164
BR | Date To Service | Depot Delivered To | Date Withdrawn | Depot Withdrawn From | Svc Age (Yrs) | Fate | Where | When | Tot Age (Yrs) | Name |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
59100 | 30/10/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 66.45 | |||||||
59101 | 19/11/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 66.40 | |||||||
59102 | 29/11/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 19/01/1988 | Ayr | 30.17 | 66.37 | ||||
59103 | 13/12/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 23/08/1969 | Neville Hill | 11.67 | 66.33 | ||||
59104 | 19/12/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 66.32 | |||||||
59105 | 21/12/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 66.31 | |||||||
59106 | 31/12/1957 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 21/12/1986 | Tyseley | 29 | 66.28 | ||||
59107 | 08/01/1958 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 66.26 | |||||||
59108 | 23/01/1958 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 66.22 | |||||||
59109 | 30/01/1958 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 66.20 | |||||||
59569 | 18/12/1959 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 64.32 | |||||||
59570 | 18/12/1959 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 64.32 | |||||||
59571 | 29/12/1959 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 64.29 | |||||||
59572 | 06/01/1960 | Bradford Hammerton Street | 64.27 |