Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 18 Online
» 571 Today
» 1095 Yesterday
» 571 Week
» 8183 Month
» 75045 Year
» 1740421 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter

166


BR Built Depot Name From Date Withdrawn
59209 06/06/1958 51A Darlington (New) 06/06/1958
59210 16/06/1958   (New) 16/06/1958
59211 26/06/1958 51A Darlington (New) 26/06/1958
59212 04/07/1958   (New) 04/07/1958
59213 11/07/1958   (New) 11/07/1958
59214 18/07/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 18/07/1958
59215 25/07/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 25/07/1958
59216 19/08/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 19/08/1958
59217 28/08/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 28/08/1958
59218 05/09/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 05/09/1958
59219 12/09/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 12/09/1958
59220 19/09/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 19/09/1958
59221 25/09/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 25/09/1958
59222 02/10/1958 W (New)
Withdrawn
02/10/1958
09/03/1963
09/03/1963
59223 10/10/1958   (New) 10/10/1958
59224 18/10/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 18/10/1958
59225 25/10/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 25/10/1958 18/01/1988
59226 04/11/1958 53C Hull Springhead (New) 04/11/1958
59227 13/11/1958 53C
W
Hull Springhead (New)
Withdrawn
13/11/1958
09/07/1984
09/07/1984
59228 26/11/1958 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 26/11/1958
59229 04/12/1958 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 04/12/1958
59240 18/12/1958 50A York (North) (New) 18/12/1958
59241 29/12/1958 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 29/12/1958
59242 15/01/1959 50B Neville Hill (New) 15/01/1959
59243 31/01/1959   (New) 31/01/1959
59244 12/03/1959 53B Hull Botanic Gardens (New) 12/03/1959