LMS Stanier "5MT" Class 4-6-0 - 'Black Five'
LMS | BR (BR Tmp) | BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
44658 | 31/05/1949 | 18/11/1967 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 18.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 18.80 | |||
44659 | 31/05/1949 | 17/06/1967 | 18.08 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 12/1967 | 18.55 | ||||
44660 | 31/05/1949 | 09/1964 | 15.33 | 15.39 | |||||||
44661 | 30/06/1949 | 12/08/1967 | 18.17 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 02/1968 | 18.64 | ||||
44662 | 30/06/1949 | 10/1967 | 18.33 | 18.72 | |||||||
44663 | 18/06/1949 | Leicester Midland | 04/05/1968 | Heaton Mersey | 18.92 | 19.26 | |||||
44664 | 16/07/1949 | Toton | 11/05/1968 | Bolton | 18.83 | 19.18 | |||||
44665 | 16/07/1949 | Sheffield Grimesthorpe | 02/03/1968 | 18.67 | 18.93 | ||||||
44666 | 16/07/1949 | Holbeck (MR) | 18/02/1967 | 17.58 | 18.18 | ||||||
44667 | 31/07/1949 | 08/1967 | 18.08 | 18.56 | |||||||
44668 | 24/12/1949 | 09/04/1966 | 16.33 | 16.57 | |||||||
44669 | 31/12/1949 | 14/10/1967 | 17.83 | 18.14 | |||||||
44670 | 31/01/1950 | 15/01/1966 | 16 | 16.21 | |||||||
44671 | 28/02/1950 | 18/02/1967 | 17 | 17.30 | |||||||
44672 | 28/02/1950 | 02/03/1968 | 18.08 | 18.31 | |||||||
44673 | 28/02/1950 | 15/05/1965 | 15.25 | 15.47 | |||||||
44674 | 31/03/1950 | 30/12/1967 | 17.75 | 17.97 | |||||||
44675 | 31/03/1950 | 23/09/1967 | 17.5 | 17.89 | |||||||
44676 | 30/04/1950 | 04/07/1964 | 14.25 | 14.22 | |||||||
44677 | 30/04/1950 | 28/10/1967 | 17.5 | 17.97 | |||||||
44678 | 31/05/1950 | 25/11/1967 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 17.5 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 06/1968 | 18.05 | |||
44679 | 31/05/1950 | 23/09/1967 | 17.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1968 | 18.05 | ||||
44680 | 30/06/1950 | 16/09/1967 | 17.25 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 03/1968 | 17.72 | ||||
44681 | 17/06/1950 | Crewe North | 16/09/1967 | 17.25 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 03/1968 | 17.76 | |||
44682 | 17/06/1950 | Crewe North | 11/1967 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 17.42 | 17.84 | |||||
44683 | 31/07/1950 | 13/04/1968 | 17.75 | 18.14 | |||||||
44684 | 31/07/1950 | 16/09/1967 | 17.17 | 18.14 | |||||||
44685 | 31/08/1950 | 22/04/1967 | 16.67 | 17.39 | |||||||
44686 | 30/04/1951 | Longsight | 16/10/1965 | 14.5 | 16.39 | ||||||
44687 | 31/05/1951 | Longsight | 22/01/1966 | 14.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1966 | 14.80 | |||
44688 | 31/08/1950 | Bank Hall | 20/08/1966 | 16 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 06/1967 | 16.80 | |||
44689 | 30/09/1950 | Bank Hall | 04/03/1967 | 16.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1967 | 17.22 | |||
44690 | 31/10/1950 | Bank Hall | 03/08/1968 | 17.83 | 17.89 | ||||||
44691 | 31/10/1950 | Bank Hall | 01/04/1967 | 16.5 | 17.13 | ||||||
44692 | 31/10/1950 | Bank Hall | 14/05/1966 | 15.58 | 15.80 | ||||||
44693 | 11/1950 | Low Moor | 29/05/1967 | 16.5 | 17.01 | ||||||
44694 | 11/1950 | Low Moor | 10/1967 | 16.92 | 17.26 | ||||||
44695 | 30/11/1950 | Low Moor | 24/06/1967 | 16.58 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 02/1968 | 17.22 | |||
44696 | 30/11/1950 | Newton Heath | 13/05/1967 | 16.5 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 02/1968 | 17.22 | |||
44697 | 30/11/1950 | Newton Heath | 18/11/1967 | Newton Heath | 17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 04/1968 | 17.39 | ||
44698 | 03/07/1948 | 14/07/1966 | 18 | 18.30 | |||||||
44699 | 10/07/1948 | Perth South | 01/05/1967 | 18.83 | 19.19 | ||||||
44700 | 31/07/1948 | Perth South | 14/07/1966 | 18 | 18.22 | ||||||
44701 | 07/08/1948 | Perth South | 18/06/1964 | 15.83 | 16.20 | ||||||
44702 | 21/08/1948 | St Rollox (Balornock) | 26/06/1965 | 16.83 | 16.99 | ||||||
44703 | 28/08/1948 | St Rollox (Balornock) | 10/12/1966 | 18.33 | 18.64 | ||||||
44704 | 04/09/1948 | 02/09/1966 | 18 | 18.38 | |||||||
44705 | 11/09/1948 | 02/09/1966 | 18 | 18.27 | |||||||
44706 | 18/09/1948 | 28/12/1963 | 15.25 | 15.75 | |||||||
44707 | 25/09/1948 | 24/01/1966 | 17.33 | 17.65 | |||||||
44708 | 02/10/1948 | 20/01/1968 | 19.25 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 08/1968 | 19.88 | ||||
44709 | 09/10/1948 | 03/08/1968 | 19.83 | 20.12 | |||||||
44710 | 16/10/1948 | 24/12/1966 | 18.17 | 18.76 | |||||||
44711 | 23/10/1948 | 04/05/1968 | Edge Hill | 19.58 | 19.74 | ||||||
44712 | 30/10/1948 | 12/11/1966 | 18.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 06/1967 | 18.64 | ||||
44713 | 06/11/1948 | 03/08/1968 | 19.75 | 20.37 | |||||||
44714 | 13/11/1948 | Crewe North | 19/11/1966 | 18 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1967 | 18.51 | |||
44715 | 20/11/1948 | 27/01/1968 | 19.17 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 04/1968 | 19.41 | ||||
44716 | 27/11/1948 | Crewe North | 31/07/1965 | 16.67 | 16.81 | ||||||
44717 | 04/12/1948 | Crewe North | 26/08/1967 | 18.67 | 19.29 | ||||||
44718 | 31/03/1949 | 29/11/1966 | 17.67 | 18.05 | |||||||
44719 | 31/03/1949 | 30/10/1964 | 15.58 | 15.89 | |||||||
44720 | 31/03/1949 | 27/10/1966 | 17.58 | Cut | Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) | 06/1967 | 18.22 | ||||
44721 | 31/03/1949 | 07/1965 | 16.33 | 16.64 | |||||||
44722 | 30/04/1949 | 22/04/1967 | 18 | 18.39 | |||||||
44723 | 30/04/1949 | 19/10/1966 | 17.5 | 17.72 | |||||||
44724 | 30/04/1949 | 19/10/1966 | 17.5 | 17.72 | |||||||
44725 | 30/04/1949 | 14/10/1967 | 18.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 18.89 | ||||
44726 | 31/05/1949 | 08/10/1966 | 17.42 | 17.97 | |||||||
44727 | 31/05/1949 | 21/10/1967 | 18.42 | 18.72 | |||||||
44728 | 31/01/1949 | 06/01/1968 | 19 | 19.30 | |||||||
44729 | 31/01/1949 | 08/10/1966 | 17.75 | 18.05 | |||||||
44730 | 28/02/1949 | 11/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 18.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 19.05 | |||
44731 | 28/02/1949 | 05/1966 | 17.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 10/1966 | 17.64 | ||||
44732 | 28/02/1949 | 15/07/1967 | 18.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1968 | 18.89 | ||||
44733 | 28/02/1949 | 24/06/1967 | 18.33 | 18.72 | |||||||
44734 | 28/02/1949 | 16/12/1967 | 18.83 | 19.14 | |||||||
44735 | 28/02/1949 | 03/08/1968 | 19.5 | 19.73 | |||||||
44736 | 28/02/1949 | 23/09/1967 | 18.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 05/1968 | 19.22 | ||||
44737 | 31/03/1949 | 14/01/1967 | 17.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 07/1967 | 18.30 | ||||
44738 | 19/06/1948 | 06/06/1964 | 16 | 16.25 | |||||||
44739 | 19/06/1948 | 23/01/1965 | 16.58 | 16.92 | |||||||
44740 | 29/05/1948 | 13/04/1963 | 14.92 | 14.97 | |||||||
44741 | 12/06/1948 | 13/03/1965 | 16.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 10/1965 | 17.35 | ||||
44742 | 03/07/1948 | 02/05/1964 | 15.83 | 15.96 | |||||||
44743 | 26/06/1948 | 08/01/1966 | 17.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1966 | 17.90 | ||||
44744 | 03/07/1948 | 09/11/1963 | 15.33 | 15.55 | |||||||
44745 | 03/07/1948 | 24/10/1964 | 16.25 | 16.63 | |||||||
44746 | 07/08/1948 | Holbeck (MR) | 01/02/1964 | 15.5 | 16.03 | ||||||
44747 | 31/07/1948 | 04/05/1963 | 14.83 | 15.30 | |||||||
M4748 | 44748 | 07/02/1948 | 05/09/1964 | 16.58 | 16.87 | ||||||
M4749 | 44749 | 14/02/1948 | 05/09/1964 | 16.58 | 16.85 | ||||||
M4750 | 44750 | 28/02/1948 | 09/1963 | 15.58 | 16.31 | ||||||
M4751 | 44751 | 13/03/1948 | 09/1964 | 16.5 | 16.94 | ||||||
M4752 | 44752 | 20/03/1948 | 18/04/1964 | 16.08 | 16.25 | ||||||
M4753 | 44753 | 27/03/1948 | 24/07/1965 | 17.33 | 17.82 | ||||||
44754 | 10/04/1948 | 11/04/1964 | 16 | 16.36 | |||||||
44755 | 01/05/1948 | 16/11/1963 | 15.5 | 15.80 | |||||||
44756 | 19/06/1948 | 09/1964 | 16.25 | 16.67 | |||||||
44757 | 31/12/1948 | 13/11/1965 | 16.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1966 | 17.14 | ||||
4758 | 44758 | 09/1947 | 20/07/1968 | 20.83 | Cut | Cohens (Cargo Fleet) | 10/1968 | 21.10 | |||
4759 | 44759 | 09/1947 | 18/11/1967 | Carlisle Kingmoor | 20.17 | 20.51 | |||||
4760 | 44760 | 09/1947 | 22/10/1966 | 19.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1967 | 19.35 | |||
4761 | 44761 | 25/09/1947 | Perth South | 13/04/1968 | 20.58 | 20.99 | |||||
4762 | 44762 | 02/10/1947 | Perth South | 26/11/1966 | 19.08 | 19.55 | |||||
4763 | 44763 | 09/10/1947 | Inverness | 02/10/1965 | 18 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1965 | 18.20 | ||
4764 | 44764 | 11/1947 | 09/1965 | 17.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 04/1966 | 18.43 | |||
4765 | 44765 | 12/1947 | 16/09/1967 | 19.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 20.26 | |||
4766 | 44766 | 12/1947 | 19/08/1967 | 19.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1967 | 20.01 | |||
4767 | 44767 | 12/1947 | 30/12/1967 | 20 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
4768 | 44768 | 04/1947 | 06/1967 | 20.17 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 04/1968 | 21.02 | |||
4769 | 44769 | 04/1947 | 07/1965 | 18.25 | 18.77 | ||||||
4770 | 44770 | 04/1947 | 10/1967 | 20.5 | 20.85 | ||||||
4771 | 44771 | 05/1947 | 18/03/1967 | 19.83 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 10/1967 | 20.43 | |||
4772 | 44772 | 05/1947 | 10/1967 | 20.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 05/1968 | 21.02 | |||
4773 | 44773 | 05/1947 | 16/12/1967 | 20.58 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 05/1968 | 21.02 | |||
4774 | 44774 | 05/1947 | 26/08/1967 | 20.25 | 20.60 | ||||||
4775 | 44775 | 06/1947 | 10/1967 | 20.33 | 20.76 | ||||||
4776 | 44776 | 06/1947 | 21/10/1967 | 20.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 04/1968 | 20.85 | |||
4777 | 44777 | 06/1947 | 22/06/1968 | 21 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 01/1969 | 21.60 | |||
4778 | 44778 | 06/1947 | 18/11/1967 | Carnforth | 20.42 | 20.68 | |||||
4779 | 44779 | 07/1947 | 17/12/1966 | 19.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 07/1967 | 20.01 | |||
4780 | 44780 | 07/1947 | 29/06/1968 | 20.92 | Cut | Cohens (Cargo Fleet) | 10/1968 | 21.27 | |||
4781 | 44781 | 08/1947 | 17/08/1968 | 21 | 21.35 | ||||||
4782 | 44782 | 08/1947 | 24/12/1966 | 19.33 | 19.93 | ||||||
4783 | 44783 | 03/1947 | 05/1964 | 17.17 | 17.52 | ||||||
4784 | 44784 | 04/1947 | 06/1964 | 17.17 | 17.43 | ||||||
4785 | 44785 | 04/1947 | 29/06/1964 | 17.17 | 17.43 | ||||||
4786 | 44786 | 04/1947 | 17/08/1966 | 19.33 | 19.60 | ||||||
4787 | 44787 | 05/1947 | 22/11/1965 | 18.5 | 18.77 | ||||||
4788 | 44788 | 05/1947 | 29/11/1966 | 19.5 | 20.10 | ||||||
4789 | 44789 | 05/1947 | 10/12/1964 | 17.58 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 03/1965 | 17.85 | |||
4790 | 44790 | 06/1947 | 18/03/1967 | 19.75 | Cut | Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) | 11/1967 | 20.43 | |||
4791 | 44791 | 06/1947 | 29/11/1966 | 19.42 | 19.85 | ||||||
4792 | 44792 | 07/1947 | 23/09/1967 | 20.17 | 20.60 | ||||||
4793 | 44793 | 08/1947 | 10/12/1964 | 17.33 | 17.59 | ||||||
4794 | 44794 | 08/1947 | 22/04/1967 | 19.67 | 20.10 | ||||||
4795 | 44795 | 08/1947 | 29/07/1967 | 19.92 | 20.35 | ||||||
4796 | 44796 | 09/1947 | 01/05/1967 | 19.67 | 20.10 | ||||||
4797 | 44797 | 09/1947 | 02/09/1966 | 19 | 19.26 | ||||||
4798 | 44798 | 10/1947 | 02/09/1966 | 18.92 | 19.27 | ||||||
4799 | 44799 | 10/1947 | 03/07/1965 | 17.75 | Cut | Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) | 08/1965 | 17.85 | |||
4800 | 44800 | 05/1944 | 16/03/1968 | 23.83 | 24.10 | ||||||
4801 | 44801 | 05/1944 | 05/1964 | 20 | 20.35 | ||||||
4802 | 44802 | 06/1944 | 29/06/1968 | 24 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 10/1968 | 24.35 | |||
4803 | 44803 | 06/1944 | 06/1968 | 24 | 24.27 | ||||||
4804 | 44804 | 06/1944 | 02/03/1968 | 23.75 | 24.02 | ||||||
4805 | 44805 | 06/1944 | 16/09/1967 | 23.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1968 | 23.60 | |||
4806 | 44806 | 07/1944 | 03/08/1968 | 24.08 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
4807 | 44807 | 09/1944 | 02/03/1968 | 23.5 | 23.76 | ||||||
4808 | 44808 | 09/1944 | 31/12/1966 | 22.25 | 23.26 | ||||||
4809 | 44809 | 09/1944 | 03/08/1968 | 23.92 | 24.18 | ||||||
4810 | 44810 | 10/1944 | 13/08/1966 | 21.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 11/1966 | 22.10 | |||
4811 | 44811 | 10/1944 | 08/10/1966 | 22 | 22.35 | ||||||
4812 | 44812 | 10/1944 | 16/09/1967 | 22.92 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 01/1968 | 23.27 | |||
4813 | 44813 | 10/1944 | 03/09/1966 | 21.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1966 | 22.18 | |||
4814 | 44814 | 10/1944 | 16/09/1967 | 22.92 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 02/1968 | 23.35 | |||
4815 | 44815 | 11/1944 | 24/02/1968 | 23.25 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 06/1968 | 23.60 | |||
4816 | 44816 | 11/1944 | 20/07/1968 | 23.67 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 06/1968 | 23.60 | |||
4817 | 44817 | 11/1944 | 12/08/1967 | 22.75 | 23.10 | ||||||
4818 | 44818 | 11/1944 | 29/06/1968 | 23.58 | Cut | Cohens (Cargo Fleet) | 10/1968 | 23.93 | |||
4819 | 44819 | 11/1944 | 11/1967 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 23 | 23.35 | |||||
4820 | 44820 | 12/1944 | 31/12/1966 | 22 | 23.01 | ||||||
4821 | 44821 | 12/1944 | 10/06/1967 | 22.5 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 12/1967 | 23.01 | |||
4822 | 44822 | 12/1944 | 21/10/1967 | 22.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 05/1968 | 23.43 | |||
4823 | 44823 | 12/1944 | 20/11/1965 | 20.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1966 | 21.26 | |||
4824 | 44824 | 12/1944 | 10/1967 | 22.83 | 23.18 | ||||||
4825 | 44825 | 12/1944 | 07/10/1967 | 22.83 | 23.18 | ||||||
4826 | 44826 | 07/1944 | 10/1967 | 23.25 | 23.60 | ||||||
4827 | 44827 | 07/1944 | 03/07/1965 | 21 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1965 | 21.43 | |||
4828 | 44828 | 07/1944 | 09/09/1967 | 23.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1968 | 23.85 | |||
4829 | 44829 | 08/1944 | 11/05/1968 | Bolton | 23.75 | 24.02 | |||||
4830 | 44830 | 08/1944 | 19/08/1967 | 23 | 23.43 | ||||||
4831 | 44831 | 08/1944 | 11/1967 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 23.25 | 23.60 | |||||
4832 | 44832 | 08/1944 | 16/09/1967 | 23.08 | 23.35 | ||||||
4833 | 44833 | 08/1944 | 16/09/1967 | 23.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 23.60 | |||
4834 | 44834 | 08/1944 | 09/12/1967 | 23.33 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 08/1968 | 24.02 | |||
4835 | 44835 | 09/1944 | 22/07/1967 | 22.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1968 | 23.51 | |||
4836 | 44836 | 09/1944 | 04/05/1968 | Stockport Edgeley | 23.67 | 24.02 | |||||
4837 | 44837 | 09/1944 | 09/09/1967 | 23 | 23.43 | ||||||
4838 | 44838 | 09/1944 | 09/03/1968 | 23.5 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 06/1968 | 23.76 | |||
4839 | 44839 | 09/1944 | 10/12/1966 | 22.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 04/1967 | 22.59 | |||
4840 | 44840 | 10/1944 | 11/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 23.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1968 | 23.35 | ||
4841 | 44841 | 10/1944 | 22/10/1966 | 22 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1967 | 22.35 | |||
4842 | 44842 | 10/1944 | 27/01/1968 | 23.25 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 05/1968 | 23.60 | |||
4843 | 44843 | 10/1944 | 16/09/1967 | 22.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 23.43 | |||
4844 | 44844 | 10/1944 | 11/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 23.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 23.43 | ||
4845 | 44845 | 10/1944 | 29/06/1968 | 23.67 | Cut | Cohens (Cargo Fleet) | 12/1968 | 24.18 | |||
4846 | 44846 | 11/1944 | 13/01/1968 | 23.17 | 23.43 | ||||||
4847 | 44847 | 11/1944 | 12/11/1966 | 22 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1967 | 22.51 | |||
4848 | 44848 | 11/1944 | 17/02/1968 | 23.25 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 07/1968 | 23.68 | |||
4849 | 44849 | 11/1944 | 21/12/1964 | 20.08 | 20.18 | ||||||
4850 | 44850 | 11/1944 | 14/07/1966 | 21.67 | 21.85 | ||||||
4851 | 44851 | 11/1944 | 04/1968 | 23.42 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 08/1968 | 23.76 | |||
4852 | 44852 | 11/1944 | 09/09/1967 | 22.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1968 | 23.51 | |||
4853 | 44853 | 11/1944 | 12/06/1967 | 22.58 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 11/1967 | 23.01 | |||
4854 | 44854 | 12/1944 | 10/1967 | 22.83 | 23.01 | ||||||
4855 | 44855 | 12/1944 | 04/05/1968 | Stockport Edgeley | 23.42 | 23.77 | |||||
4856 | 44856 | 12/1944 | 18/02/1967 | 22.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 06/1967 | 22.51 | |||
4857 | 44857 | 12/1944 | 10/1967 | 22.83 | 23.01 | ||||||
4858 | 44858 | 12/1944 | 30/12/1967 | 23 | 23.26 | ||||||
4859 | 44859 | 12/1944 | 11/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 22.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 23.26 | ||
4860 | 44860 | 12/1944 | 28/01/1967 | 22.08 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 04/1968 | 23.35 | |||
4861 | 44861 | 01/1945 | 11/1967 | Newton Heath | 22.83 | 23.26 | |||||
4862 | 44862 | 01/1945 | 29/07/1967 | 22.5 | 22.93 | ||||||
4863 | 44863 | 01/1945 | 06/05/1967 | 22.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1968 | 23.01 | |||
4864 | 44864 | 01/1945 | 04/05/1968 | Edge Hill | 23.33 | 23.51 | |||||
4865 | 44865 | 02/1945 | 16/09/1967 | 22.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1967 | 22.84 | |||
4866 | 44866 | 02/1945 | 09/09/1967 | 22.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 02/1968 | 23.01 | |||
4867 | 44867 | 02/1945 | 17/06/1967 | 22.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1967 | 22.84 | |||
4868 | 44868 | 02/1945 | 04/05/1968 | Stockport Edgeley | 23.25 | 23.60 | |||||
4869 | 44869 | 03/1945 | 09/1966 | 21.5 | 21.94 | ||||||
4870 | 44870 | 03/1945 | 17/06/1967 | 22.25 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 02/1968 | 22.94 | |||
4871 | 44871 | 03/1945 | 17/08/1968 | 23.42 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
4872 | 44872 | 03/1945 | 30/09/1967 | 22.5 | 23.02 | ||||||
4873 | 44873 | 03/1945 | 11/1967 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 22.67 | 23.02 | |||||
4874 | 44874 | 04/1945 | 03/08/1968 | 23.33 | 23.93 | ||||||
4875 | 44875 | 04/1945 | 20/05/1967 | 22.08 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 09/1967 | 22.43 | |||
4876 | 44876 | 04/1945 | 11/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 22.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 22.93 | ||
4877 | 44877 | 04/1945 | 03/08/1968 | 23.33 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 12/1968 | 23.68 | |||
4878 | 44878 | 05/1945 | 06/07/1968 | 23.17 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 02/1969 | 23.77 | |||
4879 | 44879 | 05/1945 | 22/04/1967 | 21.92 | 22.35 | ||||||
4880 | 44880 | 05/1945 | 29/11/1966 | 21.5 | 22.01 | ||||||
4881 | 44881 | 05/1945 | 17/07/1966 | 21.17 | 21.52 | ||||||
4882 | 44882 | 06/1945 | 15/07/1967 | 22.08 | 22.52 | ||||||
4883 | 44883 | 06/1945 | 15/07/1967 | 22.08 | 22.52 | ||||||
4884 | 44884 | 06/1945 | 29/06/1968 | 23 | 23.35 | ||||||
4885 | 44885 | 07/1945 | 26/12/1963 | 18.42 | 18.76 | ||||||
4886 | 44886 | 07/1945 | 21/10/1967 | 22.25 | 22.68 | ||||||
4887 | 44887 | 08/1945 | 09/12/1967 | 22.33 | 22.52 | ||||||
4888 | 44888 | 08/1945 | Newton Heath | 03/08/1968 | 23 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1969 | 23.76 | ||
4889 | 44889 | 08/1945 | Newton Heath | 27/01/1968 | 22.42 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 06/1968 | 22.85 | ||
4890 | 44890 | 08/1945 | Newton Heath | 29/06/1968 | 22.83 | 23.44 | |||||
4891 | 44891 | 08/1945 | Newton Heath | 29/06/1968 | 22.83 | 23.27 | |||||
4892 | 44892 | 09/1945 | Newton Heath | 08/04/1967 | 21.58 | 22.26 | |||||
4893 | 44893 | 09/1945 | Newton Heath | 11/1967 | Newton Heath | 22.17 | 22.60 | ||||
4894 | 44894 | 09/1945 | Newton Heath | 10/08/1968 | 22.92 | 23.68 | |||||
4895 | 44895 | 09/1945 | Newton Heath | 09/12/1967 | 22.25 | 22.76 | |||||
4896 | 44896 | 09/1945 | Farnley Junction | 09/09/1967 | 22 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1968 | 22.68 | ||
4897 | 44897 | 09/1945 | Carlisle Kingmoor | 03/08/1968 | 22.92 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 12/1968 | 23.27 | ||
4898 | 44898 | 09/1945 | Carlisle Kingmoor | 28/10/1967 | 22.08 | 22.51 | |||||
4899 | 44899 | 09/1945 | Carlisle Kingmoor | 20/07/1968 | 22.83 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 01/1969 | 23.35 | ||
4900 | 44900 | 10/1945 | St Rollox (Balornock) | 24/06/1967 | 21.67 | 22.10 | |||||
4901 | 44901 | 10/1945 | Carlisle Kingmoor | 21/08/1965 | Carlisle Kingmoor | 19.83 | |||||
4902 | 44902 | 10/1945 | Carlisle Kingmoor | 10/1967 | 22 | 22.43 | |||||
4903 | 44903 | 10/1945 | 06/04/1968 | 22.5 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 10/1968 | 23.02 | |||
4904 | 44904 | 10/1945 | 25/12/1965 | 20.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 04/1966 | 20.51 | |||
4905 | 44905 | 10/1945 | 11/1967 | Carnforth | 22.08 | 22.35 | |||||
4906 | 44906 | 10/1945 | 02/03/1968 | 22.42 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 08/1968 | 22.85 | |||
4907 | 44907 | 11/1945 | 10/1967 | 21.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1968 | 22.60 | |||
4908 | 44908 | 11/1945 | 02/06/1966 | 20.58 | 21.43 | ||||||
4909 | 44909 | 11/1945 | 30/09/1967 | 21.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1968 | 22.27 | |||
4910 | 44910 | 11/1945 | 29/06/1968 | 22.58 | 23.02 | ||||||
4911 | 44911 | 11/1945 | 10/1967 | 21.92 | 22.43 | ||||||
4912 | 44912 | 11/1945 | 09/09/1967 | 21.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 09/1968 | 22.85 | |||
4913 | 44913 | 11/1945 | 29/07/1967 | 21.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1968 | 22.35 | |||
4914 | 44914 | 12/1945 | 19/08/1967 | 21.67 | 22.10 | ||||||
4915 | 44915 | 12/1945 | 09/12/1967 | 22 | 22.85 | ||||||
4916 | 44916 | 12/1945 | 16/12/1967 | 22 | 22.18 | ||||||
4917 | 44917 | 12/1945 | 11/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 21.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 22.26 | ||
4918 | 44918 | 12/1945 | 21/01/1967 | 21.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 07/1967 | 21.59 | |||
4919 | 44919 | 12/1945 | 17/12/1966 | 21 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 08/1967 | 21.68 | |||
4920 | 44920 | 12/1945 | 11/1967 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 21.92 | 22.26 | |||||
4921 | 44921 | 01/1946 | 26/02/1965 | 19.08 | 19.43 | ||||||
4922 | 44922 | 01/1946 | 05/1964 | 18.33 | 18.85 | ||||||
4923 | 44923 | 01/1946 | 29/06/1964 | 18.42 | 18.76 | ||||||
4924 | 44924 | 02/1946 | 03/07/1965 | 19.42 | Cut | Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) | 08/1965 | 19.51 | |||
4925 | 44925 | 02/1946 | 02/09/1966 | 20.58 | 20.93 | ||||||
4926 | 44926 | 02/1946 | 20/04/1968 | Edge Hill | 22.17 | 22.68 | |||||
4927 | 44927 | 02/1946 | 16/09/1967 | 21.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 02/1968 | 22.01 | |||
4928 | 44928 | 03/1946 | 06/1967 | 21.25 | 21.77 | ||||||
4929 | 44929 | 03/1946 | 29/06/1968 | 22.25 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 12/1968 | 22.77 | |||
4930 | 44930 | 03/1946 | 20/05/1967 | 21.17 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 04/1968 | 22.10 | |||
4931 | 44931 | 04/1946 | 12/10/1965 | 19.5 | 20.10 | ||||||
4932 | 44932 | 09/1945 | Dalry Road | 03/08/1968 | 22.92 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
4933 | 44933 | 10/1945 | Dalry Road | 14/10/1967 | 22 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1968 | 22.60 | ||
4934 | 44934 | 10/1945 | Carlisle Kingmoor | 30/09/1967 | 21.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 22.43 | ||
4935 | 44935 | 10/1945 | 15/10/1966 | 21 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 04/1967 | 21.51 | |||
4936 | 44936 | 11/1945 | 12/08/1967 | 21.75 | 22.01 | ||||||
4937 | 44937 | 11/1945 | 13/05/1967 | 21.5 | 22.01 | ||||||
4938 | 44938 | 11/1945 | 14/10/1967 | 21.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 22.35 | |||
4939 | 44939 | 11/1945 | 12/1965 | 20.08 | 20.43 | ||||||
4940 | 44940 | 11/1945 | 16/03/1968 | 22.33 | 22.76 | ||||||
4941 | 44941 | 12/1945 | 12/11/1966 | 20.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1967 | 21.43 | |||
4942 | 44942 | 12/1945 | 22/06/1968 | 22.5 | 23.10 | ||||||
4943 | 44943 | 12/1945 | 10/1967 | 21.83 | 22.18 | ||||||
4944 | 44944 | 01/1946 | 16/09/1967 | 21.67 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 02/1968 | 22.10 | |||
4945 | 44945 | 01/1946 | 29/10/1966 | 20.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1967 | 21.18 | |||
4946 | 44946 | 01/1946 | 22/05/1967 | 21.33 | 21.85 | ||||||
4947 | 44947 | 02/1946 | 29/06/1968 | 22.33 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 10/1968 | 22.68 | |||
4948 | 44948 | 02/1946 | 16/09/1967 | 21.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1968 | 22.01 | |||
4949 | 44949 | 02/1946 | 29/06/1968 | 22.33 | 22.93 | ||||||
4950 | 44950 | 03/1946 | 03/08/1968 | 22.42 | 23.02 | ||||||
4951 | 44951 | 03/1946 | 14/12/1966 | 20.75 | 21.10 | ||||||
4952 | 44952 | 03/1946 | 19/10/1966 | 20.58 | 20.94 | ||||||
4953 | 44953 | 03/1946 | 10/12/1966 | 20.75 | 21.01 | ||||||
4954 | 44954 | 04/1946 | 23/09/1966 | 20.42 | 20.77 | ||||||
4955 | 44955 | 04/1946 | 07/1965 | 19.25 | 19.60 | ||||||
4956 | 44956 | 04/1946 | 14/06/1966 | 20.17 | 20.52 | ||||||
4957 | 44957 | 05/1946 | 05/1964 | 18 | 18.35 | ||||||
4958 | 44958 | 05/1946 | 04/03/1967 | 20.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 08/1967 | 21.27 | |||
4959 | 44959 | 05/1946 | 10/07/1965 | 19.17 | Cut | Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) | 11/1965 | 19.52 | |||
4960 | 44960 | 05/1946 | Perth South | 17/01/1966 | 19.67 | 20.10 | |||||
4961 | 44961 | 15/06/1946 | Perth South | 29/06/1964 | 18 | 18.27 | |||||
4962 | 44962 | 15/06/1946 | Derby | 30/12/1967 | 21.5 | 21.76 | |||||
4963 | 44963 | 22/06/1946 | Sheffield Millhouses | 20/07/1968 | 22.08 | Cut | Cohens (Cargo Fleet) | 10/1968 | 22.33 | ||
4964 | 44964 | 07/1946 | 14/10/1967 | 21.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 21.68 | |||
4965 | 44965 | 08/1946 | 04/1968 | 21.67 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 08/1968 | 22.02 | |||
4966 | 44966 | 08/1946 | 17/09/1966 | 20.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1967 | 20.43 | |||
4967 | 44967 | 04/1946 | 05/1964 | 18.08 | 18.43 | ||||||
4968 | 44968 | 04/1946 | 05/1964 | 18.08 | 18.60 | ||||||
4969 | 44969 | 04/1946 | 28/12/1963 | 17.67 | 18.18 | ||||||
4970 | 44970 | 04/1946 | 20/09/1965 | 19.42 | 19.77 | ||||||
4971 | 44971 | 04/1946 | 03/08/1968 | 22.33 | 22.85 | ||||||
4972 | 44972 | 04/1946 | 29/11/1966 | 20.58 | 21.01 | ||||||
4973 | 44973 | 05/1946 | 20/09/1965 | 19.33 | 19.60 | ||||||
4974 | 44974 | 05/1946 | 26/06/1966 | 20.08 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 04/1967 | 20.93 | |||
4975 | 44975 | 05/1946 | Perth South | 20/09/1965 | 19.33 | 19.68 | |||||
4976 | 44976 | 05/1946 | Perth South | 03/02/1964 | 17.75 | 18.10 | |||||
4977 | 44977 | 15/06/1946 | Perth South | 29/11/1966 | 20.42 | 20.93 | |||||
4978 | 44978 | 15/06/1946 | Polmadie | 10/07/1965 | 19.08 | Cut | Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) | 11/1965 | 19.43 | ||
4979 | 44979 | 22/06/1946 | Polmadie | 03/07/1965 | 19.08 | Cut | Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) | 08/1965 | 19.16 | ||
4980 | 44980 | 06/1946 | 03/07/1965 | 19.08 | Cut | Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) | 08/1965 | 19.18 | |||
4981 | 44981 | 07/1946 | 14/01/1967 | 20.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 10/1967 | 21.27 | |||
4982 | 44982 | 09/1946 | 06/05/1967 | 20.67 | 21.18 | ||||||
4983 | 44983 | 09/1946 | 10/1967 | 21.08 | 21.43 | ||||||
4984 | 44984 | 09/1946 | 12/11/1966 | 20.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1967 | 20.51 | |||
4985 | 44985 | 10/1946 | 10/1967 | 21 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1968 | 21.35 | |||
4986 | 44986 | 10/1946 | 07/05/1967 | 20.58 | 21.10 | ||||||
4987 | 44987 | 11/1946 | 22/10/1966 | 19.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1967 | 20.27 | |||
4988 | 44988 | 12/1946 | 30/12/1967 | 21 | 21.26 | ||||||
4989 | 44989 | 12/1946 | 04/02/1967 | 20.17 | 20.76 | ||||||
4990 | 44990 | 12/1946 | 10/1967 | 20.83 | 21.18 | ||||||
4991 | 44991 | 12/1947 | 01/05/1967 | 19.42 | 19.76 | ||||||
4992 | 44992 | 01/1947 | 31/12/1966 | 19.92 | 20.34 | ||||||
4993 | 44993 | 01/1947 | 16/12/1967 | 20.92 | 21.26 | ||||||
4994 | 44994 | 01/1947 | 13/07/1964 | 17.5 | Cut | Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) | 11/1964 | 17.85 | |||
4995 | 44995 | 02/1947 | 29/11/1966 | 19.75 | 20.34 | ||||||
4996 | 44996 | 02/1947 | 17/04/1964 | 17.17 | 17.42 | ||||||
4997 | 44997 | 03/1947 | 01/05/1967 | 20.17 | 20.52 | ||||||
4998 | 44998 | 03/1947 | 04/04/1967 | 20.08 | 20.52 | ||||||
4999 | 44999 | 03/1947 | 02/09/1966 | 19.5 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 11/1966 | 19.68 | |||
5000 | 45000 | 03/1935 | 28/10/1967 | 32.58 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
5001 | 45001 | 04/1935 | 16/03/1968 | 32.92 | 33.19 | ||||||
5002 | 45002 | 04/1935 | 03/07/1965 | 30.25 | 31.02 | ||||||
5003 | 45003 | 04/1935 | 06/1967 | 32.17 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 02/1968 | 32.86 | |||
5004 | 45004 | 04/1935 | 09/1966 | 31.42 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 03/1967 | 31.94 | |||
5005 | 45005 | 04/1935 | 27/01/1968 | 32.75 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 08/1968 | 33.36 | |||
5006 | 45006 | 04/1935 | 16/09/1967 | 32.42 | 32.69 | ||||||
5007 | 45007 | 04/1935 | 23/07/1964 | 29.25 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 11/1964 | 29.61 | |||
5008 | 45008 | 04/1935 | 05/1964 | 29.08 | 29.44 | ||||||
5009 | 45009 | 04/1935 | 22/11/1965 | 30.58 | 30.86 | ||||||
5010 | 45010 | 04/1935 | 29/08/1963 | 28.33 | 28.86 | ||||||
5011 | 45011 | 04/1935 | 28/12/1965 | 30.67 | 31.02 | ||||||
5012 | 45012 | 04/1935 | 08/10/1966 | 31.5 | 31.94 | ||||||
5013 | 45013 | 04/1935 | 05/1968 | Stockport Edgeley | 33.08 | 33.44 | |||||
5014 | 45014 | 04/1935 | 24/06/1967 | 32.17 | 32.61 | ||||||
5015 | 45015 | 04/1935 | 16/09/1967 | 32.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1968 | 32.94 | |||
5016 | 45016 | 05/1935 | 14/07/1966 | 31.17 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 11/1966 | 31.53 | |||
5017 | 45017 | 05/1935 | 10/08/1968 | 33.25 | 33.94 | ||||||
5018 | 45018 | 05/1935 | 24/12/1966 | 31.58 | 32.11 | ||||||
5019 | 45019 | 05/1935 | 13/05/1967 | 32 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 12/1967 | 32.61 | |||
5020 | 45020 | 08/1934 | 11/12/1965 | 31.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1966 | 31.60 | |||
5021 | 45021 | 08/1934 | 16/09/1967 | 33.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1967 | 33.36 | |||
5022 | 45022 | 08/1934 | 16/09/1963 | 29.08 | 29.52 | ||||||
5023 | 45023 | 08/1934 | 16/09/1963 | 29.08 | 29.52 | ||||||
5024 | 45024 | 08/1934 | 13/05/1967 | 32.75 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 02/1968 | 33.53 | |||
5025 | 45025 | 08/1934 | 10/08/1968 | 34 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
5026 | 45026 | 09/1934 | 09/10/1965 | 31.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 04/1966 | 31.60 | |||
5027 | 45027 | 09/1934 | 04/05/1968 | Stockport Edgeley | 33.67 | 34.11 | |||||
5028 | 45028 | 09/1934 | 25/03/1967 | 32.5 | 33.19 | ||||||
5029 | 45029 | 09/1934 | 19/10/1966 | 32.08 | 32.44 | ||||||
5030 | 45030 | 09/1934 | 29/12/1962 | 28.25 | 28.93 | ||||||
5031 | 45031 | 09/1934 | 06/1967 | 32.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 11/1967 | 33.19 | |||
5032 | 45032 | 09/1934 | 08/02/1964 | 29.42 | 29.44 | ||||||
5033 | 45033 | 09/1934 | 24/12/1966 | 32.25 | 33.02 | ||||||
5034 | 45034 | 09/1934 | 03/02/1968 | 33.42 | 33.69 | ||||||
5035 | 45035 | 09/1934 | 21/11/1964 | 30.17 | 30.27 | ||||||
5036 | 45036 | 09/1934 | 29/12/1962 | 28.25 | 29.02 | ||||||
5037 | 45037 | 09/1934 | 27/11/1965 | 31.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1966 | 31.36 | |||
5038 | 45038 | 09/1934 | 17/02/1968 | 33.42 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 06/1968 | 33.77 | |||
5039 | 45039 | 10/1934 | 26/08/1967 | 32.83 | 33.44 | ||||||
5040 | 45040 | 10/1935 | 22/07/1967 | 31.75 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 08/1968 | 32.86 | |||
5041 | 45041 | 10/1935 | 09/12/1967 | 32.17 | 32.52 | ||||||
5042 | 45042 | 10/1935 | 16/09/1967 | 31.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1967 | 32.19 | |||
5043 | 45043 | 10/1935 | 25/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 32.08 | 32.36 | |||||
5044 | 45044 | 10/1935 | 10/1966 | 31 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 08/1967 | 31.85 | |||
5045 | 45045 | 10/1935 | 29/10/1966 | 31 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1967 | 31.36 | |||
5046 | 45046 | 10/1935 | 22/06/1968 | 32.67 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 11/1968 | 33.11 | |||
5047 | 45047 | 10/1935 | 17/07/1966 | 30.75 | 31.11 | ||||||
5048 | 45048 | 10/1935 | 11/1967 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 32.08 | 32.36 | |||||
5049 | 45049 | 11/1935 | 29/08/1963 | 27.75 | 27.93 | ||||||
5050 | 45050 | 11/1935 | 12/08/1967 | 31.75 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 02/1968 | 32.27 | |||
5051 | 45051 | 11/1935 | 19/11/1966 | 31 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1967 | 31.52 | |||
5052 | 45052 | 11/1935 | 30/09/1967 | 31.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 32.35 | |||
5053 | 45053 | 11/1935 | 19/11/1966 | 31 | Cut | Arnott Young (Carmyle) | 02/1967 | 31.27 | |||
5054 | 45054 | 11/1935 | 10/02/1968 | 32.25 | 32.61 | ||||||
5055 | 45055 | 11/1935 | 03/08/1968 | 32.75 | 33.28 | ||||||
5056 | 45056 | 11/1935 | 19/08/1967 | 31.75 | 32.10 | ||||||
5057 | 45057 | 12/1935 | 12/08/1967 | 31.67 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 07/1968 | 32.61 | |||
5058 | 45058 | 12/1935 | 08/10/1966 | 30.83 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 03/1967 | 31.27 | |||
5059 | 45059 | 12/1935 | 08/07/1967 | 31.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1968 | 32.11 | |||
5060 | 45060 | 12/1935 | 04/03/1967 | 31.25 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 10/1967 | 31.85 | |||
5061 | 45061 | 12/1935 | 18/11/1967 | Carlisle Kingmoor | 31.92 | 32.27 | |||||
5062 | 45062 | 12/1935 | 15/04/1967 | 31.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 09/1967 | 31.77 | |||
5063 | 45063 | 12/1935 | 10/10/1966 | 30.83 | 31.11 | ||||||
5064 | 45064 | 12/1935 | 11/03/1967 | 31.25 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 10/1967 | 31.85 | |||
5065 | 45065 | 12/1935 | 05/1968 | Heaton Mersey | 32.42 | 32.78 | |||||
5066 | 45066 | 01/1935 | 06/02/1964 | 29.08 | 29.18 | ||||||
5067 | 45067 | 01/1935 | 21/10/1967 | 32.75 | 33.35 | ||||||
5068 | 45068 | 01/1935 | 12/1965 | 30.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 04/1966 | 31.27 | |||
5069 | 45069 | 01/1935 | 24/06/1967 | 32.42 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 12/1967 | 32.94 | |||
5070 | 45070 | 05/1935 | 20/05/1967 | 32 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 07/1967 | 32.19 | |||
5071 | 45071 | 05/1935 | 22/07/1967 | 32.17 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 08/1968 | 33.28 | |||
5072 | 45072 | 06/1935 | 09/09/1967 | 32.25 | 32.69 | ||||||
5073 | 45073 | 06/1935 | 03/08/1968 | 33.17 | 33.77 | ||||||
5074 | 45074 | 06/1935 | 18/09/1965 | 30.25 | 30.77 | ||||||
5075 | 45075 | 02/1935 | 09/09/1967 | 32.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 04/1968 | 33.19 | |||
5076 | 45076 | 03/1935 | 29/06/1968 | 33.25 | 33.86 | ||||||
5077 | 45077 | 03/1935 | 14/08/1965 | 30.42 | 31.02 | ||||||
5078 | 45078 | 03/1935 | 30/10/1965 | 30.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1965 | 30.78 | |||
5079 | 45079 | 03/1935 | 08/03/1967 | 32 | 32.53 | ||||||
5080 | 45080 | 03/1935 | 10/1967 | 32.58 | 32.95 | ||||||
5081 | 45081 | 03/1935 | 16/10/1965 | 30.58 | 31.02 | ||||||
5082 | 45082 | 03/1935 | 09/07/1966 | 31.33 | 31.61 | ||||||
5083 | 45083 | 03/1935 | 16/12/1967 | 32.75 | 33.19 | ||||||
5084 | 45084 | 03/1935 | 29/11/1966 | 31.67 | 32.11 | ||||||
5085 | 45085 | 03/1935 | 29/12/1962 | 27.75 | 28.69 | ||||||
5086 | 45086 | 03/1935 | 29/12/1962 | 27.75 | 28.44 | ||||||
5087 | 45087 | 03/1935 | 26/07/1963 | 28.33 | 29.19 | ||||||
5088 | 45088 | 04/1935 | 12/09/1964 | 29.42 | 29.61 | ||||||
5089 | 45089 | 04/1935 | 26/08/1967 | 32.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 12/1967 | 32.69 | |||
5090 | 45090 | 04/1935 | 06/12/1965 | 30.67 | 31.02 | ||||||
5091 | 45091 | 04/1935 | 10/09/1966 | 31.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1967 | 31.94 | |||
5092 | 45092 | 04/1935 | 16/12/1967 | 32.67 | 32.94 | ||||||
5093 | 45093 | 04/1935 | 10/1965 | 30.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1965 | 30.69 | |||
5094 | 45094 | 04/1935 | 25/02/1967 | 31.83 | 32.44 | ||||||
5095 | 45095 | 04/1935 | 03/08/1968 | 33.33 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 12/1968 | 33.69 | |||
5096 | 45096 | 04/1935 | 03/08/1968 | 33.33 | 33.69 | ||||||
5097 | 45097 | 04/1935 | 18/06/1966 | 31.17 | 31.52 | ||||||
5098 | 45098 | 04/1935 | 29/12/1962 | 27.67 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 10/1963 | 28.52 | |||
5099 | 45099 | 04/1935 | 16/09/1963 | 28.42 | 28.69 | ||||||
5100 | 45100 | 05/1935 | 28/09/1963 | 28.33 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 19/10/1963 | 28.45 | |||
5101 | 45101 | 05/1935 | 16/03/1968 | 32.83 | 33.19 | ||||||
5102 | 45102 | 05/1935 | 30/01/1965 | 29.67 | 30.78 | ||||||
5103 | 45103 | 05/1935 | 09/1964 | 29.33 | 29.44 | ||||||
5104 | 45104 | 05/1935 | 29/06/1968 | 33.08 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 10/1968 | 33.44 | |||
5105 | 45105 | 05/1935 | 29/10/1966 | 31.42 | 31.78 | ||||||
5106 | 45106 | 05/1935 | 14/01/1967 | 31.67 | 32.02 | ||||||
5107 | 45107 | 05/1935 | 16/09/1967 | 32.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 10/1968 | 33.44 | |||
5108 | 45108 | 05/1935 | 11/12/1965 | 30.58 | 30.94 | ||||||
5109 | 45109 | 05/1935 | 01/04/1967 | 31.92 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 09/1967 | 32.36 | |||
5110 | 45110 | 06/1935 | 17/08/1968 | 33.17 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
5111 | 45111 | 06/1935 | 28/10/1967 | 32.33 | 32.94 | ||||||
5112 | 45112 | 06/1935 | 15/10/1966 | 31.33 | 32.02 | ||||||
5113 | 45113 | 06/1935 | 03/07/1965 | 30.08 | 30.85 | ||||||
5114 | 45114 | 06/1935 | 13/01/1968 | 32.58 | 32.94 | ||||||
5115 | 45115 | 06/1935 | 29/11/1966 | 31.42 | 31.85 | ||||||
5116 | 45116 | 06/1935 | 29/07/1967 | 32.08 | 32.52 | ||||||
5117 | 45117 | 06/1935 | 22/10/1965 | 30.33 | 30.69 | ||||||
5118 | 45118 | 06/1935 | 08/10/1966 | 31.33 | 31.77 | ||||||
5119 | 45119 | 06/1935 | 29/12/1962 | 27.5 | 28.44 | ||||||
5120 | 45120 | 06/1935 | 06/1967 | 32 | 32.44 | ||||||
5121 | 45121 | 06/1935 | 05/1964 | 28.92 | 29.27 | ||||||
5122 | 45122 | 06/1935 | 11/04/1964 | 28.83 | 28.85 | ||||||
5123 | 45123 | 07/1935 | 16/09/1963 | 28.17 | 28.77 | ||||||
5124 | 45124 | 07/1935 | 01/05/1967 | 31.83 | 32.19 | ||||||
5125 | 45125 | 05/1935 | 29/12/1962 | 27.58 | 28.27 | ||||||
5126 | 45126 | 05/1935 | 20/05/1967 | 32 | 32.53 | ||||||
5127 | 45127 | 05/1935 | 19/11/1966 | 31.5 | Cut | Arnott Young (Carmyle) | 02/1967 | 31.78 | |||
5128 | 45128 | 05/1935 | 10/09/1966 | 31.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1967 | 31.85 | |||
5129 | 45129 | 05/1935 | 17/09/1966 | 31.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1967 | 31.69 | |||
5130 | 45130 | 05/1935 | 11/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 32.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 32.86 | ||
5131 | 45131 | 05/1935 | 20/04/1968 | Speke Junction | 32.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 08/1968 | 33.28 | ||
5132 | 45132 | 05/1935 | 04/03/1967 | 31.83 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 10/1967 | 32.44 | |||
5133 | 45133 | 05/1935 | 03/02/1968 | 32.75 | 32.94 | ||||||
5134 | 45134 | 05/1935 | 03/08/1968 | 33.25 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 01/1969 | 33.70 | |||
5135 | 45135 | 05/1935 | 07/10/1967 | 32.42 | 32.86 | ||||||
5136 | 45136 | 05/1935 | 30/10/1964 | 29.42 | 29.78 | ||||||
5137 | 45137 | 06/1935 | 31/12/1966 | 31.5 | 32.10 | ||||||
5138 | 45138 | 06/1935 | 09/1966 | 31.25 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 03/1967 | 31.77 | |||
5139 | 45139 | 06/1935 | 19/08/1967 | 32.17 | 32.61 | ||||||
5140 | 45140 | 06/1935 | 09/1966 | 31.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1967 | 31.69 | |||
5141 | 45141 | 06/1935 | 11/03/1967 | 31.75 | 32.27 | ||||||
5142 | 45142 | 06/1935 | 24/04/1965 | 29.83 | 31.02 | ||||||
5143 | 45143 | 14/06/1935 | 11/12/1965 | 30.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1966 | 30.77 | |||
5144 | 45144 | 06/1935 | 13/06/1964 | 29 | 29.19 | ||||||
5145 | 45145 | 14/06/1935 | 11/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 32.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1968 | 32.70 | ||
5146 | 45146 | 06/1935 | 19/06/1965 | 30 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1965 | 30.52 | |||
5147 | 45147 | 06/1935 | 20/05/1967 | 31.92 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 10/1967 | 32.36 | |||
5148 | 45148 | 06/1935 | 25/12/1965 | 30.5 | 30.85 | ||||||
5149 | 45149 | 06/1935 | 22/06/1968 | 33 | 33.61 | ||||||
5150 | 45150 | 06/1935 | 02/03/1968 | 32.75 | 33.02 | ||||||
5151 | 45151 | 06/1935 | 29/12/1962 | 27.5 | 28.19 | ||||||
5152 | 45152 | 06/1935 | 29/12/1962 | 27.5 | 28.27 | ||||||
5153 | 45153 | 06/1935 | 05/1964 | 28.92 | 29.27 | ||||||
5154 | 45154 | 06/1935 | 12/11/1966 | 31.42 | 31.94 | ||||||
5155 | 45155 | 07/1935 | 12/11/1964 | 29.33 | 29.69 | ||||||
5156 | 45156 | 07/1935 | 10/08/1968 | 33.08 | 33.44 | ||||||
5157 | 45157 | 07/1935 | 29/12/1962 | 27.42 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 07/1963 | 28.02 | |||
5158 | 45158 | 07/1935 | 23/07/1964 | 29 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 10/1964 | 29.27 | |||
5159 | 45159 | 07/1935 | 29/12/1962 | 27.42 | 28.36 | ||||||
5160 | 45160 | 07/1935 | 02/09/1966 | 31.17 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 06/1967 | 31.94 | |||
5161 | 45161 | 07/1935 | 29/11/1966 | 31.33 | 31.85 | ||||||
5162 | 45162 | 08/1935 | 19/11/1966 | 31.25 | Cut | Arnott Young (Carmyle) | 02/1967 | 31.53 | |||
5163 | 45163 | 08/1935 | 15/05/1965 | 29.75 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
5164 | 45164 | 08/1935 | 09/08/1966 | 31 | 31.36 | ||||||
5165 | 45165 | 08/1935 | 29/12/1962 | 27.33 | 28.27 | ||||||
5166 | 45166 | 08/1935 | 16/09/1963 | 28.08 | 28.77 | ||||||
5167 | 45167 | 08/1935 | 01/05/1967 | 31.75 | 32.11 | ||||||
5168 | 45168 | 08/1935 | 26/09/1966 | 31.08 | 31.44 | ||||||
5169 | 45169 | 08/1935 | 29/12/1962 | 27.33 | 28.35 | ||||||
5170 | 45170 | 08/1935 | 31/03/1964 | 28.58 | 28.94 | ||||||
5171 | 45171 | 08/1935 | 29/10/1965 | 30.17 | 30.53 | ||||||
5172 | 45172 | 08/1935 | 05/1964 | 28.75 | 29.11 | ||||||
5173 | 45173 | 08/1935 | 23/07/1964 | 28.92 | Cut | Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick) | 11/1964 | 29.27 | |||
5174 | 45174 | 08/1935 | 29/12/1962 | 27.33 | 28.10 | ||||||
5175 | 45175 | 08/1935 | 26/07/1963 | 27.92 | 28.77 | ||||||
5176 | 45176 | 08/1935 | 17/08/1966 | 31 | 31.27 | ||||||
5177 | 45177 | 09/1935 | 14/07/1966 | 30.83 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 12/1966 | 31.27 | |||
5178 | 45178 | 09/1935 | 30/01/1965 | 29.33 | 29.68 | ||||||
5179 | 45179 | 09/1935 | 29/12/1962 | 27.25 | 28.10 | ||||||
5180 | 45180 | 09/1935 | 25/09/1965 | 30 | 30.27 | ||||||
5181 | 45181 | 09/1935 | 15/01/1966 | 30.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1966 | 30.68 | |||
5182 | 45182 | 09/1935 | 12/03/1966 | 30.5 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 11/1966 | 31.19 | |||
5183 | 45183 | 09/1935 | 30/10/1964 | 29.08 | 29.52 | ||||||
5184 | 45184 | 09/1935 | 18/09/1965 | 30 | 30.36 | ||||||
5185 | 45185 | 09/1935 | 06/1966 | 30.75 | 31.19 | ||||||
5186 | 45186 | 09/1935 | 09/09/1967 | 32 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 03/1967 | 31.52 | |||
5187 | 45187 | 09/1935 | 06/1968 | 32.75 | 33.52 | ||||||
5188 | 45188 | 09/1935 | 22/07/1967 | 31.83 | 32.61 | ||||||
5189 | 45189 | 09/1935 | 13/07/1963 | 27.83 | 27.93 | ||||||
5190 | 45190 | 10/1935 | 04/05/1968 | Heaton Mersey | 32.58 | 32.94 | |||||
5191 | 45191 | 10/1935 | 22/07/1967 | 31.75 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 02/1968 | 32.36 | |||
5192 | 45192 | 10/1935 | 21/08/1965 | 29.83 | 30.11 | ||||||
5193 | 45193 | 10/1935 | 08/1967 | 31.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 32.44 | |||
5194 | 45194 | 10/1935 | 24/04/1965 | 29.5 | 29.77 | ||||||
5195 | 45195 | 10/1935 | 30/07/1966 | 30.75 | 31.02 | ||||||
5196 | 45196 | 10/1935 | 30/12/1967 | 32.17 | 32.44 | ||||||
5197 | 45197 | 10/1935 | 14/01/1967 | 31.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 07/1967 | 31.77 | |||
5198 | 45198 | 10/1935 | 30/09/1967 | 31.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 07/1968 | 32.77 | |||
5199 | 45199 | 10/1935 | 09/1963 | 27.92 | 27.85 | ||||||
5200 | 45200 | 10/1935 | 20/07/1968 | 32.75 | Cut | Cohens (Cargo Fleet) | 10/1968 | 33.02 | |||
5201 | 45201 | 10/1935 | 05/1968 | Speke Junction | 32.58 | 32.86 | |||||
5202 | 45202 | 10/1935 | 29/06/1968 | 32.67 | 33.11 | ||||||
5203 | 45203 | 11/1935 | 29/06/1968 | 32.58 | 33.28 | ||||||
5204 | 45204 | 11/1935 | 09/01/1967 | 31.17 | 31.60 | ||||||
5205 | 45205 | 11/1935 | 29/10/1966 | 30.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1967 | 31.35 | |||
5206 | 45206 | 11/1935 | 03/08/1968 | 32.75 | Cut | Cohens (Cargo Fleet) | 12/1968 | 33.11 | |||
5207 | 45207 | 11/1935 | 11/09/1966 | 30.83 | 31.10 | ||||||
5208 | 45208 | 11/1935 | 01/10/1967 | 31.92 | 32.27 | ||||||
5209 | 45209 | 11/1935 | 29/06/1968 | 32.58 | 32.94 | ||||||
5210 | 45210 | 11/1935 | 02/04/1966 | 30.42 | 30.68 | ||||||
5211 | 45211 | 11/1935 | 17/05/1967 | 31.5 | 31.94 | ||||||
5212 | 45212 | 11/1935 | 03/08/1968 | 32.75 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
5213 | 45213 | 11/1935 | 31/12/1966 | 31.08 | 31.44 | ||||||
5214 | 45214 | 11/1935 | 31/12/1966 | 31.08 | 31.44 | ||||||
5215 | 45215 | 11/1935 | 07/10/1967 | 31.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1968 | 32.19 | |||
5216 | 45216 | 11/1935 | 12/02/1966 | 30.25 | 30.60 | ||||||
5217 | 45217 | 11/1935 | 26/11/1966 | 31 | 31.60 | ||||||
5218 | 45218 | 11/1935 | 16/04/1966 | 30.42 | 30.68 | ||||||
5219 | 45219 | 11/1935 | Farnley Junction | 10/1967 | 31.92 | 32.27 | |||||
5220 | 45220 | 11/1935 | Farnley Junction | 09/1966 | 30.83 | 31.85 | |||||
5221 | 45221 | 11/1935 | Low Moor | 30/12/1967 | 32.08 | 32.35 | |||||
5222 | 45222 | 12/1935 | 11/02/1967 | 31.17 | 31.60 | ||||||
5223 | 45223 | 12/1935 | Newton Heath | 10/12/1966 | 31 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 07/1967 | 31.60 | ||
5224 | 45224 | 12/1935 | Newton Heath | 12/11/1966 | 30.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1967 | 31.44 | ||
5225 | 45225 | 08/1936 | 14/10/1967 | 31.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 07/1968 | 31.94 | |||
5226 | 45226 | 08/1936 | 16/09/1967 | 31.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1968 | 31.85 | |||
5227 | 45227 | 08/1936 | 13/01/1968 | 31.42 | 31.69 | ||||||
5228 | 45228 | 08/1936 | 18/03/1967 | 30.58 | 31.35 | ||||||
5229 | 45229 | 08/1936 | 04/09/1965 | 29.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1965 | 29.35 | |||
5230 | 45230 | 08/1936 | 14/08/1965 | 29 | 29.27 | ||||||
5231 | 45231 | 08/1936 | 03/08/1968 | 32 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
5232 | 45232 | 08/1936 | 11/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 31.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 31.60 | ||
5233 | 45233 | 08/1936 | 07/05/1966 | 29.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 09/1966 | 30.10 | |||
5234 | 45234 | 08/1936 | 09/09/1967 | 31.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1968 | 31.44 | |||
5235 | 45235 | 08/1936 | 15/01/1966 | 29.42 | 29.68 | ||||||
5236 | 45236 | 08/1936 | 23/12/1967 | 31.33 | 31.69 | ||||||
5237 | 45237 | 08/1936 | 25/09/1965 | 29.08 | 29.35 | ||||||
5238 | 45238 | 08/1936 | 24/12/1966 | 30.33 | 30.93 | ||||||
5239 | 45239 | 08/1936 | 16/09/1967 | 31.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1968 | 31.85 | |||
5240 | 45240 | 08/1936 | 21/01/1967 | 30.42 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 01/1968 | 31.44 | |||
5241 | 45241 | 09/1936 | 16/09/1967 | 31 | 31.52 | ||||||
5242 | 45242 | 09/1936 | 03/06/1967 | 30.75 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 07/1968 | 31.85 | |||
5243 | 45243 | 09/1936 | 16/09/1967 | 31 | 31.27 | ||||||
5244 | 45244 | 09/1936 | 03/08/1963 | 26.92 | 27.02 | ||||||
5245 | 45245 | 09/1936 | 28/08/1965 | 28.92 | 29.19 | ||||||
5246 | 45246 | 09/1936 | 30/12/1967 | 31.25 | 31.52 | ||||||
5247 | 45247 | 09/1936 | 08/04/1967 | 30.58 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 10/1967 | 31.10 | |||
5248 | 45248 | 09/1936 | 26/02/1966 | 29.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 07/1966 | 29.85 | |||
5249 | 45249 | 09/1936 | 10/12/1966 | 30.25 | 30.77 | ||||||
5250 | 45250 | 09/1936 | 11/03/1967 | 30.5 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 09/1967 | 31.02 | |||
5251 | 45251 | 09/1936 | 28/12/1963 | 27.25 | 27.77 | ||||||
5252 | 45252 | 09/1936 | 26/03/1966 | 29.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 06/1966 | 29.77 | |||
5253 | 45253 | 09/1936 | 04/1968 | 31.58 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 10/1968 | 32.10 | |||
5254 | 45254 | 09/1936 | 05/1968 | Newton Heath | 31.67 | 31.94 | |||||
5255 | 45255 | 10/1936 | 29/06/1968 | 31.67 | 32.36 | ||||||
5256 | 45256 | 10/1936 | 06/1967 | 30.67 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 06/1968 | 31.69 | |||
5257 | 45257 | 10/1936 | 10/1965 | 29 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1966 | 29.36 | |||
5258 | 45258 | 10/1936 | 02/03/1968 | 31.42 | 31.69 | ||||||
5259 | 45259 | 10/1936 | 30/12/1967 | 31.17 | 31.52 | ||||||
5260 | 45260 | 10/1936 | 03/08/1968 | 31.83 | 32.36 | ||||||
5261 | 45261 | 10/1936 | 21/10/1967 | 31 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 02/1968 | 31.36 | |||
5262 | 45262 | 10/1936 | 03/08/1968 | 31.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 09/1968 | 31.94 | |||
5263 | 45263 | 10/1936 | 21/10/1967 | 31 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1968 | 31.69 | |||
5264 | 45264 | 10/1936 | 16/09/1967 | 30.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1968 | 31.27 | |||
5265 | 45265 | 10/1936 | 19/05/1962 | 25.58 | 25.60 | ||||||
5266 | 45266 | 10/1936 | 29/12/1962 | 26.17 | 27.18 | ||||||
5267 | 45267 | 10/1936 | 14/10/1967 | 31 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 31.44 | |||
5268 | 45268 | 10/1936 | 03/08/1968 | 31.83 | Cut | Cohens (Cargo Fleet) | 02/1969 | 32.36 | |||
5269 | 45269 | 11/1936 | 03/08/1968 | 31.75 | 32.35 | ||||||
5270 | 45270 | 11/1936 | 16/09/1967 | 30.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1968 | 31.19 | |||
5271 | 45271 | 11/1936 | 23/09/1967 | 30.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 09/1968 | 31.85 | |||
5272 | 45272 | 11/1936 | 09/10/1965 | 28.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1966 | 29.19 | |||
5273 | 45273 | 11/1936 | 10/1967 | 30.92 | 31.27 | ||||||
5274 | 45274 | 11/1936 | 13/05/1967 | 30.5 | 31.02 | ||||||
5275 | 45275 | 11/1936 | 21/10/1967 | 30.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1968 | 31.27 | |||
5276 | 45276 | 11/1936 | 21/01/1967 | 30.17 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 11/1967 | 31.02 | |||
5277 | 45277 | 11/1936 | 25/02/1967 | 30.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1967 | 30.52 | |||
5278 | 45278 | 11/1936 | Kentish Town | 10/06/1967 | 30.58 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 12/1967 | 31.10 | ||
5279 | 45279 | 11/1936 | Kentish Town | 23/03/1968 | 31.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 09/1968 | 31.85 | ||
5280 | 45280 | 11/1936 | Kentish Town | 11/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 31 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 31.35 | |
5281 | 45281 | 11/1936 | Kentish Town | 11/1967 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 31 | 31.52 | ||||
5282 | 45282 | 11/1936 | Nottingham | 04/05/1968 | Edge Hill | 31.5 | 31.94 | ||||
5283 | 45283 | 11/1936 | Bristol Barrow Road | 21/01/1967 | 30.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1967 | 30.52 | ||
5284 | 45284 | 12/1936 | Holbeck (MR) | 04/05/1968 | Edge Hill | 31.42 | 31.69 | ||||
5285 | 45285 | 12/1936 | 30/12/1967 | 31 | 31.27 | ||||||
5286 | 45286 | 12/1936 | 13/03/1965 | 28.25 | 29.27 | ||||||
5287 | 45287 | 12/1936 | 03/08/1968 | 31.67 | 32.19 | ||||||
5288 | 45288 | 12/1936 | Bristol Barrow Road | 11/1967 | Heaton Mersey | 30.92 | 31.35 | ||||
5289 | 45289 | 12/1936 | Bristol Barrow Road | 12/11/1966 | 29.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1967 | 30.43 | ||
5290 | 45290 | 12/1936 | Northampton | 29/06/1968 | 31.5 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 10/1968 | 31.85 | ||
5291 | 45291 | 12/1936 | Rugby | 23/10/1965 | 28.83 | 29.10 | |||||
5292 | 45292 | 12/1936 | Swansea Paxton Street (Victoria) | 11/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 30.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 31.27 | |
5293 | 45293 | 12/1937 | Shrewsbury | 21/08/1965 | 27.67 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
5294 | 45294 | 12/1937 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 02/03/1968 | 30.25 | 30.44 | |||||
5295 | 45295 | 12/1937 | Longsight | 30/12/1967 | 30 | 30.35 | |||||
5296 | 45296 | 12/1937 | Longsight | 10/02/1968 | 30.17 | 30.44 | |||||
5297 | 45297 | 12/1937 | Monument Lane | 16/09/1967 | 29.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1968 | 30.19 | ||
5298 | 45298 | 12/1937 | Edge Hill | 16/09/1967 | 29.75 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 02/1968 | 30.19 | ||
5299 | 45299 | 01/1937 | Crewe North | 11/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 30.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 04/1968 | 31.27 | |
5300 | 45300 | 01/1937 | Crewe North | 12/1965 | 28.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1966 | 29.18 | ||
5301 | 45301 | 01/1937 | Monument Lane | 10/07/1965 | 28.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1965 | 28.93 | ||
5302 | 45302 | 01/1937 | 22/07/1967 | 30.5 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 02/1968 | 31.10 | |||
5303 | 45303 | 01/1937 | 10/06/1967 | 30.42 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 12/1967 | 30.93 | |||
5304 | 45304 | 01/1937 | 26/08/1967 | 30.58 | 31.02 | ||||||
5305 | 45305 | 01/1937 | 10/08/1968 | 31.58 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
5306 | 45306 | 01/1937 | 30/01/1965 | 28 | 28.35 | ||||||
5307 | 45307 | 01/1937 | 07/10/1967 | 30.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 31.18 | |||
5308 | 45308 | 01/1937 | 12/08/1967 | 30.58 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 01/1968 | 31.02 | |||
5309 | 45309 | 01/1937 | 26/09/1966 | 29.67 | 30.10 | ||||||
5310 | 45310 | 01/1937 | 03/08/1968 | 31.58 | Cut | Cohens (Cargo Fleet) | 12/1968 | 31.94 | |||
5311 | 45311 | 02/1937 | 29/10/1966 | 29.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1967 | 30.26 | |||
5312 | 45312 | 02/1937 | 29/06/1968 | 31.33 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 02/1969 | 32.02 | |||
5313 | 45313 | 02/1937 | 06/02/1965 | 28 | 28.10 | ||||||
5314 | 45314 | 02/1937 | 10/1965 | 28.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 04/1966 | 29.18 | |||
5315 | 45315 | 02/1937 | 31/08/1963 | 26.5 | Cut | Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) | 19/10/1963 | 26.69 | |||
5316 | 45316 | 02/1937 | 02/03/1968 | 31.08 | 31.35 | ||||||
5317 | 45317 | 02/1937 | 23/11/1963 | 26.75 | 26.76 | ||||||
5318 | 45318 | 02/1937 | 10/08/1968 | 31.5 | 32.10 | ||||||
5319 | 45319 | 02/1937 | 01/05/1967 | 30.25 | 30.60 | ||||||
5320 | 45320 | 02/1937 | 28/10/1963 | 26.67 | 27.26 | ||||||
5321 | 45321 | 02/1937 | 07/10/1967 | 30.67 | 31.02 | ||||||
5322 | 45322 | 02/1937 | 10/09/1966 | 29.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 04/1967 | 30.18 | |||
5323 | 45323 | 02/1937 | 30/09/1967 | 30.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 31.10 | |||
5324 | 45324 | 02/1937 | 12/08/1967 | 30.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1967 | 30.85 | |||
5325 | 45325 | 03/1937 | 20/08/1966 | 29.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1966 | 29.77 | |||
5326 | 45326 | 03/1937 | 11/03/1967 | 30 | 30.52 | ||||||
5327 | 45327 | 03/1937 | 23/01/1965 | 27.83 | 28.35 | ||||||
5328 | 45328 | 03/1937 | 23/09/1967 | 30.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 11/1967 | 30.69 | |||
5329 | 45329 | 03/1937 | 12/11/1966 | 29.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1967 | 29.94 | |||
5330 | 45330 | 03/1937 | 03/08/1968 | 31.42 | Cut | Cohens (Cargo Fleet) | 12/1968 | 31.78 | |||
5331 | 45331 | 03/1937 | 11/1967 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 30.67 | 31.19 | |||||
5332 | 45332 | 03/1937 | 19/11/1966 | 29.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1967 | 29.94 | |||
5333 | 45333 | 03/1937 | 06/1966 | 29.25 | 29.61 | ||||||
5334 | 45334 | 03/1937 | 07/1965 | 28.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1965 | 28.77 | |||
5335 | 45335 | 03/1937 | 10/07/1965 | 28.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1965 | 28.77 | |||
5336 | 45336 | 03/1937 | 14/01/1967 | 29.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 01/1968 | 30.86 | |||
5337 | 45337 | 04/1937 | 06/02/1965 | 27.83 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
5338 | 45338 | 04/1937 | 15/10/1966 | 29.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1967 | 29.86 | |||
5339 | 45339 | 04/1937 | 06/1967 | 30.17 | 30.77 | ||||||
5340 | 45340 | 04/1937 | 22/04/1967 | 30 | 30.27 | ||||||
5341 | 45341 | 04/1937 | 07/01/1967 | 29.75 | 30.10 | ||||||
5342 | 45342 | 04/1937 | 03/08/1968 | 31.33 | 31.52 | ||||||
5343 | 45343 | 04/1937 | 24/06/1967 | 30.17 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 12/1967 | 30.69 | |||
5344 | 45344 | 04/1937 | 20/08/1966 | 29.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1967 | 29.93 | |||
5345 | 45345 | 04/1937 | 06/1968 | 31.17 | 31.44 | ||||||
5346 | 45346 | 04/1937 | 06/1967 | 30.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 11/1967 | 30.61 | |||
5347 | 45347 | 04/1937 | 11/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 30.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1968 | 30.86 | ||
5348 | 45348 | 04/1937 | 13/08/1966 | 29.33 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 11/1966 | 29.61 | |||
5349 | 45349 | 05/1937 | 11/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 30.5 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 30.85 | ||
5350 | 45350 | 05/1937 | 03/08/1968 | 31.25 | 31.61 | ||||||
5351 | 45351 | 05/1937 | 07/08/1965 | 28.25 | 28.69 | ||||||
5352 | 45352 | 05/1937 | 08/04/1967 | 29.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 08/1967 | 30.27 | |||
5353 | 45353 | 05/1937 | 20/07/1968 | 31.17 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 02/1969 | 31.78 | |||
5354 | 45354 | 05/1937 | 10/1965 | 28.42 | 28.85 | ||||||
5355 | 45355 | 05/1937 | 29/12/1962 | 25.58 | 26.27 | ||||||
5356 | 45356 | 05/1937 | 05/1964 | 27 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 10/1964 | 27.44 | |||
5357 | 45357 | 05/1937 | 31/12/1966 | 29.58 | 29.94 | ||||||
5358 | 45358 | 05/1937 | 28/12/1963 | 26.58 | 27.10 | ||||||
5359 | 45359 | 05/1937 | 01/05/1967 | 30 | 30.36 | ||||||
5360 | 45360 | 05/1937 | 03/09/1965 | 28.33 | 28.69 | ||||||
5361 | 45361 | 05/1937 | 13/02/1964 | 26.75 | 27.10 | ||||||
5362 | 45362 | 05/1937 | 29/10/1965 | 28.42 | 28.78 | ||||||
5363 | 45363 | 06/1937 | 28/10/1967 | 30.33 | 30.77 | ||||||
5364 | 45364 | 06/1937 | 13/08/1966 | 29.17 | 29.61 | ||||||
5365 | 45365 | 06/1937 | 10/12/1966 | 29.5 | 29.85 | ||||||
5366 | 45366 | 06/1937 | 17/04/1964 | 26.83 | 27.10 | ||||||
5367 | 45367 | 06/1937 | 29/11/1963 | 26.42 | 27.02 | ||||||
5368 | 45368 | 06/1937 | 11/11/1967 | Speke Junction | 30.42 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1968 | 30.94 | ||
5369 | 45369 | 06/1937 | 04/03/1967 | 29.75 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 10/1967 | 30.35 | |||
5370 | 45370 | 06/1937 | 13/08/1966 | 29.17 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 11/1966 | 29.44 | |||
5371 | 45371 | 06/1937 | 15/04/1967 | 29.83 | 30.19 | ||||||
5372 | 45372 | 06/1937 | 26/11/1966 | 29.42 | 29.93 | ||||||
5373 | 45373 | 06/1937 | 23/09/1967 | 30.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 10/1968 | 31.36 | |||
5374 | 45374 | 06/1937 | 10/1967 | 30.33 | 30.94 | ||||||
5375 | 45375 | 06/1937 | 27/01/1968 | 30.58 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 07/1968 | 31.10 | |||
5376 | 45376 | 06/1937 | 04/1968 | 30.83 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 08/1968 | 31.19 | |||
5377 | 45377 | 06/1937 | 09/12/1967 | 30.5 | 30.85 | ||||||
5378 | 45378 | 07/1937 | 06/03/1965 | 27.67 | 28.44 | ||||||
5379 | 45379 | 07/1937 | 31/07/1965 | Willesden | 28 | Prs | Preserved | ||||
5380 | 45380 | 07/1937 | 27/03/1965 | 27.67 | 28.44 | ||||||
5381 | 45381 | 07/1937 | 04/05/1968 | Bolton | 30.83 | 31.11 | |||||
5382 | 45382 | 07/1937 | 29/06/1968 | 30.92 | 31.44 | ||||||
5383 | 45383 | 07/1937 | 11/02/1967 | 29.58 | 30.19 | ||||||
5384 | 45384 | 07/1937 | 29/06/1964 | 26.92 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 10/1964 | 27.27 | |||
5385 | 45385 | 07/1937 | 10/1966 | 29.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1967 | 29.85 | |||
5386 | 45386 | 07/1937 | 03/08/1968 | 31.08 | 31.69 | ||||||
5387 | 45387 | 07/1937 | 13/03/1965 | 27.67 | 28.27 | ||||||
5388 | 45388 | 07/1937 | 10/08/1968 | 31.08 | 31.85 | ||||||
5389 | 45389 | 07/1937 | 08/10/1965 | 28.25 | 28.52 | ||||||
5390 | 45390 | 08/1937 | 10/08/1968 | 31 | 31.19 | ||||||
5391 | 45391 | 08/1937 | 03/02/1968 | 30.5 | 30.85 | ||||||
5392 | 45392 | 08/1937 | 04/05/1968 | Heaton Mersey | 30.75 | 31.11 | |||||
5393 | 45393 | 08/1937 | 17/09/1966 | 29.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1967 | 29.52 | |||
5394 | 45394 | 08/1937 | 20/07/1968 | 30.92 | Cut | Cohens (Cargo Fleet) | 12/1968 | 31.36 | |||
5395 | 45395 | 08/1937 | 23/03/1968 | 30.58 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 07/1968 | 30.94 | |||
5396 | 45396 | 08/1937 | 01/02/1966 | 28.5 | 28.85 | ||||||
5397 | 45397 | 08/1937 | 03/08/1968 | 31 | 31.36 | ||||||
5398 | 45398 | 08/1937 | 09/1965 | 28.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1965 | 28.35 | |||
5399 | 45399 | 08/1937 | 24/12/1966 | 29.33 | 29.85 | ||||||
5400 | 45400 | 08/1937 | 04/05/1964 | 26.75 | 27.02 | ||||||
5401 | 45401 | 08/1937 | 11/11/1961 | 24.25 | 24.27 | ||||||
5402 | 45402 | 08/1937 | 22/04/1967 | 29.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 10/1967 | 30.19 | |||
5403 | 45403 | 08/1937 | 10/09/1966 | 29.08 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1967 | 29.44 | |||
5404 | 45404 | 08/1937 | 06/05/1967 | 29.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 11/1967 | 30.27 | |||
5405 | 45405 | 09/1937 | 26/08/1967 | 29.92 | 30.27 | ||||||
5406 | 45406 | 09/1937 | 08/07/1967 | 29.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1967 | 30.27 | |||
5407 | 45407 | 09/1937 | 10/08/1968 | 30.92 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
5408 | 45408 | 09/1937 | 26/11/1966 | 29.17 | 29.68 | ||||||
5409 | 45409 | 09/1937 | 12/08/1967 | 29.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1967 | 30.27 | |||
5410 | 45410 | 09/1937 | 10/09/1966 | 29 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1967 | 29.44 | |||
5411 | 45411 | 09/1937 | 06/1968 | 30.75 | 31.02 | ||||||
5412 | 45412 | 09/1937 | 05/08/1967 | 29.92 | Cut | Cohens (Kettering) | 07/1968 | 30.85 | |||
5413 | 45413 | 09/1937 | 19/09/1964 | 27 | 27.10 | ||||||
5414 | 45414 | 10/1937 | 06/02/1965 | 27.33 | 27.43 | ||||||
5415 | 45415 | 10/1937 | 10/1967 | 30 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 08/1968 | 30.85 | |||
5416 | 45416 | 10/1937 | 10/07/1965 | 27.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1965 | 28.19 | |||
5417 | 45417 | 10/1937 | 22/07/1967 | 29.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 06/1968 | 30.69 | |||
5418 | 45418 | 10/1937 | 12/02/1966 | 28.33 | 28.94 | ||||||
5419 | 45419 | 10/1937 | 10/09/1966 | 28.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1967 | 29.27 | |||
5420 | 45420 | 10/1937 | 29/06/1968 | 30.67 | 31.36 | ||||||
5421 | 45421 | 10/1937 | 10/02/1968 | 30.33 | 30.69 | ||||||
5422 | 45422 | 10/1937 | 10/09/1966 | 28.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1966 | 29.19 | |||
5423 | 45423 | 10/1937 | 01/05/1967 | 29.58 | 29.94 | ||||||
5424 | 45424 | 10/1937 | 20/04/1968 | Carnforth | 30.5 | 31.02 | |||||
5425 | 45425 | 10/1937 | 21/10/1967 | 30 | 30.36 | ||||||
5426 | 45426 | 10/1937 | 23/03/1968 | 30.42 | 30.85 | ||||||
5427 | 45427 | 10/1937 | 20/08/1966 | 28.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1967 | 29.36 | |||
5428 | 45428 | 10/1937 | 10/1967 | 30 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
5429 | 45429 | 11/1937 | 07/08/1965 | 27.75 | 28.19 | ||||||
5430 | 45430 | 11/1937 | 09/1966 | 28.83 | Cut | Cohens (Morriston) | 03/1967 | 29.35 | |||
5431 | 45431 | 11/1937 | 02/12/1967 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 30.08 | 30.52 | |||||
5432 | 45432 | 11/1937 | 19/10/1966 | 28.92 | 29.19 | ||||||
5433 | 45433 | 11/1937 | 03/03/1966 | 28.33 | 28.43 | ||||||
5434 | 45434 | 11/1937 | 08/1966 | 28.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 12/1966 | 29.10 | |||
5435 | 45435 | 11/1937 | 29/06/1968 | 30.58 | 30.94 | ||||||
5436 | 45436 | 11/1937 | 13/04/1968 | 30.42 | 30.85 | ||||||
5437 | 45437 | 11/1937 | 14/10/1967 | 29.92 | 30.27 | ||||||
5438 | 45438 | 11/1937 | 08/1966 | 28.75 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1967 | 29.35 | |||
5439 | 45439 | 11/1937 | 11/1965 | 28 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 01/1966 | 28.19 | |||
5440 | 45440 | 11/1937 | 16/09/1967 | 29.83 | Cut | Cashmore's (Newport) | 03/1968 | 30.35 | |||
5441 | 45441 | 12/1937 | 04/02/1967 | 29.17 | 29.77 | ||||||
5442 | 45442 | 12/1937 | 27/08/1966 | 28.67 | 29.02 | ||||||
5443 | 45443 | 12/1937 | 28/08/1965 | 27.67 | 27.94 | ||||||
5444 | 45444 | 12/1937 | 03/08/1968 | 30.67 | 31.35 | ||||||
5445 | 45445 | 12/1937 | 29/06/1968 | 30.5 | 30.85 | ||||||
5446 | 45446 | 12/1937 | 11/02/1967 | 29.17 | 29.77 | ||||||
5447 | 45447 | 12/1937 | 03/08/1968 | 30.67 | 31.02 | ||||||
5448 | 45448 | 12/1937 | 26/08/1967 | 29.67 | 30.10 | ||||||
5449 | 45449 | 12/1937 | 11/1967 | Springs Branch (Wigan) | 29.92 | 30.19 | |||||
5450 | 45450 | 12/1937 | 18/11/1967 | Lostock Hall | 29.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1968 | 30.19 | ||
5451 | 45451 | 12/1937 | 12/11/1966 | 28.92 | 29.27 | ||||||
5452 | 45452 | 09/1938 | 29/12/1962 | 24.25 | 25.02 | ||||||
5453 | 45453 | 09/1938 | 29/12/1962 | 24.25 | 25.18 | ||||||
5454 | 45454 | 09/1938 | 08/1967 | 28.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 03/1968 | 29.52 | |||
5455 | 45455 | 09/1938 | 08/1967 | 28.92 | 29.44 | ||||||
5456 | 45456 | 10/1938 | 07/12/1964 | 26.17 | 26.43 | ||||||
5457 | 45457 | 10/1938 | 16/09/1963 | 24.92 | 25.35 | ||||||
5458 | 45458 | 10/1938 | 29/12/1962 | 24.17 | 25.35 | ||||||
5459 | 45459 | 10/1938 | 14/05/1964 | 25.58 | 25.85 | ||||||
5460 | 45460 | 10/1938 | 26/06/1965 | 26.67 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 06/1968 | 29.69 | |||
5461 | 45461 | 10/1938 | 22/08/1966 | 27.83 | 28.10 | ||||||
5462 | 45462 | 11/1938 | 29/06/1964 | 25.58 | 25.85 | ||||||
5463 | 45463 | 11/1938 | 29/11/1966 | 28 | 28.43 | ||||||
5464 | 45464 | 11/1938 | 22/10/1966 | 27.92 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1967 | 28.52 | |||
5465 | 45465 | 11/1938 | 13/02/1964 | 25.25 | 25.35 | ||||||
5466 | 45466 | 11/1938 | 25/02/1967 | 28.25 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 05/1967 | 28.52 | |||
5467 | 45467 | 11/1938 | 31/12/1966 | 28.08 | 28.43 | ||||||
5468 | 45468 | 12/1938 | 05/1964 | 25.42 | 25.94 | ||||||
5469 | 45469 | 12/1938 | 19/11/1966 | 27.92 | Cut | Arnott Young (Carmyle) | 02/1967 | 28.19 | |||
5470 | 45470 | 12/1938 | 10/09/1964 | 25.75 | 26.02 | ||||||
5471 | 45471 | 12/1938 | 03/07/1965 | 26.58 | 26.85 | ||||||
5472 | 45472 | 04/1943 | 02/09/1966 | 23.42 | 23.68 | ||||||
5473 | 45473 | 05/1943 | 19/11/1966 | 23.5 | Cut | Arnott Young (Carmyle) | 02/1967 | 23.77 | |||
5474 | 45474 | 05/1943 | 02/09/1966 | 23.33 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 06/1967 | 24.10 | |||
5475 | 45475 | 06/1943 | 02/09/1966 | 23.25 | 23.52 | ||||||
5476 | 45476 | 07/1943 | 10/1964 | 21.25 | 21.93 | ||||||
5477 | 45477 | 07/1943 | 17/08/1966 | 23.08 | 23.52 | ||||||
5478 | 45478 | 08/1943 | 10/12/1966 | 23.33 | 23.68 | ||||||
5479 | 45479 | 08/1943 | 05/1964 | 20.75 | 21.18 | ||||||
5480 | 45480 | 08/1943 | 22/08/1966 | 23 | 23.44 | ||||||
5481 | 45481 | 09/1943 | 30/09/1967 | 24 | 24.52 | ||||||
5482 | 45482 | 09/1943 | 29/06/1964 | 20.75 | 21.18 | ||||||
5483 | 45483 | 09/1943 | 31/12/1966 | 23.25 | 24.18 | ||||||
5484 | 45484 | 10/1943 | 13/02/1964 | 20.33 | 20.43 | ||||||
5485 | 45485 | 10/1943 | 28/10/1963 | 20 | 20.76 | ||||||
5486 | 45486 | 10/1943 | 06/12/1965 | 22.17 | Cut | Arnott Young (Troon) | 03/1968 | 24.43 | |||
5487 | 45487 | 11/1943 | 02/1964 | 20.25 | 21.02 | ||||||
5488 | 45488 | 11/1943 | 29/11/1966 | 23 | 23.43 | ||||||
5489 | 45489 | 11/1943 | 29/11/1966 | 23 | 23.43 | ||||||
5490 | 45490 | 12/1943 | 31/12/1966 | 23 | 23.52 | ||||||
5491 | 45491 | 12/1943 | 17/07/1965 | 21.58 | Prs | Preserved | |||||
5492 | 45492 | 01/1944 | 31/12/1966 | 22.92 | 23.26 | ||||||
5493 | 45493 | 01/1944 | 06/01/1968 | 24 | 24.27 | ||||||
5494 | 45494 | 01/1944 | 16/09/1967 | 23.67 | Cut | Cashmore's (Great Bridge) | 02/1968 | 24.10 | |||
5495 | 45495 | 02/1944 | 04/03/1967 | 23.08 | 24.02 | ||||||
5496 | 45496 | 02/1944 | 08/06/1964 | 20.33 | 20.68 | ||||||
5497 | 45497 | 04/1944 | 02/1964 | 19.83 | 20.52 | ||||||
5498 | 45498 | 04/1944 | 26/06/1965 | 21.17 | Cut | Arnott Young (Carmyle) | 10/1965 | 21.52 | |||
5499 | 45499 | 04/1944 | 07/1965 | 21.25 | 21.60 |