161
BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
59380 | 02/10/1958 | 65.53 | ||||||||
59381 | 01/10/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.53 | |||||||
59382 | 01/10/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.53 | |||||||
59383 | 02/10/1958 | 65.53 | ||||||||
59384 | 08/10/1958 | 65.52 | ||||||||
59385 | 16/10/1958 | 65.49 | ||||||||
59386 | 28/10/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.46 | |||||||
59387 | 28/10/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.46 | |||||||
59388 | 11/11/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.42 | |||||||
59389 | 14/11/1958 | Hull Springhead | 65.41 | |||||||
59390 | 28/11/1958 | Hull Botanic Gardens | 65.38 | |||||||
59782 | 03/12/1960 | Hamilton (West) | 63.36 | |||||||
59783 | 03/12/1960 | Hamilton (West) | 63.36 | |||||||
59784 | 09/12/1960 | Hamilton (West) | 63.34 | |||||||
59785 | 17/12/1960 | Hamilton (West) | 63.32 | |||||||
59786 | 17/12/1960 | Hamilton (West) | 63.32 | |||||||
59787 | 23/12/1960 | Hamilton (West) | 63.30 | |||||||
59788 | 23/12/1960 | Hamilton (West) | 63.30 | |||||||
59789 | 31/12/1960 | Hamilton (West) | 63.28 | |||||||
59790 | 07/01/1961 | Hamilton (West) | 63.26 | |||||||
59791 | 14/01/1961 | Hamilton (West) | 63.24 | |||||||
59792 | 14/01/1961 | Hamilton (West) | 63.24 | |||||||
59793 | ||||||||||
59794 | ||||||||||
59795 | ||||||||||
59796 | ||||||||||
59797 | ||||||||||
59798 | ||||||||||
59799 | 18/02/1961 | Hamilton (West) | 63.15 | |||||||
59800 | 25/02/1961 | Hamilton (West) | 63.13 | |||||||
59801 | 10/03/1961 | Hamilton (West) | 63.09 | |||||||
59802 | ||||||||||
59803 | ||||||||||
59804 | ||||||||||
59805 | ||||||||||
59806 | ||||||||||
59807 |