57 Co-Co
BR (Pre Tops) | BR (47/0) | BR (47/3) | BR (47/4) | BR (47/7) | BR (47/8) | BR (57/0) | BR (57/6) | BR (57/3) | Date To Service | Bld | Rebuilt From | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
D1611 | 47032 | 47662 | 47817 | 57311 | 18/08/1964 | CW | 31/07/2003 from 47 |
Landore | 60.45 | |||||||||||
D1618 | 47037 | 47563 | 47831 | 57310 | 05/09/1964 | CW | 30/08/2003 from 47 |
Toton | 60.40 | |||||||||||
D1639 | 47055 | 47652 | 47807 | 57304 | 14/12/1964 | CW | 30/08/2002 from 47 |
Cardiff Canton | 60.12 | |||||||||||
D1653 | 47069 | 47638 | 47845 | 57301 | 16/01/1965 | CW | 31/05/2002 from 47 |
Cardiff Canton | 60.03 | |||||||||||
D1677 | 47091 | 47647 | 47846 | 57308 | 24/04/1965 | CW | 08/05/2003 from 47 |
Cardiff Canton | 59.76 | THOR | ||||||||||
D1758 | 47164 | 47571 | 47822 | 57305 | 23/05/1964 | BH | 19/12/2002 from 47 |
Tinsley | 60.68 | |||||||||||
D1811 | 47330 | 57312 | 09/02/1965 | BH | 31/10/2003 from 47 |
Nottingham Division | 59.97 | |||||||||||||
D1890 | 47371 | 57313 | 23/07/1965 | BH | 04/10/2004 from 47 |
Tinsley | 59.52 | |||||||||||||
D1891 | 47372 | 57314 | 06/08/1965 | BH | 25/10/2004 from 47 |
Tinsley | 59.48 | |||||||||||||
D1901 | 47225 | 57307 | 20/09/1965 | BH | 31/08/2003 from 47 |
Cardiff Canton | 59.36 | |||||||||||||
D1911 | 47234 | 57315 | 26/10/1965 | BH | 23/11/2004 from 47 |
Cardiff Canton | 59.26 | |||||||||||||
D1919 | 47242 | 47659 | 47814 | 57306 | 22/11/1965 | BH | 31/03/2003 from 47 |
Cardiff Canton | 59.18 | |||||||||||
D1928 | 47251 | 47589 | 47827 | 57302 | 21/01/1966 | BH | 31/07/2002 from 47 |
Bristol Bath Road | 59.02 | |||||||||||
D1931 | 47254 | 47651 | 47806 | 57309 | 21/02/1966 | BH | 30/06/2003 from 47 |
Bristol Bath Road | 58.93 | |||||||||||
D1957 | 47261 | 47554 | 47705 | 57303 | 28/01/1967 | BH | 27/02/2003 from 47 |
Western Lines (LMR) | 58.00 | |||||||||||
D1992 | 47290 | 57316 | 15/03/1966 | CW | 20/12/2004 from 47 |
York (North) | 58.87 |