LYR/LMS Hughes "5P" Class 4-6-0
Class | LYR | LMS | BR | Built | Depot Name | From | Date Withdrawn | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
5P | 1649 | 10420 | 08/1921 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1937 | 03/1937 | |
5P | 1650 | 10421 | 08/1921 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 11/1934 | |
5P | 1651 | 10422 | 08/1921 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1937 | 04/1937 | |
5P | 1652 | 10423 | 50423 | 08/1921 | W | Withdrawn | 03/07/1948 | 03/07/1948 |
5P | 1653 | 10424 | 09/1921 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1934 | 06/1934 | |
5P | 1654 | 10425 | 10/1921 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1936 | 04/1936 | |
5P | 1655 | 10426 | 09/1921 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1934 | 08/1934 | |
5P | 1656 | 10427 | 10/1921 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1934 | 10/1934 | |
5P | 1657 | 10428 | 03/1922 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1935 | 12/1935 | |
5P | 1658 | 10429 | 50429 | 05/1922 | W | Withdrawn | 10/04/1948 | 10/04/1948 |
5P | 1659 | 10430 | 11/1922 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1935 | 05/1935 | |
5P | 1660 | 10431 | 12/1922 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1936 | 01/1936 | |
5P | 1661 | 10432 | 50432 | 12/1922 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1949 | 03/1949 |
5P | 1662 | 10433 | 12/1922 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1935 | 03/1935 | |
5P | 1663 | 10434 | 01/1923 | W | Withdrawn | 08/1934 | 08/1934 | |
5P | 1664 | 10435 | 01/1923 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1936 | 02/1936 | |
5P | 1665 | 10436 | 02/1923 | 23C W |
Southport Withdrawn |
11/04/1936 11/1936 |
11/1936 | |
5P | 1666 | 10437 | 02/1923 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1946 | 10/1946 | |
5P | 1667 | 10438 | 03/1923 | 23C W |
Southport Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 06/1936 |
06/1936 | |
5P | 1668 | 10439 | 04/1923 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1935 | 10/1935 | |
5P | 1669 | 10440 | 04/1923 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1936 | 05/1936 | |
5P | 1670 | 10441 | 05/1923 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 11/1934 | |
5P | 1671 | 10442 | 50442 | 05/1923 | 23A 24A W |
Bank Hall Accrington Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 30/11/1935 08/1950 |
08/1950 |
5P | 1672 | 10443 | 05/1923 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1936 | 04/1936 | |
5P | 1673 | 10444 | 05/1923 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1937 | 02/1937 | |
5P | 1674 | 10445 | 06/1923 | 24E W |
Blackpool Central Withdrawn |
02/11/1935 02/1936 |
02/1936 | |
5P | 1675 | 10446 | 06/1923 | 24E W |
Blackpool Central Withdrawn |
11/04/1936 06/1946 |
06/1946 | |
5P | 1676 | 10447 | 06/1923 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 11/1934 | |
5P | 1677 | 10448 | 50448 | 07/1923 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1949 | 10/1949 |
5P | 1678 | 10449 | 08/1923 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1936 | 03/1936 | |
5P | 10450 | 08/1923 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1936 | 06/1936 | ||
5P | 10451 | 08/1923 | 26B W |
Agecroft Withdrawn |
11/04/1936 08/1936 |
08/1936 | ||
5P | 10452 | 08/1923 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1936 | 06/1936 | ||
5P | 10453 | 09/1923 | W | Withdrawn | 04/1934 | 04/1934 | ||
5P | 10454 | 09/1923 | W | Withdrawn | 1936 | 1936 | ||
5P | 10455 | 50455 | 04/1924 | W | Withdrawn | 06/10/1951 | 06/10/1951 | |
10456 | 04/1924 | W | Withdrawn | 1936 | 1936 | |||
5P | 10457 | 05/1924 | W | Withdrawn | 1936 | 1936 | ||
5P | 10458 | 05/1924 | W | Withdrawn | 1935 | 1935 | ||
5P | 10459 | 06/1924 | W | Withdrawn | 1936 | 1936 | ||
5P | 10460 | 06/1924 | 24E W |
Blackpool Central Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 1947 |
1947 | ||
5P | 10461 | 07/1924 | W | Withdrawn | 1935 | 1935 | ||
5P | 10462 | 07/1924 | W | Withdrawn | 1935 | 1935 | ||
5P | 10463 | 08/1924 | W | Withdrawn | 1935 | 1935 | ||
5P | 10464 | 08/1924 | W | Withdrawn | 1939 | 1939 | ||
5P | 10465 | 09/1924 | 24E W |
Blackpool Central Withdrawn |
30/11/1935 1937 |
1937 | ||
5P | 10466 | 09/1924 | W | Withdrawn | 1935 | 1935 | ||
5P | 10467 | 10/1924 | W | Withdrawn | 1937 | 1937 | ||
5P | 10468 | 10/1924 | W | Withdrawn | 1936 | 1936 | ||
5P | 10469 | 11/1924 | W | Withdrawn | 1935 | 1935 | ||
5P | 10470 | 11/1924 | W | Withdrawn | 1935 | 1935 | ||
5P | 10471 | 12/1924 | W | Withdrawn | 1936 | 1936 | ||
5P | 10472 | 12/1924 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1935 | 02/1935 | ||
5P | 10473 | 01/1925 | W | Withdrawn | 1937 | 1937 | ||
5P | 10474 | 01/1925 | W | Withdrawn | 1935 | 1935 | ||
5P | 1506 | 10410 | 06/1908 | W | Withdrawn | 09/1934 | 09/1934 | |
5P | 1509 | 10414 | 07/1908 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1933 | 11/1933 | |
5P | 1510 | 10408 | 08/1908 | W | Withdrawn | 07/1935 | 07/1935 | |
5P | 1511 | 10409 | 08/1908 | W | Withdrawn | 06/1936 | 06/1936 | |
5P | 1514 | 10406 | 09/1908 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1937 | 01/1937 | |
5P | 1516 | 10412 | 50412 | 10/1908 | W | Withdrawn | 02/1949 | 02/1949 |
5P | 1517 | 10416 | 10/1908 | W | Withdrawn | 03/1936 | 03/1936 | |
5P | 1518 | 10419 | 11/1908 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1934 | 01/1934 | |
5P | 1519 | 10418 | 11/1908 | W | Withdrawn | 01/1934 | 01/1934 | |
5P | 1520 | 10415 | 12/1908 | W | Withdrawn | 05/1936 | 05/1936 | |
5P | 1521 | 10411 | 12/1908 | W | Withdrawn | 12/1935 | 12/1935 | |
5P | 1522 | 10405 | 01/1909 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 11/1934 | |
5P | 1523 | 10407 | 01/1909 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1935 | 11/1935 | |
5P | 1524 | 10417 | 02/1909 | W | Withdrawn | 10/1926 | 10/1926 | |
5P | 1525 | 10413 | 03/1909 | W | Withdrawn | 11/1934 | 11/1934 |