Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 142 Today
» 1096 Yesterday
» 2307 Week
» 2307 Month
» 69169 Year
» 1734545 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

104


BR Date To Service Depot Delivered To Date Withdrawn Depot Withdrawn From Svc Age (Yrs) Fate Where When Tot Age (Yrs) Name
50420
50421 27/04/1957 Longsight 63.89
50422 11/05/1957 Longsight 63.85
50423 18/05/1957 Longsight 63.84
50428 25/05/1957 Longsight 63.82
50429 01/06/1957 Longsight 63.80
50430 08/06/1957 Longsight 63.78
50431 15/06/1957 Longsight 63.76
50432
50433
50434
50435
50436
50437
50438 14/07/1974 Newton Heath
50439
50440
50441 04/05/1969 Newton Heath
50442
50443
50444
50445
50446
50447
50448
50449
50450
50451
50452
50453
50454
50455
50456
50457
50458
50459
50460
50461 15/07/1987 Ayr
50462
50463
50464
50465
50466
50467
50468
50469
50470
50471
50472
50473
50474
50475
50476
50477
50478
50479
50532
50533
50534
50535
50536
50537
50538
50539
50540
50541
50594 15/05/1958 York (North) 62.84
50595 16/05/1958 York (North) 62.84
50596 16/05/1958 York (North) 62.84
50597 24/05/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.82
50598 30/05/1958 Bradford Hammerton Street 62.80