Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 896 Today
» 1177 Yesterday
» 3202 Week
» 28036 Month
» 62368 Year
» 1727744 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

104


Date Event Number From Depot From To Depot To
27/04/1957 To Service 50421   NEW 9A Longsight
27/04/1957 To Service 50425   NEW 9A Longsight
11/05/1957 To Service 50422   NEW 9A Longsight
11/05/1957 To Service 50426   NEW 9A Longsight
18/05/1957 To Service 50423   NEW 9A Longsight
18/05/1957 To Service 50427   NEW 9A Longsight
25/05/1957 To Service 50428   NEW 9A Longsight
25/05/1957 To Service 50480   NEW 9A Longsight
01/06/1957 To Service 50429   NEW 9A Longsight
01/06/1957 To Service 50481   NEW 9A Longsight
08/06/1957 To Service 50430   NEW 9A Longsight
08/06/1957 To Service 50482   NEW 9A Longsight
15/06/1957 To Service 50431   NEW 9A Longsight
15/06/1957 To Service 50483   NEW 9A Longsight
15/05/1958 To Service 50594   NEW 50A York (North)
16/05/1958 To Service 50595   NEW 50A York (North)
16/05/1958 To Service 50596   NEW 50A York (North)
24/05/1958 To Service 50597   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
30/05/1958 To Service 50598   NEW 56G Bradford Hammerton Street
06/06/1958 To Service 50542   NEW 51A Darlington
06/06/1958 To Service 50563   NEW 51A Darlington
26/06/1958 To Service 50544   NEW 51A Darlington
26/06/1958 To Service 50565   NEW 51A Darlington
18/07/1958 To Service 50547   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
18/07/1958 To Service 50568   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
25/07/1958 To Service 50548   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
25/07/1958 To Service 50569   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
19/08/1958 To Service 50549   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
19/08/1958 To Service 50570   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
28/08/1958 To Service 50550   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
28/08/1958 To Service 50571   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
05/09/1958 To Service 50551   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
05/09/1958 To Service 50572   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
12/09/1958 To Service 50552   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
12/09/1958 To Service 50573   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
19/09/1958 To Service 50553   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
19/09/1958 To Service 50574   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
25/09/1958 To Service 50554   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
25/09/1958 To Service 50575   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
18/10/1958 To Service 50557   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
18/10/1958 To Service 50578   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
25/10/1958 To Service 50558   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
25/10/1958 To Service 50579   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
04/11/1958 To Service 50559   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
04/11/1958 To Service 50580   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
13/11/1958 To Service 50560   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
13/11/1958 To Service 50581   NEW 53C Hull Springhead
26/11/1958 To Service 50561   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
26/11/1958 To Service 50582   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
04/12/1958 To Service 50562   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
04/12/1958 To Service 50583   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
18/12/1958 To Service 50584   NEW 50A York (North)
18/12/1958 To Service 50589   NEW 50A York (North)
29/12/1958 To Service 50585   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
29/12/1958 To Service 50590   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
15/01/1959 To Service 50586   NEW 50B Neville Hill
15/01/1959 To Service 50591   NEW 50B Neville Hill
12/03/1959 To Service 50588   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
12/03/1959 To Service 50593   NEW 53B Hull Botanic Gardens
16/11/1963 Condemned 50513       COND
31/07/1967 Condemned 50558 53C Hull Springhead   COND
31/07/1967 Condemned 50592 SGosfo     COND
04/05/1969 Condemned 50441       COND
23/08/1969 Condemned 50569 53C Hull Springhead   COND
14/07/1974 Condemned 50438       COND
19/09/1977 Condemned 50559 53C Hull Springhead   COND
15/07/1987 Condemned 50461       COND
15/07/1987 Condemned 50525       COND