Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 308 Today
» 1021 Yesterday
» 4654 Week
» 4654 Month
» 71516 Year
» 1736892 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

104


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
50420      
50421 27/04/1957 9A Longsight (New) 27/04/1957
50422 11/05/1957 9A Longsight (New) 11/05/1957
50423 18/05/1957 9A Longsight (New) 18/05/1957
50424
50425 27/04/1957 9A Longsight (New) 27/04/1957
50426 11/05/1957 9A Longsight (New) 11/05/1957
50427 18/05/1957 9A Longsight (New) 18/05/1957
50428 25/05/1957 9A Longsight (New) 25/05/1957
50429 01/06/1957 9A Longsight (New) 01/06/1957
50430 08/06/1957 9A Longsight (New) 08/06/1957
50431 15/06/1957 9A Longsight (New) 15/06/1957
50432
50433
50434
50435
50436
50437
50438 14/07/1974
50439
50440
50441 W Withdrawn 04/05/1969 04/05/1969
50442
50443
50444
50445
50446
50447
50448
50449
50450
50451
50452
50453
50454
50455
50456
50457
50458
50459
50460
50461 15/07/1987
50462
50463
50464
50465
50466
50467
50468
50469
50470
50471
50472
50473
50474
50475
50476
50477
50478
50479
50480 25/05/1957 9A Longsight (New) 25/05/1957
50481 01/06/1957 9A Longsight (New) 01/06/1957
50482 08/06/1957 9A Longsight (New) 08/06/1957
50483 15/06/1957 9A Longsight (New) 15/06/1957
50484
50485
50486
50487
50488
50489
50490
50491
50492
50493
50494
50495
50496
50497
50498
50499
50500
50501
50502
50503
50504
50505
50506
50507
50508
50509
50510
50511
50512
50513 W Withdrawn 16/11/1963 16/11/1963
50514
50515
50516
50517
50518
50519
50520
50521
50522
50523
50524
50525 15/07/1987
50526
50527
50528
50529
50530
50531
50532
50533
50534
50535
50536
50537
50538
50539
50540
50541
50542 06/06/1958 51A Darlington (New) 06/06/1958
50543 16/06/1958   (New) 16/06/1958
50544 26/06/1958 51A Darlington (New) 26/06/1958
50545 04/07/1958   (New) 04/07/1958
50546 11/07/1958   (New) 11/07/1958
50547 18/07/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 18/07/1958
50548 25/07/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 25/07/1958
50549 19/08/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 19/08/1958
50550 28/08/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 28/08/1958
50551 05/09/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 05/09/1958
50552 12/09/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 12/09/1958
50553 19/09/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 19/09/1958
50554 25/09/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 25/09/1958
50555 02/10/1958   (New) 02/10/1958
50556 10/10/1958   (New) 10/10/1958
50557 18/10/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 18/10/1958
50558 25/10/1958 53C
W
Hull Springhead (New)
Withdrawn
25/10/1958
31/07/1967
31/07/1967
50559 04/11/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 04/11/1958 19/09/1977
50560 13/11/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 13/11/1958
50561 26/11/1958 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 26/11/1958
50562 04/12/1958 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 04/12/1958
50563 06/06/1958 51A Darlington (New) 06/06/1958
50564 16/06/1958   (New) 16/06/1958
50565 26/06/1958 51A Darlington (New) 26/06/1958
50566 04/07/1958   (New) 04/07/1958
50567 11/07/1958   (New) 11/07/1958
50568 18/07/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 18/07/1958
50569 25/07/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 25/07/1958 23/08/1969
50570 19/08/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 19/08/1958
50571 28/08/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 28/08/1958
50572 05/09/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 05/09/1958
50573 12/09/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 12/09/1958
50574 19/09/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 19/09/1958
50575 25/09/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 25/09/1958
50576 02/10/1958   (New) 02/10/1958
50577 10/10/1958   (New) 10/10/1958
50578 18/10/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 18/10/1958
50579 25/10/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 25/10/1958
50580 04/11/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 04/11/1958
50581 13/11/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 13/11/1958
50582 26/11/1958 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 26/11/1958
50583 04/12/1958 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 04/12/1958
50584 18/12/1958 50A York (North) (New) 18/12/1958
50585 29/12/1958 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 29/12/1958
50586 15/01/1959 50B Neville Hill (New) 15/01/1959
50587 31/01/1959   (New) 31/01/1959
50588 12/03/1959 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 12/03/1959
50589 18/12/1958 50A York (North) (New) 18/12/1958
50590 29/12/1958 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 29/12/1958
50591 15/01/1959 50B Neville Hill (New) 15/01/1959
50592 31/01/1959 W (New)
Withdrawn
31/01/1959
31/07/1967
31/07/1967
50593 12/03/1959 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 12/03/1959
50594 15/05/1958 50A York (North) (New) 15/05/1958
50595 16/05/1958 50A York (North) (New) 16/05/1958
50596 16/05/1958 50A York (North) (New) 16/05/1958
50597 24/05/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 24/05/1958
50598 30/05/1958 56G Bradford Hammerton Street (New) 30/05/1958