1964 18/07/1964 18/09/1965 12/11/1966 |
12/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 5452 | 45452 | 09/1938 | 29A 67A 64D W |
Perth South Corkerhill Carstairs Withdrawn (Re-instd) |
01/01/1948 04/07/1959 21/11/1959 29/12/1962 02/1963 |
29/12/1962 | |
Black Five | 5453 | 45453 | 09/1938 | 28A 60A 60A 63A 68B W |
Motherwell Inverness Inverness Perth South Dumfries Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/06/1950 01/07/1950 27/08/1960 16/06/1962 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
Black Five | 5454 | 45454 | 09/1938 | 12A 5A CAR 10A 10A 10B 2E 1A 1H 2D 16B 9E W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Crewe North Carlisle Canal Springs Branch (Wigan) Springs Branch (Wigan) Preston Northampton Willesden Northampton Banbury Colwick Trafford Park (LMS) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/05/1949 01/10/1949 02/06/1951 16/06/1951 10/08/1957 11/04/1961 28/11/1964 09/01/1965 02/10/1965 19/02/1966 25/06/1966 08/1967 |
08/1967 | |
Black Five | 5455 | 45455 | 09/1938 | 12A W |
Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 08/1967 |
08/1967 | |
Black Five | 5456 | 45456 | 10/1938 | 29A 67D 67C 67D 67E W |
Perth South Ardrossan Ayr Ardrossan Dumfries Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/03/1959 04/07/1959 26/09/1959 30/05/1964 07/12/1964 |
07/12/1964 | |
Black Five | 5457 | 45457 | 10/1938 | 29A 67D 67C 67D W |
Perth South Ardrossan Ayr Ardrossan Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 14/03/1959 04/07/1959 26/09/1959 16/09/1963 |
16/09/1963 | |
Black Five | 5458 | 45458 | 10/1938 | 29A 60A 63A 66A W |
Perth South Inverness Perth South Polmadie Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/07/1958 25/10/1958 22/11/1958 29/12/1962 |
29/12/1962 | |
Black Five | 5459 | 45459 | 10/1938 | 29A 60A 63A 66A 66C 66A 67B W |
Perth South Inverness Perth South Polmadie Hamilton (West) Polmadie Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 05/07/1958 25/10/1958 22/11/1958 09/04/1960 30/07/1960 07/09/1963 14/05/1964 |
14/05/1964 | |
Black Five | 5460 | 45460 | 10/1938 | 29A 62B 63A 60A 67A 67C W |
Perth South Dundee Tay Bridge Perth South Inverness Corkerhill Ayr Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 25/02/1950 18/03/1950 26/10/1957 04/06/1960 08/09/1962 26/06/1965 |
26/06/1965 | |
Black Five | 5461 | 45461 | 10/1938 | 28A 28A 60A 63A W |
Motherwell Motherwell Inverness Perth South Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 24/06/1950 30/07/1960 22/08/1966 |
22/08/1966 | |
Black Five | 5462 | 45462 | 11/1938 | 28A 28A W |
Motherwell Motherwell Withdrawn |
22/06/1946 01/01/1948 29/06/1964 |
29/06/1964 | |
Black Five | 5463 | 45463 | 11/1938 | 29A 67B 67D 67E 67F W |
Perth South Hurlford Ardrossan Dumfries Stranraer Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/06/1961 26/08/1961 30/05/1964 25/06/1966 29/11/1966 |
29/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 5464 | 45464 | 11/1938 | 29A 24E 17A 16F 40E W |
Perth South Blackpool Central Derby Burton Colwick Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/03/1957 25/05/1963 12/09/1964 25/12/1965 22/10/1966 |
22/10/1966 | |
Black Five | 5465 | 45465 | 11/1938 | 29A W |
Perth South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 13/02/1964 |
13/02/1964 | |
Black Five | 5466 | 45466 | 11/1938 | 29A 68A 8C 8A 8C W |
Perth South Carlisle Kingmoor Speke Junction Edge Hill Speke Junction Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/08/1952 14/03/1964 20/06/1964 13/02/1965 25/02/1967 |
25/02/1967 | |
Black Five | 5467 | 45467 | 11/1938 | 29A 67A 67B 67A 67E 67C 66B W |
Perth South Corkerhill Hurlford Corkerhill Dumfries Ayr Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/07/1960 11/02/1961 24/11/1962 30/05/1964 26/06/1965 26/11/1966 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 5468 | 45468 | 12/1938 | 31A 31D W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Grangemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 03/07/1948 22/10/1949 05/1964 |
05/1964 | |
Black Five | 5469 | 45469 | 12/1938 | 29A 61B 61A 61B 64C 64A W |
Perth South Aberdeen Ferryhill Kittybrewster Aberdeen Ferryhill Dalry Road St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/08/1955 02/07/1960 01/07/1961 14/07/1962 30/10/1965 19/11/1966 |
19/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 5470 | 45470 | 12/1938 | 29A 60A 67A 67D W |
Perth South Inverness Corkerhill Ardrossan Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 18/11/1961 21/04/1962 21/04/1962 10/09/1964 |
10/09/1964 | |
Black Five | 5471 | 45471 | 12/1938 | 31A 67E W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Dumfries Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/01/1965 03/07/1965 |
03/07/1965 | |
Black Five | 5472 | 45472 | 04/1943 | 29A W |
Perth South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/09/1966 |
02/09/1966 | |
Black Five | 5473 | 45473 | 05/1943 | 29A 62B W |
Perth South Dundee Tay Bridge Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 30/04/1966 19/11/1966 |
19/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 5474 | 45474 | 05/1943 | 29A 67C W |
Perth South Ayr Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/07/1965 02/09/1966 |
02/09/1966 | |
Black Five | 5475 | 45475 | 06/1943 | 29A W |
Perth South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 02/09/1966 |
02/09/1966 | |
Black Five | 5476 | 45476 | 07/1943 | 32A 63A 64C W |
Inverness Perth South Dalry Road Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/08/1960 21/10/1961 10/1964 |
10/1964 | |
Black Five | 5477 | 45477 | 07/1943 | 32A 63A 64C 64A W |
Inverness Perth South Dalry Road St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/08/1960 01/07/1961 30/10/1965 17/08/1966 |
17/08/1966 | |
Black Five | 5478 | 45478 | 08/1943 | 32A 63A 66A 66E W |
Inverness Perth South Polmadie Carstairs Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 12/03/1960 04/06/1960 30/05/1964 10/12/1966 |
10/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 5479 | 45479 | 08/1943 | 32A 63A 60A 67A 67D W |
Inverness Perth South Inverness Corkerhill Ardrossan Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/08/1960 18/11/1961 21/04/1962 21/04/1962 05/1964 |
05/1964 | |
Black Five | 5480 | 45480 | 08/1943 | 31A 68B W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Dumfries Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/09/1952 22/08/1966 |
22/08/1966 | |
Black Five | 5481 | 45481 | 09/1943 | 31A 68C 68A W |
St Rollox (Balornock) Stranraer Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 06/09/1952 27/12/1952 30/09/1967 |
30/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5482 | 45482 | 09/1943 | 12A 65B 65F W |
Carlisle Kingmoor St Rollox (Balornock) Grangemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/04/1950 08/04/1961 29/06/1964 |
29/06/1964 | |
Black Five | 5483 | 45483 | 09/1943 | 28A 63A 64C 64A W |
Motherwell Perth South Dalry Road St Margarets Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 11/02/1950 21/10/1961 30/10/1965 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 5484 | 45484 | 10/1943 | 27A 64A 64A 66A 66A 66B W |
Polmadie St Margarets St Margarets Polmadie Polmadie Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 20/01/1951 31/01/1951 24/03/1951 31/03/1951 27/11/1954 13/02/1964 |
13/02/1964 | |
Black Five | 5485 | 45485 | 10/1943 | 27A 66B 68C W |
Polmadie Motherwell Stranraer Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1954 16/06/1962 28/10/1963 |
28/10/1963 | |
Black Five | 5486 | 45486 | 10/1943 | 27A 64A 62B 67A 68C 67A 67C W |
Polmadie St Margarets Dundee Tay Bridge Corkerhill Stranraer Corkerhill Ayr Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/01/1953 30/10/1954 07/05/1960 27/08/1960 19/11/1960 19/11/1960 06/12/1965 |
06/12/1965 | |
Black Five | 5487 | 45487 | 11/1943 | 27A 65D 64A 63D 63A 2A 65F W |
Polmadie Dawsholm St Margarets Fort William Perth South Rugby Grangemouth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 23/02/1952 01/11/1952 12/06/1954 27/11/1954 21/04/1956 21/10/1961 02/1964 |
02/1964 | |
Black Five | 5488 | 45488 | 11/1943 | 28A 67A 65F 67A W |
Motherwell Corkerhill Grangemouth Corkerhill Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 21/10/1961 02/11/1963 30/10/1965 29/11/1966 |
29/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 5489 | 45489 | 11/1943 | 30A 67B W |
Corkerhill Hurlford Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/09/1960 29/11/1966 |
29/11/1966 | |
Black Five | 5490 | 45490 | 12/1943 | 30A 67D 67C 67B 66B W |
Corkerhill Ardrossan Ayr Hurlford Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 24/10/1959 08/09/1962 08/06/1963 26/11/1966 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 5491 | 45491 | 12/1943 | 30A 68A W |
Corkerhill Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 09/08/1952 17/07/1965 |
17/07/1965 | |
Black Five | 5492 | 45492 | 01/1944 | 4A 28B 66B 66E 66B W |
Shrewsbury Dalry Road Motherwell Carstairs Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 28/02/1948 21/10/1961 30/05/1964 26/11/1966 31/12/1966 |
31/12/1966 | |
Black Five | 5493 | 45493 | 01/1944 | 5A 5B 5B 3E 3B 2A 6J 2F 2D 6D 12A W |
Crewe North Crewe South Crewe South Monument Lane Bushbury Rugby Holyhead Bescot Banbury Shrewsbury Carlisle Kingmoor Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 27/11/1948 11/12/1948 09/07/1949 16/07/1949 01/10/1949 22/06/1963 07/11/1964 02/10/1965 17/09/1966 11/03/1967 06/01/1968 |
06/01/1968 | |
Black Five | 5494 | 45494 | 01/1944 | 12B 24L 12B 24L 5B W |
Carlisle Upperby Carnforth Carlisle Upperby Carnforth Crewe South Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 07/02/1959 21/02/1959 20/06/1959 03/10/1959 16/09/1967 |
16/09/1967 | |
Black Five | 5495 | 45495 | 02/1944 | 3E 11A 8B 7C 10A 10C 10C 8B 8B 10B 10A W |
Monument Lane Carnforth Warrington Dallam Holyhead Springs Branch (Wigan) Patricroft Patricroft Warrington Dallam Warrington Dallam Blackpool Central Carnforth Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 17/01/1948 01/05/1948 05/06/1948 01/10/1949 14/01/1950 21/01/1950 30/11/1950 02/12/1950 20/06/1964 26/09/1964 04/03/1967 |
04/03/1967 | |
Black Five | 5496 | 45496 | 02/1944 | 28A 28A 31A 28A 63A 65F 66B W |
Motherwell Motherwell St Rollox (Balornock) Motherwell Perth South Grangemouth Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 19/06/1948 14/08/1948 11/02/1950 21/10/1961 19/01/1963 08/06/1964 |
08/06/1964 | |
Black Five | 5497 | 45497 | 04/1944 | 28A 28A 31A 28A 67A 67D 67C W |
Motherwell Motherwell St Rollox (Balornock) Motherwell Corkerhill Ardrossan Ayr Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 29/05/1948 14/08/1948 21/10/1961 30/12/1961 08/09/1962 02/1964 |
02/1964 | |
Black Five | 5498 | 45498 | 04/1944 | 28A 28A 31A 28A W |
Motherwell Motherwell St Rollox (Balornock) Motherwell Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 29/05/1948 14/08/1948 26/06/1965 |
26/06/1965 | |
Black Five | 5499 | 45499 | 04/1944 | 28A 28A 31A W |
Motherwell Motherwell St Rollox (Balornock) Withdrawn |
01/01/1948 31/01/1948 29/05/1948 07/1965 |
07/1965 |